Good Technology Corporation et al v. AirWatch, LLC
Plaintiff: Good Technology Corporation and Good Technology Software, Inc
Defendant: AirWatch, LLC
Case Number: 5:2012cv05827
Filed: November 14, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting #250 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2015)
April 17, 2015 Filing 250 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal (Joint) filed by AirWatch, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hung, Richard) (Filed on 4/17/2015)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting #159 (psglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2015)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 248 OMNIBUS ORDER RE: MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying #232 ; denying #239 ; granting-in-part #243 (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2015)
April 8, 2015 Filing 247 EXHIBITS re #243 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity [orginally filed at Dkt. [243-6] filed by AirWatch, LLC. (Attachments: #1 [Corrected Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed] Hartman Ex 21 ISO Motion to Strike [orginally filed at Dkt. 243-10])(Related document(s) #243 ) (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 4/8/2015) Modified on 4/21/2015 (cvS, COURT STAFF).
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 246 STIPULATION AND ORDER, granting 244-3. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 4/8/15. (cvS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2015) Modified on 4/9/2015 (ofr, COURT STAFF).
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting #244 (psglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2015)
April 6, 2015 Filing 244 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by AirWatch, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 [UNREDACTED VERSION DECLARATION OF BROOKS M. BEARD IN SUPPORT OF JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL, #3 [UNREDACTED VERSION OF EXHIBIT A TO THE DECLARATION OF BROOKS M. BEARD IN SUPPORT OF JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL)(Hung, Richard) (Filed on 4/6/2015) Modified on 4/8/2015 (cvS, COURT STAFF).
March 31, 2015 Filing 243 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by AirWatch, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Barbara Barath, #2 Declaration of David Tim, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Motion to Strike [Unredacted Version of Documents Sought to Be Sealed], #5 Motion to Exclude [Unredacted Version of Documents Sought to Be Sealed], #6 MSJ of Invalidity [Unredacted Version of Documents Sought to Be Sealed], #7 MSJ of Non-Infringement [Unredacted Version of Documents Sought to Be Sealed], #8 Damages MSJ [Unredacted Version of Documents Sought to Be Sealed], #9 Hartman Ex 20 ISO Motion to Strike [Unredacted Version of Documents Sought to Be Sealed], #10 Hartman Ex 21 ISO Motion to Strike [Unredacted Version of Documents Sought to Be Sealed], #11 Hartman Ex 22 ISO Motion to Strike [Unredacted Version of Documents Sought to Be Sealed], #12 Hartman Ex 23 ISO Motion to Strike [Unredacted Version of Documents Sought to Be Sealed], #13 Hung Ex 11 ISO MSJs [Unredacted Version of Documents Sought to Be Sealed], #14 Hung Ex 13 ISO MSJs [Unredacted Version of Documents Sought to Be Sealed], #15 Hung Ex 16 ISO MSJs [Unredacted Version of Documents Sought to Be Sealed], #16 Hung Ex 23 ISO MSJs [Unredacted Version of Documents Sought to Be Sealed], #17 Hung Ex 25 ISO MSJs [Unredacted Version of Documents Sought to Be Sealed], #18 Hung Ex 26 ISO MSJs [Unredacted Version of Documents Sought to Be Sealed], #19 Hung Ex 31 ISO MSJs [Unredacted Version of Documents Sought to Be Sealed], #20 Hung Ex 32 ISO MSJs [Unredacted Version of Documents Sought to Be Sealed], #21 Hung Ex 34 ISO MSJs [Unredacted Version of Documents Sought to Be Sealed], #22 Hung Ex 35 ISO MSJs [Unredacted Version of Documents Sought to Be Sealed], #23 Hung Ex 36 ISO MSJs [Unredacted Version of Documents Sought to Be Sealed], #24 Hung Ex 38 ISO MSJs [Unredacted Version of Documents Sought to Be Sealed], #25 Hung Ex 40 ISO MSJs [Unredacted Version of Documents Sought to Be Sealed], #26 Hung Ex 42 ISO MSJs [Unredacted Version of Documents Sought to Be Sealed], #27 Hung Ex 43 ISO MSJs [Unredacted Version of Documents Sought to Be Sealed], #28 Hung Ex 46 ISO MSJs [Unredacted Version of Documents Sought to Be Sealed], #29 Hung Ex 49 ISO MSJs [Unredacted Version of Documents Sought to Be Sealed], #30 Hung Ex 50 ISO MSJs [Unredacted Version of Documents Sought to Be Sealed], #31 Hung Ex 51 ISO MSJs [Unredacted Version of Documents Sought to Be Sealed], #32 Hung Ex 52 ISO MSJs [Unredacted Version of Documents Sought to Be Sealed], #33 McDaniel Ex 1 ISO MSJs [Unredacted Version of Documents Sought to Be Sealed], #34 McDaniel Ex 2 ISO MSJs [Unredacted Version of Documents Sought to Be Sealed], #35 Weissman Ex 1 ISO MSJs [Unredacted Version of Documents Sought to Be Sealed], #36 Weissman Ex 2 ISO MSJs [Unredacted Version of Documents Sought to Be Sealed], #37 Wiener Ex 1 ISO Motion to Exclude [Unredacted Version of Documents Sought to Be Sealed], #38 Wiener Ex 2 ISO Motion to Exclude [Unredacted Version of Documents Sought to Be Sealed], #39 Wiener Ex 3 ISO Motion to Exclude [Unredacted Version of Documents Sought to Be Sealed], #40 Wiener Ex 5 ISO Motion to Exclude [Unredacted Version of Documents Sought to Be Sealed], #41 Wiener Ex 6 ISO Motion to Exclude [Unredacted Version of Documents Sought to Be Sealed], #42 Wiener Ex 8 ISO Motion to Exclude [Unredacted Version of Documents Sought to Be Sealed], #43 Wiener Ex 10 ISO Motion to Exclude [Unredacted Version of Documents Sought to Be Sealed], #44 Wiener Ex 11 ISO Motion to Exclude [Unredacted Version of Documents Sought to Be Sealed], #45 Wiener Ex 12 ISO Motion to Exclude [Unredacted Version of Documents Sought to Be Sealed], #46 Wiener Ex 13 ISO Motion to Exclude [Unredacted Version of Documents Sought to Be Sealed], #47 Wiener Ex 14 ISO Motion to Exclude [Unredacted Version of Documents Sought to Be Sealed], #48 Wiener Ex 15 ISO Motion to Exclude [Unredacted Version of Documents Sought to Be Sealed], #49 Wiener Ex 16 ISO Motion to Exclude [Unredacted Version of Documents Sought to Be Sealed], #50 Wiener Ex 17 ISO Motion to Exclude [Unredacted Version of Documents Sought to Be Sealed])(Hung, Richard) (Filed on 3/31/2015) Modified text on 4/21/2015 ***UNSEALED *** (pursuant to 248 OMNIBUS ORDER re: motions to seal) (cvS, COURT STAFF).
March 31, 2015 Filing 242 Declaration of RICHARD S.J. HUNG in Support of #235 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF INVALIDITY [REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED], #229 MOTION to Strike REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED, #233 MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF ROY WEINSTEIN AND HUGH SMITH [REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED], #236 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF NON-INFRINGEMENT [REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED], #237 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF NO DIRECT, INDIRECT, OR WILLFUL INFRINGEMENT AND OF NO LOST PROFITS [REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED] filed byAirWatch, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11 [REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED], #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13 [REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED], #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16 [REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED], #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23 [REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED], #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25 [REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED], #26 Exhibit 26 [REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED], #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31 [REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED], #32 Exhibit 32 [REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED], #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34 [REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED], #35 Exhibit 35 [REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED], #36 Exhibit 36 [REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED], #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38 [REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED], #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40 [REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED], #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42 [REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED], #43 Exhibit 43 [REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED], #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46 [REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED], #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49 [REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED], #50 Exhibit 50 [REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED], #51 Exhibit 51 [REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED], #52 Exhibit 52 [REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED])(Related document(s) #235 , #229 , #233 , #236 , #237 ) (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 3/31/2015)
March 31, 2015 Filing 241 Declaration of JON B. WEISSMAN in Support of #233 MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF ROY WEINSTEIN AND HUGH SMITH [REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED], #236 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF NON-INFRINGEMENT [REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED], #237 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF NO DIRECT, INDIRECT, OR WILLFUL INFRINGEMENT AND OF NO LOST PROFITS [REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED], #235 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF INVALIDITY [REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED], #229 MOTION to Strike REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED filed byAirWatch, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 [REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED], #2 Exhibit 2 [REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED])(Related document(s) #233 , #236 , #237 , #235 , #229 ) (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 3/31/2015)
March 31, 2015 Filing 240 Declaration of PATRICK McDANIEL in Support of #233 MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF ROY WEINSTEIN AND HUGH SMITH [REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED], #236 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF NON-INFRINGEMENT [REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED], #237 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF NO DIRECT, INDIRECT, OR WILLFUL INFRINGEMENT AND OF NO LOST PROFITS [REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED], #235 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF INVALIDITY [REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED], #229 MOTION to Strike REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED filed byAirWatch, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 [REDACTED VERION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED], #2 Exhibit 2 [REDACTED VERION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED])(Related document(s) #233 , #236 , #237 , #235 , #229 ) (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 3/31/2015)
March 31, 2015 Filing 239 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Good Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Geoffrey Smith, #3 REDACTED Version of Exhibit M, #4 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit M, #5 REDACTED Version of Exhibit P, #6 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit P, #7 REDACTED Version of Exhibit X, #8 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit X, #9 REDACTED Version of Exhibit Y, #10 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit Y)(Smith, Geoffrey) (Filed on 3/31/2015) Modified on 4/21/2015 ***UNSEALED *** (pursuant to #248 OMNIBUS ORDER re: motions to seal)(cvS, COURT STAFF).
