Barrera v. The Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: John Barrera, Jr.
Defendant: The Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2012cv05199
Filed: October 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Benito
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS AND CLASS REPRESENTATIVE ENHANCEMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 05/20/2015. (lhklc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2015)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/1/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2015)
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 3/10/2015. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2015)
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO VACATE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 3/9/2015. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2015)
March 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER TO FILE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 3/5/2015. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2015)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 103 AMENDED ORDER REGARDING FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 2/19/2015. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2015)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 87 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 10/15/2014. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2014)
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER GRANTING 78 Proposed Order filed by John Barrera, Jr.. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 10/1/2014. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2014)
July 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 7/30/2014. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2014)
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference to March 12, 2014. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on January 14, 2014. (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2014)
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Directing Parties to File Joint Case Management Statement. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on January 10, 2014. (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2014)
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER (MODIFIED BY THE COURT) re 49 MOTION for Protective Order Stipulated Protective Order filed by John Barrera, Jr., The Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/3/2014. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014)
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER directing parties to file joint cause management statement. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on August 12, 2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER re 35 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by The Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on June 18, 2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2013)
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Directing Parties to File a Joint Case Management Statement. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on June 14, 2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2013)
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 29 Stipulation to Continue Further Status Conference.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2013)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 26 Stipulation to Extend Mediation Deadlins (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barrera v. The Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Barrera, Jr.
Represented By: William Lucas Marder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Clement Cheng
Represented By: Krystal Noel LoPilato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?