In Re FACEBOOK INTERNET TRACKING LITIGATION Featured Case
Plaintiff: Sharon Beatty, Lana Brkic, Jacqueline Burdick, Stephanie Campbell, Julian Carroll, Perrin Aikens Davis, John Graham, Petersen Gross, David Hoffman, Dana Howard, Tommasina Iannuzzi, Joon Khang, Dr. Brian K. Lentz, Laura Maguire, Patrick K. Maloney, Alexandria Parrish, Jane Peddicord, Cynthia D. Quinn, Brooke Rutledge, Lisa Sabato, Jennifer Sauro, Tracy Sauro, Janet Seamon, Christopher Simon, Michael Singley, Tracie Skiles, Edward Stravato, Chandra L. Thompson, Matthew J. Vickery and Jeanne M. Walker
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
In Re: In Re FACEBOOK INTERNET TRACKING LITIGATION
Case Number: 5:2012md02314
Filed: February 8, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Edward J Davila
2 Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER of USCA as to #179 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Matthew J. Vickery, Cynthia D. Quinn, Perrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER of USCA as to #179 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Matthew J. Vickery, Cynthia D. Quinn, Perrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2018)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER of USCA as to 179 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Matthew J. Vickery, Cynthia D. Quinn, Perrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER of USCA as to 179 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Matthew J. Vickery, Cynthia D. Quinn, Perrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2018)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER of USCA as to 179 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Matthew J. Vickery, Cynthia D. Quinn, Perrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2018)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER of USCA Appellees unopposed motion to maintain under seal the Response of Plaintiffs-Appellants to Motion of Defendant-Appellee to Seal Documents until such time as this Court rules on appellees renewed motion to seal is granted. The Clerk shall maintain under seal appellants response until such time as this Court rules on appellees renewed motion to seal.as to 179 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Matthew J. Vickery, Cynthia D. Quinn, Perrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER of USCA as to 179 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Matthew J. Vickery, Cynthia D. Quinn, Perrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz. Filed order. On March 26, 2018, appellants filed a notice of intent to file previously sealed documents publicly pursuant to Interim Ninth Circuit Rule 27-13(f), and submitted the opening brief and volume VII of the excerpts of record provisionally under seal. See Docket Entry No. 11 . On April 13, 2018, appellee filed a motion to maintain under seal any and all documents that were sealed by the district court, and requests that the Court direct plaintiffs to redact all portions of their opening brief that quote from or make reference to such documents. See Docket Entry No. 16 . On April 26, 2018, appellants filed an opposition to appellees motion to maintain the seal. See Docket Entry No. 18 . On May 3, 2018, appellee filed a reply to the opposition. See Docket Entry No. 19 . Appellees motion to maintain the seal is inadequate because it does not specifically identify which portions of the opening brief and volume VII of the excerpts of record that appellee seeks to maintain under seal. See Interim Ninth Circuit Rule 27-13(e) (a motion to seal shall request the least restrictive scope of sealing and shall be limited in scope to only the specific documents or portions of documents that merit sealing). Accordingly, appellees motion to maintain the seal is denied without prejudice to appellee filing a renewed motion to seal within 14 days after the date of this order. The opening brief and volume VII of the excerpts of record shall remain provisionally sealed for 14 days after the date of this order, to allow appellee to file a renewed motion to seal. If appellee does not file a renewed motion to seal within 14 days after the date of this order, the Clerk shall unseal the opening brief and volume VII of the excerpts of record, and file it publicly with volumes I through VI of the excerpts of record. The existing briefing schedule shall continue in effect. (Sealed Documents. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2018)
March 29, 2018 Filing 183 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Michael Ramsey Scott (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 3/29/2018)
January 16, 2018 Filing 182 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on October 5, 2012, April 28, 2016, and November 16, 2017 before Judge Edward J. Davila, re 179 Notice of Appeal,, Transcript due by 2/14/2018. (Straite, David) (Filed on 1/16/2018)
December 15, 2017 Filing 181 Redaction of 176 Transcript,,, (Related documents(s) 176 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
December 15, 2017 USCA Case Number 17-17486 USCA for 179 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Matthew J. Vickery, Cynthia D. Quinn, Perrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
December 15, 2017 Filing 180 USCA Scheduling Order as to 179 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Matthew J. Vickery, Cynthia D. Quinn, Perrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 12/22/2017. Transcript ordered by 01/16/2018. Transcript due 02/14/2018. Appellants Perrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn and Matthew J. Vickery opening brief due 03/26/2018. Appellee Facebook, Inc. answering brief due 04/26/2018. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
December 14, 2017 Filing 179 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Perrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery. Appeal of Order 175 , Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Protective Order, Order on Motion to Compel 148 , Order on Motion to Dismiss, 87 , Order on Motion to Dismiss 174 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-11952369 paid.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Representation Statement)(Straite, David) (Filed on 12/14/2017)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER GRANTING 177 STIPULATION TO REDACT TRANSCRIPT. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/14/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2017)
December 13, 2017 Filing 177 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Requesting Limited Redaction of November 16, 2017 Hearing Transcript filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kyle C. Wong in Support of Stipulation, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
November 21, 2017 Filing 176 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/16/2017, before Judge Edward J. Davila. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 172 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/20/2018. (Related documents(s) 172 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 11/21/2017)
November 17, 2017 Filing 175 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/17/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER GRANTING 162 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/17/2017. The Clerk shall close this file. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 17, 2017 Filing 173 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11-16-2017 before Judge Edward J. Davila by Facebook Inc., for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Wong, Kyle) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 17, 2017 Filing 172 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/16/2017 before Judge Edward J. Davila by Sharon Beatty, Perrin Aikens Davis, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Straite, David) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 16, 2017 Filing 171 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward J. Davila: Motion Hearing re 162 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Facebook Inc. held on 11/16/2017. Oral argument held. The Court took the matter under submission. Court to issue the order. Plaintiff Attorney: Stephen Grygiel, David Straite. Defendant Attorney: Matthew Brown, Lauren Pomeroy. Total Time in Court:9:00-10:15am(1hr.15mins.) Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/16/2017)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER GRANTING 156 MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/8/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2017)
October 30, 2017 Filing 169 NOTICE by Facebook Inc. Notice of Execution of Protective Order by Non-Parties to this Action (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 10/30/2017)
October 27, 2017 Filing 168 REPLY (re 162 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint ) filed byFacebook Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 10/27/2017)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER granting 165 Voluntary Dismissal [Edward Stravato, Plaintiff, 5:12-cv-0800-EJD]. The Clerk shall close Case No. 5:12-cv-00800-EJD. Pursuant to JPMDL Rule 10.1(a), the Clerk shall transmit a copy of this order to the Clerk ofthe JPMDL Panel. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/24/2017. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER granting 164 Voluntary Dismissal [Jane Peddicord, Plaintiff, 5:12-cv-0670-EJD]. The Clerk shall close Case No. 5:12-cv-00670-EJD. Pursuant to JPMDL Rule 10.1(a), the Clerk shall transmit a copy of this order to the Clerk of the JPMDL Panel. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/24/2017. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 23, 2017 Filing 165 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal [Edward Stravato, Plaintiff, 5:12-cv-0800-EJD] by Perrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery (Straite, David) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 23, 2017 Filing 164 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal [Jane Peddicord, Plaintiff, 5:12-cv-0670-EJD] by Perrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery (Straite, David) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 13, 2017 Filing 163 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 162 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint ) filed byPerrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery. (Straite, David) (Filed on 10/13/2017)
September 8, 2017 Filing 162 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Facebook Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 10/13/2017. Replies due by 10/27/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Matthew D. Brown In Support of Defendant Facebook, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Brown Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Brown Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Brown Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Brown Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 5 to Brown Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 6 to Brown Declaration, # 8 Proposed Order)(Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 9/8/2017)
August 30, 2017 Filing 161 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook Inc. re 160 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 8/30/2017)
August 29, 2017 Filing 160 EXHIBITS re 156 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the Third Amended Consolidated Complaint REDACTED Exh 2 to Naugle Declaration in Support of Defendant Facebook, Inc.s Response to Plaintiffs Administrative Motion to File Under Seal: CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 159 filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit UNREDACTED Exhibit 2 to Naugle Declaration)(Related document(s) 156 ) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 8/29/2017)
August 29, 2017 Filing 159 *** POSTED IN ERROR *** please see 160 EXHIBITS re 156 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit UNREDACTED Exhibit 2 to Naugle Declaration)(Related document(s) 156 ) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 8/29/2017) Modified on 8/29/2017 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 29, 2017 Filing 158 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 156 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the Third Amended Consolidated Complaint ) Defendant Facebook, Inc.s Response to Plaintiffs Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration Naugle Declaration in Support)(Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 8/29/2017)
August 25, 2017 Filing 157 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT (Public Version) against All Defendants. Filed by Brian K. Lentz, Perrin Aikens Davis, Matthew J. Vickery, Cynthia D. Quinn. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U (redacted), # 22 Exhibit V (redacted), # 23 Exhibit W (redacted), # 24 Exhibit X (redacted), # 25 Exhibit Y (redacted), # 26 Exhibit Z (redacted), # 27 Exhibit AA (redacted), # 28 Exhibit BB (redacted), # 29 Exhibit CC (redacted), # 30 Exhibit DD (redacted), # 31 Exhibit EE, # 32 Exhibit FF (redacted), # 33 Exhibit GG (redacted), # 34 Exhibit HH (redacted), # 35 Exhibit II (redacted), # 36 Exhibit JJ, # 37 Exhibit KK, # 38 Exhibit LL (redacted), # 39 Exhibit MM, # 40 Exhibit NN, # 41 Exhibit OO, # 42 Exhibit PP)(Straite, David) (Filed on 8/25/2017) Modified on 8/25/2017 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2017 Filing 156 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the Third Amended Consolidated Complaint filed by Perrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David A. Straite, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1 (Redacted Version of Complaint), # 4 Exhibit 2 (Sealed Exhibits), # 5 Exhibit 3 (Redacted Version of Exhibits), # 6 Exhibit 4 (Sealed Complaint), # 7 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Straite, David) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
August 1, 2017 Filing 155 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on July 28, 2017 before Hon. Edward J. Davila by Facebook Inc., for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 8/1/2017)
August 1, 2017 Filing 154 Transcript of Proceedings held on 07/28/2017, before Judge Davila. Court Reporter Irene L. Rodriguez, email address Irene_Rodriguez@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 153 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/30/2017. (Related documents(s) 153 ) (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 8/1/2017)
July 28, 2017 Filing 153 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 07/28/2017 before Hon. Edward J. Davila by Sharon Beatty, for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Straite, David) (Filed on 7/28/2017)
July 28, 2017 Filing 152 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Edward J. Davila: Further Case Management Conference held on 7/28/2017. Third Amended Complaint due by 8/25/2017. Motion to Dismiss due by 9/8/2017. Opposition due by 10/13/2017. Reply due by 10/27/2017. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 11/16/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Total Time in Court: 34 minutes (9:59-10:33 AM). Court Reporter Name: Irene Rodriguez. Courtroom Deputy: Irene Mason. For Plaintiff(s): David Straite. For Defendant(s): Matthew Brown. (iym, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/28/2017) Modified on 7/28/2017 (iym, COURT STAFF).