March 31, 2015 Filing 238 MOTION to Strike PORTIONS OF DEFENDANTS EXPERT REPORTS filed by Good Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 5/5/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 4/14/2015. Replies due by 4/21/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Geoffrey Smith, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit R, #21 Exhibit S, #22 Exhibit T, #23 Exhibit U, #24 Exhibit V, #25 Exhibit W, #26 Exhibit X, #27 Exhibit Y, #28 Exhibit Z, #29 Exhibit AA)(Smith, Geoffrey) (Filed on 3/31/2015)
March 31, 2015 Filing 237 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF NO DIRECT, INDIRECT, OR WILLFUL INFRINGEMENT AND OF NO LOST PROFITS [REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED] filed by AirWatch, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 5/5/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 4/14/2015. Replies due by 4/21/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hung, Richard) (Filed on 3/31/2015)
March 31, 2015 Filing 236 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF NON-INFRINGEMENT [REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED] filed by AirWatch, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 5/5/2015 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 4/14/2015. Replies due by 4/21/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hung, Richard) (Filed on 3/31/2015)
March 31, 2015 Filing 235 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF INVALIDITY [REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED] filed by AirWatch, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 5/5/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 4/14/2015. Replies due by 4/21/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hung, Richard) (Filed on 3/31/2015)
March 31, 2015 Filing 234 Declaration of CHRISTOPHER J. WIENER in Support of #233 MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF ROY WEINSTEIN AND HUGH SMITH [REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED] filed byAirWatch, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 [REDACTED VERION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED], #2 Exhibit 2 [REDACTED VERION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED], #3 Exhibit 3 [REDACTED VERION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED], #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5 [REDACTED VERION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED], #6 Exhibit 6 [REDACTED VERION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED], #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8 [REDACTED VERION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED], #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10 [REDACTED VERION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED], #11 Exhibit 11 [REDACTED VERION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED], #12 Exhibit 12 [REDACTED VERION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED], #13 Exhibit 13 [REDACTED VERION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED], #14 Exhibit 14 [REDACTED VERION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED], #15 Exhibit 15 [REDACTED VERION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED], #16 Exhibit 16 [REDACTED VERION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED], #17 Exhibit 17 [REDACTED VERION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED], #18 Exhibit 18)(Related document(s) #233 ) (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 3/31/2015)
March 31, 2015 Filing 233 MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF ROY WEINSTEIN AND HUGH SMITH [REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED] filed by AirWatch, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 5/5/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 4/14/2015. Replies due by 4/21/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hung, Richard) (Filed on 3/31/2015)
March 31, 2015 Filing 232 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Good Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Joel Stonedale, #3 REDACTED Version of Good's Motion, #4***UNSEALED *** UNREDACTED Version of Good's Motion, #5 ***UNSEALED *** UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit A, #6***UNSEALED *** UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit B)(Stonedale, Joel) (Filed on 3/31/2015) Modified text on 4/21/2015,( *** pursuant to #248 OMIBUS ORDER re: motions to seal***) (cvS, COURT STAFF).
March 31, 2015 Filing 231 MOTION excluding (1) the opinions Julie Davis pertaining to Goods compensation for infringement after trial; and (2) all of the opinions of Keith Rutherford, as unreliable and contrary to law in violation of Federal Rule of Evidence 702 and Daubert v. Merrell Dow Pharms., Inc.,509 U.S. 579 (1993) filed by Good Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 5/5/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 4/14/2015. Replies due by 4/21/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Joel Stonedale, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Stonedale, Joel) (Filed on 3/31/2015)
March 31, 2015 Filing 230 Declaration of JOSHUA A. HARTMAN in Support of #229 MOTION to Strike REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED filed byAirWatch, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20 [REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED], #21 Exhibit 21 [REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED, #22 Exhibit 22 [REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED, #23 Exhibit 23 [REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25)(Related document(s) #229 ) (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 3/31/2015)
March 31, 2015 Filing 229 MOTION to Strike REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED filed by AirWatch, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 5/5/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 4/14/2015. Replies due by 4/21/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hung, Richard) (Filed on 3/31/2015)
March 31, 2015 Filing 228 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Jacobs (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 3/31/2015)
March 25, 2015 Filing 227 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence M. Hadley (Hadley, Lawrence) (Filed on 3/25/2015)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER GRANTING JOINT NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF LETTER BRIEFS re #225 Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 24, 2015 (psglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2015)
March 16, 2015 Filing 225 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion LETTER BRIEFS (DKT. NOS. #222 AND #223 ) (Tolliver, Craig) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 13, 2015 Filing 224 Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/27/2015, before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leo T. Mankiewicz, CSR, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (415) 722-7045; email: leomank@gmail.com. FTR 5:00 p.m. - 5:44 p.m. = 44 minutes. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 4/3/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/13/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/11/2015. (Mankiewicz, Leo) (Filed on 3/13/2015)
March 11, 2015 Filing 223 Discovery Letter Brief concerning the scheduling of additional depositions #222 filed by Good Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc. (Tolliver, Craig) (Filed on 3/11/2015)
March 11, 2015 Filing 222 Letter from AirWatch, LLC Regarding Deposition Scheduling. (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 3/11/2015)
March 10, 2015 Filing 221 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for 2/27/15 hearing by Good Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Tolliver, Craig) (Filed on 3/10/2015) (TRANSCRIBER: LEO MANKIEWICZ) Modified on 3/12/2015 (sms, COURT STAFF).
March 6, 2015 Filing 220 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for 2/27/15 by AirWatch, LLC for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. TRANSCRIBER: Leo Mankiewicz(Hung, Richard) (Filed on 3/6/2015) Modified on 3/6/2015 (sp, COURT STAFF).
