Facebook Inc. et al v. Profile Technology, LTD et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Facebook Inc. and Facebook Ireland Limited
Defendant: Profile Technology, LTD and Christopher Claydon
Case Number: 5:2013cv00459
Filed: February 1, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2014 Filing 145 STATUS REPORT SECOND JOINT SETTLEMENT STATUS REPORT by Christopher Claydon, Profile Technology, LTD. (Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 9/5/2014)
August 12, 2014 Filing 144 REPLY (re 125 MOTION for Settlement ) Facebook's Response to Defendants' Further Supp. Opposition filed byFacebook Inc., Facebook Ireland Limited. (Alger, Timothy) (Filed on 8/12/2014)
August 12, 2014 Filing 143 copy of receipt generated by the CM/ECF system. Notice of Electronic Filing *** Docket number 127. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Facebook's Response to Defendants' Further Supp. Opposition filed by Facebook Inc., Facebook Ireland Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Facebook's Response to Defendants' Further Supp. Opposition (UNREDACTED), # 2 Facebook's Response to Defendants' Further Supp. Opposition (REDACTED))(Alger, Timothy) (Filed on 8/12/2014) Modified text on 8/12/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2014 Filing 142 *** copy of receipt generated by the CM/ECF system. Notice of Electronic Filing *** Docket number 127. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) filed by Christopher Claydon, Profile Technology, LTD. (Attachments: # 1 REDACTED SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION, # 2 REDACTED SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER CLAYDON, # 3 SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION, # 4 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER CLAYDON)(Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 8/6/2014) Modified text on 8/8/2014,(not a motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified text on 8/12/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2014 Filing 141 EXHIBITS re 125 MOTION for Settlement Motion for Order Compelling Compliance with Settlement Agreement filed byFacebook Inc., Facebook Ireland Limited. (Related document(s) 125 ) (Alger, Timothy) (Filed on 7/31/2014)
July 31, 2014 Filing 140 *** copy of receipt generated by the CM/ECF system. Notice of Electronic Filing *** filed by Facebook Inc., Facebook Ireland Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Unredacted, # 2 Exhibit Redacted)(Alger, Timothy) (Filed on 7/31/2014) Modified text on 8/8/2014, (not administrative motion.) (cvS, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2014 Filing 139 Proposed Order re 125 MOTION for Settlement Motion for Order Compelling Compliance with Settlement Agreement by Facebook Inc., Facebook Ireland Limited. (Alger, Timothy) (Filed on 7/31/2014)
July 30, 2014 Filing 138 Minute Entry: Hearing re Facebook's Motion for Settlement 125 held on 7/30/2014 before Magistrate Judge Nathanael Cousins. (FTR Digital Recorder: 1:48pm - 2:24pm.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/30/2014)
July 29, 2014 Filing 137 RESPONSE (re 125 MOTION for Settlement, 136 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Supplemental Opposition to Motion to Compel Compliance with Settlement ) REDACTED VERSION filed byChristopher Claydon, Profile Technology, LTD. (Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 7/29/2014)
July 28, 2014 Filing 136 *** copy of receipt generated by the CM/ECF system. Notice of Electronic Filing *** Docket number 127. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Supplemental Opposition to Motion to Compel Compliance with Settlement filed by Christopher Claydon, Profile Technology, LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Supplemental Opposition)(Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 7/28/2014) Modified on 7/30/2014 (sp, COURT STAFF). Modified text on 8/8/2014,(not administrative motion) (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified text on 8/12/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins granting 134 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2014)
July 22, 2014 Filing 134 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing filed by Facebook Inc., Facebook Ireland Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing)(Alger, Timothy) (Filed on 7/22/2014)
July 22, 2014 Filing 133 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Administrative Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing filed by Facebook Inc., Facebook Ireland Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Administrative Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing, # 2 Unredacted Administrative Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing)(Alger, Timothy) (Filed on 7/22/2014) Modified on 7/30/2014 (sp, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER GRANTING Motion to Appear by Telephone 131 . Defendants are directed to contact the courtroom deputy at 415.522.2039 in advance of the hearing to schedule the telephone appearance. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2014)
July 17, 2014 Filing 131 MOTION to Appear by Telephone AT JULY 30, 2014 HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION COMPELLING COMPLIANCE WITH SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT filed by Christopher Claydon, Profile Technology, LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 7/17/2014)
July 14, 2014 Filing 130 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING Facebook's Motion for Order Compelling Compliance with Settlement Agreement [125-3]. Motion Hearing set for 7/30/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. This is a text-only entry generated by the Court. There is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
