Emeco Industries, Inc. v. Restoration Hardware, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Emeco Industries, Inc.
Defendant: Gary Friedman and Restoration Hardware, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2012cv05072
Filed: October 1, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO DISMISS ACTION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 11, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2013)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference scheduled for February 1, 2013 is continued to March 22, 2013. The parties shall file a Joint Case Management Statement no later than March 15, 2013 or, in lieu thereof, may file a stipulation requesting a further extension in light of the anticipated dismissal. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 29, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION. The hearing on plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction is continued to March 1, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 10, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2013)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO BRING EQUIPMENT INTO THE COURTROOM FOR USE AT HEARING ON JANUARY 11, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 8, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2013)
December 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO FILE SURREPLY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 12, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2012)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE ON PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. The hearing is continued from December 14, 2012 to January 11, 2013, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 11, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS; AFFORDING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO AMEND; VACATING HEARING. To the extent the motion seeks dismissal of plaintiff's claim, included in the First Cause of Action, that defen dants have infringed the mark registered as No. 3,191,187, the motion is granted. To the extent the motion seeks dismissal of plaintiffs claim, included in the Second Cause of Action, that defendants have engaged in counterfeiting with respect to pla intiff's marks "The Navy Chair" and "111 Navy Chair," the motion is granted. To the extent the motion seeks dismissal of the Sixth Cause of Action, the motion is granted. To the extent the motion seeks dismissal of the port ions of the Seventh Cause of Action that are derivative of the claims dismissed above, the motion is granted. In all other respects, the motion is denied. Should plaintiff wish to file a First Amended Complaint, plaintiff shall file it no later than January 4, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 6, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2012)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Initial Case Management Conference shall be held on Friday, February 1, 2013, at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 20, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2012)
October 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATED REQUEST TO ENLARGE TIME FOR BRIEFING AND HEARING ON PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND ORDER THEREON. Defendant's opposition, if any, is due November 16, 2012. Plaintiff's reply, if any, is due November 30, 2012. The hearing is continued to December 14, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 18, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emeco Industries, Inc. v. Restoration Hardware, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Friedman
Represented By: Nathaniel Bryan Sabri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Restoration Hardware, Inc.
Represented By: Nathaniel Bryan Sabri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emeco Industries, Inc.
Represented By: John Willson Spiegel
Represented By: Jonathan Hugh Blavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?