February 27, 2015 Filing 219 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal: Discovery Hearing (In Re: ECF No. #215 ) held on 2/27/2015. Hearing on Summary Judgment Motions reset from 4/7/2015 to 5/5/2015 at 10:00 AM. Summary Judgment Motions to be filed by 3/31/2015. Rebuttal expert report of Dr. Smith will stand. Mr. Weinsten permitted to serve additional schedule or supplemental exhibit by 3/2/2015. Defendant AirWatch may serve additional reports from Dr. McDaniel and Dr. Weissman. No further depositions of Dr. McDaniel or Dr. Weissman permitted. Hearing Date on Motion to Strike reports to remain set for 5/5/2015. Ms. Davis may also serve an additional report. Plaintiffs permitted to take additional deposition of Ms. Davis if they believe it is necessary after review of Ms. Davis' report. AirWatch may depose Mr. Weinstein or Ms. Davis in San Francisco or other location convenient. Parties are encouraged to meet and confer as to location. FTR Time FTR: (5:00 to 5:44). Plaintiff Attorney(s) present (telephonically): Steven Pollinger, Craig Tolliver and Trent Campione. Defendant Attorney(s) present (telephonically) Josh Hartman, Richard Hung and Christopher Wiener. This is a text only Minute Entry. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/27/2015)
February 27, 2015 Filing 218 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING TIME ON FEBRUARY 27, 2015 TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY HEARING: 2/27/2015 4:30 PM Discovery Hearing (In Re: ECF No. 215 ) is reset to 5:00 PM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Parties requesting to appear telephonically are instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2015)
February 27, 2015 Filing 217 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING TIME ON FEBRUARY 27, 2015 TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY HEARING: 2/27/2015 1:30 PM Discovery Hearing (In Re: ECF No. #215 ) is reset to 4:30 PM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Parties requesting to appear telephonically are instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2015)
February 26, 2015 Filing 216 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY HEARING: Discovery Hearing (In Re: ECF No. #215 ) set for 2/27/2015 at 1:30 PM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Parties requesting to appear telephonically are instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2015)
February 23, 2015 Filing 215 Letter from Parties' Joint Letter Brief Pursuant to the Court's April 2, 2014 Case Management Order . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Smith Rebuttal Report)(Hung, Richard) (Filed on 2/23/2015)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER GRANTING #213 STIPULATION entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
February 20, 2015 Filing 213 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Certain Expert Depositions After Close of Expert Discovery filed by AirWatch, LLC. (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 2/20/2015)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting #211 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
February 18, 2015 Filing 211 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation Regarding Daubert Motion and Motion to Strike Scheduling and Daubert, Motion to Strike, and Motions for Summary Judgment Briefing filed by Good Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc. (Pollinger, Steven) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
February 18, 2015 Set/Reset Hearing pursuant to ECF No. #212 Order on Stipulation: 6/15/2015 Jury Trial reset to 6/22/2015 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
December 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying (103) in case 5:12-cv-05827-PSG; denying (96) in case 5:12-cv-05826-PSG; denying (102) in case 5:12-cv-05826-PSG (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2014)
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 209 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REQUESTING LEAVE FOR THE PARTIES TO SUPPLEMENT THEIR CONTENTIONS AND WITHDRAWING DKTS. 179 AND 180 by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting #208 . (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2014)
December 11, 2014 Filing 208 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #179 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS AND #180 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT INVALIDITY CONTTENTIONS filed by Good Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc. (Smith, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/11/2014)
December 8, 2014 Filing 207 Declaration of John Herrema in Support of #200 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byGood Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc. (Related document(s) #200 ) (Smith, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/8/2014)
December 8, 2014 Filing 206 Declaration of Esther Kim in Support of #204 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Portions of Ex. 10 to Smith Declaration filed byAirWatch, LLC. (Related document(s) #204 ) (Kim, Esther) (Filed on 12/8/2014)
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER GRANTING #192 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
December 3, 2014 Filing 204 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Good Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc. (Attachments: #1 (Proposed) Order, #2 Declaration of Geoffrey Smith, #3 REDACTED version of Exhibit 10, #4 UNREDACTED version of Exhibit 10) (Smith, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/3/2014) Modified on 12/4/2014 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
December 3, 2014 Filing 203 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT CONTENTIONS (re #179 filed by Good Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Geoffrey Smith, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10)(Smith, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/3/2014) Text modified on 12/4/2014 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
December 3, 2014 Filing 202 DECLARATION OF RICHARD S.J. HUNG IN SUPPORT OF AIRWATCHS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT ITS INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS re #201 filed by AirWatch, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16) (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 12/3/2014) Text modified on 12/4/2014 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
December 3, 2014 Filing 201 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF AIRWATCHS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT ITS INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS (re #186 filed by AirWatch, LLC. (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 12/3/2014) Text modified on 12/4/2014 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
December 3, 2014 Filing 200 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by AirWatch, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF DAVID TIM, #2 UNREDACTED REPLY IN SUPPORT OF AIRWATCH'S MOTION FOR LEAVE, #3 REDACTED REPLY IN SUPPORT OF AIRWATCH'S MOTION FOR LEAVE, #4 UNREDACTED EXHIBIT 5 TO THE DECLARATION OF RICHARD S.J. HUNG, #5 REDACTED EXHIBIT 5 TO THE DECLARATION OF RICHARD S.J. HUNG, #6 UNREDACTED EXHIBIT 6 TO THE DECLARATION OF RICHARD S.J. HUNG, #7 UNREDACTED EXHIBIT 6 TO THE DECLARATION OF RICHARD S.J. HUNG, #8 Proposed Order)(Hung, Richard) (Filed on 12/3/2014)
December 3, 2014 Filing 199 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal: Hearing held on 12/3/2014 re: ECF No. #197 . The court denies Stipulation Regarding Withdrawal of Documents Previously Filed Under Seal & for In Camera Review. Parties to submit revised request & stipulation within 14 days. FTR Time: (10:03 to 10:12). Plaintiff Attorney(s) present (telephonically): Steven Pollinger & Geoffrey Smith. Defendant Attorney(s) present: Richard Hung & Barbara Barath. This is a Text Only Minute Entry (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/3/2014)
December 1, 2014 Filing 198 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING RE: ECF NO. #197 STIPULATION REGARDING THE WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENTS FILED UNDER SEAL & SUBMISSION OF DOCUMENTS FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW: Hearing set for 12/3/2014 at 10:00 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Parties requesting to appear telephonically are instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2014)
November 26, 2014 Filing 197 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER regarding the withdrawal of documents filed under seal and submission of documents for in camera review. re #184 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Good Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit 9)(Smith, Geoffrey) (Filed on 11/26/2014) Modified on 11/26/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION EXTENDING CERTAIN DEADLINES by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting #195 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
November 25, 2014 Filing 195 JOINT TIPULATION and (PROPOSED) ORDER Regarding Certain Deadlines re #193 Opposition/Response to Motion, #191 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by Good Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc. (Smith, Geoffrey) (Filed on 11/25/2014) Text modified on 12/2/2014 conforming to posted document caption (bwS, COURT STAFF).
November 24, 2014 Filing 194 Declaration of BARBARA N. BARATH in Support of #193 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byAirWatch, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18 Part 1, #19 Exhibit 18 Part 2, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35)(Related document(s) #193 ) (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 11/24/2014)
November 24, 2014 Filing 193 RESPONSE (re #179 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS ) filed byAirWatch, LLC. (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 11/24/2014)
November 24, 2014 Filing 192 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal EXHIBITS TO THE DECLARATION OF BARBARA N. BARATH filed by AirWatch, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Tim in Support of AirWatch's Administrative Motion, #2 Redacted Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Barbara N. Barath, #3 Unredacted Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Barbara N. Barath, #4 Redacted Exhibit 4 to the Declaration of Barbara N. Barath, #5 Unredacted Exhibit 4 to the Declaration of Barbara N. Barath, #6 Redacted Exhibit 5 to the Declaration of Barbara N. Barath, #7 Unredacted Exhibit 5 to the Declaration of Barbara N. Barath, #8 Redacted Exhibit 7 to the Declaration of Barbara N. Barath, #9 Unredacted Exhibit 7 to the Declaration of Barbara N. Barath, #10 Redacted Exhibit 9 to the Declaration of Barbara N. Barath, #11 Unredacted Exhibit 9 to the Declaration of Barbara N. Barath, #12 Redacted Exhibit 10 to the Declaration of Barbara N. Barath, #13 Unredacted Exhibit 10 to the Declaration of Barbara N. Barath, #14 Unredacted Exhibit 21 Part 1 to the Declaration of Barbara N. Barath, #15 Unredacted Exhibit 21 Part 2 to the Declaration of Barbara N. Barath, #16 Unredacted Exhibit 24 to the Declaration of Barbara N. Barath, #17 Proposed Order)(Hung, Richard) (Filed on 11/24/2014)
November 24, 2014 Filing 191 RESPONSE (re #186 MOTION for Leave to Supplement Its Invalidity Contentions (CORRECTED) ) filed byGood Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Geoffrey Smith, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit R, #21 Exhibit S, #22 Exhibit T, #23 Exhibit U, #24 Exhibit V, #25 Exhibit W, #26 Exhibit X, #27 Exhibit Y, #28 Exhibit Z)(Smith, Geoffrey) (Filed on 11/24/2014)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION RE EXTENSION OF DEADLINE FOR DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF SEALING CERTAIN DOCUMENTS by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting #189 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2014)
