April 2, 2014 |
Filing
481
STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING OPT -INS SSUCHIA CHEN, BERTHA DE LA MADRID NICKEL, XUEOU FENG, ROGER SERMONE, EMI SHIGEMITSU AND CHIA CHI YI by Hon. William Alsup granting 477 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2014)
|
March 25, 2014 |
Filing
472
ORDER by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins denying 222 Motion for Sanctions (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
|
March 18, 2014 |
Filing
464
ORDER PERMITTING RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO RECONSIDER THE JANUARY 8 ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 18, 2014. Response due March 24. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
|
March 14, 2014 |
Filing
458
ORDER DENYING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL (DKT. NO. 452) by Hon. William Alsup denying 452 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2014)
|
March 13, 2014 |
Filing
453
Order Releasing Transcript of Settlement Stipulation to Counsel for Parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/13/2014. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2014)
|
March 12, 2014 |
Filing
447
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION AND SETTING HEARING FOR MARCH 14 AT 9:00 A.M. re 446 MOTION to Shorten Time on Plaintiffs' Motion for Order Temporarily Enjoining Enforcement of Non-Final Settlement Agr eement filed by Michelle Lou Responses due by noon on 3/13/2014. Motion Hearing set for 3/14/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 12, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2014)
|
February 27, 2014 |
Filing
441
ORDER REGARDING CASE SCHEDULE by Hon. William Alsup finding as moot 426 Motion for Summary Judgment.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
|
February 24, 2014 |
Filing
436
ORDER REGARDING FEBRUARY 27 HEARING re 435 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 426 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication filed by MA Laboratories, Inc, Christy Yee, Christine Rao, Abr aham Ma, 434 Order, 426 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication filed by Christy Yee, 432 Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 24, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
|
February 19, 2014 |
Filing
434
ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 19, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
|
January 28, 2014 |
Filing
429
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION WITHDRAWING DISCOVERY LETTER REGARDING EMAILS AND EPOPS 428 . The hearing re discovery letter 418 set for 1/29/2014 01:00 PM is VACATED. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 1/28/14. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
|
January 8, 2014 |
Filing
420
OMNIBUS ORDER RE CERTIFICATION AND RELATED MOTIONS by Judge Alsup finding as moot 351 Motion <Class Action Denied>; finding as moot 352 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. ; denying 272 Motion to Certify Class; finding as moot 284 Motion <Class Action Denied>; finding as moot 295 Motion <Class Action Denied> (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2014)
|
January 3, 2014 |
Filing
416
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY DAVID W. SANFORD PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting 415 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014)
|
December 26, 2013 |
Filing
410
ORDER RE TIAN ACTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 26, 2013. Plaintiffs' response due December 30 at noon. Defendants' response due December 31 at noon. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2013)
|
December 5, 2013 |
Filing
394
NOTICE CONTINUING HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 5, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2013)
|
December 4, 2013 |
Filing
393
Order by Hon. William Alsup denying 383 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2013)
|
December 2, 2013 |
Filing
391
ORDER by Hon. William Alsup denying 376 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
|
November 7, 2013 |
Filing
357
ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SEAL by Hon. William Alsup denying 294 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2013)
|
October 30, 2013 |
Filing
349
ORDER DENYING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO STRIKE by Hon. William Alsup denying 346 Ex Parte Application.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2013)
|
October 24, 2013 |
Filing
293
ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION TO SEAL by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 287 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
|
October 17, 2013 |
Filing
283
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO SEAL by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 276 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2013)
|
October 9, 2013 |
Filing
269
ORDER DENYING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS by Hon. William Alsup denying 265 Motion to Shorten Time.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
|
October 2, 2013 |
Filing
264
ORDER RE SCHEDULING by Hon. William Alsup granting 261 Motion for Extension of Time to File.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013)
|
September 30, 2013 |
Filing
258
ORDER RE ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS by Judge Alsup granting in part and denying in part 251 Motion to Shorten Time; denying 252 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
|
September 24, 2013 |
Filing
249
ORDER RESOLVING VARIOUS DISCOVERY DISPUTES (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
|
September 16, 2013 |
Filing
236
ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY MEET AND CONFER - Discovery Hearing set for 9/20/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 9/16/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2013)
|
August 20, 2013 |
Filing
221
Order re: August 21, 2013 Discovery Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 8/20/2013. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2013)
|
August 12, 2013 |
Filing
212
Order Granting 210 Motion to Shorten Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 8/12/2013. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