June 25, 2014 Filing 129 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Facebook Inc., Facebook Ireland Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Facebook's Reply in Support of Motion for Order Compelling Compliance with Settlement and Objections to Claydon Declaration (Unredacted), # 2 Facebook's Reply in Support of Motion for Order Compelling Compliance with Settlement and Objections to Claydon Declaration (Redacted))(Alger, Timothy) (Filed on 6/25/2014)
June 18, 2014 Filing 128 Exhibit - Copy of Notice of Electronic Filing related to 127 and 125 filed by Christopher Claydon, Profile Technology, LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit REDACTED OPPOSITION, # 2 Exhibit OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH SETTLEMENT [125-6])(Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 6/18/2014) Modified text on 6/19/2014, (to conform with document posted by counsel.) (cvS, COURT STAFF).
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER GRANTING 125 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
June 10, 2014 Filing 126 STATUS REPORT JOINT SETTLEMENT STATUS REPORT by Christopher Claydon, Profile Technology, LTD. (Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
June 4, 2014 Filing 125 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Facebook Inc., Facebook Ireland Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Facebook's Motion for Order Compelling Compliance with Settlement Agreement and Objections to Declaration of Christopher Claydon, # 4 Redacted Version of Declaration of Timothy L. Alger in Support of Facebook's Motion for Order Compelling Compliance with Settlement Agreement and Objections to Declaration of Christopher Claydon, # 5 Redacted Version of [Proposed] Order Compelling Compliance with Settlement Agreement, # 6 Unredacted Version of Facebook's Motion for Order Compelling Compliance with Settlement Agreement and Objections to Declaration of Christopher Claydon, # 7 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Timothy L. Alger in Support of Facebook's Motion for Order Compelling Compliance with Settlement Agreement and Objections to Declaration of Christopher Claydon, # 8 Unredacted Version of [Proposed] Order Compelling Compliance with Settlement Agreement)(Alger, Timothy) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER OF STIPULATED DISMISSAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 123 . (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
June 2, 2014 Filing 123 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 90 Order to Show Cause, 118 Clerks Notice, JOINT REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE filed by Christopher Claydon, Profile Technology, LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order OF STIPULATED DISMISSAL)(Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT JUNE 3, 2014 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 121 . Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014)
May 28, 2014 Filing 121 MOTION to Appear by Telephone AT OSC RE DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT ON 6/3/2014 AT 8:30 AM filed by Christopher Claydon, Profile Technology, LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 5/28/2014)
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER ENFORCING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT, Dkt. Nos. 94 95 102 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO REDACT COURT'S ORDER ENFORCING SETTLEMENT 117 .The Clerk of Court is directed to file the May 20 order in ECF. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 27, 2014 Filing 118 CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING TIME ON JUNE 3, 2014 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING: 6/3/2014 10:00 AM Order to Show Cause Hearing is advanced to 8:30 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 23, 2014 Filing 117 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PURSUANT TO SEALING ORDER [DKT 111] filed by Christopher Claydon, Profile Technology, LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement DEFENDANTS MOTION REGARDING SEALING OF ORDER ENFORCING SETTLEMENT)(Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
May 15, 2014 Filing 116 Minute Entry: Hearing held on 5/14/2014 before Nathanael Cousins Defendants' Motion to Enforce Settlement 95 ; Administrative Motion to File Under Seal 114 ; Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Declaration of Christopher Claydon 115 . Court to issue order. (FTR: SEALED (2:14pm-2:57pm) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/15/2014)
May 14, 2014 Filing 115 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Declaration of Christopher Claydon (114-1) filed by Christopher Claydon, Profile Technology, LTD. (Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 5/14/2014)
May 14, 2014 Filing 114 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Supplemental Declaration and Objections to Evidence filed by Christopher Claydon, Profile Technology, LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christopher Claydon, # 2 Exhibit Objections to Evidence)(Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 5/14/2014)
