Integral Development Corp v. Tolat
Plaintiff: Integral Development Corp
Defendant: Viral Tolat
Case Number: 5:2012cv06575
Filed: December 31, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION AND DENYING DE NOVO MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 2/12/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2015)
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER GRANTING 302 Stipulation to Continue Status Conference. Case Management Statement due by 9/5/2014. Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/22/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2014)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER GRANTING 297 STIPULATION to Modify the Schedule. Case Management Statement due by 7/18/2014. Case Management Conference set for 7/25/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/16/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2014)
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 284 STIPULATION to Modify the Schedule. Case Management Statement due by 6/13/2014. Case Management Conference set for 6/20/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/14/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER GRANTING 192 Motion for Summary Judgment, DENYING 194 Motion for Sanctions, DENYING 196 Motion for Summary Judgment, DENYING 198 Motion for Writ of Possession, DENYING 232 Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion for Relief, GRANTIN G 258 Motion to Strike, and REFERRING to Magistrate Judge Corley. Case Management Statement due by 4/18/2014. Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 24, 2014. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/10/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2014)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER REGARDING 188 THE PARTIES' EIGHTH JOINT LETTER BRIEF DATED NOVEMBER 8, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 11/12/2013.(lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
October 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/25/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2013)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER REGARDING [174-3] 177 THE PARTIES' SEVENTH JOINT LETTER BRIEF DATED SEPTEMBER 30, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 10/24/2013.(lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED RE: 171 Case Management Scheduling Order. Motions due by 11/15/2013. Replies due by 12/13/2013. Responses due by 12/6/2013. Motion Hearing set for 1/17/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/30/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER REGARDING 162 164 THE PARTIES' SEPARATE DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEFS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 9/26/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/25/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2013)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER RE: 127 THE PARTIES' JOINT DISCOVERY DISPUTE LETTER DATED AUGUST 22, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 9/13/2013.(lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2013)
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 117 Administrative Motion Requesting Continuance of Dates in Scheduling Order and [Proposed] Order. Motion Hearing set for 10/4/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/8/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2013)
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER GRANTING 116 Notice of Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Judge JEFFERY S. WHITE on 8/5/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2013)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER GRANTING AS AMENDED 108 STIPULATION re: Revised Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/24/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 106 STIPULATION re: Revised Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/18/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2013)
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 96 STIPULATION Re: Schedule. Motion Hearings set for 9/27/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/10/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Order regarding 80 Discovery Dispute in 5/15/2013 Joint Letter Brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 5/30/2013.(lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER GRANTING 77 STIPULATION to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 5/17/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/24/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/8/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2013)
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 63 MOTION Administrative Relief To Set Early Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 5/6/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/10/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/2/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER GRANTING 69 STIPULATION AND REFERRAL FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WITH EITHER MAG. JUDGE CORLEY OR MAG. JUDGE COUSINS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/30/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2013)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING 59 60 Plaintiff's Administrative Motions to File Portions of Documents Under Seal and DENYING AS MOOT 62 Defendant's Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 4/22/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2013)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO LODGE WITH CHAMBERS NEW, UNREDACTED VERSIONS OF THE PARTIES' JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEFS AND RELATED DOCUMENTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 4/15/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING 53 STIPULATION to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 6/7/2013. Case Management Conference set for 6/14/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/2/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2013)
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/10/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2013)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER of TENTATIVE RULING and QUESTIONS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 8, 2012. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2013)
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SETTING HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Responses due by 9:00 a.m. 1/7/2013. Replies due by 9:00 a.m. 1/8/2013. Temporary Restraining Order Hearing set for 1/10/2013 09:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/4/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Integral Development Corp v. Tolat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Integral Development Corp
Represented By: Jack Russo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viral Tolat
Represented By: Jarin R Jackson
Represented By: Stuart Matthew Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?