July 21, 2017 Filing 151 SUPPLEMENTAL JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Perrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery. (Straite, David) (Filed on 7/21/2017) Modified on 7/24/2017 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER GRANTING 92 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/5/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2017)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER GRANTING 104 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/5/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2017)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER GRANTING 101 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/30/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: 6/29/2017 Case Management Conference is CONTINUED to 7/28/2017 at 10:00 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Updated Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/21/2017. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 6/28/2017. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2017)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 146 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byPerrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Straite, David) (Filed on 5/16/2017)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER GRANTING 143 MOTION TO SCHEDULE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/4/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2017)
April 24, 2017 Filing 144 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 143 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Schedule Subsequent Case Management Conference ) filed byFacebook Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 4/24/2017)
April 18, 2017 Filing 143 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Schedule Subsequent Case Management Conference filed by Perrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery. Responses due by 4/24/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David A. Straite, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Proposed Order)(Straite, David) (Filed on 4/18/2017)
April 14, 2017 Filing 142 RESPONSE to re 141 Letter FACEBOOK, INC.S RESPONSE TO LETTER REQUESTING A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO ADDRESS THE PARTIES DISCOVERY MOTIONS by Facebook Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 4/14/2017)
April 11, 2017 Filing 141 Letter from David A. Straite requesting a Case Management Conference to address the parties' discovery impasse. (Straite, David) (Filed on 4/11/2017)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 140 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byPerrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery. (Straite, David) (Filed on 3/6/2017)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 139 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byPerrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 101 ) (Straite, David) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
October 17, 2016 Filing 138 NOTICE by Perrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE THAT THE MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY AND COMPLIANCE WITH THE PROTECTIVE ORDER HAS BEEN UNDER SUBMISSION FOR MORE THAN 120 DAYS (Straite, David) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 137 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byPerrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Straite, David) (Filed on 10/4/2016)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 136 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byPerrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Straite, David) (Filed on 9/28/2016)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 135 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byPerrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 101 ) (Straite, David) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
June 29, 2016 Filing 134 NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael Ramsey Scott (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 6/29/2016)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 133 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byPerrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 101 ) (Straite, David) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
June 10, 2016 Filing 132 REPLY (re 101 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Facebook, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) & 12(b)(6)) ) Plaintiffs' Response to Facebook's Supplemental Spokeo Brief filed byPerrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Straite, David) (Filed on 6/10/2016)
June 10, 2016 Filing 131 REPLY (re 101 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Facebook, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) & 12(b)(6)) ) Facebook's Reply to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief Regarding Spokeo's Application to Facebook's Motion to Dismiss filed byFacebook Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 6/10/2016)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 130 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d by Perrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery REQUEST FOR LEAVE to provide Anthem II as supplemental authority for the Courts consideration when deciding the Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Straite, David) (Filed on 6/3/2016) Modified text on 6/3/2016,(incorrect event selected.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 31, 2016 Filing 129 Supplemental Brief re 101 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Facebook, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) & 12(b)(6)) PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF REGARDING APPLICATION OF NEW SUPREME COURT DECISION IN SPOKEO, INC. v. ROBINS filed byPerrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery. (Related document(s) 101 ) (Straite, David) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
May 31, 2016 Filing 128 Supplemental Brief re 101 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Facebook, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) & 12(b)(6)) Regarding Spokeo's Application to Facebook's Motion to Dismiss filed byFacebook Inc.. (Related document(s) 101 ) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER GRANTING 125 Notice (Other) for Leave to File Recent Decision filed by Matthew J. Vickery, Cynthia D. Quinn, Perrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/25/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2016)
May 20, 2016 Filing 126 Order Granting 124 Motion for Leave to File Status of Recent Decision and Supplemental Briefing Concerning the Application of the Recent Decision. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 5/20/2016.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2016)
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 125 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d by Perrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery ; REQUEST FOR LEAVE provide this decision as supplemental authority for the Courts consideration when deciding the Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Straite, David) (Filed on 5/20/2016) Modified on 6/3/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 18, 2016 Filing 124 MOTION for Leave to File a Statement of Recent Decision and Supplemental briefing concerning the Statement of Recent Decision filed by Perrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery. Responses due by 5/23/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Straite, David) (Filed on 5/18/2016) Modified on 5/18/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2016 Filing 123 Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/28/2016, before Judge Davila. Court Reporter Irene L. Rodriguez, telephone number (408)947-8160 Irene_Rodriguez@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 121 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/11/2016. (Related documents(s) 121 ) (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 3, 2016 Filing 122 ***FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD***Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/28/2016, before Judge Davila. Court Reporter Irene L. Rodriguez, telephone number (408)947-8160 Irene_Rodriguez@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 120 Transcript Order, 121 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/1/2016. (Related documents(s) 120 , 121 ) (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 5/3/2016) Modified on 5/5/2016 (sp, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2016 Filing 121 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/28/2016 before Hon. Edward J. Davila by Facebook Inc., for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Trigg, Adam) (Filed on 5/2/2016)
April 29, 2016 Filing 120 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/28/2016 before Hon. Edward J. Davila by Perrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery, for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Straite, David) (Filed on 4/29/2016)
April 28, 2016 Filing 119 (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Edward J. Davila: Motion Hearing held on 4/28/2016 re 101 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Facebook, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) & 12(b)(6)) filed by Facebook Inc., 108 MOTION for Protective Order TEMPORARILY STAYING FURTHER DISCOVERY PENDING RESOLUTION OF MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT, AND MEMORANDUM OF POI filed by Facebook Inc., 110 MOTION to Compel DISCOVERY AND COMPLIANCE WITH PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Matthew J. Vickery, Cynthia D. Quinn, Perrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz The court took the motion under submission after oral argument. The court to issue further order following hearing. Appearances:Attorney(s) for Plaintiff(s): David Straite, Jay Barnes, Stephen Grygiel Attorneys(s) for Defendant(s): Matthew Brown, Kyle Wong, Adam Trigg. Court Reporter Name: 2 hours, 55 minutes Total Time in Court: Irene Rodriguez This is a text only Minute Entry. There is no document associated with this entry. (ecg, COURT STAFF)(Date Filed: 4/28/2016)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting 113 Administrative Motion to Amended Consolidation Order. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/27/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2016)
April 21, 2016 Filing 117 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Supplemental Joint Case Management Statement filed by Facebook Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 4/21/2016)
April 13, 2016 Filing 116 OBJECTIONS to re 115 Reply to Opposition/Response, Defendant Facebook, Inc.s Objection, Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3(d)(1), to Evidence Submitted by Plaintiffs in Their Motion to Compel Reply Brief by Facebook Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 4/13/2016)
April 6, 2016 Filing 115 REPLY (re 110 MOTION to Compel DISCOVERY AND COMPLIANCE WITH PROTECTIVE ORDER ) filed bySharon Beatty. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of David A. Straite, # 2 Exhibit 1 to the Straite Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 2 to the Straite Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 3 to the Straite Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 4 to the Straite Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 5 to the Straite Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 6 to the Straite Declaration)(Straite, David) (Filed on 4/6/2016)
March 30, 2016 Filing 114 RESPONSE (re 110 MOTION to Compel DISCOVERY AND COMPLIANCE WITH PROTECTIVE ORDER ) Defendant Facebook, Inc.s Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion To Compel filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Natalie Naugle, # 2 Declaration of Adam C. Trigg, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Trigg Declaration)(Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 3/30/2016)
March 25, 2016 Filing 113 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Amended Consolidation Order re 19 Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases,,,, 80 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, 66 Order filed by Perrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery. Responses due by 3/29/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Paul Kiesel, # 2 Declaration of Jay Barnes, # 3 Declaration of Mark Mandell, # 4 Proposed Order)(Straite, David) (Filed on 3/25/2016)
March 23, 2016 Filing 112 REPLY (re 108 MOTION for Protective Order TEMPORARILY STAYING FURTHER DISCOVERY PENDING RESOLUTION OF MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT, AND MEMORANDUM OF POI ) filed byFacebook Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 3/23/2016)
March 16, 2016 Filing 111 OPPOSITION (re 108 MOTION for Protective Order STAYING FURTHER DISCOVERY PENDING RESOLUTION OF MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT, ) filed by Perrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery. (Straite, David) (Filed on 3/16/2016) Modified on 3/16/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 16, 2016 Filing 110 MOTION to Compel DISCOVERY AND COMPLIANCE WITH PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Perrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery. Motion Hearing set for 4/28/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 3/30/2016. Replies due by 4/6/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David A. Straite, # 2 Declaration of Wilfred Gomes)(Straite, David) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
March 10, 2016 Filing 109 REPLY (re 101 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Facebook, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) & 12(b)(6)) ) filed byFacebook Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 3/10/2016)