May 9, 2014 Filing 113 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal on Granted Order - Expedited Brief Regarding Enforcement of Settlement Agreement filed by Facebook Inc., Facebook Ireland Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Facebook's Expedited Brief Regarding Enforcement of Settlement Agreement, # 2 Declaration of Timothy L. Alger, # 3 Exhibit A to Alger Declaration, # 4 Exhibit B to Alger Declaration, # 5 Proposed Order)(Alger, Timothy) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 9, 2014 Filing 112 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal on Granted Order - Further Briefing re Breach and Remedies filed by Christopher Claydon, Profile Technology, LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Briefing, # 2 Declaration of Jared R Smith, # 3 Declaration Christopher Claydon, # 4 Proposed Order)(Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins granting 110 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 7, 2014 Filing 110 Unopposed Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Christopher Claydon, Profile Technology, LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jared R Smith, # 2 Proposed Order)(Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 5/7/2014) Modified on 5/8/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2014 Filing 109 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING JURY TRIAL: 5/12/2014 Jury Trial is hereby vacated. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
May 6, 2014 Filing 108 Minute Entry: Pretrial Conference held on 5/6/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. No parties present. Matter off calendar. (Court Reporter FTR: (11:06 to 11:06) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/6/2014)
May 2, 2014 Filing 106 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING MAY 6, 2014 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING: 5/6/2014 Order to Show Cause Hearing is reset to 6/3/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
May 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; ORDERING FURTHER EXPEDITED BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on May 2, 2014. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
April 28, 2014 Filing 107 Minute Entry: Further Settlement Conference held with Judge Cousins on 4/28/2014. Discussions continue. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/28/2014)
April 4, 2014 Set Hearing re 104 : Settlement Conference set for 4/28/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2014)
April 3, 2014 Filing 104 Minute Entry: Hearing held on 4/2/2014 before Judge Nathanael Cousins re Motion to Compel Enforcement of Settlement 95 filed by Christopher Claydon, Profile Technology, LTD. (FTR: 2:43pm-3:08pm.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/3/2014)
March 31, 2014 Filing 103 CLERKS NOTICE CONFIRMING HEARING RE: Defendants' Motion to Compel Enforcement of Settlement 95 on 4/2/2014 01:00 PM before Judge Cousins in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Counsel participating by telephone must contact Lili Harrell at 415.522.2039 to provide a direct dial number for their appearance. This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2014)
March 28, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 95 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time on Motion to Compel Enforcement of Settlement Motion Hearing set for 4/2/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 27, 2014 Filing 102 RENOTICE OF MOTION hearing re 95 filed by Christopher Claydon, Profile Technology, LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte Motion for Hearing on Shortened Time)(Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 3/27/2014) Modified on 3/28/2014,(counsel selected incorrect event.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT DISPUTES. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 26, 2014. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER GRANTING 92 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
March 17, 2014 Filing 99 REPLY (re 95 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time on Motion to Compel Enforcement of Settlement CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 93 filed by Christopher Claydon, Profile Technology, LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jared R Smith)(Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 3/17/2014) Modified on 3/17/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER GRANTING 96 MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENT entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
March 14, 2014 Filing 97 RESPONSE (re 92 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time and Motion to Compel Settlement ) filed byFacebook Inc., Facebook Ireland Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Alger, Timothy) (Filed on 3/14/2014)
March 13, 2014 Filing 96 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document DOCKET NUMBERS [92-3], [92-4], [93-main] and [93-1] filed by Christopher Claydon, Profile Technology, LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jared R Smith, # 2 Proposed Order)(Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 3/13/2014)
March 13, 2014 Filing 95 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time on Motion to Compel Enforcement of Settlement CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 93 , MOTION for Settlement (REDACTED) CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 93 filed by Christopher Claydon, Profile Technology, LTD. Responses due by 3/27/2014. Replies due by 4/3/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jared R Smith - redacted, # 2 Proposed Order re Shortening Time, # 3 Proposed Order re Compelling Enforcement of Settlement)(Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 3/13/2014)