November 14, 2014 Filing 189 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #184 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by AirWatch, LLC. (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 11/14/2014)
November 14, 2014 Filing 188 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Prieb Estremera (Estremera, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/14/2014)
November 13, 2014 Filing 187 Corrected Exhibit 59 to Hartman Declaration #186 filed by AirWatch, LLC. (Related document(s) #186 ) (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 11/13/2014) Modified on 11/13/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 11, 2014 Filing 186 MOTION for Leave to Supplement Its Invalidity Contentions (CORRECTED) filed by AirWatch, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 11/25/2014. Replies due by 12/2/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua Hartman, #2 Exhibit 72, #3 Proposed Order)(Hung, Richard) (Filed on 11/11/2014)
November 10, 2014 Filing 185 EXHIBITS re #180 MOTION Airwatch's Motion for Leave to Supplement Its Invalidity Contentions Ex. 51 filed byAirWatch, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 52, #2 Exhibit 53, #3 Exhibit 54, #4 Exhibit 55, #5 Exhibit 56, #6 Exhibit 57, #7 Exhibit 58, #8 Exhibit 59, #9 Exhibit 60, #10 Exhibit 61, #11 Exhibit 62, #12 Exhibit 63, #13 Exhibit 64, #14 Exhibit 65, #15 Exhibit 66, #16 Exhibit 67, #17 Exhibit 68, #18 Exhibit 69, #19 Exhibit 70, #20 Exhibit 71)(Related document(s) #180 ) (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 11/10/2014)
November 10, 2014 Filing 184 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Good Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Craig Tolliver, #3 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2 Part 1, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 3 Part 1, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 4 Part 1, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 5 Part 1, #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 7 Part 1, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 9 Part 1)(Tolliver, Craig) (Filed on 11/10/2014)
November 10, 2014 Filing 183 EXHIBITS re #180 MOTION Airwatch's Motion for Leave to Supplement Its Invalidity Contentions Ex. 31 filed byAirWatch, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 32, #2 Exhibit 33, #3 Exhibit 34, #4 Exhibit 35, #5 Exhibit 36, #6 Exhibit 37, #7 Exhibit 38, #8 Exhibit 39, #9 Exhibit 40, #10 Exhibit 41, #11 Exhibit 42, #12 Exhibit 43, #13 Exhibit 44, #14 Exhibit 45, #15 Exhibit 46, #16 Exhibit 47, #17 Exhibit 48, #18 Exhibit 49, #19 Exhibit 50)(Related document(s) #180 ) (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 11/10/2014)
November 10, 2014 Filing 182 EXHIBITS re #180 MOTION Airwatch's Motion for Leave to Supplement Its Invalidity Contentions Exhibit 11 filed byAirWatch, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12, #2 Exhibit 13, #3 Exhibit 14, #4 Exhibit 15, #5 Exhibit 16, #6 Exhibit 17, #7 Exhibit 18, #8 Exhibit 19, #9 Exhibit 20, #10 Exhibit 21, #11 Exhibit 22, #12 Exhibit 23, #13 Exhibit 24, #14 Exhibit 25, #15 Exhibit 26, #16 Exhibit 27, #17 Exhibit 28, #18 Exhibit 29, #19 Exhibit 30)(Related document(s) #180 ) (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 11/10/2014)
November 10, 2014 Filing 181 EXHIBITS re #180 MOTION Airwatch's Motion for Leave to Supplement Its Invalidity Contentions Exhibit 1 filed byAirWatch, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10)(Related document(s) #180 ) (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 11/10/2014)
November 10, 2014 Filing 180 *** POSTED IN ERROR *** please see #186 MOTION Airwatch's Motion for Leave to Supplement Its Invalidity Contentions filed by AirWatch, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 11/24/2014. Replies due by 12/1/2014. (Attachments: #1 Hartman Declaration, #2 Kleinman-Green Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Hung, Richard) (Filed on 11/10/2014) Modified on 11/12/2014 (cvS, COURT STAFF).
November 10, 2014 Filing 179 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS filed by Good Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 11/24/2014. Replies due by 12/1/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Craig Tolliver, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18)(Tolliver, Craig) (Filed on 11/10/2014)
November 10, 2014 Filing 178 Transcript of Proceedings held on 8-22-14, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (141 in 5:12-cv-05827-PSG) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/9/2015. (las, ) (Filed on 11/10/2014)
October 31, 2014 Filing 177 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Good Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Tolliver, Craig) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
October 31, 2014 Filing 176 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/29/14, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (175 in 5:12-cv-05827-PSG) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/29/2015. (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
October 31, 2014 Filing 175 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by AirWatch, LLC for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Barath, Barbara) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER DENYING #172 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. There are many legitimate disputes in this case. The confidentiality designations presented in this motion are not among them. It appears from the redactions that Good claims as confidential such revelations as Mr. Lee having "heard from some of our sales folks that Airwatch may be entering our space. Any thoughts on this?" (page 2, n.7; the title, page number and date of a deposition transcript (page 2, n.6) and the fact that Mr. Lee does not have any day-to-day responsibilities at Good (page 4)-- something announced on the internet 18 months ago (http://www.businessinsider.com/two-top-execs-are-out-at-good-2013-2). Sealing in this and any other court imposes real costs. The taxpayers are denied access to work and materials they are paying for, and the court and its staff are pressed to slog through declarations and redacted materials rather than evaluating a case's merits. The parties are urged to use greater care in the future. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
October 29, 2014 Filing 174 Minute Entry: Hearing held on 10/29/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal Re: Cross Production of Email (Dkt. No. 144 in CV12-05826 & Dkt. No. 166 in CV12-05827), Hearing Re: Additional Deposition Hours (Dkt. No. 149 in CV12-05827), Hearing Re: Protective Order & Good's Use & Taking of Discovery (Dkt. No. 151 in CV12-05827), Hearing Re: Air Watch Customer Depositions (Dkt. No. 167 in CV12-05827) & Hearing Re: Deposition of King Lee (Dkt. No. 172-2 in CV12-05827): The court denies Defendants' request to compel production of email. If a document is used by one defendant during a deposition & becomes part of the transcript, the other defendant is entitled to see the document. The court grants 5 additional deposition hours per side. As to protective order & Good's use & taking of discovery, the court grants requested modification as to documents and transcripts already identified by Good Technology Corporation as well as any additional documents & transcripts that are identified no later than 14 days from today. Defendant Air Watch, LLC may depose King Lee for up to 3 hours. (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/29/2014)
October 29, 2014 Filing 172 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal THE LETTER FROM THE PARTIES REGARDING THE DEPOSITION OF KING LEE AND EXHIBITS filed by AirWatch, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted version of parties' letter brief regarding King deposition and exhibits, #3 Unredacted version of parties' letter brief regarding King deposition and exhibits, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B (redacted), #6 Exhibit B (unredacted), #7 Exhibit C (redacted), #8 Exhibit C (unredacted), #9 Exhibit D (redacted), #10 Exhibit D (unredacted), #11 Exhibit E (redacted), #12 Exhibit E (unredacted), #13 Exhibit F (redacted), #14 Exhibit F (unredacted), #15 Exhibit G (redacted), #16 Exhibit G (unredacted), #17 Exhibit H)(Hung, Richard) (Filed on 10/29/2014)
October 29, 2014 Filing 171 Transcript of Proceedings held on 09/18/14, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (142 in 5:12-cv-05827-PSG) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/27/2015. (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 10/29/2014)
October 27, 2014 Filing 170 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byAirWatch, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #151 ) (Barath, Barbara) (Filed on 10/27/2014)
October 27, 2014 Filing 169 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING DISCOVERY HEARING, setting hearing as to #167 Letter Brief Re: Air Watch Customer Depositions. Discovery Hearing set for 10/29/2014 at 10:00 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Parties requesting to appear telephonically are instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2014)
October 27, 2014 Filing 168 CLERK'S NOTICE Setting Discovery Hearing, setting hearing as to (144 in 5:12-cv-05826-PSG) Letter Brief Regarding Cross-Production of Email and (166 in 5:12-cv-05827-PSG) Letter Brief Regarding Cross-Production of Email. Discovery Hearing set for 10/29/2014 at 10:00 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Parties requesting to appear telephonically are instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2014)
October 24, 2014 Filing 167 Letter from the parties regarding AirWatch customer depositions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Pollinger, Steven) (Filed on 10/24/2014)
October 24, 2014 Filing 166 Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Cross-Production of Email filed by AirWatch, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2)(Hung, Richard) (Filed on 10/24/2014)
October 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO TAKE THE DEPOSITION OF ORKIN, LLC AFTER THE CLOSE OF FACT DISCOVERY by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting #164 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2014)
October 24, 2014 Filing 164 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING TAKING THE DEPOSITION OF ORKIN, LLC AFTER THE CLOSE OF FACT DISCOVERY filed by Good Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc. (Tolliver, Craig) (Filed on 10/24/2014)
October 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION MODIFYING CERTAIN DEADLINES by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting #161 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2014)
October 23, 2014 Filing 162 NOTICE of Appearance by Trent Edward Campione (Campione, Trent) (Filed on 10/23/2014)
October 22, 2014 Filing 161 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Modification of Certain Deaadlines filed by AirWatch, LLC. (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 10/22/2014)
October 21, 2014 Filing 160 Statement re #151 Letter AIRWATCH, LLCS STATEMENT OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF AIRWATCHS PORTION OF DKT. NO. 151 by AirWatch, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hung, Richard) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
