Evans Analytical Group, Inc. v. Green Plant Farms, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Evans Analytical Group, Inc.
Defendant: Shri Thanedar, Does 1 to 20, inclusive and Green Plant Farms, LLC
Case Number: 5:2012cv05023
Filed: September 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 12 Motion to Dismiss.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2013)
June 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Regarding Joint Settlement Status Report. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/22/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2013)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 26 Stipulation selecting Mediation.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 23 Motion to Substitute Law Firms.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
February 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Continuing Hearing. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/18/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2013)
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans Analytical Group, Inc. v. Green Plant Farms, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shri Thanedar
Represented By: James William Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Plant Farms, LLC
Represented By: James William Brody
Represented By: Nathan Earl Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evans Analytical Group, Inc.
Represented By: David W. Lively
Represented By: Michaeline H Correa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?