March 13, 2014 Filing 94 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time by Christopher Claydon, Profile Technology, LTD. Amendment to 92 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time and Motion to Compel Settlement amendment to [92-3] AND [92-4] TO CORRECT REDACTIONS. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jared R Smith - redacted)(Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 3/13/2014) Modified on 3/13/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2014 Filing 93 *** PURSUANT TO ORDER 96 DOCUMENTS #93 AND #93-1 REMOVED*** Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time on Motion to Compel Enforcement of Settlement, MOTION for Settlement (REDACTED) filed by Christopher Claydon, Profile Technology, LTD. Responses due by 3/26/2014. Replies due by 4/2/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jared R Smith - redacted, # 2 Proposed Order Shortening Time for Hearing, # 3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Compel Enforcement of Settlement)(Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 3/12/2014) Modified on 3/13/2014 (ewn, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/13/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF). (Main Document 93 replaced on 3/17/2014) (sp, COURT STAFF). (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/17/2014) (sp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/17/2014 (sp, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2014 Filing 92 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time and Motion to Compel Settlement filed by Christopher Claydon, Profile Technology, LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jared R Smith, # 2 Proposed Order, *** # 3 Exhibit Redacted Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time and Motion to Compel Settlement, # 4 Exhibit Redacted Smith Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time and Motion to Compel Settlement PURSUANT TO ORDER 96 DOCUMENTS #92-3 AND #92-4 REMOVED *** , # 5 Exhibit Unredacted Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time and Motion to Compel Settlement, # 6 Exhibit Unredacted Smith Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time and Motion to Compel Settlement)(Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 3/12/2014) Modified on 3/13/2014 (ewn, COURT STAFF). (Attachment 3 replaced on 3/17/2014) (sp, COURT STAFF). (Attachment 4 replaced on 3/17/2014) (sp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/17/2014 (sp, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2014 Filing 91 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING APRIL 29, 2014 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Due to the court's unavailability, the 4/29/2014 Pretrial Conference is reset to 5/6/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2014)
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 5/6/2014 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 4, 2014. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 89 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference sessions held with Magistrate Judge Cousins on 2/26/2014 and 2/27/2014. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/27/2014)
February 20, 2014 Filing 88 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held on 2/14/2014 with Judge Cousins. Parties inform the Court settlement reached on 2/17/2014. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/20/2014)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER DENYING-AS-MOOT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND EX PARTE MOTION FOR SHORTENED TIME TO RECONSIDER AND/OR MODIFY THE DOCUMENT PRODUCTION DEADLINE by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 80 , denying-as-moot 81 and 83 , and granting 82 . (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 86 Declaration of Timothy L. Alger in Support of 82 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byFacebook Inc., Facebook Ireland Limited. (Related document(s) 82 ) (Alger, Timothy) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 85 RESPONSE (re 81 Ex Parte Application re 74 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Protective Order,, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 83 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of January 29, 2014 Discovery Order (Dkt#74) ) filed byFacebook Inc., Facebook Ireland Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Timothy L. Alger)(Alger, Timothy) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTES. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on February 10, 2014. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 7, 2014 Filing 83 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of January 29, 2014 Discovery Order (Dkt#74) filed by Christopher Claydon, Profile Technology, LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jared R Smith, # 2 Declaration of Christopher Claydon, # 3 Proposed Order)(Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 2/7/2014)
February 7, 2014 Filing 82 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Christopher Claydon, Profile Technology, LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jared R Smith, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Jared R Smith in Support of Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration)(Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 2/7/2014)
February 6, 2014 Filing 81 Ex Parte Application re 74 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Protective Order,, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Christopher Claydon, Profile Technology, LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jared R Smith, # 2 Declaration of Christopher Claydon, # 3 Proposed Order)(Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 2/6/2014)