October 20, 2014 Filing 159 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by AirWatch, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF DAVID TIM, #2 Proposed Order, #3 [REDACTED] ATTACHMENT #1 TO LETTER FROM THE PARTIES REGARDING ADDITIONAL DEPOSITION HOURS [DKT 149-1], #4 [UNREDACTED] ATTACHMENT #1 TO LETTER FROM THE PARTIES REGARDING ADDITIONAL DEPOSITION HOURS [DKT 149-1])(Hung, Richard) (Filed on 10/20/2014)
October 20, 2014 Filing 158 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING DISCOVERY HEARING: Discovery Hearing (In Re: Docket Nos. #149 & #151 ) set for 10/29/2014 at 10:00 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Parties requesting to appear telephonically are instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2014)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 157 (SIGNED COPY) ORDER GRANTING AIRWATCH'S MOTION TO REMOVE INADVERTENTLY FILED DOCUMENTS [DOCKET NO. 149-1], granting #150 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 10/20/2014. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2014)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER GRANTING #148 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER GRANTING #150 MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENT entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER GRANTING #153 STIPULATION entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
October 17, 2014 Filing 153 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Depositions of Witnesses After Close of Fact Discovery filed by AirWatch, LLC. (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 17, 2014 Filing 152 NOTICE of Appearance by Sabrina Larson (Larson, Sabrina) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 17, 2014 Filing 151 Letter from the Parties Regarding the Protective Order and Goods Use and Taking of Discovery. (Pollinger, Steven) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 17, 2014 Filing 150 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document [Docket No. 149-1] filed by AirWatch, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Airwatch's Motion to Remove)(Hung, Richard) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 17, 2014 Filing 149 Letter from The Parties Regarding Additional Deposition Hours. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Excepts)*** PURSUANT TO ORDER #157 DOCUMENT REMOVED. *** (Pollinger, Steven) (Filed on 10/17/2014) Modified on 10/17/2014 (fff, COURT STAFF). (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/20/2014) (sp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/20/2014 (sp, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2014 Filing 148 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Todd Michael Bellaire ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9003430.) filed by Good Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Bellaire, Todd) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER GRANTING #144 STIPULATION entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
October 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER GRANTING #140 MOTION PRO HAC VICE entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
October 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 145 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Grewal on 10/13/2014. (Grewal, Paul) (Filed on 10/13/2014)
October 10, 2014 Filing 144 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #132 Order on Stipulation, STIPULATION REGARDING REDUCTION OF CLAIMS AND ASSERTED PRIOR ART filed by Good Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc. (Tolliver, Craig) (Filed on 10/10/2014)
October 1, 2014 Filing 143 Transcript of the Proceedings of the Official Electronic Sound Recording held on September 25, 2014, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Transcriber Carrie McKee-Parks, Telephone number 510-637-9897; mckee-parks65@att.net. FTR 4:46-5:19. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/30/2014. (cmp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2014)
October 1, 2014 Filing 142 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by AirWatch, LLC for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 10/1/2014)
September 30, 2014 Filing 141 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by AirWatch, LLC for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
September 29, 2014 Filing 140 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Ramzi Khazen ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8954457.) filed by Good Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Khazen, Ramzi) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
September 26, 2014 Filing 139 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for 9/25/14 by AirWatch, LLC for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Wiener, Christopher) (Filed on 9/26/2014) TRANSCRIBER: Carrie McKee-Parks. Modified on 9/26/2014 (sp, COURT STAFF).
September 25, 2014 Filing 138 Supplemental Brief re #125 Reply to Opposition/Response MOBILEIRON'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER filed byMobile Iron, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) #125 ) (Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 9/25/2014)
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER DENYING #115 MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. The court has considered the parties' arguments in their respective briefs and at the hearing held earlier today. After the hearing the court further considered the particular case cited by counsel at the end of the hearing: Abbott Diabetes Care Inc. v. Roche Diagnostics Corp., Case No. 05-3117, 2007 WL 4166030 (N.D. Cal. Nov. 19, 2007). On balance, the court is persuaded that neither a protective order nor an in camera review of the settlement agreement at issue is warranted. Whether the agreement is ultimately material to the question of the hypothetical license here remains to be seen. But the prejudice to MobileIron from access to the agreement by Good's outside counsel is clearly outweighed by Good's need to evaluate the agreement under Georgia-Pacific Factor 2 and ResQNet. The motion is DENIED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
September 25, 2014 Filing 136 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/25/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re #115 MOTION for Protective Order: The court takes matter under submission; written order to be issued. (Court Reporter FTR: (4:46 to 5:19) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/25/2014)
September 23, 2014 Filing 135 NOTICE of Appearance by Colette R. Verkuil (Verkuil, Colette) (Filed on 9/23/2014)
September 18, 2014 Filing 134 Minute Entry: Continued Tutorial, Claims Construction and Motions for Summary Judgment (Dkt. Nos. 96 in -05826 & 103 in -05827 AND Docket No. 102 in -05826) held on 9/18/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal: Court to issue written order. (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/18/2014)
September 17, 2014 Filing 133 STATEMENT OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INDEFINITENESS re #103 by Good Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Tolliver, Craig) (Filed on 9/17/2014) Modified on 9/17/2014 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION AND STIPULATION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINES by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting (131) in case 5:12-cv-05827-PSG; granting (123) in case 5:12-cv-05826-PSG (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2014)
September 15, 2014 Filing 131 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO MODIFY CERTAIN DEADLINES filed by Good Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc. (Tolliver, Craig) (Filed on 9/15/2014)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ALLOW A/V AND COMPUTER EQUIPMENT TO COURT FOR HEARING by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting (128) in case 5:12-cv-05827-PSG; granting (121) in case 5:12-cv-05826-PSG (psglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2014)
September 12, 2014 Filing 129 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing September 23, 2014 Motion Hearing, continuing #115 MOTION for Protective Order: 9/23/2014 Motion Hearing is continued to 9/25/2014 at 4:45 PM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2014)
September 12, 2014 Filing 128 UNOPPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER ALLOWING GOOD TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION AND GOOD TECHNOLOGY SOFTWARE, INC. TO BRING AUDIO-VISUAL/COMPUTER EQUIPMENT TO COURT FOR HEARING filed by Good Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc. Responses due by 9/16/2014. Replies due by 9/17/2014. (Tolliver, Craig) (Filed on 9/12/2014) Modified on 9/15/2014 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2014 Filing 127 STATEMENT OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INDEFINITENESS re #103 by Mobile Iron, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A)(Mao, Lillian) (Filed on 9/12/2014) Modified on 9/15/2014 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2014 Filing 126 STATEMENT OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INDEFINITENESS re #103 by AirWatch, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -ttachment A)(Hung, Richard) (Filed on 9/12/2014) Modified on 9/15/2014 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 29, 2014 Filing 125 REPLY (re #115 MOTION for Protective Order ) filed byMobile Iron, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mao, Lillian) (Filed on 8/29/2014)
August 22, 2014 Filing 124 Minute Entry: Tutorial, Claims Construction and Motions for Summary Judgment (Dkt. Nos. 96 in -05826 & 103 in -05827 AND Docket No. 102 in -05826) held on 8/22/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal: Matters are continued to 9/18/2014 at 9:00 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. Parties requesting to appear telephonically are instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/22/2014)
August 22, 2014 Filing 123 RESPONSE (re #115 MOTION for Protective Order ) in Opposition to MobileIron Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order filed byGood Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Joel Stonedale, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Tolliver, Craig) (Filed on 8/22/2014)
August 22, 2014 Filing 122 Declaration of Barbara N. Barath in Support of #121 Opposition/Response to Motion For Protective Order filed byAirWatch, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to B. Barath Decl ISO Opp to Mtn for Prot. Order, #2 Exhibit B to B. Barath Decl ISO Opp to Mtn for Prot. Order, #3 Exhibit C to B. Barath Decl ISO Opp to Mtn for Prot. Order)(Related document(s) #121 ) (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 8/22/2014)
August 22, 2014 Filing 121 RESPONSE (re #115 MOTION for Protective Order ) AIRWATCH'S OPPOSITION TO MOBILE IRON, INC.'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER filed byAirWatch, LLC. (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 8/22/2014)
August 21, 2014 Filing 120 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT Patent Local Rule 4-3 Supplemental Joint Claim Construction and Pre-Hearing Statement filed by Good Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc. (Tolliver, Craig) (Filed on 8/21/2014)
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER ALLOWING GOOD TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION AND GOOD TECHNOLOGY SOFTWARE, INC. TO BRING AUDIO-VISUAL/COMPUTER EQUIPMENT TO COURT FOR HEARING by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting #117 . (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2014)
