Cypress Semiconductor Corp. v. Promos Technologies, Inc
Plaintiff: Cypress Semiconductor Corp.
Defendant: Promos Technologies, Inc
Case Number: 5:2012cv04620
Filed: September 4, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING 42 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Cypress Semiconductor Corp. The Clerk shall close this file. ***ALL Deadlines terminated. Motions terminated: 41 MOTION to Dismiss AND AWARD OF ATTORNEY FEES AND EXPENSES filed by Promos Technologies, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/25/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2013)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER finding as moot 30 Motion for Default Judgment; granting 31 Motion to Set Aside Default. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/25/2013. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2013) Modified text on 7/25/2013 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Accordingly, the 5/3/2013 Case Management Conference and all other pretrial deadlines are VACATED. The court schedules a hearing on Plaintiff's anticipated Motion for Default Judgmentfor July 12, 2013, at 9:00 a.m. Plaintiff shall file, serve and notice the motion as necessary pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.***5/3/2013 CMC Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/30/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2013)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER CONTINUING 3/22/2013 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Updated Case Management Statement due by 4/26/2013. Case Management Conference set for 5/3/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/18/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2013)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Updated Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/15/2013. Case Management Conference set for 3/22/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila.***1/25/2013 Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/22/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
December 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/18/2013. Case Management Conference set for 1/25/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. *** 12/17/2012 CMC Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/12/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cypress Semiconductor Corp. v. Promos Technologies, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Promos Technologies, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cypress Semiconductor Corp.
Represented By: Traci Michelle Keith
Represented By: Philip J. Wang
Represented By: Terence Paul Woodsome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?