Diaz et al v. DAWS Manufacturing Company, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Jesus Cortes Diaz and Margarita Diaz
Defendant: DAWS Manufacturing Company, Inc, Snap-on Incorporated and Lowe's HIW, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2012cv05325
Filed: October 16, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SETTLEMENT. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 12/21/2017 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 12/14/2017. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/21/2017. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2017)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 156 SECOND ORDER RE: MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/14/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2017)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 154 FIRST ORDER RE: MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/13/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2017)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 101 , 102 DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/11/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 PRETRIAL ORDER(JURY) - SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFIC DEADLINES: The Trial Setting Conference scheduled for 2/2/2017 is VACATED - NO APPEARANCE NECESSARY, and the parties are ordered to comply with the schedule set forth in the order. Joint Final Pretrial Conference Statement due by 8/31/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/14/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Jury Selection set for 9/26/2017 09:00 AM, Jury Trial set for 01:30 PM, trial dates as follows:9/27, 9/29, 10/2, 10/4, 10/6, 10/10, 10/11, 10/13, 10/17, 10/18-10/19(deliberations) before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/24/2017. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2017)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The parties are ordered to appear on 12/15/2016 at 10:00 a.m. to show cause why the court should not impose any and all appropriate sanctions, including monetary sanctions and/or dismissal of this action, on the parties, or an y of them, for willful disobedience of a court order.The parties may file a response to this order demonstrating good cause why sanctions should not be imposed on or before 12/8/2016. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/18/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2016)
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER. The parties are advised to consult Judge Lloyd's Standing Order re: Civil Discovery Disputes, and shall present their dispute to Judge Lloyd on or before May 31, 2016. The court schedules a Further Status Conference for 10:00 a.m. on July 21, 2016. The parties shall file an updated Joint Status Conference Statement on or before July 14, 2016. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/19/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2016)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting 84 Stipulation Regarding Testing of Cleats. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/19/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2016)
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Having reviewed the parties' updated Joint Case Management Statement filed on December 3, 2015 (Docket Item No. 79), and in order to permit the parties to undertake materials testing of the subject cleats, the Case Management Conference currently scheduled for December 10, 2015, is CONTINUED to 10:00 a.m. on May 19, 2016. The parties shall file an updated Joint Case Management Conference Statement on or before May 12, 2016. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/7/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Having reviewed the parties' Joint Case Management Statement filed on September 3, 2015 (Docket Item No. 77 ), and in order to permit Plaintiff's counsel to continue discussions with Mr. Lee& #039;s appellate attorney, the Case Management Conference currently scheduled for September 10, 2015, is CONTINUED to 10:00 a.m. on December 10, 2015. The parties shall file an updated Joint Case Management Conference Statement on or before December 3, 2015. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/8/2015.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2015)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. In the next Joint Case Management Conference Statement, the parties shall detail what, if any, additional discovery or other matters can be conducted without access to the retention cleats. If the part ies have accomplished all that can be done, and assuming access to the retention cleats will not be forthcoming, the court intends to stay this action until the final resolution of Mr. Lee's criminal proceedings. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/3/2015. Case Management Conference set for 9/10/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/4/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2015)
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. In light of the parties' Joint Case Management Statement, the Court finds an appearance unnecessary at this time. Accordingly, the Court continues the August 9, 2013 Case Management Conference to December 13, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. The parties shall file an updated joint case management statement by December 6, 2013. ***8/9/2013 CMC Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/5/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2013)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Updated Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/2/2013. Case Management Conference set for 8/9/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. ***2/15/2013 CMC Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/12/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2013)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting 31 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint and Motion to Dismiss Better Built Company. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/9/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diaz et al v. DAWS Manufacturing Company, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Cortes Diaz
Represented By: Nicole N. Hancock
Represented By: Mark B. O'Connor
Represented By: Michael Murt Shea
Represented By: Michael Murt Shea, Jr
Represented By: Nicole N. Hancock
Represented By: Mark B. O'Connor
Represented By: Michael Murt Shea
Represented By: Michael Murt Shea, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margarita Diaz
Represented By: Nicole N. Hancock
Represented By: Mark B. O'Connor
Represented By: Michael Murt Shea
Represented By: Michael Murt Shea, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAWS Manufacturing Company, Inc
Represented By: Bradford Alan Rosenblatt
Represented By: Troy Dean Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snap-on Incorporated
Represented By: Jennifer J. Capabianco
Represented By: Paul Edmond Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's HIW, Inc.
Represented By: Bradford Alan Rosenblatt
Represented By: Troy Dean Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?