August 21, 2014 Filing 118 NOTICE of Appearance by Diek O Van Nort (Van Nort, Diek) (Filed on 8/21/2014)
August 19, 2014 Filing 117 MOTION to Allow Audio-Visual & Computer Equipment to Court Unopposed Motion filed by Good Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc. Responses due by 9/2/2014. Replies due by 9/9/2014. (Tolliver, Craig) (Filed on 8/19/2014)
August 12, 2014 Filing 116 EXHIBITS re #106 Brief,, CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [106.2] filed byGood Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc. (Related document(s) #106 ) (Green, Eric) (Filed on 8/12/2014)
August 8, 2014 Filing 115 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Mobile Iron, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/23/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 8/22/2014. Replies due by 8/29/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mao, Lillian) (Filed on 8/8/2014)
July 28, 2014 Filing 114 Brief re #106 Brief,, REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed byGood Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Green, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Declaration of Dr. Hugh Smith, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #106 ) (Tolliver, Craig) (Filed on 7/28/2014)
July 28, 2014 Filing 113 Declaration of Richard Hung in Support of #112 Reply to Opposition/Response, filed byAirWatch, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3)(Related document(s) #112 ) (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 7/28/2014)
July 28, 2014 Filing 112 REPLY (re #103 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness ) Defendants AirWatch's and Mobile Iron's Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness filed byAirWatch, LLC. (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 7/28/2014)
July 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR JUDICIAL CORRECTION OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 8,012,219 AND 7,702,322 by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting #94 in Case No. 5:12-cv-05826-PSG; granting (100) in Case No. 5:12-cv-05827-PSG (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2014)
July 14, 2014 Filing 110 Declaration of John Villasenor in Support of #108 Brief (Responsive Claim Construction Brief) filed byAirWatch, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #108 ) (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
July 14, 2014 Filing 109 Declaration of Richard Hung in Support of #108 Brief (Responsive Claim Construction Brief) filed byAirWatch, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Related document(s) #108 ) (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
July 14, 2014 Filing 108 Brief re #106 Brief,, Responsive Claim Construction Brief filed byAirWatch, LLC. (Related document(s) #106 ) (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
July 14, 2014 Filing 107 RESPONSE (re #103 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness ) filed byGood Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Dr. Hugh Smith, #3 Exhibit A)(Tolliver, Craig) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
June 23, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing re (103 in 5:12-cv-05827-PSG) MOTION for Summary Judgment, Claims Construction Hearing set for 8/22/2014 09:00 AM. Motion Hearing set for 8/22/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Tutorial Hearing set for 8/22/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
June 23, 2014 Filing 106 Brief GOOD'S OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed byGood Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Craig Tolliver, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17)(Tolliver, Craig) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
June 23, 2014 Filing 105 Declaration of John Villasenor in Support of #103 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness filed byAirWatch, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #103 ) (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
June 23, 2014 Filing 104 Declaration of Richard Hung in Support of #103 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness filed byAirWatch, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15)(Related document(s) #103 ) (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
June 23, 2014 Filing 103 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness filed by AirWatch, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 8/22/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 7/14/2014. Replies due by 7/28/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hung, Richard) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
June 17, 2014 Filing 102 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING TIME ON JULY 29, 2014 MOTIONS, Resetting Time as to (94 in 5:12-cv-05826-PSG) and (100 in 5:12-cv-05827-PSG) MOTION JUDICIAL CORRECTION OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 8,012,219 AND 7,702,322: 7/29/2014 9:00 AM Motion Hearing is reset to 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting #99 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2014)
June 16, 2014 Filing 100 MOTION FOR JUDICIAL CORRECTION OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 8,012,219 AND 7,702,322 filed by Good Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 7/29/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 6/30/2014. Replies due by 7/7/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Craig Tolliver, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)(Tolliver, Craig) (Filed on 6/16/2014) Modified on 6/17/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 16, 2014 Filing 99 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8698006.) filed by AirWatch, LLC. (Hartman, Joshua) (Filed on 6/16/2014)
June 16, 2014 Filing 98 NOTICE by AirWatch, LLC Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Beard, Brooks) (Filed on 6/16/2014)
June 16, 2014 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher James Wiener (Wiener, Christopher) (Filed on 6/16/2014)
June 16, 2014 Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara Nora Barath (Barath, Barbara) (Filed on 6/16/2014)
June 16, 2014 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by Esther Kim (Kim, Esther) (Filed on 6/16/2014)
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER GRANTING-AS-MODIFIED JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING BRIEFING PAGE LIMITS AND CERTAIN OTHER DEADLINES RELATING TO CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-as-modified Docket No. 92 in case 5:12-cv-05826-PSG and Docket No. 93 in case 5:12-cv-05827-PSG (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 27, 2014 Filing 93 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #86 Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING PAGE LIMITS AND CERTAIN DEADLINES filed by Good Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc. (Tolliver, Craig) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 92 JOINT SECOND AMENDED CONFIDENTIALITY STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting #91 . (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
May 2, 2014 Filing 91 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [JOINT] SECOND AMENDED CONFIDENTIALITY STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by AirWatch, LLC. (Beard, Brooks) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 90 JOINT FIRST AMENDED CONFIDENTIALITY STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting #89 . (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
April 14, 2014 Filing 89 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER JOINT FIRST AMENDED CONFIDENTIALITY STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by AirWatch, LLC. (Beard, Brooks) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JOEL P. STONEDALE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting #87 . (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2014)
April 7, 2014 Filing 87 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Joel P. Stonedale ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8511840.) filed by Good Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Stonedale, Joel) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 86 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part #64 and #68 in case 5:12-cv-05827-PSG and 59 in case 5:12-cv-05826-PSG. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2014)
April 2, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing re (89 in 5:12-cv-05826-PSG, 89 in 5:12-cv-05826-PSG, 89 in 5:12-cv-05826-PSG, 86 in 5:12-cv-05827-PSG, 86 in 5:12-cv-05827-PSG, 86 in 5:12-cv-05827-PSG) Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Leave to File: Tutorial, Claims Construction and Hearing on Defendants Motions for Summary Judgment set for 8/22/2014 09:00 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2014)
April 2, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 6/2/2015 at 01:30 PM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Jury Trial set for 6/15/2015 09:00 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2014)
April 1, 2014 Filing 85 Minute Entry: Status Conference held on 4/1/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court to issue case scheduling order. (Court Reporter FTR: (4:27 to 5:07) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/1/2014)
March 31, 2014 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Lowenberg (Lowenberg, Kelly) (Filed on 3/31/2014)
March 26, 2014 Filing 83 Certificate of Interested Entities by AirWatch, LLC identifying Corporate Parent VMware, Inc., Corporate Parent EMC Corporation, Other Affiliate A.W.S. Holding, LLC for AirWatch, LLC. Second Supplemental (Cahoon, Susan) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 26, 2014 Filing 82 CLERK'S NOTICE RE TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT APRIL 1, 2014 STATUS CONFERENCE: Counsel requesting to appear telephonically are instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 25, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing re (83 in 5:12-cv-05826-PSG, 81 in 5:12-cv-05827-PSG) Order: Status Conference set for 4/1/2014 at 4:30 PM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 25, 2014. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO REASSIGN CASES. As all parties have now consented to such an assignment for all purposes, the Clerk shall reassign the above-captioned cases to Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/24/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 20, 2014 Filing 79 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 3/20/2014 before Judge Edward J. Davila (Date Filed: 3/20/2014). Defendant Mobile Iron consents to referral to Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal for all purposes. Defendant AirWatch to contact court clerk re: consent by NOON, March 21, 2014. (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/20/2014)
March 18, 2014 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie M Adams (Adams, Stephanie) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 18, 2014 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard S.J. Hung (Hung, Richard) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 18, 2014 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Krevans (Krevans, Rachel) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 18, 2014 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Brooks M. Beard (Beard, Brooks) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 13, 2014 Filing 74 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by AirWatch, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Artuz, Robert) (Filed on 3/13/2014)