March 2, 2016 Filing 108 MOTION for Protective Order TEMPORARILY STAYING FURTHER DISCOVERY PENDING RESOLUTION OF MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT, AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by Facebook Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/28/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 3/16/2016. Replies due by 3/23/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kyle C. Wong in Support of Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Kyle C. Wong in Support of Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Kyle C. Wong in Support of Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order, # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Kyle C. Wong in Support of Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order, # 5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Kyle C. Wong in Support of Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order, # 6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Kyle C. Wong in Support of Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order, # 7 Exhibit F to Declaration of Kyle C. Wong in Support of Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order, # 8 Exhibit G to Declaration of Kyle C. Wong in Support of Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order, # 9 Exhibit H to Declaration of Kyle C. Wong in Support of Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order, # 10 Proposed Order (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 3/2/2016) Modified on 3/16/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2016 Filing 107 EXHIBITS re 104 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 2 to Declaration of David A. Straite filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2 HIGHLIGHTED UNREDACTED to Decl. of David A. Straite)(Related document(s) 104 ) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 2/22/2016)
February 22, 2016 Filing 106 RESPONSE (re 104 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Natalie Naugle in Support of Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting in Part Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal)(Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 2/22/2016)
February 18, 2016 Filing 105 DECLARATION of Stephen G. Grygiel in Opposition to 101 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Facebook, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) & 12(b)(6)) filed byPerrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Related document(s) 101 ) (Straite, David) (Filed on 2/18/2016)
February 18, 2016 Filing 104 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Perrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of David A. Straite, # 3 Exhibit 1: Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss (Redacted Version), # 4 Exhibit 2: Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss (Unredacted Version) - FILED UNDER SEAL)(Straite, David) (Filed on 2/18/2016)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER OF RECUSAL: I hereby recuse myself from hearing or determining any matters in the above case. The Clerk of Court shall remove the undersigned as referral judge and reassign the referred matters in this case to another Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal on 2/4/2016. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
February 4, 2016 Remarks: Judge Cousins randomly assigned to case as referral judge due to Order of Recusal 103 . *** Please note this is a docket entry only*** (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ***EFILED IN ERROR, SEE CORRECTED ORDER AT ECF NO. 103 ***ORDER OF RECUSAL: I hereby recuse myself from hearing or determining any matters in the above case. The Clerk of Court shall remove the undersigned as referral judge and reassign the referred matters in this case to another Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal on 2/4/2016. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2016) Modified on 2/4/2016 (ofr, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2016 Filing 101 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Facebook, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) & 12(b)(6)) filed by Facebook Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/28/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 2/18/2016. Replies due by 3/10/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 1/14/2016)
January 5, 2016 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/21/2016. Case Management Conference set for 4/28/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016)
January 5, 2016 Filing 100 Order Granting 99 Stipulation CONCERNING PAGE LIMITS FOR BRIEFING ON MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DATE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 1. Facebook's Motion to Dismiss shall not exceed 40 pages; 2. Plaintiffs opposition to the Motion to Dismiss shall not exceed 40 pages; 3. Facebook's reply in support of the Motion to Dismiss shall not exceed 25 pages; and 4. The Case Management Conference scheduled for January 14, 2016 shall be continued to April 28, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. (the same date on which the hearing on the Motion to Dismiss is scheduled). Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 1/5/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016)
December 30, 2015 Filing 99 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Concerning Page Limits for Briefing on Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint and Date of Case Management Conference filed by Facebook Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 12/30/2015)
December 11, 2015 Filing 98 OBJECTIONS to re 97 Reply to Opposition/Response,, Defendant Facebook, Inc.s Objection to Plaintiffs Reply to Defendant Facebook, Inc.s Response to Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Facebook Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 12/11/2015)
December 8, 2015 Filing 97 REPLY (re 92 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE PORTIONS OF SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT UNDER SEAL CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 90 , 90 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE PORTIONS OF SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT UNDER SEAL ) PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO DEFENDANT FACEBOOK INC.S RESPONSE TO ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL filed byPerrin Aikens Davis. (Kiesel, Paul) (Filed on 12/8/2015)
December 4, 2015 Filing 96 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook Inc. re 95 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/4/2015)
December 4, 2015 Filing 95 REDACTION DECLARATION of Natalie Naugle in support of response REDACTED Version of Exhibit 2 re: 92 filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 2, # 2 REDACTED Version of Exhibit 3, # 3 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) 92 , 90 ) (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/4/2015) Modified on 12/7/2015 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2015 Filing 94 RESPONSE (re 92 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT UNDER SEAL CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 90 , 90 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Natalie Naugle in Support of Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting in Part Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal)(Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/4/2015) Modified on 12/7/2015 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 1, 2015 Filing 93 REDACTED VERSION OF SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 91 against All Defendants. Filed by Perrin Aikens Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit BB, # 29 Exhibit CC, # 30 Exhibit DD, # 31 Exhibit EE, # 32 Exhibit FF, # 33 Exhibit GG, # 34 Exhibit HH)(Kiesel, Paul) (Filed on 12/1/2015) Modified on 6/3/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 1, 2015 Filing 92 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE PORTIONS OF SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT UNDER SEAL CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 90 filed by Perrin Aikens Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Straite, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Proposed Order)(Kiesel, Paul) (Filed on 12/1/2015)
November 30, 2015 Filing 91 *** POSTED IN ERROR *** please see 93 REDACTED VERSION OF SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed by Perrin Aikens Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit BB, # 29 Exhibit CC, # 30 Exhibit DD, # 31 Exhibit EE, # 32 Exhibit FF, # 33 Exhibit GG, # 34 Exhibit HH)(Kiesel, Paul) (Filed on 11/30/2015) Modified on 6/3/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/3/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2015 Filing 90 *** POSTED IN ERROR *** please see 92 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Perrin Aikens Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Straite, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2 - FILED UNDER SEAL, # 4 Exhibit 3 - FILED UNDER SEAL, # 5 Proposed Order)(Kiesel, Paul) (Filed on 11/30/2015) Modified on 6/3/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 24, 2015 Set Deadlines/Hearings re 89 Order: Motion due by 1/14/2016. Opposition due 2/18/2016. Reply due 3/10/2016. Motion Hearing set for 4/28/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
November 24, 2015 Filing 89 Order as Modified by the Court Granting 88 Stipulation Extending Briefing on Motion to Dismiss. 1. Facebook shall file its Motion to Dismiss on or before January 14, 2016; 2. Plaintiffs shall file their opposition to the Motion to Dismiss on or before February 18, 2016; AND 3. Facebook shall file its reply in support of the Motion to Dismiss on or before March 10, 2016. The Court sets the matter for hearing on April 28, 2016 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 11/24/2015.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
November 20, 2015 Filing 88 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONCERNING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR FACEBOOK'S MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Gutkin)(Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/20/2015)
October 23, 2015 ***Set Deadlines/Hearings re 87 Order: Amended Pleadings due by 11/30/2015. Case Management Statement due by 1/7/2016. Case Management Conference set for 1/14/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2015)
October 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting 44 Motion to Dismiss. Any amended complaint must be filed on or before 11/30/2015. The court schedules this case for a Case Management Conference at 10:00 a.m. on 1/14/2016. The parties shall file a Joint Case Management Conference Statement on or before 1/7/2016. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/23/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2015)
August 3, 2015 Filing 86 NOTICE by Joon Khang of Withdrawal of Michael M. Goldberg as Counsel (Godino, Marc) (Filed on 8/3/2015)
March 17, 2015 Filing 85 Order Granting 84 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Frederic S. Fox for Plaintiffs Davis, Lentz, Quinn and Vickery. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 3/17/2015.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2015)
March 12, 2015 Filing 84 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9356454.) filed by Perrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery. (Fox, Frederic) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
March 12, 2015 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Mario Man-Lung Choi for Plaintiffs Davis, Lentz, Quinn and Vickery (Choi, Mario) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
March 12, 2015 Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by Linda M. Fong for Plaintiffs Davis, Lentz, Quinn and Vickery (Fong, Linda) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
March 12, 2015 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by Laurence D. King (King, Laurence) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
March 12, 2015 Filing 80 Order Granting 79 Motion to Amend Interim Lead Counsel. The plaintiffs' Interim Executive Committee shall consist of Stephen G. Grygiel of Silverman, Thompson, Slutkin & White LLC, and David A. Straite of Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer, LLP. James P. Frickleton of Bartimus, Frickleton, Robertson & Goza, P.C., is appointed to the plaintiffs' Interim Steering Committee. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 3/12/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
March 10, 2015 Filing 79 MOTION to Amend Consolidation Order re 19 ORDER Granting on Motion to Consolidate Cases, 66 ORDER filed by Perrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery. Responses due by 3/16/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of STEPHEN G. GRYGIEL, # 2 Declaration of DAVID STRAITE, # 3 Proposed Order)(Kiesel, Paul) (Filed on 3/10/2015) Modified on 3/11/2015 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/11/2015 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed by Perrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery. (Related document(s) 54 ) (Kiesel, Paul) (Filed on 8/15/2014) Modified on 6/3/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF RECENT UNITED STATES SUPREME COURT AUTHORITY RELEVANT TO MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR LEAVE filed byPerrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery. (Related document(s) 54 ) (Kiesel, Paul) (Filed on 6/26/2014)
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISIONS RELEVANT TO MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS CORRECTED FIRST AMENDEDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR LEAVE filed byPerrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery. (Related document(s) 54 ) (Kiesel, Paul) (Filed on 5/12/2014)
April 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER ENTERING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 68 Stipulation (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2014)
