Universal Green Solutions, LLC v. VII Pac Shores Investors, LLC
Plaintiff: Universal Green Solutions, LLC
Defendant: VII Pac Shores Investors, LLC
Case Number: 5:2012cv05613
Filed: November 1, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte denying 70 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 71 Motion in Limine; denying 72 Motion in Limine; granting 73 Motion in Limine; denying 77 Motion in Limine; granting in part and deny ing in part 78 Motion in Limine; denying 79 Motion in Limine; denying 80 Motion in Limine; denying 81 Motion in Limine; denying 82 Motion in Limine; denying 83 Motion in Limine; denying 84 Motion in Limine; granting in part and d enying in part 85 Motion in Limine; denying 86 Motion in Limine; granting 87 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 88 Motion in Limine; denying 90 Motion in Limine; denying 92 Motion in Limine; denying 93 Motion in Limine; denying 94 Motion in Limine; denying 95 Motion in Limine; denying 96 Motion in Limine; denying 97 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 98 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 99 Motion in Limine; denying 145 Motion in Limine (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2014)
May 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER for Objections to Jury Instructions. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/30/14. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2014)
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Granting 68 , 75 Stipulation to Bifurcate Trial. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/23/14. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte denying 60 Motion for Summary Judgment (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2014)
February 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting 48 , 49 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2014)
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER re 54 , 55 Allowing Plaintiff's Counsel to Appear by Telephone at Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/20/14. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2014)
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION AND ORDER 43 Extending Trial and Other Dates: Jury Trial set for 6/16/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose befor e Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Pretrial Conference set for 6/5/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Discovery cutoff 4/11/2014. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/19/13. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2013)
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte granting 25 Motion for Leave to File(rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2013)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER 31 Allowing Plaintiff's Counsel to Appear by Telephone at Hearing on Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Third Party Complaint. NOTE: The Court will initiate the conference call between 9:00 AM to 10:00 AM on 9/13/2013. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/12/13. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER 26 Granting Amended Stipulation for Request for Order Changing Time Re: Motion for Leave to File Third Party Complaint. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 25 MOTION for Leave to File Third-Party Complaint. Opposition due by 8/30/2013. Reply due by 9/6/2013. Motion Hearing set for 9/13/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/27/13. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2013)
April 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte denying 6 Motion to Dismiss(rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2013)
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES, granting 4 Stipulation filed by VII Pac Shores Investors, LLC. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 11/29/2012. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Universal Green Solutions, LLC v. VII Pac Shores Investors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Green Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Martin Zurada
Represented By: Mark Lain Venardi, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VII Pac Shores Investors, LLC
Represented By: Bruce A. McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?