Kotsinsh et al v. Greenpoint Morgage Funding Incorporation et al
Plaintiff: Imant Kotsinsh and David-Wynn Miller
Defendant: Aurora Loan Services, Marin Conveyancing Corporation, Greenpoint Morgage Funding Incorporation and Nationstar Mortgage Services, LLC
Case Number: 5:2012cv04636
Filed: September 5, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1640
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DISMISSING ALL REMAINING DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on March 5, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER dismissing Akerman Senterfitt, LLP, Taylor L. Broadhead, and Justin D. Balser; Motion 11 denied as moot. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ALL REMAINING DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on January 31, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2013) Modified text on 1/31/2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED AS TO DEFENDANT GREENPOINT MORTGAGE FUNDING, INC. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on December 13, 2012. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2012)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 1/2/2013 02:00 PM. Show Cause Response due by 12/10/2012.. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on November 26, 2012. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kotsinsh et al v. Greenpoint Morgage Funding Incorporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Loan Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marin Conveyancing Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenpoint Morgage Funding Incorporation
Represented By: Hunter Randolph Eley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Imant Kotsinsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David-Wynn Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?