April 2, 2014 Filing 74 NOTICE by Perrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery re 68 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER HAS BEEN UNDER SUBMISSION FOR MORE THAN 120 DAYS (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Straite, David) (Filed on 4/2/2014) Modified on 6/3/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d RELEVANT TO MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR LEAVE filed by Perrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery. (Related document(s) 54 ) (Kiesel, Paul) (Filed on 3/21/2014) Modified on 6/3/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 13, 2013 Filing 72 NOTICE of Change of Address by Paul R. Kiesel NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND CLARIFICATION OF AFFILIATION for Stephen Grygiel (Kiesel, Paul) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
November 12, 2013 Filing 71 NOTICE by Perrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE (Kiesel, Paul) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION RELEVANT TO MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; REQUEST FOR LEAVE filed byPerrin Aikens Davis. (Related document(s) 54 ) (Kiesel, Paul) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
October 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d Relevant to Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Corrected First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint; Request for Leave filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 61 , 44 ) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 10/10/2013) Modified on 6/3/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 6, 2013 Filing 68 STIPULATED WITH PROPOSED ORDER - PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR LITIGATION INVOLVING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION AND TRADE SECRETS by Perrin Aikens Davis. (Kiesel, Paul) (Filed on 9/6/2013) Modified on 9/6/2013,(incorrect event selected.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 27, 2013 Filing 67 NOTICE by Perrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE (Kiesel, Paul) (Filed on 6/27/2013)
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER GRANTING 64 REVISED CONSOLIDATION ORDER filed by Matthew J. Vickery, Cynthia D. Quinn, Perrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/26/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2013)
June 24, 2013 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul R. Kiesel (Kiesel, Paul) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
June 24, 2013 Filing 64 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] REVISED CONSOLIDATION ORDER by Perrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kiesel, Paul) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Granting Withdrawal of re 62 Notice (Other) filed by Perrin Aikens Davis Attorneys David A. Straite, Ralph N. Sianni, Michele S. Carino, and Lydia E.York are hereby withdrawn from this case. The Plaintiffs in this class action will continue to be represented by the remaining Co-Lead Counsel and additional counsel in this case. Attorney David A. Straite; Ralph N. Sianni and David K. Stein terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/20/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
May 15, 2013 Filing 62 NOTICE by Perrin Aikens Davis NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL FROM CASE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 11-5 AND [PROPOSED] ORDER (Kiesel, Paul) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
March 7, 2013 Filing 61 Statement of Recent Decisions Relevant to Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Corrected First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint; Request for Leave filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 44 ) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 3/7/2013) Modified text on 3/8/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2012 Filing 60 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/05/2012, before Judge Davila. Court Reporter/Transcriber Irene L. Rodriguez, Telephone number (408)947-8160. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 11/7/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/19/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/15/2013. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
October 5, 2012 Filing 59 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/5/2012 before Judge Edward J. Davila (Date Filed: 10/5/2012) re 44 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(1) & 12(b)(6)) filed by Facebook Inc. The Court took the matter under submission after oral argument. The Court to issue further Order following hearing. (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/5/2012)
August 22, 2012 Filing 58 Declaration of Kyle C. Wong in Support of 56 Request for Judicial Notice, 55 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 56 , 55 ) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 8/22/2012)
August 22, 2012 Filing 57 Declaration of Sandeep Solanki in Support of 56 Request for Judicial Notice, 55 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 56 , 55 ) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 8/22/2012)
August 22, 2012 Filing 56 Request for Judicial Notice re 55 Reply to Opposition/Response, 44 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(1) & 12(b)(6)) filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 55 , 44 ) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 8/22/2012)
August 22, 2012 Filing 55 REPLY (re 44 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(1) & 12(b)(6)) ) filed byFacebook Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 8/22/2012)
August 2, 2012 Filing 54 OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS 44 MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT correction to 53 filed by Perrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery. (Kiesel, Paul) (Filed on 8/2/2012) Modified on 8/21/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 2, 2012 Filing 53 ERRATA Corrected First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed on July 31, 2012 (Dkt. No. 52 ) contains errors in two sentences on page 15. re 52 Opposition/Response to Motion, by Perrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery. (Kiesel, Paul) (Filed on 8/2/2012) Modified on 8/21/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2012 Filing 52 OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS 44 MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Perrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery. (Kiesel, Paul) (Filed on 7/31/2012) Modified on 8/1/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 44 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(1) & 12(b)(6)): Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 Filing 51 Order Granting 49 Stipulation Continuing Hearing for Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 7/30/2012.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 27, 2012 Filing 50 JOINT STATEMENT CONCERNING CASE SCHEDULE filed by Facebook Inc.. (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/27/2012) Modified on 7/30/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2012 Filing 49 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CHANGING HEARING DATE FOR DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC.'S 44 MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Facebook Inc.. (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/26/2012) Modified on 7/27/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 20, 2012 Filing 48 Transcript of Proceedings held on 06/29/2012, before Judge Davila. Court Reporter/Transcriber Irene L. Rodriguez, Telephone number (408)947-8160. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 8/10/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/20/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/18/2012. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 7/20/2012)
July 2, 2012 Filing 47 Declaration of Kyle C. Wong in Support of 45 Request for Judicial Notice, filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 45 ) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
July 2, 2012 Filing 46 Declaration of Solanki in Support of 45 Request for Judicial Notice, filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 45 ) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
July 2, 2012 Filing 45 Request for Judicial Notice re 44 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(1) & 12(b)(6)) filed byFacebook Inc.. (Related document(s) 44 ) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
July 2, 2012 Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(1) & 12(b)(6)) filed by Facebook Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 7/31/2012. Replies due by 8/22/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
June 29, 2012 Filing 43 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 6/29/2012 before Judge Edward J. Davila (Date Filed: 6/29/2012). The parties to submit proposed order re dates for hearing Motion to Dismiss. The parties to submit a Joint Case Management Conference statement two weeks after the Rule 26(f) conference which proposes a scheduling order for the case. (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/29/2012)
June 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting 40 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The court permits ONLY Blackwell to withdraw. The firms remains as counsel of record for Plaintiff unless the court is notified otherwise. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/28/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2012)
June 22, 2012 Filing 41 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Facebook Inc.. (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/22/2012)
June 21, 2012 Filing 40 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Janet Seamon. Responses due by 7/5/2012. Replies due by 7/12/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Blackwell, Joseph) (Filed on 6/21/2012)
June 19, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to re 39 Order re Briefing Schedule and Page Limits:Opposition due by 7/31/2012. Replydue by 8/22/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2012)
June 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 37 Stipulation Concerning Briefing Schedule and Page Limits For Facebook's Motion to Dismiss. Facebook's Motion shall not exceed 35 pages. Plaintiffs shall file their opposition to the Motion on or before July 31,2012, and the opposition shall not exceed 35 pages; AND Facebook shall file its reply in support of the Motion on or before August 22, 2012, and the reply shall not exceed 25 pages. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/18/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2012) Modified text on 6/19/2012 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2012 Filing 38 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Gutkin in Support of 37 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 19 Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases,,,, Stipulation and Proposed Order Concerning Briefing Schedule and Page Limits For Facebook's Motion to Dismiss filed byFacebook Inc.. (Related document(s) 37 ) (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/6/2012)
June 6, 2012 Filing 37 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 19 Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases,,,, Stipulation and Proposed Order Concerning Briefing Schedule and Page Limits For Facebook's Motion to Dismiss filed by Facebook Inc.. (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/6/2012)
May 25, 2012 Filing 36 Transcript of Proceedings held on 03/30/2012, before Judge Davila. Court Reporter/Transcriber Irene L. Rodriguez, Telephone number (408)947-8160. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 6/15/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/25/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/23/2012. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 5/25/2012)
May 23, 2012 Filing 35 CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Facebook Inc.. correction to 33 First Amended Consolidation Class Action Complaint Filed by Brian K. Lentz, Perrin Aikens Davis, Matthew J. Vickery, Cynthia D. Quinn. (Kiesel, Paul) (Filed on 5/23/2012) Modified on 5/23/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 23, 2012 Filing 34 ERRATA re 33 Amended Complaint is missing characters on Pages 12-19. by Perrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery. (Kiesel, Paul) (Filed on 5/23/2012) Modified on 5/23/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 17, 2012 Filing 33 *** ERROR *** Please see 35 CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed by Brian K. Lentz, Perrin Aikens Davis, Matthew J. Vickery, Cynthia D. Quinn. (Kiesel, Paul) (Filed on 5/17/2012) Modified on 5/18/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/23/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 10, 2012 Filing 32 Order Granting 31 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 5/10/2012.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
May 9, 2012 Filing 31 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Interim Co-Lead Counsel and [Proposed] Order (Civ. L.R. 11-5(a)) filed by Perrin Aikens Davis, Petersen Gross, Tommasina Iannuzzi, Brian K. Lentz, Lisa Sabato, Jennifer Sauro, Tracy Sauro. (Kiesel, Paul) (Filed on 5/9/2012) Modified on 5/10/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 19, 2012 Filing 30 Order Granting 28 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jennifer L Harwood. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 4/19/2012.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2012)
April 19, 2012 Filing 29 Order Granting 27 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Stephen G. Grygiel. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 4/19/2012.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2012)