March 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Order Granting #72 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven Callahan terminated. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 3/10/2014.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
March 7, 2014 Filing 72 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Good Technology Corporation. Responses due by 3/21/2014. Replies due by 3/28/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Callahan, Steven) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/13/2014. Case Management Conference set for 3/20/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/6/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
February 26, 2014 Filing 70 Statement of Non-Opposition re #68 MOTION for Leave to File & Designate Additional Claim Terms for Construction filed byGood Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc. (Related document(s) #68 ) (Tolliver, Craig) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
February 25, 2014 Filing 69 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT AND PRE-HEARING STATEMENT (JOINT) filed by AirWatch, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Kolassa, Scott) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
February 24, 2014 Filing 68 MOTION for Leave to File & Designate Additional Claim Terms for Construction filed by AirWatch, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott Kolassa)(Kolassa, Scott) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER VACATING INTERIM CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The court finds that a conference is unnecessary at this time and VACATES the conference. ***2/28/2014 CMC Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/24/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 21, 2014 Filing 66 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FOR INTERIM CONFERENCE filed by Good Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc. (Tolliver, Craig) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 18, 2014 Filing 65 RESPONSE (re #64 MOTION ) IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT AIRWATCH LLCS MOTION TO MODIFY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION DEADLINES filed byGood Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Eric C. Green, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9)(Green, Eric) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
February 12, 2014 Filing 64 DEFENDANT AIRWATCH LLC'S MOTION TO MODIFY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION DEADLINES filed byAirWatch, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott Kolassa ISO Motion to Modify Claim Construction Deadlines, #2 Exhibit A to Kolassa Dec, #3 Declaration of Jessica Rossman ISO Motion to Modify Claim Construction Deadlines, #4 Proposed Order)(Kolassa, Scott) (Filed on 2/12/2014) Modified text/correct event is motion on 2/13/2014 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Granting #62 Stipulation to Extend Certain Claim Construction Deadlines. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/7/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2014)
January 31, 2014 Filing 62 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Modifying Certain Claim Construction Deadlines) filed by AirWatch, LLC. (Artuz, Robert) (Filed on 1/31/2014)
January 17, 2014 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Kolassa (Kolassa, Scott) (Filed on 1/17/2014)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting #59 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2013)
October 23, 2013 Filing 59 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding E-Discovery filed by AirWatch, LLC. (Artuz, Robert) (Filed on 10/23/2013)
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER REGARDING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT PLAINTIFFS' INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting #48 . (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2013)
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 JOINT CONFIDENTIALITY STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting #56 . (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2013)
October 16, 2013 Filing 56 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER -- Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order filed by AirWatch, LLC. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Protective Order)(Artuz, Robert) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
October 16, 2013 Filing 55 NOTICE by AirWatch, LLC re #54 Order on Stipulation -- Withdrawal of Stipulation Shortening Time re Joint Motion for Protective Order #53 (Artuz, Robert) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION AND ORDER SHORTENING TIME RE JOINT MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting #53 . (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2013)
October 7, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines re: #54 : Joint motion for protective order and brief due by 10/15/13. Hearing set for 10/22/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2013)
October 7, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing re #48 MOTION to Supplement Infringement Contentions : Motion Hearing set for 10/22/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2013)
October 4, 2013 Filing 53 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER SHORTENING TIME RE JOINT MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by AirWatch, LLC. (Artuz, Robert) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION AND ORDER re (51 in 5:12-cv-05827-EJD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER LIMITING PATENT CLAIMS AND PRIOR ART AND MODIFYING CERTAIN DEADLINES filed by Good Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc, (56 in 5:12-cv-05826-EJD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER LIMITING PATENT CLAIMS AND PRIOR ART AND MODIFYING CERTAIN DEADLINES filed by Good Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc. Interim Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/21/2014. Interim Case Management Conference set for 2/28/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Tutorial Hearing/ Claims Construction Hearing set for 6/4/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/27/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
September 26, 2013 Filing 51 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER LIMITING PATENT CLAIMS AND PRIOR ART AND MODIFYING CERTAIN DEADLINES filed by Good Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc. (Tolliver, Craig) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
September 26, 2013 Filing 50 ANSWER to Counterclaim byGood Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc. (Tolliver, Craig) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
September 12, 2013 Filing 49 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Good Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc byAirWatch, LLC. (Artuz, Robert) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
September 11, 2013 Filing 48 MOTION to Supplement Infringement Contentions (UNOPPOSED) filed by Good Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 10/22/2013 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 9/25/2013. Replies due by 10/2/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Craig Tolliver, #2 Exhibit 1 - Web Page, #3 Exhibit 2 - Supplemental Infringement Contentions, #4 Exhibit 3 - Supplmental Infringement Contentions Chart re US 6,151,606, #5 Exhibit 4 - Supplemental Infringement Contentions Chart re US 8,012,219, #6 Proposed Order)(Tolliver, Craig) (Filed on 9/11/2013)
September 9, 2013 Filing 47 Certificate of Interested Entities by AirWatch, LLC identifying Corporate Parent A.W.S. Holding, LLC, Other Affiliate The Dabbiere Irrevocable Trust 2005, Other Affiliate John D. Marshall, Other Affiliate Thomas L. McLain, Other Affiliate Alan J. Dabbiere, Other Affiliate David K. Dabbiere, Other Affiliate Kim Dennis, Other Affiliate Ellen Donovan, Other Affiliate J P Halebeed, Other Affiliate Richard Franke, Other Affiliate Steve Pettise, Other Affiliate Jackie Hertenstein, Other Affiliate Dan Wardle, Other Affiliate Insight Venture Partners VII, L.P., Other Affiliate IVP (Cayman) VII (AWS Blocker), Inc., Other Affiliate IVP (DE) VII (AWS Blocker), Inc., Other Affiliate IVP CIF II (AIP A), L.P., Other Affiliate IVP CIF II (AWS Splitter), L.P., Other Affiliate AJD, LLC, Other Affiliate Airwatch Holding (AGF2) Inc., Other Affiliate GP Investment Group LLC for AirWatch, LLC, AirWatch, LLC. SUPPLEMENTAL (Artuz, Robert) (Filed on 9/9/2013)
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #43 Motion to Amend/Correct Airwatch LLC's Answer and Counterclaim. The Amended Answer and Counterclaims shall be filed as a separate docket item on ECF/PACER forthwith. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/3/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2013)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Order Granting #42 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Eric Green for Plaintiff. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 8/29/2013.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
August 23, 2013 Filing 44 Declaration of Robert J. Artuz in Support of #43 MOTION to Amend/Correct Airwatch LLC's Answer and Counterclaim--Unopposed filed byAirWatch, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #43 ) (Artuz, Robert) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
August 23, 2013 Filing 43 MOTION to Amend/Correct Airwatch LLC's Answer and Counterclaim--Unopposed filed by AirWatch, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/27/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 9/6/2013. Replies due by 9/13/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Artuz, Robert) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
August 23, 2013 Filing 42 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Eric Green ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7950000.) filed by Good Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Green, Eric) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Order Granting #40 Stipulation Extending Deadline for Motion fro Leave to Join Additional Parties or File any Other Amendments to the Pleadings. Deadline to join or file 8/23/2013. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 8/9/2013.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
August 8, 2013 Filing 40 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline for Motion for Leave to Join Additional Parties or File Any Other Amendments to the Pleadings filed by AirWatch, LLC. (Artuz, Robert) (Filed on 8/8/2013)
August 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Order Granting #38 Stipulation Regarding Modification of Certain Deadlines. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 8/6/2013.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2013)
August 2, 2013 Filing 38 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING MODIFICATION OF CERTAIN DEADLINES filed by Good Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc. (Tolliver, Craig) (Filed on 8/2/2013)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 PATENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Based on the parties' Joint Case Management Statement, the court has determined a schedule for the case can be set without the necessity of an appearance at this time. Accordingly, the 4/5/2013 Case Management Conference is VACATED and the following schedule shall apply to this case: The deadline for any motion for leave to join any additional parties, or motion for leave to file any other amendments to the pleadings, is August 9, 2013. The parties identify an agreed mediator within 30 days of the date of this order and schedule a private mediation to occur within 90 days of the date of service of Defendant's Patent L.R. 3-3 invalidity contentions. Infringement Contentions deadline 5/17/2013. Invalidity Contentions deadline 8/16/2013. Exchange of Proposed Terms of Construction deadline 9/20/2013. Exchange of Preliminary Claim Constructions and Extrinsic Evidence deadline 10/11/2013. Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement due 11/1/2013. Joint Interim Case Management Statement due by 11/8/2013. Interim Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Tutorial Hearing/Claims Construction Hearing set for 3/5/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/2/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2013)
