Cepeda et al v. Federal National Mortgage Association et al
Plaintiff: Pedro D Cepeda and Helga R Cepeda
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association, Green Tree Servicing, LLC and Northwest Trustee Services, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2013cv00388
Filed: January 28, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1446 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 48 , 50 , 56 , 71 , and 72 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA'S REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT OCTOBER 15, 2013 MOTION TO DISMISS, granting 63 : Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 10/4/2013. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 33 Motion to Dismiss; granting 25 Motion to Dismiss (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2013)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 8 Motion to Dismiss (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2013)
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT 3/12/2013 MOTION TO DISMISS AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, granting 15 : Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 3/6/2013. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cepeda et al v. Federal National Mortgage Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro D Cepeda
Represented By: Kathleen OSullivan Mahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helga R Cepeda
Represented By: Kathleen OSullivan Mahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Kimberly Ann Paese
Represented By: Mary Kate Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Tree Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Kimberly Ann Paese
Represented By: Mary Kate Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Trustee Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?