February 5, 2014 Filing 80 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the Declaration of Allison B. Mull in Response to the Court's Order Re: Discovery Disputes (Dkt. 74) filed by Facebook Inc., Facebook Ireland Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Timothy L. Alger, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Unredacted Version of Mull Declaration)(Alger, Timothy) (Filed on 2/5/2014)
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting in part and denying in part 35 Motion to Dismiss (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2014)
January 30, 2014 Filing 78 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Facebook Inc., Facebook Ireland Limited for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Schwartz, Julie) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
January 30, 2014 Filing 77 Transcript of Proceedings held on 01/28/14, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/30/2014. (Related documents(s) 76 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
January 30, 2014 Filing 76 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Christopher Claydon, Profile Technology, LTD for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTES by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part 56 , 58 , 59 , and 71 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
January 28, 2014 Filing 75 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 1/28/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re 56 MOTION to Compel, 58 MOTION for Protective Order and 59 MOTION to Compel. The court denies Defendants' Motion to Compel. Facebook to submit a sworn declaration confirming that Facebook has not permitted other parties to retain scraped or spidered data past the termination of a license. The court takes remaining matters under submission; written order to be issued. (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/28/2014)
January 27, 2014 Filing 73 RESPONSE (re 58 MOTION for Protective Order From Discovery Related to "Search Engine Agreements", 56 MOTION to Compel FURTHER RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND DOCUMENT REQUESTS ) SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE filed byChristopher Claydon, Profile Technology, LTD. (Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 27, 2014 Filing 72 RESPONSE (re 59 MOTION to Compel Further Production from Defendants ) SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE filed byChristopher Claydon, Profile Technology, LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jared R Smith)(Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 27, 2014 Filing 71 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Christopher Claydon, Profile Technology, LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Redacted Document, # 4 Exhibit Unredacted Document)(Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 22, 2014 Filing 70 REPLY (re 58 MOTION for Protective Order From Discovery Related to "Search Engine Agreements" ) filed byFacebook Inc., Facebook Ireland Limited. (Alger, Timothy) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
January 22, 2014 Filing 69 REPLY (re 59 MOTION to Compel Further Production from Defendants ) filed byFacebook Inc., Facebook Ireland Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Timothy L. Alger, # 2 Exhibit A)(Alger, Timothy) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER - Settlement Conference set for 2/14/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 1/22/14. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
January 9, 2014 Filing 67 Minute Entry: Status held on 1/9/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re 56 , 57 , 58 and 59 : Parties to proceed with deposition of Mr. Claydon on 2/12/14 and 2/13/14 and settlement conference before Judge Cousins on 2/14/14. Mr. Claydon to submit sworn declaration if unable to attend for the court to consider whether to continue dates. Parties to continue with document production and interrogatory response. Pending motions (In Re: Dkt. Nos. 56 , 58 and 59 ) set for 1/28/14 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. The court will issue rulings from the bench. Parties approved to appear telephonically. The court modifies the case schedule as follows: Expert designations: 2/3/14; Discovery cut-off: 3/28/14; and Last day for dispositive motions: 4/8/14 at 10:00 a.m. Trial date to remain as calendared. The court is open to entertain a renewed request for a new trial date. (Court Reporter FTR: (11:33 to 11:56.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/9/2014)
January 8, 2014 Filing 66 RESPONSE (re 58 MOTION for Protective Order From Discovery Related to "Search Engine Agreements", 56 MOTION to Compel FURTHER RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND DOCUMENT REQUESTS ) REPLY (COMBINED) filed byChristopher Claydon, Profile Technology, LTD. (Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 1/8/2014)
January 8, 2014 Filing 65 RESPONSE (re 59 MOTION to Compel Further Production from Defendants ) filed byChristopher Claydon, Profile Technology, LTD. (Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 1/8/2014)
January 8, 2014 Filing 64 REPLY (re 57 Ex Parte Application FOR CONTINUANCE OR RE-SCHEDULING OF DATE FOR DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESSES; and REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO ADDRESS FURTHER RE-SCHEDULING ) filed byChristopher Claydon, Profile Technology, LTD. (Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 1/8/2014)
