Correa v. The City of San Jose et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Correa
Defendant: The City of San Jose, The San Jose Police Department (SJPD), Michael Sullivan and Kimberly Hudson
Case Number: 5:2012cv05436
Filed: October 22, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 133 FURTHER PRETRIAL ORDER. Jury Trial set for 4/11/2016-4/15/2016 and 4/18/2016-4/22/2016, 08:30 AM-1:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/23/2016. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2016)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 95 , 101 , 121 , 122 defendant's motions in limine. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2016)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 95 , 101 defendant's Motions in Limine 1-12. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2015)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 36 defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/10/2015, 1:30 PM. Parties referred to Magistrate Judge Cousins for settlement conference to take place prior to Final Pretrial Conference. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2015)
November 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying 28 plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Complaint. 11/12/2013 hearing is vacated. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2013)
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 23 (MODIFIED BY THE COURT). Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 7/26/2013. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Correa v. The City of San Jose et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Correa
Represented By: Thomas Kevin Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of San Jose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The San Jose Police Department (SJPD)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?