Edwards v. Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Laura A Edwards
Defendant: Western Reconveyance Corporation, Does 1 - 100, inclusive, Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation and OCWEN Loan Services, LLC
Case Number: 5:2012cv04868
Filed: September 17, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER OF DISMISSAL UPON SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/26/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER EXPUNGING 58 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/17/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS SHOULD NOT BE SANCTIONED - Show Cause Response due by 9/9/2013. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/28/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2013)
August 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS re 43 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint. Defendants' motion to dismiss as to the plaintiffs' claim of promissory estoppel is DENIED. The motion to dismiss the First Cause of Action against Freddie Mac is GRANTED WITH PREJUDICE. The motion to dismiss the Second Cause of Action against Freddie Mac and Ocwen is GRANTED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/15/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 22 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER VACATING MOTION HEARING re 22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, OCWEN Loan Services, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 8, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REGARDING MOTION TO DISMISS.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/13/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Reconveyance Corporation
Represented By: Eric Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 - 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Eric D. Houser
Represented By: Sara Firoozeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCWEN Loan Services, LLC
Represented By: Sara Firoozeh
Represented By: Eric D. Houser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura A Edwards
Represented By: Jeremy J. Alberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?