March 29, 2013 Filing 36 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Good Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reichman, Courtland) (Filed on 3/29/2013)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/22/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
March 15, 2013 Filing 34 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Roy, Douglas) (Filed on 3/15/2013)
March 15, 2013 Filing 33 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Defendant and Counterclaim Plaintiff Airwatch LLC (Artuz, Robert) (Filed on 3/15/2013)
March 15, 2013 Filing 32 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Good Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc filed by Good Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc. (Reichman, Courtland) (Filed on 3/15/2013)
January 28, 2013 Filing 31 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM #30 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim byGood Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc. (Reichman, Courtland) (Filed on 1/28/2013)
January 7, 2013 Filing 30 DEFENDANT AIRWATCH LLC'S ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, COUNTERCLAIM against Good Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc byAirWatch, LLC. (Artuz, Robert) (Filed on 1/7/2013)
January 7, 2013 Filing 29 Certificate of Interested Entities by AirWatch, LLC (Artuz, Robert) (Filed on 1/7/2013)
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting #27 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Susan A. Cahoon for Defendant AirWatch LLC. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/4/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2013)
January 3, 2013 Filing 27 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7380288.) Filing fee previously paid on January 3, 2013 filed by AirWatch, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter of Good Standing)(Cahoon, Susan) (Filed on 1/3/2013)
December 27, 2012 Filing 26 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT FROM MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/29/2013. Case Management Conference set for 4/5/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2012)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Edward J. Davila. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/26/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2012)
December 20, 2012 Filing 24 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2012)
December 19, 2012 Filing 23 JOINT CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Good Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc. & AirWatch LLC. (Reichman, Courtland) (Filed on 12/19/2012)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting re #10 Application of Attorney Craig N. Tolliver for Pro Hac Vice. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting re #9 Application for Admission of Attorney Geoffrey L. Smith for Pro Hac Vice. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting re #8 Application for Admission of Attorney Steven J. Pollinger for Pro Hac Vice. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting re #7 Application for Admission of Attorney Steven C. Callahan for Pro Hac Vice. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 2/5/2013. Case Management Conference set for 2/12/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 12/17/2012. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2012)
December 14, 2012 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd no longer assigned to the case. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2012)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RELATING CASES C-12-5826-EDL AND C-12-5827-HRL re #16 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 12/11/2012. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2012)
December 11, 2012 Filing 16 Notice of Lodging Administrative Motion to Reassign Related Cases (12-5826-EDL, 12-5827-HRL) by Good Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Reichman, Courtland) (Filed on 12/11/2012) Modified on 12/12/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd TERMINATING #14 Motion to Relate Case. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2012)
December 4, 2012 Filing 14 Administrative Motion to Reassign Related Cases re (12-5826EDL) filed by Good Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 (Proposed) Order #4 Proof of Service) (Reichman, Courtland) (Filed on 12/4/2012) Modified on 12/5/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2012 Filing 13 Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint as to defendant Airwatch, LLC served on 11/15/2012 by Good Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc (Reichman, Courtland) (Filed on 12/4/2012) Modified on 12/5/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2012 Filing 12 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendant AirWatch LLC to Respond to Complaint re #1 filed by AirWatch, LLC. (Artuz, Robert) (Filed on 11/30/2012) Modified on 12/3/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2012 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearances of attorneys Robert J. Artuz and Benjamin M. Kleinman-Green filed by AirWatch, LLC (Artuz, Robert) (Filed on 11/30/2012) Modified on 12/3/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
November 29, 2012 Filing 10 Application for Admission of Attorney Craig N. Tolliver for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice and (Proposed) Order ( Filing fee $ 305 paid, receipt number 0971-7309261) filed by Good Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Reichman, Courtland) (Filed on 11/29/2012) Modified on 11/30/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
November 29, 2012 Filing 9 Application for Admission of Attorney Geoffrey L. Smith for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice and (Proposed) Order ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7309242) filed by Good Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Reichman, Courtland) (Filed on 11/29/2012) Modified on 11/30/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
November 29, 2012 Filing 8 Application for Admission of Attorney Steven J. Pollinger for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice and (Proposed) Order ( Filing fee $ 305 paid, receipt number 0971-7309213) filed by Good Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Reichman, Courtland) (Filed on 11/29/2012) Modified on 11/30/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
November 29, 2012 Filing 7 Application for Admission of Attorney Steven C. Callahan for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice and (Proposed) Order (Filing fee $ 305 paid, receipt number 0971-7309131) filed by Good Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Reichman, Courtland) (Filed on 11/29/2012) Modified on 11/30/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
November 28, 2012 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certification of Interested Entities or Parties by Good Technology Corporation, Good Technology Software, Inc identifying Corporate Parent Good Technology Corporation for Good Technology Software, Inc. (Reichman, Courtland) (Filed on 11/28/2012) Modified on 11/28/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2012 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to AirWatch, LLC. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2012) (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2012 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patent Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
November 14, 2012 Filing 3 CLERKS NOTICE re: Failure to E-File and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer On November 14, 2012, counsel for Plaintiff filed a Complaint and Exhibits manually, on paper. This case has been designated for electronic filing, pursuant to Local Rule 5-4 and General Order 45.The above mentioned paper document has been filed and docketed. However, General Order 45 provides at Section III that cases assigned to judges who participate in the e-filing program shall be presumptively designated as e-filing cases. Therefore, counsel for Plaintiff should submit Exhibits A-D only, in PDF format within 10 days, as an attachment in an e-mail message directed to the judges chamber's "PDF" email box listed at http://ecf.cand.uscourts.gov. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
November 14, 2012 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 1/15/2013. Case Management Conference set for 1/22/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
November 14, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement (NO PROCESS) against AirWatch, LLC ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611012814). Filed by Good Technology Software, Inc, Good Technology Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/19/2012: #2 Exhibit-A) (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/19/2012: #3 Exhibit-B, #4 Exhibit-C, #5 Exhibit-D, #6 Exhibit-E) (bwS, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2012 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Good Technology Corporation et al v. AirWatch, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Good Technology Corporation
Represented By: Courtland Lewis Reichman
Represented By: Craig N. Tolliver
Represented By: Douglas Patrick Roy
Represented By: Eric Conley Green
Represented By: Geoffrey L. Smith
Represented By: Jennifer Prieb Estremera
Represented By: Joel Patrick Napier Stonedale
Represented By: Lawrence M. Hadley
Represented By: Ramzi Ragheb Khazen
Represented By: Robert James Muller
Represented By: Stephanie M. Adams Ryan
Represented By: Steven Callahan
Represented By: Steven John Pollinger
Represented By: Todd Michael Bellaire
Represented By: Trent Edward Campione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Good Technology Software, Inc
Represented By: Courtland Lewis Reichman
Represented By: Craig N. Tolliver
Represented By: Douglas Patrick Roy
Represented By: Eric Conley Green
Represented By: Geoffrey L. Smith
Represented By: Jennifer Prieb Estremera
Represented By: Joel Patrick Napier Stonedale
Represented By: Lawrence M. Hadley
Represented By: Ramzi Ragheb Khazen
Represented By: Robert James Muller
Represented By: Stephanie M. Adams Ryan
Represented By: Steven Callahan
Represented By: Steven John Pollinger
Represented By: Todd Michael Bellaire
Represented By: Trent Edward Campione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AirWatch, LLC
Represented By: Joshua Hartman
Represented By: Susan A Cahoon
Represented By: Barbara Nora Barath
Represented By: Benjamin Max Kleinman
Represented By: Brooks M. Beard
Represented By: Christopher James Wiener
Represented By: Colette Reiner Mayer
Represented By: Diek O Van Nort
Represented By: Esther Kim Chang
Represented By: Kelly Lowenberg
Represented By: Michael A. Jacobs
Represented By: Rachel Krevans
Represented By: Richard S.J. Hung
Represented By: Robert John Artuz
Represented By: Sabrina Larson
Represented By: Scott Kolassa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?