St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company v. American Safety Indemnity Company et al
Plaintiff: St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive, Virginia Surety Company, Valley Forge Insurance Company, Rockhill Insurance Company, Praetorian Insurance Company, Old Republic Insurance Company, NIC Insurance Company, North American Capacity Insurance Company, First Mercury Insurance Company, Gemini Insurance Company, Granite State Insurance Company, Great American Insurance Company, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Interstate Fire & Casualty Company, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company, Navigators Insurance Company, Chartis Specialty Insurance Company, Clarendon America Insurance Company, Century Surety Company and American Safety Indemnity Company
Case Number: 5:2012cv05952
Filed: November 21, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER REGARDING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 6/4/14. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER REQUESTING SETTLEMENT STATUS. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 5/29/14. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2014)
May 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER by Judge Lucy Koh denying 238 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 239 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 244 Motion to Appear by Telephone (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2014)
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER DENYING IN PART MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 5/14/14. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2014)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER CONTINUING HEARINGS. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 3/25/14. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/05/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2013)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 152 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 151 Stipulation to Set Aside the Default of Defendant Rockhill Insurance Company.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 150 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 145 Stipulation to Dismiss Hartford Fire Insurance Company and Hartford Casualty Insurance Company.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2013)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 131 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 128 Stipulation to Dismiss Defendant Old Republic Insurance Co.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 125 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 119 Stipulation to Dismiss Defendant American Safety Indemnity Company.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2013)
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 78 Stipulation selecting Mediation.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 53 Stipulation Extending Time for Defendant Century Surety Company to Respond to the Complaint.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2013)
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re 7 Stipulation filed by Century Surety Company Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/02/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company v. American Safety Indemnity Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Surety Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley Forge Insurance Company
Represented By: Sherman Chuck Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockhill Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Praetorian Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NIC Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Capacity Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew Morache
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Mercury Insurance Company
Represented By: Jennifer Corrine Kalvestran
Represented By: Dana L. Stenvick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gemini Insurance Company
Represented By: David Francis Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Granite State Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interstate Fire & Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navigators Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chartis Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarendon America Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Century Surety Company
Represented By: Lisa Marie DarlingAlderton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Safety Indemnity Company
Represented By: Alan Edward Swerdlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company
Represented By: A. Eric Aguilera
Represented By: Daniel Eli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?