Stanford Hospital and Clinics v. Hawaii Management Alliance Association
Plaintiff: Stanford Hospital and Clinics
Defendant: Hawaii Management Alliance Association and Does 1 through 25
Case Number: 5:2012cv05273
Filed: October 11, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL by Hon. William Alsup granting 27 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND VACATING HEARING by Judge William Alsup [denying 8 Motion to Dismiss] (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 11 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2012)
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/24/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanford Hospital and Clinics v. Hawaii Management Alliance Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanford Hospital and Clinics
Represented By: Melanie Joy Young
Represented By: Barry Sullivan
Represented By: Michael Suzek Robinson
Represented By: Richard Alan Lovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaii Management Alliance Association
Represented By: Clarissa A. Kang
Represented By: Virginia H. Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?