April 19, 2012 Filing 28 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6754934.) filed by Perrin Aikens Davis, Petersen Gross, Tommasina Iannuzzi, Brian K. Lentz, Lisa Sabato, Jennifer Sauro, Tracy Sauro. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order)(Grygiel, Stephen) (Filed on 4/19/2012)
April 19, 2012 Filing 27 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6754856.) filed by Perrin Aikens Davis, Petersen Gross, Brian K. Lentz, Tommasina Iannuzzi, Tracy Sauro, Jennifer Sauro, Lisa Sabato. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order)(Grygiel, Stephen) (Filed on 4/19/2012)
April 18, 2012 Filing 26 Order Granting 25 Motion to Withdraw as Representative Plaintiff filed by Laura Maguire. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 4/18/2012.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2012)
April 18, 2012 Filing 25 MOTION to Withdraw as Representative Plaintiff filed by Laura Maguire. Responses due by 5/2/2012. Replies due by 5/9/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Murphy, William) (Filed on 4/18/2012)
April 16, 2012 Filing 24 *** POSTED IN ERROR *** please see - 25 MOTION to Withdraw (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Murphy, William) (Filed on 4/16/2012) Modified on 4/18/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/18/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/18/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 13, 2012 Filing 23 Certificate of Interested Entities by Facebook Inc. Defendant Facebook Inc.'s Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Civil Local Rule 3-16 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 4/13/2012)
April 6, 2012 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary M Mandell (Mandell, Zachary) (Filed on 4/6/2012)
April 6, 2012 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Marie Bonnet-Hebert (Bonnet-Hebert, Heather) (Filed on 4/6/2012)
April 3, 2012 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 6/22/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/29/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2012)
April 3, 2012 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jane Peddicord. Service waived by Facebook Inc. waiver sent on 4/3/2012, answer due 6/4/2012. (London, Alice) (Filed on 4/3/2012)
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING 13 MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE AND APPOINT INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL. All future related cases shall be automatically consolidated and administratively closed. The Consolidated Amended Complaint shall be filed no later than 45 days Any Answer or responsive motion shall be filed no later than 90 days from the date upon which this order is filed; A further Case Management Conference is scheduled for June 29, 2012, at 2:00 p.m. On or before June 22, 2012, the parties shall file a Joint Case Management Conference Statement which includes, inter alia, further proposed deadlines for this action.5. All counsel, including those for the consolidated plaintiffs, shall register with this districts ECF/PACER system forthwith and shall receive further notices regarding this action through that system. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/3/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2012) Modified on 4/3/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/3/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/4/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 3, 2012 Filing 18 FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed by Jane Peddicord. (London, Alice) (Filed on 4/3/2012) Modified on 4/3/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 9 Motion to Substitute Party. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/30/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2012)
March 30, 2012 Filing 16 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 3/30/2012 before Judge Edward J. Davila (Date Filed: 3/30/2012). The Court to issue further Order following conference. (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/30/2012)
March 29, 2012 Filing 15 Order Granting (11) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:12-md-02314-EJD. Counsel shall arrange for a telephonic appearance through CourtCall. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 3/29/2012. Associated Cases: 5:12-md-02314-EJD, 5:12-cv-00675-EJD(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
March 29, 2012 Filing 14 Order Granting 8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joseph E. Blackwell. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 3/29/2012.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
March 28, 2012 Filing 13 MOTION to Consolidate Cases PURSUANT TO RULE 42(a); APPOINT INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL PURUANT TO RULE 23(g) filed by Perrin Aikens Davis. Motion Hearing set for 3/30/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 3/30/2012. Replies due by 3/30/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kiesel, Paul) (Filed on 3/28/2012)
March 28, 2012 Filing 12 Order Granting (6) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:12-md-02314-EJD. The request to appear by telephone is granted. Counsel shall arrange for a telephonic appearance through CourtCall. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 3/28/2012. Associated Cases: 5:12-md-02314-EJD, 5:12-cv-00824-EJD(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2012)
March 28, 2012 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear by Telephone for the Plaintiff Seamon in case number C12-675 EJD filed by Janet Seamon. (Davis, Michael) (Filed on 3/28/2012) Modified on 3/28/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 27, 2012 Filing 10 Order Granting (5) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:12-md-02314-EJD. The request to appear by telephone at the Case Management Conference on March 30, 2012 at 1:30 PM is GRANTED. Counsel shall arrange for a telephonic appearance through CourtCall. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 3/27/2012. Associated Cases: 5:12-md-02314-EJD, 5:12-cv-00796-EJD(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
March 27, 2012 Filing 9 MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Michael Singley. Responses due by 4/10/2012. Replies due by 4/17/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(London, Alice) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
March 26, 2012 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6692471.) filed by Janet Seamon. (Blackwell, Joseph) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
March 23, 2012 Filing 7 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT in ("Related Actions) filed by Perrin Aikens Davis. (Kiesel, Paul) (Filed on 3/23/2012) Modified on 3/26/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 23, 2012 Filing 6 First MOTION to Appear by Telephone in case number 12-824 EJD *** please note that Documents affecting a single individual action should be posted on the docket sheet of that action and on the master docket sheet. filed by Patrick K. Maloney. (Fultz, Michael) (Filed on 3/23/2012) Modified on 3/23/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 23, 2012 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear by Telephone by plaintiff STEPHANIE CAMPBELL Case No. 5:12-cv-00796-EJD In the Case Management Conference filed by Stephanie Campbell.*** Please notice *** Pursuant to MDL procedures motion has been docketed in the individual action case C12-796 EJD. (Rahmeyer, Grant) (Filed on 3/23/2012) Modified on 3/23/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/23/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 16, 2012 Filing 4 NOTICE by Facebook Inc. of Pendency of, action, Ung v. Facebook, Inc., No. 112-cv-217244 (Ung), pending in the Superior Court of the State of California, County of Santa Clara Facebook intends to move the Superior Court for a stay of proceedings in Ung pending resolution this matter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/16/2012) Modified on 3/19/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Motions terminated: (33 in 5:11-cv-04834-EJD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Facebook, Inc., (12 in 5:12-cv-00669-EJD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint, (10 in 5:12-cv-00676-EJD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Facebook Inc., (14 in 5:12-cv-00798-EJD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (14 in 5:12-cv-00799-EJD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Facebook Inc., (5 in 5:12-cv-00800-EJD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Facebook Inc., (8 in 5:12-cv-00824-EJD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Facebook Inc., (13 in 5:12-cv-00667-EJD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Facebook Inc., (14 in 5:12-cv-00825-EJD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Facebook Inc., (25 in 5:12-cv-00797-EJD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Facebook, Inc., (18 in 5:12-cv-00796-EJD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Facebook Inc., (10 in 5:12-cv-00801-EJD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Facebook Inc., (11 in 5:12-cv-00668-EJD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Facebook Incorporated, (11 in 5:12-cv-00675-EJD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Facebook Inc., (16 in 5:11-cv-04935-EJD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend filed by Facebook, Inc., (8 in 5:12-cv-00673-EJD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Facebook Inc., (16 in 5:12-cv-00674-EJD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Facebook Inc.. Joint Case Management Conference statement due 3/23/2012 Case Management Conference set for 3/30/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/8/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2012) Modified on 1/3/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 28, 2012 Filing 2 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/23/2012. Case Management Conference set for 3/30/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2012)
February 13, 2012 clerk's error
February 13, 2012 ***Party Alexandria Parrish, Facebook Inc., Sharon Beatty, Brooke Rutledge, Michael Singley, Dana Howard, John Graham, David Hoffman, J Seamon and Chandra L. Thompson added. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2012)
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1 TRANSFER ORDER: pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1407, the actions listed onSchedule A and pending outside the Northern District of California are transferred to the Northern District of California and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Edward J. Davila for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending there and listed on Schedule A.. Signed by Judge MDL PANEL on 2/8/12. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2012)
March 12, 2015 Filing 84 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9356454.) filed by Perrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery. (Fox, Frederic) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
March 12, 2015 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Mario Man-Lung Choi for Plaintiffs Davis, Lentz, Quinn and Vickery (Choi, Mario) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
March 12, 2015 Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by Linda M. Fong for Plaintiffs Davis, Lentz, Quinn and Vickery (Fong, Linda) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
March 12, 2015 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by Laurence D. King (King, Laurence) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Order Granting # 79 Motion to Amend Interim Lead Counsel. The plaintiffs' Interim Executive Committee shall consist of Stephen G. Grygiel of Silverman, Thompson, Slutkin & White LLC, and David A. Straite of Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer, LLP. James P. Frickleton of Bartimus, Frickleton, Robertson & Goza, P.C., is appointed to the plaintiffs' Interim Steering Committee. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 3/12/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
March 10, 2015 Filing 79 MOTION TO AMEND CONSOLIDATION ORDER re # 19 Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases,,,, # 66 Order filed by Perrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery. Responses due by 3/16/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of STEPHEN G. GRYGIEL, # 2 Declaration of DAVID STRAITE, # 3 Proposed Order)(Kiesel, Paul) (Filed on 3/10/2015)
August 15, 2014 Filing 78 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF RECENT DECIONS filed byPerrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery. (Related document(s) # 54 ) (Kiesel, Paul) (Filed on 8/15/2014)
June 26, 2014 Filing 77 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF RECENT UNITED STATES SUPREME COURT AUTHORITY RELEVANT TO MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR LEAVE filed byPerrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery. (Related document(s) # 54 ) (Kiesel, Paul) (Filed on 6/26/2014)
May 12, 2014 Filing 76 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISIONS RELEVANT TO MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS CORRECTED FIRST AMENDEDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR LEAVE filed byPerrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery. (Related document(s) # 54 ) (Kiesel, Paul) (Filed on 5/12/2014)
April 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER ENTERING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting # 68 Stipulation (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2014)
April 2, 2014 Filing 74 NOTICE by Perrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery re # 68 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER PLAINTIFFS LOCAL RULE 7-13 NOTICE THAT THE PARTIES JOINT STIPULATED PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR LITIGATION INVOLVING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION AND TRADE SECRETS HAS BEEN UNDER SUBMISSION FOR MORE THAN 120 DAYS (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Straite, David) (Filed on 4/2/2014)
