California Sportfishing Protection Alliance v. Salinas Valley Solid Waste Authority et al
Plaintiff: California Sportfishing Protection Alliance
Defendant: Salinas Valley Solid Waste Authority, Patrick Mathews and David B. Meza
Case Number: 5:2012cv04388
Filed: August 21, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER VACATING REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. The prior order referring this case to mediation is VACATED. This case is instead referred to Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal for a settlement conference to occur no later than 2/25/2013. The parties are instructed to contact Judge Grewal's Courtroom Deputy to arrange a date for the conference.Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/27/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2012)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order Denying 24 Motion to Appear by Telephone as to Defendant. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 11/20/2012.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2012)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING 10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant David B. Meza filed by California Sportfishing Protection Alliance. David B. Meza (an individual) terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/1/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: California Sportfishing Protection Alliance v. Salinas Valley Solid Waste Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Sportfishing Protection Alliance
Represented By: Emily Jeanne Brand
Represented By: Andrew L. Packard
Represented By: Erik M Roper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salinas Valley Solid Waste Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David B. Meza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?