Smith v. Hunt & Henriques et al
Plaintiff: Raymond J Smith
Defendant: Hunt & Henriques, Michael S Hunt and Janalie Ann Henriques
Case Number: 5:2012cv04150
Filed: August 7, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting as modified 65 Hunt & Henriques' Motion for Attorney Fees; and denying 66 Hunt & Henriques' Motion re Citation Designation. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 55 defendant's Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions; granting 60 defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Untimely Opposition. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2013)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting 45 Substitution of Attorney. Jim Q. Tran substituted as plaintiff's counsel in place of Ashley Rose. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 8/29/2013. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER re 42 Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 8/13/2013. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2013)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Re-Setting Initial Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 7/16/2013. Each party to file a form Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge by 7/16/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/23/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/18/2013. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2013)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES AND VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on June 11, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER REGARDING FILING OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on June 7, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on April 25, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2013)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on March 25, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on March 1, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2013)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 2/26/2013 02:00 PM. Show Cause Response due by 2/20/2013.. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on February 6, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Hunt & Henriques et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond J Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunt & Henriques
Represented By: Kurtiss Anthony Jacobs
Represented By: Michael S. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael S Hunt
Represented By: Kurtiss Anthony Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janalie Ann Henriques
Represented By: Michael S. Hunt
Represented By: Kurtiss Anthony Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?