Priyev v. Google, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Gabriel Priyev
Defendant: Google Inc and Does 1-20
Case Number: 5:2013cv00093
Filed: January 8, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2013 Pursuant to Signed Related Case Order 56 Case Reassigned to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Judge Lucy H. Koh no longer assigned to the case. (gmS, ) (Filed on 5/1/2013)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER as Modified by the Court Granting Stipulation (50 in 5:10-cv-04809 EJD) of Class Actions. Before consolidation, the clerk shall relate case numbers 5:10-cv-04809 EJD and 5:13-cv-00093 LHK and reassign the latter to the undersigned. The clerk shall then administratively close case number 5:13-cv-00093 once reassigned. The pending motion to dismiss filed in case number 5:10-cv-04809 EJD (Docket Item No. 44) is TERMINATED AS MOOT in light of the forthcoming consolidated complaint. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/30/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2013)
March 27, 2013 Filing 55 CLERKS NOTICE. The court has reviewed the motion and determined that no cases are related and no reassignments shall occur. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal for all discovery matters. Signed by The Executive Committee on 1/25/2013. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
January 24, 2013 Filing 53 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge: All matters presently set before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal are hereby vacated. Clerk to reassign case. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
January 23, 2013 Filing 52 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Gabriel Priyev.. (Diemer, Kathryn) (Filed on 1/23/2013)
January 23, 2013 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn S. Diemer (Diemer, Kathryn) (Filed on 1/23/2013)
January 11, 2013 Filing 50 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RE COURT DEADLINE FOR PARTIES TO EITHER CONSENT OR DECLINE TO PROCEED BEFORE A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Case Management Conference set for 2/5/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/29/2013. Each party who has not already done so shall file either a Consent or Declination to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge no later than 1/29/2013. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2013)
January 8, 2013 Filing 49 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:12-cv-01467. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 8, 2013 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (gmS, ) (Filed on 1/8/2013)
December 18, 2012 Filing 48 TRANSFERRED electronically the complete file record to the U.S. District Court Northern District of California, San Jose Division. (jmp, )
August 28, 2012 Filing 47 MINUTE entry before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: The Court, in its discretion, grants Plaintiff's motion to transfer venue 32 pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and transfers this lawsuit to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California, San Jose Division. Status hearing set for 10/11/2012 is stricken. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California, San Jose Division. [For further details see text below.] Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (jmp, )
August 24, 2012 Filing 46 REPLY by Plaintiff Gabriel Priyev to memorandum in opposition to motion 43 (Bulgarelli, Mark)
August 22, 2012 Filing 45 MINUTE entry before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Pursuant to the parties' joint stipulation, defendant Google Inc.'s time to respond to the second amended complaint is extended to 9/7/12. Mailed notice (kef, )
August 21, 2012 Filing 44 STIPULATION (Joint), to Extend Defendant Google Inc.'s Time to Respond to The Complaint. (Sarles, Jeffrey)
August 17, 2012 Filing 43 MEMORANDUM by Google, Inc. in Opposition to motion to transfer case 32 (Sarles, Jeffrey)
August 10, 2012 Filing 42 Second AMENDED complaint by Gabriel Priyev against All Defendants (Stepick, Alex)
August 9, 2012 Filing 41 MINUTE entry before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve:Status hearing held on 8/9/2012 and continued to 10/11/2012 at 08:30 AM. Plaintiff's second amended complaint shall be filed by 8/10/12. Mailed notice (kef, )
August 3, 2012 Filing 40 AMENDED complaint by Gabriel Priyev against All Defendants (Stepick, Alex)
July 18, 2012 Filing 39 MINUTE entry before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve:Motion hearing held on 7/18/2012. Plaintiff's motion to transfer venue 32 is entered. Response shall be filed by 8/17/12. Reply by 8/24/12. Status hearing set for 9/10/12 is stricken and reset to 8/9/12 at 8:30 a.m. Mailed notice (kef, )
July 17, 2012 Filing 38 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Gabriel Priyev by Alex Stepick, Iv (Stepick, Alex)
July 16, 2012 Filing 37 MINUTE entry before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file an amended complaint 35 is granted. Plaintiff's amended complaint shall be filed by 8/3/12. Defendant's motion to dismiss 21 is denied as moot. Joint Stipulation filed on 7/13/12 is stricken as irrelevant. Mailed notice (kef, )
July 13, 2012 Filing 36 NOTICE of Motion by Mark Anthony Bulgarelli for presentment of motion to amend/correct 35 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 7/18/2012 at 08:30 AM. (Bulgarelli, Mark)
July 13, 2012 Filing 35 MOTION by Plaintiff Gabriel Priyev to amend/correct complaint (Bulgarelli, Mark)
July 13, 2012 Filing 34 NOTICE of Motion by Mark Anthony Bulgarelli for presentment of motion to transfer case 32 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 7/18/2012 at 08:30 AM. (Bulgarelli, Mark)
July 13, 2012 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM by Gabriel Priyev in support of motion to transfer case 32 (Bulgarelli, Mark)
July 13, 2012 Filing 32 MOTION by Plaintiff Gabriel Priyev to transfer case (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bulgarelli, Mark)
July 13, 2012 Filing 31 STIPULATION regarding motion to dismiss 21 (Bulgarelli, Mark)
