June 4, 2020 |
Filing
225
ORDER GRANTING 219 MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/4/2020. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2020)
|
January 9, 2020 |
Filing
217
ORDER Addressing Post-Appeal Matters. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on January 9, 2020. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2020)
|
September 26, 2017 |
Filing
197
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW AND GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/26/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
|
October 15, 2015 |
Filing
138
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. The above-entitled case is referred to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd for a settlement conference to occur at 9:30 a.m. on 10/30/2015. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/15/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2015)
|
February 13, 2015 |
Filing
116
PRETRIAL ORDER (JURY). Based on the parties' Joint Trial Setting Conference Statement, the court has determined an appearance is unnecessary at this time. Accordingly, the 2/19/2015 Trial Setting Conference is VACATED and the parties are orde red to comply with the following schedule: Fact and Expert Discovery cutoff 6/20/2015. Dispositive Motion Deadline 7/15/2015. Hearing on Anticipated Dispositive Motions set for 9/3/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Joint Final Pretrial Conference Statement, Motions in Limine and Exchange of Exhibits due by 10/1/2015. Voir Dire Questions, Proposed Jury Instructions, and Proposed Jury Verdict Forms due by 10/5/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Jury Selection set for 11/3/2015 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Jury trial set for 11/3/2015, 11/4/2015, 11/6/2015 before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Jury Deliberations set for 11/9/2015, 11/10/2015 before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The court advises the parties that this is the final case schedule. All parties are expected to comply as directed above. This schedule will not be amended further absent the presentation of good cause necessitating such an amendment. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/13/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2015)
|
January 14, 2015 |
Filing
111
ORDER denying 95 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and To Strike Punitive Damages Allegations. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/14/2015. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2015) Modified on 1/14/2015 (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF).
|
August 13, 2014 |
Filing
100
ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT ENE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/13/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2014).
|
June 11, 2014 |
Filing
94
ORDER Referring Case to Early Neutral Evaluation. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/11/2014. (Correction of 93 to input missing signature).(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2014)
|
May 14, 2014 |
Filing
91
ORDER GRANTING 90 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Simulados Software, Ltd. Attorney Kevin Patrick O'Brien and Bruce Charles Piontkowski terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/14/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2014)
|
May 13, 2014 |
Filing
85
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The parties are ordered to appear before the Honorable Edward J. Davila on 5/16/2014 at 10:00 a.m. to show cause why the court should not impose any and all appropriate sanctions for willful disobedience of a court order. The parties may request that this Order to Show Cause be vacated and the parties relieved of the obligation to appear if one of the two documents referenced above is filed on or before 4:00 p.m. on 5/14/2014. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/13/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2014)
|
May 1, 2014 |
Filing
83
Order Granting 46 Motion to Dismiss. The Court dismisses Simulados' second and third causes of action arising under the UCC and DTPA without leave to amend. The Court orders that Simuados must file a more definite statement of its request for damages within 30 days of the this order. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 5/1/2014.(ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2014) Modified text on 5/1/2014 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
|
February 25, 2014 |
Filing
80
ORDER RE: 74 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLETE DISCOVERY. On or before 2/28/2014, Plaintiff shall file a proposed order which details the specific dates requested by Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/25/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
|
October 22, 2013 |
Filing
73
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd terminating 72 plaintiff's Motion to Compel. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
|
September 5, 2013 |
Filing
70
ORDER VACATING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. In light of the currently pending motion to dismiss (see Docket Item Nos. 46, 67), the Preliminary Pretrial Conference scheduled for September 13, 2013, is VACATED and will be reset, if necessary, upon resolution of the pending motion. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/5/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2013)
|
June 25, 2013 |
Filing
64
ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/19/2013. Case Management Conference set for 7/26/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. ***OSC Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/24/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
|
June 13, 2013 |
Filing
62
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SETTLEMENT. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/26/2013 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 7/19/2013. All other pretrial deadlines and hearing dates are VACATED and any pending motions are TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/13/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2013)
|
January 29, 2013 |
Filing
57
Order Denying 56 Motion to Continue ADR Conference. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 1/29/2013.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
|