March 21, 2014 Filing 73 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISIONS RELEVANT TO MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS CORRECTED FIRST AMENDEDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR LEAVE filed byPerrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery. (Related document(s) # 54 ) (Kiesel, Paul) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
December 13, 2013 Filing 72 NOTICE of Change of Address by Paul R. Kiesel NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND CLARIFICATION OF AFFILIATION for Stephen Grygiel (Kiesel, Paul) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
November 12, 2013 Filing 71 NOTICE by Perrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE (Kiesel, Paul) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
October 11, 2013 Filing 70 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION RELEVANT TO MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; REQUEST FOR LEAVE filed byPerrin Aikens Davis. (Related document(s) # 54 ) (Kiesel, Paul) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
October 10, 2013 Filing 69 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d Defendant Facebook, Inc.s Statement of Recent Decision Relevant to Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Corrected First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint; Request for Leave filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) # 61 , # 44 ) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 10/10/2013)
September 6, 2013 Filing 68 STIPULATED WITH PROPOSED ORDER - PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR LITIGATION INVOLVING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION AND TRADE SECRETS by Perrin Aikens Davis. (Kiesel, Paul) (Filed on 9/6/2013) Modified on 9/6/2013,(incorrect event selected.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 27, 2013 Filing 67 NOTICE by Perrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE (Kiesel, Paul) (Filed on 6/27/2013)
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER GRANTING # 64 REVISED CONSOLIDATION ORDER filed by Matthew J. Vickery, Cynthia D. Quinn, Perrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/26/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2013)
June 24, 2013 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul R. Kiesel (Kiesel, Paul) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
June 24, 2013 Filing 64 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] REVISED CONSOLIDATION ORDER by Perrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kiesel, Paul) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Granting Withdrawal of re # 62 Notice (Other) filed by Perrin Aikens Davis Attorneys David A. Straite, Ralph N. Sianni, Michele S. Carino, and Lydia E.York are hereby withdrawn from this case. The Plaintiffs in this class action will continue to be represented by the remaining Co-Lead Counsel and additional counsel in this case. Attorney David A. Straite; Ralph N. Sianni and David K. Stein terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/20/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
May 15, 2013 Filing 62 NOTICE by Perrin Aikens Davis NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL FROM CASE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 11-5 AND [PROPOSED] ORDER (Kiesel, Paul) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
March 7, 2013 Filing 61 Statement of Recent Decisions Relevant to Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Corrected First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint; Request for Leave filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) # 44 ) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 3/7/2013) Modified text on 3/8/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2012 Filing 60 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/05/2012, before Judge Davila. Court Reporter/Transcriber Irene L. Rodriguez, Telephone number (408)947-8160. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 11/7/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/19/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/15/2013. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
October 5, 2012 Filing 59 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/5/2012 before Judge Edward J. Davila (Date Filed: 10/5/2012) re # 44 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(1) & 12(b)(6)) filed by Facebook Inc. The Court took the matter under submission after oral argument. The Court to issue further Order following hearing. (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/5/2012)
August 22, 2012 Filing 58 Declaration of Kyle C. Wong in Support of # 56 Request for Judicial Notice, # 55 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) # 56 , # 55 ) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 8/22/2012)
August 22, 2012 Filing 57 Declaration of Sandeep Solanki in Support of # 56 Request for Judicial Notice, # 55 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) # 56 , # 55 ) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 8/22/2012)
August 22, 2012 Filing 56 Request for Judicial Notice re # 55 Reply to Opposition/Response, # 44 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(1) & 12(b)(6)) filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) # 55 , # 44 ) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 8/22/2012)
August 22, 2012 Filing 55 REPLY (re # 44 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(1) & 12(b)(6)) ) filed byFacebook Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 8/22/2012)
August 2, 2012 Filing 54 OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS # 44 MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT correction to # 53 filed by Perrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery. (Kiesel, Paul) (Filed on 8/2/2012) Modified on 8/21/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 2, 2012 Filing 53 ERRATA Corrected First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed on July 31, 2012 (Dkt. No. # 52 ) contains errors in two sentences on page 15. re # 52 Opposition/Response to Motion, by Perrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery. (Kiesel, Paul) (Filed on 8/2/2012) Modified on 8/21/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2012 Filing 52 OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS # 44 MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Perrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery. (Kiesel, Paul) (Filed on 7/31/2012) Modified on 8/1/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to # 44 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(1) & 12(b)(6)) : Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Order Granting # 49 Stipulation Continuing Hearing for Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 7/30/2012.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 27, 2012 Filing 50 JOINT STATEMENT CONCERNING CASE SCHEDULE filed by Facebook Inc.. (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/27/2012) Modified on 7/30/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2012 Filing 49 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CHANGING HEARING DATE FOR DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC.'S # 44 MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Facebook Inc.. (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/26/2012) Modified on 7/27/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 20, 2012 Filing 48 Transcript of Proceedings held on 06/29/2012, before Judge Davila. Court Reporter/Transcriber Irene L. Rodriguez, Telephone number (408)947-8160. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 8/10/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/20/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/18/2012. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 7/20/2012)
July 2, 2012 Filing 47 Declaration of Kyle C. Wong in Support of # 45 Request for Judicial Notice, filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) # 45 ) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
July 2, 2012 Filing 46 Declaration of Solanki in Support of # 45 Request for Judicial Notice, filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) # 45 ) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
July 2, 2012 Filing 45 Request for Judicial Notice re # 44 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(1) & 12(b)(6)) filed byFacebook Inc.. (Related document(s) # 44 ) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
July 2, 2012 Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(1) & 12(b)(6)) filed by Facebook Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 7/31/2012. Replies due by 8/22/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
June 29, 2012 Filing 43 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 6/29/2012 before Judge Edward J. Davila (Date Filed: 6/29/2012). The parties to submit proposed order re dates for hearing Motion to Dismiss. The parties to submit a Joint Case Management Conference statement two weeks after the Rule 26(f) conference which proposes a scheduling order for the case. (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/29/2012)
June 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting # 40 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The court permits ONLY Blackwell to withdraw. The firms remains as counsel of record for Plaintiff unless the court is notified otherwise. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/28/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2012)
June 22, 2012 Filing 41 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Facebook Inc.. (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/22/2012)
June 21, 2012 Filing 40 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Janet Seamon. Responses due by 7/5/2012. Replies due by 7/12/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Blackwell, Joseph) (Filed on 6/21/2012)
June 19, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to re # 39 Order re Briefing Schedule and Page Limits:Opposition due by 7/31/2012. Replydue by 8/22/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2012)
June 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting # 37 Stipulation Concerning Briefing Schedule and Page Limits For Facebook's Motion to Dismiss. Facebook's Motion shall not exceed 35 pages. Plaintiffs shall file their opposition to the Motion on or before July 31,2012, and the opposition shall not exceed 35 pages; AND Facebook shall file its reply in support of the Motion on or before August 22, 2012, and the reply shall not exceed 25 pages. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/18/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2012) Modified text on 6/19/2012 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2012 Filing 38 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Gutkin in Support of # 37 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re # 19 Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases,,,, Stipulation and Proposed Order Concerning Briefing Schedule and Page Limits For Facebook's Motion to Dismiss filed byFacebook Inc.. (Related document(s) # 37 ) (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/6/2012)
June 6, 2012 Filing 37 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re # 19 Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases,,,, Stipulation and Proposed Order Concerning Briefing Schedule and Page Limits For Facebook's Motion to Dismiss filed by Facebook Inc.. (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/6/2012)
May 25, 2012 Filing 36 Transcript of Proceedings held on 03/30/2012, before Judge Davila. Court Reporter/Transcriber Irene L. Rodriguez, Telephone number (408)947-8160. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 6/15/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/25/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/23/2012. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 5/25/2012)
May 23, 2012 Filing 35 CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Facebook Inc.. correction to # 33 First Amended Consolidation Class Action Complaint Filed by Brian K. Lentz, Perrin Aikens Davis, Matthew J. Vickery, Cynthia D. Quinn. (Kiesel, Paul) (Filed on 5/23/2012) Modified on 5/23/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 23, 2012 Filing 34 ERRATA re # 33 Amended Complaint is missing characters on Pages 12-19. by Perrin Aikens Davis, Brian K. Lentz, Cynthia D. Quinn, Matthew J. Vickery. (Kiesel, Paul) (Filed on 5/23/2012) Modified on 5/23/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 17, 2012 Filing 33 *** ERROR *** Please see # 35 CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed by Brian K. Lentz, Perrin Aikens Davis, Matthew J. Vickery, Cynthia D. Quinn. (Kiesel, Paul) (Filed on 5/17/2012) Modified on 5/18/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/23/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Order Granting # 31 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 5/10/2012.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
May 9, 2012 Filing 31 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Interim Co-Lead Counsel and [Proposed] Order (Civ. L.R. 11-5(a)) filed by Perrin Aikens Davis, Petersen Gross, Tommasina Iannuzzi, Brian K. Lentz, Lisa Sabato, Jennifer Sauro, Tracy Sauro. (Kiesel, Paul) (Filed on 5/9/2012) Modified on 5/10/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Order Granting # 28 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jennifer L Harwood. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 4/19/2012.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2012)
April 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Order Granting # 27 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Stephen G. Grygiel. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 4/19/2012.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2012)