January 7, 2014 Filing 63 CLERK'S NOTICE RE COURT REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE NATHANAEL COUSINS FOR SETTLEMENT: The court refers this matter to Magistrate Judge Nathanael Cousins for Settlement. The parties are instructed to immediately contact Lili Harrell, Courtroom Deputy to Judge Cousins, at 415-522-2039 to schedule a date. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2014)
January 7, 2014 Filing 62 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING MOTIONS: Motions (In Re: Docket Nos. 56 , 57 , 58 and 59 ) set for 1/9/2014 at 11:30 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Parties requesting to appear telephonically are instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2014)
January 6, 2014 Filing 61 RESPONSE (re 57 Ex Parte Application FOR CONTINUANCE OR RE-SCHEDULING OF DATE FOR DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESSES; and REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO ADDRESS FURTHER RE-SCHEDULING ) Opposition to Ex Parte Motion for Continuance or Re-Scheduling of Date for Disclosure of Expert Witnesses and Request for Telephonic Case Management Conference to Address Further Re-Scheduling filed byFacebook Inc., Facebook Ireland Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Timothy L. Alger, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K)(Alger, Timothy) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
January 6, 2014 Filing 60 RESPONSE (re 56 MOTION to Compel FURTHER RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND DOCUMENT REQUESTS ) Opposition to Motion to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories, Set One and Requests for Production, Set One filed byFacebook Inc., Facebook Ireland Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Timothy L. Alger, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Proposed Order Denying Motion to Compel)(Alger, Timothy) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
January 3, 2014 Filing 59 MOTION to Compel Further Production from Defendants filed by Facebook Inc., Facebook Ireland Limited. Motion Hearing set for 2/11/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 1/17/2014. Replies due by 1/24/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Timothy L. Alger, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel)(Alger, Timothy) (Filed on 1/3/2014)
January 3, 2014 Filing 58 MOTION for Protective Order From Discovery Related to "Search Engine Agreements" filed by Facebook Inc., Facebook Ireland Limited. Motion Hearing set for 2/11/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 1/17/2014. Replies due by 1/24/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Timothy L. Alger, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Declaration of Yoav Zeevi, # 10 Proposed Order)(Alger, Timothy) (Filed on 1/3/2014)
January 2, 2014 Filing 57 Ex Parte Application FOR CONTINUANCE OR RE-SCHEDULING OF DATE FOR DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESSES; and REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO ADDRESS FURTHER RE-SCHEDULING filed by Christopher Claydon, Profile Technology, LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jared R Smith, # 2 Proposed Order)(Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
December 23, 2013 Filing 56 MOTION to Compel FURTHER RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND DOCUMENT REQUESTS filed by Profile Technology, LTD. Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 1/6/2014. Replies due by 1/13/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Proposed Order)(Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 12/23/2013)
December 20, 2013 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Erin Schwartz (Schwartz, Julie) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
November 27, 2013 Filing 54 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RE DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANTS 46 (Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
November 22, 2013 Filing 53 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/19/2013, before Judge Grewal. Court Reporter Irene L. Rodriguez, Telephone number (408)947-8160 Irene-Rodriguez@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/20/2014. (Related documents(s) 52 ) (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
November 19, 2013 Filing 52 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Christopher Claydon, Profile Technology, LTD for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 11/19/2013)
November 19, 2013 Filing 51 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 11/19/2013 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re 35 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims. The court takes matter under submission, written order after hearing to be issued. The court will issue an order referring case to a U.S. Magistrate Judge for Settlement Conference to occur no later than mid February. If parties are unable to timely schedule a settlement conference, parties are to proceed with mediation. (Court Reporter: Irene Rodriguez.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/19/2013)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR LITIGATION INVOLVING HIGHLY SENSITIVE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION AND/OR TRADE SECRETS by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 49 . (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