|
August 2, 2013 |
Filing
206
ORDER DISMISSING COUNTERCLAIMS, GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, MODIFYING SCHEDULING ORDER, DENYING RECONSIDERATION, AND VACATING HEARING by Judge William Alsup [granting in part and denying in part 149 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 159 Motion to Strike ; denying 174 Motion for Leave to File; finding as moot 180 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 193 Motion for Leave to File]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2013)
|
July 12, 2013 |
Filing
196
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE ON PENDING MOTIONS re 174 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of Order filed by MA Laboratories, Inc, 193 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Michelle Lou, [1 49] MOTION to Dismiss Cross-Complaint and Anti-SLAPP Motion to Strike Cross-Complaint filed by Michelle Lou, 159 MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses filed by Michelle Lou. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 12, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2013)
|
June 26, 2013 |
Filing
168
Order re 167 Motion to Shorten Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 06/26/2013. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2013)
|
June 21, 2013 |
Filing
160
ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SEAL by Hon. William Alsup denying 148 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2013)
|
May 17, 2013 |
Filing
143
ORDER DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION RE XUEOU FENG by Judge William Alsup [denying 69 Motion to Dismiss]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
|
May 15, 2013 |
Filing
140
ORDER DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION RE MICHELLE LOU by Judge William Alsup [denying 31 Motion to Dismiss]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
|
May 9, 2013 |
Filing
130
ORDER GRANTING MODIFICATION OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Hon. William Alsup [granting in part and denying in part 125 Motion].(whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2013)
|
May 7, 2013 |
Filing
126
ORDER RE MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge William Alsup [granting 124 Motion to Shorten Time]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2013) Modified on 5/7/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
|
April 24, 2013 |
Filing
113
ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Hon. William Alsup granting 57 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
|
April 15, 2013 |
Filing
82
ORDER DENYING 75 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION filed by MA Laboratories, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 04/15/2013. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
|
March 28, 2013 |
Filing
67
Order by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins granting 61 Plaintiffs' request to compel discovery. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
|
March 27, 2013 |
Filing
65
ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 64 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINES ON PENDING ARBITRATION MOTION AND FOR ORDER COMBINING BRIEFING ON ARBITRATION MOTIONS AND EXTENDING RELATED DEADLINES filed by Michelle Lou, Motions terminated: 64 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINES ON PENDING ARBITRATION MOTION AND FOR ORDER COMBINING BRIEFING ON ARBITRATION MOTIONS AND EXTENDING RELATED DEADLINES filed by M ichelle Lou., Set/Reset Deadlines as to 64 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINES ON PENDING ARBITRATION MOTION AND FOR ORDER COMBINING BRIEFING ON ARBITRATION MOTIONS AND EXTENDING RELATED DEADLINES, 31 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Compel Arbitration and Stay the Action Pending Arbitration; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof. Responses due by 4/11/2013. Replies due by 4/29/2013. Motion Hearing set for 5/9/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 26, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
|
March 13, 2013 |
Filing
50
Order by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins granting Plaintiff's requests for discovery re: 48 Discovery Letter Brief. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2013)
|
March 5, 2013 |
Filing
47
ORDER re 42 Discovery Letter Brief Number 1 filed by Michelle Lou, 43 Discovery Letter Brief Number 2 filed by Michelle Lou, 44 Discovery Letter Brief Number 3 filed by Michelle Lou, 45 Discovery Letter Br ief Number 4 filed by Michelle Lou, 46 Discovery Letter Brief (Defendants' Request to Strike Plaintiff's Discovery Letter Briefs 1-4) filed by MA Laboratories, Inc, Christy Yee, Christine Rao, Abraham Ma. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 03/05/2013. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
|
February 11, 2013 |
Filing
40
ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND REFERRING ALL DISCOVERY DISPUTES TO A RANDOMLY-ASSIGNEDMAGISTRATE JUDGE by Judge Alsup granting 34 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 31 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Compel Arbitration and Stay the Action Pending Arbitration; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ; denying 38 Discovery Letter Brief; denying 39 Motion for Leave to File Responses due by 3/28/2013. Replies due by 4/4/2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2013)
|
February 6, 2013 |
Filing
35
ORDER REGARDING PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY re 34 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Michelle Lou (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2013)
|
January 3, 2013 |
Filing
16
ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [re 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Christy Yee, Christine Rao, Abraham Ma]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/3/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2013)
|
December 19, 2012 |
Filing
13
SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 12 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2012)
|
November 26, 2012 |
Filing
11
NOTICE REGARDING FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2012)
|