April 19, 2012 Filing 28 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6754934.) filed by Perrin Aikens Davis, Petersen Gross, Tommasina Iannuzzi, Brian K. Lentz, Lisa Sabato, Jennifer Sauro, Tracy Sauro. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order)(Grygiel, Stephen) (Filed on 4/19/2012)
April 19, 2012 Filing 27 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6754856.) filed by Perrin Aikens Davis, Petersen Gross, Brian K. Lentz, Tommasina Iannuzzi, Tracy Sauro, Jennifer Sauro, Lisa Sabato. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order)(Grygiel, Stephen) (Filed on 4/19/2012)
April 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order Granting # 25 Motion to Withdraw as Representative Plaintiff filed by Laura Maguire. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 4/18/2012.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2012)
April 18, 2012 Filing 25 MOTION to Withdraw as Representative Plaintiff filed by Laura Maguire. Responses due by 5/2/2012. Replies due by 5/9/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Murphy, William) (Filed on 4/18/2012)
April 16, 2012 Filing 24 *** POSTED IN ERROR *** please see - # 25 MOTION to Withdraw (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Murphy, William) (Filed on 4/16/2012) Modified on 4/18/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/18/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/18/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 13, 2012 Filing 23 Certificate of Interested Entities by Facebook Inc. Defendant Facebook Inc.'s Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Civil Local Rule 3-16 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 4/13/2012)
April 6, 2012 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary M Mandell (Mandell, Zachary) (Filed on 4/6/2012)
April 6, 2012 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Marie Bonnet-Hebert (Bonnet-Hebert, Heather) (Filed on 4/6/2012)
April 3, 2012 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 6/22/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/29/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2012)
April 3, 2012 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jane Peddicord. Service waived by Facebook Inc. waiver sent on 4/3/2012, answer due 6/4/2012. (London, Alice) (Filed on 4/3/2012)
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING # 13 MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE AND APPOINT INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL. All future related cases shall be automatically consolidated and administratively closed. The Consolidated Amended Complaint shall be filed no later than 45 days Any Answer or responsive motion shall be filed no later than 90 days from the date upon which this order is filed; A further Case Management Conference is scheduled for June 29, 2012, at 2:00 p.m. On or before June 22, 2012, the parties shall file a Joint Case Management Conference Statement which includes, inter alia, further proposed deadlines for this action.5. All counsel, including those for the consolidated plaintiffs, shall register with this districts ECF/PACER system forthwith and shall receive further notices regarding this action through that system. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/3/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2012) Modified on 4/3/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/3/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/4/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 3, 2012 Filing 18 FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed by Jane Peddicord. (London, Alice) (Filed on 4/3/2012) Modified on 4/3/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting # 9 Motion to Substitute Party. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/30/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2012)
March 30, 2012 Filing 16 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 3/30/2012 before Judge Edward J. Davila (Date Filed: 3/30/2012). The Court to issue further Order following conference. (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/30/2012)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order Granting (11) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:12-md-02314-EJD. Counsel shall arrange for a telephonic appearance through CourtCall. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 3/29/2012. Associated Cases: 5:12-md-02314-EJD, 5:12-cv-00675-EJD(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Granting # 8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joseph E. Blackwell. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 3/29/2012.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
March 28, 2012 Filing 13 MOTION to Consolidate Cases PURSUANT TO RULE 42(a); APPOINT INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL PURUANT TO RULE 23(g) filed by Perrin Aikens Davis. Motion Hearing set for 3/30/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 3/30/2012. Replies due by 3/30/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kiesel, Paul) (Filed on 3/28/2012)
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Granting (6) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:12-md-02314-EJD. The request to appear by telephone is granted. Counsel shall arrange for a telephonic appearance through CourtCall. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 3/28/2012. Associated Cases: 5:12-md-02314-EJD, 5:12-cv-00824-EJD(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2012)
March 28, 2012 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear by Telephone for the Plaintiff Seamon in case number C12-675 EJD filed by Janet Seamon. (Davis, Michael) (Filed on 3/28/2012) Modified on 3/28/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Granting (5) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:12-md-02314-EJD. The request to appear by telephone at the Case Management Conference on March 30, 2012 at 1:30 PM is GRANTED. Counsel shall arrange for a telephonic appearance through CourtCall. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 3/27/2012. Associated Cases: 5:12-md-02314-EJD, 5:12-cv-00796-EJD(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
March 27, 2012 Filing 9 MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Michael Singley. Responses due by 4/10/2012. Replies due by 4/17/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(London, Alice) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
March 26, 2012 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6692471.) filed by Janet Seamon. (Blackwell, Joseph) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
March 23, 2012 Filing 7 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT in ("Related Actions) filed by Perrin Aikens Davis. (Kiesel, Paul) (Filed on 3/23/2012) Modified on 3/26/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 23, 2012 Filing 6 First MOTION to Appear by Telephone in case number 12-824 EJD *** please note that Documents affecting a single individual action should be posted on the docket sheet of that action and on the master docket sheet. filed by Patrick K. Maloney. (Fultz, Michael) (Filed on 3/23/2012) Modified on 3/23/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 23, 2012 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear by Telephone by plaintiff STEPHANIE CAMPBELL Case No. 5:12-cv-00796-EJD In the Case Management Conference filed by Stephanie Campbell.*** Please notice *** Pursuant to MDL procedures motion has been docketed in the individual action case C12-796 EJD. (Rahmeyer, Grant) (Filed on 3/23/2012) Modified on 3/23/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/23/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 16, 2012 Filing 4 NOTICE by Facebook Inc. of Pendency of, action, Ung v. Facebook, Inc., No. 112-cv-217244 (Ung), pending in the Superior Court of the State of California, County of Santa Clara Facebook intends to move the Superior Court for a stay of proceedings in Ung pending resolution this matter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/16/2012) Modified on 3/19/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Motions terminated: (33 in 5:11-cv-04834-EJD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Facebook, Inc., (12 in 5:12-cv-00669-EJD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint, (10 in 5:12-cv-00676-EJD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Facebook Inc., (14 in 5:12-cv-00798-EJD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (14 in 5:12-cv-00799-EJD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Facebook Inc., (5 in 5:12-cv-00800-EJD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Facebook Inc., (8 in 5:12-cv-00824-EJD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Facebook Inc., (13 in 5:12-cv-00667-EJD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Facebook Inc., (14 in 5:12-cv-00825-EJD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Facebook Inc., (25 in 5:12-cv-00797-EJD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Facebook, Inc., (18 in 5:12-cv-00796-EJD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Facebook Inc., (10 in 5:12-cv-00801-EJD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Facebook Inc., (11 in 5:12-cv-00668-EJD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Facebook Incorporated, (11 in 5:12-cv-00675-EJD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Facebook Inc., (16 in 5:11-cv-04935-EJD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend filed by Facebook, Inc., (8 in 5:12-cv-00673-EJD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Facebook Inc., (16 in 5:12-cv-00674-EJD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Facebook Inc.. Joint Case Management Conference statement due 3/23/2012 Case Management Conference set for 3/30/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/8/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2012) Modified on 1/3/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 28, 2012 Filing 2 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/23/2012. Case Management Conference set for 3/30/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2012)
February 13, 2012 clerk's error
February 13, 2012 ***Party Alexandria Parrish, Facebook Inc., Sharon Beatty, Brooke Rutledge, Michael Singley, Dana Howard, John Graham, David Hoffman, J Seamon and Chandra L. Thompson added. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2012)
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1 TRANSFER ORDER: pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed onSchedule A and pending outside the Northern District of California are transferred to the Northern District of California and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Edward J. Davila for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending there and listed on Schedule A.. Signed by Judge MDL PANEL on 2/8/12. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re FACEBOOK INTERNET TRACKING LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Beatty
Represented By: Stephen M Gorny
Represented By: Paul R. Kiesel
Represented By: Edward D Robertson, III
Represented By: Mary Doerhoff Winter
Represented By: Joel Grant Woods
Represented By: Ralph N. Sianni
Represented By: James Patrick Frickleton
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood
Represented By: David A. Straite
Represented By: Edward D. Robertson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lana Brkic
Represented By: Stephen M Gorny
Represented By: Paul R. Kiesel
Represented By: Edward D Robertson, III
Represented By: Mary Doerhoff Winter
Represented By: Ralph N. Sianni
Represented By: James Patrick Frickleton
Represented By: Conal Fergus Doyle
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood,
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood
Represented By: Edward D. Robertson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Burdick
Represented By: Stephen M Gorny
Represented By: Paul R. Kiesel
Represented By: Edward D Robertson, III
Represented By: Mary Doerhoff Winter
Represented By: Ralph N. Sianni
Represented By: James Patrick Frickleton
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood,
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood
Represented By: Henry A Meyer, III
Represented By: Edward D. Robertson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Campbell
Represented By: Stephen M Gorny
Represented By: Paul R. Kiesel
Represented By: Edward D Robertson, III
Represented By: Mary Doerhoff Winter
Represented By: Ralph N. Sianni
Represented By: Brian L Campbell
Represented By: Brian L Campbell,
Represented By: James Patrick Frickleton
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood,
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood
Represented By: Grant Rahmeyer
Represented By: Edward D. Robertson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julian Carroll
Represented By: Stephen M Gorny
Represented By: Paul R. Kiesel
Represented By: Edward D Robertson, III
Represented By: Mary Doerhoff Winter
Represented By: Ralph N. Sianni
Represented By: James Patrick Frickleton
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood,
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood
Represented By: Reginald Von Terrell
Represented By: Edward D. Robertson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perrin Aikens Davis
Represented By: Stephen M Gorny
Represented By: Paul R. Kiesel
Represented By: Edward D Robertson, III
Represented By: Mary Doerhoff Winter
Represented By: Ralph N. Sianni
Represented By: Stephen G. Grygiel
Represented By: John E. Keefe, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen T. Sullivan, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan Will Thames
Represented By: Daryl Lee Zaslow
Represented By: David A. Straite
Represented By: Laurence D. King
Represented By: James Patrick Frickleton
Represented By: Barry R Eichen
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood,
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood
Represented By: Frederic S. Fox
Represented By: Linda M. Fong
Represented By: Edward D. Robertson, Jr.
