Navcom Techonology, Inc et al v. OKI Semiconductor America, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Navcom Techonology, Inc and Deere & Company
Defendant: OKI Semiconductor America, Inc, OKI Electric Industry Co, Ltd, OKI Data Americas, Inc., LAPIS Semiconductor Co, Ltd, Rohm Semiconductor USA, LLC, Does One through Ten, Inclusive and OKI Electric America, Inc
Case Number: 5:2012cv04175
Filed: August 8, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 426 ORDER Re Attorneys' Fees. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/7/2020. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2020)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 378 ORDER denying 343 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/16/2017. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2017)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER RE: HEARING ON NOVEMBER 5, 2014. Each side's total presentation shall be limited to 45 minutes for all motions. The majority of the parties' argument should be focused on Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Motion for New Trial (Docket Item Nos. 330 , 343 ). The court does not require extensive argument concerning Defendant's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law or Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs (Docket Item Nos. 332 , 333 ). The parties shall prepare their arguments accordingly. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/4/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2014)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 328 JUDGMENT for Defendant. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/28/2014. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014)
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER RE: PROPOSED JUDGMENT. The court orders that Defendant shall submit to the court a proposed form of judgment on or before 5/27/2014. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/20/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2014)
March 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER granting 228 Administrative Motion for Order Clarifying Issues for Trial. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/20/2014. (ejdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2014)
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. The above-entitled case is referred to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd for a settlement conference to occur no later than 3/31/2014. Counsel are advised to contact Judge Lloyd's Courtroom Deputy to arrange a date and time for the conference. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/13/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2014)
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 97 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 100 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 102 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 131 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/11/2014. (ejdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2014)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 87 Discovery Dispute Joint Report #1 (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 STIPULATION AND ORDER Re: Deposition at the United States Embassy, Tokyo Japan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on July 31, 2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 STIPULATION AND ORDER for depositions in Japan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on April 15, 2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER (MODIFIED BY THE COURT). Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on January 24, 2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Order Granting 54 Stipulation selecting Private ADR. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 11/13/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Granting Dismissal of Individual Defendants re 50 Stipulation filed by OKI Data Americas, Inc., OKI Electric America, Inc, LAPIS Semiconductor Co, Ltd, Rohm Semiconductor USA, LLC, ***11/30/2012 Motion Hearings terminated. Motions terminated: 13 MOTION to Remand Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Deere & Company, Navcom Techonology, Inc, 33 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6). Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/1/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Navcom Techonology, Inc et al v. OKI Semiconductor America, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Navcom Techonology, Inc
Represented By: Brett Michael Schuman
Represented By: Rachel Melissa Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deere & Company
Represented By: Brett Michael Schuman
Represented By: Rachel Melissa Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OKI Semiconductor America, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OKI Electric Industry Co, Ltd
Represented By: Michael A. Ladra
Represented By: Matthew Rawlinson
Represented By: Michelle Patricia Woodhouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OKI Data Americas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAPIS Semiconductor Co, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rohm Semiconductor USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does One through Ten, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OKI Electric America, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?