June 15, 2012 Filing 30 MINUTE entry before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Plaintiff's motion for extension of time 28 is granted. Plaintiff's response to defendant's motion to dismiss 21 shall be filed on or before 7/13/12. Reply by 8/10/12. Status hearing set for 9/10/12 is stricken and reset to 10/10/12 at 8:30 a.m. No appearance is required on the 6/19/12 notice date. Mailed notice (kef, )
June 14, 2012 Filing 29 NOTICE of Motion by Mark Anthony Bulgarelli for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, motion for relief 28 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 6/19/2012 at 08:30 AM. (Bulgarelli, Mark)
June 14, 2012 Filing 28 MOTION by Plaintiff Gabriel Priyev for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion to dismiss 21 (Bulgarelli, Mark)
June 14, 2012 Filing 27 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Gabriel Priyev by Ilan Chorowsky (Chorowsky, Ilan)
May 3, 2012 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve:Status hearing held on 5/3/2012 and continued to 9/10/12 at 8:30 a.m. Defendant's motion to dismiss 21 is entered. Response by 6/18/12. Reply by 7/9/12. Discovery is stayed until the Court rules on the pending motion to dismiss. Mailed notice (kef, )
May 2, 2012 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Donald Falk's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice 24 on behalf of Google, Inc. is granted; Attorney Donald M Falk for Google, Inc. added. Mailed notice (jmp, )
May 1, 2012 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7106730. (Falk, Donald)
April 30, 2012 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM by Google, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss 21 (Johnson, Edward)
April 30, 2012 Filing 22 NOTICE of Motion by Edward D Johnson for presentment of motion to dismiss 21 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 5/3/2012 at 08:30 AM. (Johnson, Edward)
April 30, 2012 Filing 21 MOTION by Defendant Google, Inc. to dismiss (Johnson, Edward)
April 30, 2012 Filing 20 STATUS Report by Gabriel Priyev (Bulgarelli, Mark)
April 25, 2012 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Eric Evans' motion for leave to appear pro hac vice 18 on behalf of Google, Inc., is granted. Attorney Eric Butler Evans for Google, Inc., added. Mailed notice (jmp, )
April 24, 2012 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7082543. (Evans, Eric)
April 5, 2012 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Jonathan A. Helfgott and Luke B. Weiger's motions for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Google, Inc. 14 15 are granted. Attorney Jonathan A. Helfgott, Luke B. Weiger for Google, Inc. added. Mailed notice (jmp, )
April 4, 2012 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Google, Inc. by Edward D Johnson (Johnson, Edward)
April 4, 2012 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7017525. (Weiger, Luke)
April 4, 2012 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7016480. (Helfgott, Jonathan)
April 1, 2012 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Edward Johnson's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Google 11 is granted. Attorney Edward D Johnson for Google, Inc. added. Mailed notice (jmp, )
April 1, 2012 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Defendant Google's agreed motion for extension of time 9 is granted. Google should answer or otherwise plead by 4/30/12. Joint status report should be filed by 4/30/12. Status hearing set for 4/16/12 is stricken and reset to 5/3/12 at 8:30 a.m. Mailed notice (kef, )
March 26, 2012 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6983099. (Johnson, Edward)
March 23, 2012 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Jeffrey W. Sarles for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, motion for relief 9 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 3/29/2012 at 08:30 AM. (Sarles, Jeffrey)
March 23, 2012 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendant Google, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint 1 (AGREED) (Sarles, Jeffrey)
March 23, 2012 Filing 8 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Google, Inc. and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 (Sarles, Jeffrey)
March 23, 2012 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Google, Inc. by Jeffrey W. Sarles (Sarles, Jeffrey)
March 13, 2012 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gabriel Priyev as to Google, Inc. on 3/9/2012, answer due 3/30/2012. (Bulgarelli, Mark)
March 8, 2012 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Google, Inc. (nsf, )
March 7, 2012 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Plaintiff's motion for class certification 4 is denied without prejudice to refile once defendant is served. Defendant is on notice that this is a putative class action suit. Plaintiff also failed to notice the motion pursuant to local rules. Mailed notice (kef, )
March 6, 2012 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Gabriel Priyev to certify class (Bulgarelli, Mark)
March 5, 2012 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Initial status hearing set for 4/16/12 at 8:30 a.m. in courtroom 1241. Parties should refer to Judge St. Eve's web page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov and file a joint status report by 4/11/12 as set forth in the Initial Status Conferences procedure. Mailed notice (kef, )
March 1, 2012 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Gabriel Priyev by Mark Anthony Bulgarelli (Bulgarelli, Mark)
February 29, 2012 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Arlander Keys. (nsf, )
February 29, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Gabriel Priyev; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-6891964. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bulgarelli, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Priyev v. Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Priyev
Represented By: Mark Anthony Bulgarelli
Represented By: Ilan Chorowsky
Represented By: Kathryn S. Diemer
Represented By: Alex Stepick, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc
Represented By: Eric Butler Evans
Represented By: Donald M. Falk
Represented By: Jonathan A. Helfgott
Represented By: Edward D. Johnson
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Sarles
Represented By: Luke B Weiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?