Represented By: Mario Man-Lung Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Graham
Represented By: Stephen M Gorny
Represented By: Paul R. Kiesel
Represented By: Edward D Robertson, III
Represented By: Mary Doerhoff Winter
Represented By: Ralph N. Sianni
Represented By: James Patrick Frickleton
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood,
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood
Represented By: Michelle L. Marvel
Represented By: Edward D. Robertson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Petersen Gross
Represented By: Paul R. Kiesel
Represented By: Stephen G. Grygiel
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood,
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Hoffman
Represented By: Stephen M Gorny
Represented By: Paul R. Kiesel
Represented By: Edward D Robertson, III
Represented By: Mary Doerhoff Winter
Represented By: Ralph N. Sianni
Represented By: James Patrick Frickleton
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood,
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Edward D. Robertson, Jr.
Represented By: Mark P Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Howard
Represented By: Stephen M Gorny
Represented By: Paul R. Kiesel
Represented By: Edward D Robertson, III
Represented By: Mary Doerhoff Winter
Represented By: Ralph N. Sianni
Represented By: James Patrick Frickleton
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood,
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood
Represented By: Mark Chandler Goldenberg
Represented By: Thomas P Rosenfeld
Represented By: Edward D. Robertson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommasina Iannuzzi
Represented By: Paul R. Kiesel
Represented By: Stephen G. Grygiel
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood,
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joon Khang
Represented By: Stephen M Gorny
Represented By: Paul R. Kiesel
Represented By: Edward D Robertson, III
Represented By: Mary Doerhoff Winter
Represented By: Ralph N. Sianni
Represented By: Marc Lawrence Godino
Represented By: James Patrick Frickleton
Represented By: Lionel Zevi Glancy
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood,
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood
Represented By: Jon A Tostrud
Represented By: Edward D. Robertson, Jr.
Represented By: Michael M. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Brian K. Lentz
Represented By: Paul R. Kiesel
Represented By: Stephen G. Grygiel
Represented By: David A. Straite
Represented By: Laurence D. King
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood,
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood
Represented By: Frederic S. Fox
Represented By: Linda M. Fong
Represented By: Mario Man-Lung Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Maguire
Represented By: Stephen M Gorny
Represented By: Paul R. Kiesel
Represented By: Edward D Robertson, III
Represented By: Mary Doerhoff Winter
Represented By: Ralph N. Sianni
Represented By: Peter G. Angelos
Represented By: Eric H. Gibbs
Represented By: William H Murphy, Jr
Represented By: David K. Stein
Represented By: Kambon Williams
Represented By: James Patrick Frickleton
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood,
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood
Represented By: Tonya M. Osborne
Represented By: Edward D. Robertson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick K. Maloney
Represented By: Stephen M Gorny
Represented By: Paul R. Kiesel
Represented By: Edward D Robertson, III
Represented By: Mary Doerhoff Winter
Represented By: Ralph N. Sianni
Represented By: Michael Fultz
Represented By: James Patrick Frickleton
Represented By: Michael K Fultz
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood,
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood
Represented By: Edward D. Robertson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandria Parrish
Represented By: Stephen M Gorny
Represented By: Paul R. Kiesel
Represented By: Edward D Robertson, III
Represented By: Mary Doerhoff Winter
Represented By: Ralph N. Sianni
Represented By: Peter F Burns
Represented By: James Patrick Frickleton
Represented By: William Mitchell Cunningham, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood,
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood
Represented By: Peter F Burns,
Represented By: Peter S Mackey
Represented By: Edward D. Robertson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Peddicord
Represented By: Stephen M Gorny
Represented By: Paul R. Kiesel
Represented By: Edward D Robertson, III
Represented By: Mary Doerhoff Winter
Represented By: Ralph N. Sianni
Represented By: Alice London
Represented By: James Patrick Frickleton
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood,
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood
Represented By: Edward D. Robertson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia D. Quinn
Represented By: Stephen M Gorny
Represented By: Paul R. Kiesel
Represented By: Edward D Robertson, III
Represented By: Mary Doerhoff Winter
Represented By: Ralph N. Sianni
Represented By: David A. Straite
Represented By: Laurence D. King
Represented By: James Patrick Frickleton
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood,
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood
Represented By: Robert M. Hatch
Represented By: Frederic S. Fox
Represented By: Linda M. Fong
Represented By: Margery S. Bronster
Represented By: Edward D. Robertson, Jr.
Represented By: Mario Man-Lung Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooke Rutledge
Represented By: Stephen M Gorny
Represented By: Paul R. Kiesel
Represented By: Edward D Robertson, III
Represented By: Mary Doerhoff Winter
Represented By: Ralph N. Sianni
Represented By: James Patrick Frickleton
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood,
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood
Represented By: Edward D. Robertson, Jr.
Represented By: David Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Sabato
Represented By: Paul R. Kiesel
Represented By: Stephen G. Grygiel
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood,
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Sauro
Represented By: Paul R. Kiesel
Represented By: Stephen G. Grygiel
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood,
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Sauro
Represented By: Paul R. Kiesel
Represented By: Stephen G. Grygiel
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood,
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Seamon
Represented By: Stephen M Gorny
Represented By: Paul R. Kiesel
Represented By: Edward D Robertson, III
Represented By: Mary Doerhoff Winter
Represented By: Ralph N. Sianni
Represented By: Tim P. Hartdegen
Represented By: Joseph E. Blackwell
Represented By: James Patrick Frickleton
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood,
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood
Represented By: Tim P. Hartdegen,
Represented By: L.J. Hymel
Represented By: Michael Reese Davis
Represented By: Richard P. Ieyoub
Represented By: Edward D. Robertson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Simon
Represented By: Stephen M Gorny
Represented By: Paul R. Kiesel
Represented By: Edward D Robertson, III
Represented By: Mary Doerhoff Winter
Represented By: Ralph N. Sianni
Represented By: Peter G. Angelos
Represented By: Eric H. Gibbs
Represented By: David K. Stein
Represented By: Kambon Williams
Represented By: James Patrick Frickleton
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood,
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood
Represented By: Tonya M. Osborne
Represented By: Edward D. Robertson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Singley
Represented By: Stephen M Gorny
Represented By: Paul R. Kiesel
Represented By: Edward D Robertson, III
Represented By: Mary Doerhoff Winter
Represented By: Ralph N. Sianni
Represented By: Alice London
Represented By: James Patrick Frickleton
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood,
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood
Represented By: Daniel W. Bishop, II
Represented By: Edward D. Robertson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracie Skiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Stravato
Represented By: Stephen M Gorny
Represented By: Paul R. Kiesel
Represented By: Edward D Robertson, III
Represented By: Mary Doerhoff Winter
Represented By: Ralph N. Sianni
Represented By: Michael S Schwartz
Represented By: Michael S Schwartz,
Represented By: James Patrick Frickleton
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood,
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood
Represented By: Zachary M Mandell
Represented By: Heather Marie Bonnet-Hebert
Represented By: Edward D. Robertson, Jr.
Represented By: Mark S Mandell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chandra L. Thompson
Represented By: Stephen M Gorny
Represented By: Paul R. Kiesel
Represented By: Edward D Robertson, III
Represented By: Mary Doerhoff Winter
Represented By: Ralph N. Sianni
Represented By: Andrew Stephan Lyskowski
Represented By: James Patrick Frickleton
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood,
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood
Represented By: Andrew Stephan Lyskowski,
Represented By: Edward D. Robertson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew J. Vickery
Represented By: Stephen M Gorny
Represented By: Paul R. Kiesel
Represented By: Edward D Robertson, III
Represented By: Mary Doerhoff Winter
Represented By: Ralph N. Sianni
Represented By: David A. Straite
Represented By: Laurence D. King
Represented By: James Patrick Frickleton
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood,
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood
Represented By: Frederic S. Fox
Represented By: Linda M. Fong
Represented By: Michael Ramsey Scott
Represented By: Louis David Peterson
Represented By: Edward D. Robertson, Jr.
Represented By: Mario Man-Lung Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanne M. Walker
Represented By: Stephen M Gorny
Represented By: Paul R. Kiesel
Represented By: Edward D Robertson, III
Represented By: Mary Doerhoff Winter
Represented By: Ralph N. Sianni
Represented By: James Patrick Frickleton
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood,
Represented By: Jennifer L. Harwood
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Thomas
Represented By: Edward D. Robertson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
Represented By: Kyle Christopher Wong
Represented By: Adam Christopher Trigg
Represented By: Jeffrey Gutkin
Represented By: Matthew Dean Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: In Re FACEBOOK INTERNET TRACKING LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?