Lambertson v. Lewis et al
Plaintiff: John D. Lambertson
Defendant: G. D. Lewis and John 1-10 Does
Case Number: 5:2012cv05122
Filed: October 2, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: PSLC CLA
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/17/17. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER by Judge James Donato denying 73 Motion to Correct Mistake.. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2016)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER by Judge James Donato denying 69 Motion for Contempt. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2016)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER by Judge James Donato denying 64 Motion for Leave to File Depositions.. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2016)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER TO REOPEN CASE AND SEND PLAINTIFF A SUBPOENA. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/1/16. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2016)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/3/14. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lambertson v. Lewis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John D. Lambertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. D. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John 1-10 Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?