Gooden v. Baptista et al
Plaintiff: David Gooden
Defendant: W. Baptista, C. Mart and E. Garza
Case Number: 5:2013cv00352
Filed: January 25, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Del Norte
Presiding Judge: PSLC CLA
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR DEFENDANTS TO BE EXCUSED FROM PERSONALLY ATTENDING THE FEBRUARY 5 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Defendants are to appear by videoconference during the entirety of the conference. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 2/1/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2016)
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST to extend deadline for establishing effectiveness of Pelican Bay's video link technology to 2/1/2016. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 1/29/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2016)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' REQUEST TO BE EXCUSED FROM ATTENDING FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. The Court is open, however, to video conference participation by the individual officer defendants if defendants can establish that the video link technology will be effective and the officers can be available during the entirety of the conference. Defendants may renew their request by January 29. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 1/27/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2016)
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/16/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2015)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 AMENDED ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Plaintiff shall participate in the Settlement Conference set for December 18th at 2:00 PM via telephone. Authorities at CSP Sacramento are to contact the Courtroom Deputy at 408.535.5343 and counsel for Mr. Gooden to provide the contact information for his appearance. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 12/15/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2015)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER REFERRING PARTIES TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2015)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER TO FILE JOINT STATEMENT REGARDING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 9/3/2015. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2015)
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/27/2015. (lhklc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2015)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Hon. Lucy H. Koh on 3/17/2015. (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2015)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding. Parties did not reach agreement. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 12/2/14. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2014)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for presence of Plaintiff at settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor Vadas on 9/30/2014. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gooden v. Baptista et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Gooden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Baptista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Mart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?