November 18, 2013 Filing 49 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR GENERAL PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR LITIGATION INVOLVING HIGHLY SENSITIVE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION AND/OR TRADE SECRETS filed by Christopher Claydon, Profile Technology, LTD. (Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
November 15, 2013 Filing 48 Declaration of Ira P Rothken in Support of 46 MOTION for Protective Order RE DEPOSITIONS OF DEFENDANTS filed byChristopher Claydon, Profile Technology, LTD. (Related document(s) 46 ) (Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
November 15, 2013 Filing 47 Declaration of Christopher Claydon in Support of 46 MOTION for Protective Order RE DEPOSITIONS OF DEFENDANTS CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [46-2] filed byChristopher Claydon, Profile Technology, LTD. (Related document(s) 46 ) (Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
November 14, 2013 Filing 46 MOTION for Protective Order RE DEPOSITIONS OF DEFENDANTS filed by Christopher Claydon, Profile Technology, LTD. Motion Hearing set for 1/7/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 12/2/2013. Replies due by 12/9/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Dec of Jared R Smith, # 2 Declaration Dec of Christopher Claydon, # 3 Proposed Order)(Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 11/14/2013)
November 14, 2013 Filing 45 Transcript of Proceedings held on 05/28/13, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/12/2014. (Related documents(s) 44 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 11/14/2013)
November 13, 2013 Filing 44 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Christopher Claydon, Profile Technology, LTD for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 11/13/2013)
October 29, 2013 Filing 43 REPLY (re 35 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims ) filed byFacebook Inc.. (Cutler, Joseph) (Filed on 10/29/2013)
October 2, 2013 Filing 42 STIPULATION CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANTS' COUNTERCLAIMS by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 40 . (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL AND CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES (MODIFIED) by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 39 . (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013)
October 2, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing re 41 : 2/25/2014 Pretrial Conference reset to 4/29/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. 3/10/2014 Jury Trial reset to 5/12/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013)
October 1, 2013 Filing 40 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANTS' COUNTERCLAIMS; [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Facebook Inc., Facebook Ireland Limited. (Alger, Timothy) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
October 1, 2013 Filing 39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL AND CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES filed by Facebook Inc., Facebook Ireland Limited. (Alger, Timothy) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
September 26, 2013 Filing 38 RESPONSE (re 35 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims ) filed byChristopher Claydon, Profile Technology, LTD. (Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 36 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 35 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims Responses due by 9/26/2013. Replies due by 10/3/2013. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2013)
September 9, 2013 Filing 36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 35 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims and Proposed Order filed by Christopher Claydon, Profile Technology, LTD. (Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 9/9/2013)
September 5, 2013 Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims filed by Facebook Inc., Facebook Ireland Limited. Motion Hearing set for 10/22/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 9/19/2013. Replies due by 9/26/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cutler, Joseph) (Filed on 9/5/2013)
August 29, 2013 Filing 34 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS FACEBOOK, INC. AND FACEBOOK IRELAND LIMITED TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' COUNTERCLAIMS filed by Facebook Inc., Facebook Ireland Limited. (Bali, Sunita) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
August 5, 2013 Filing 33 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Roes 1 through 100, COUNTERCLAIM against Facebook Inc., Facebook Ireland Limited byChristopher Claydon, Profile Technology, LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Third-Party Complaint)(Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 8/5/2013)
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 11 Motion to Dismiss (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2013)
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND ORDER, re 26 : The defendant's proposed schedule is adopted, as modified. Pretrial Conference set for 2/25/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Jury Trial set for 3/10/2014 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 7/19/2013. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2013)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 29 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
May 28, 2013 Filing 29 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Joseph P. Cutler ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7730884.) filed by Facebook Inc., Facebook Ireland Limited. (Cutler, Joseph) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
May 28, 2013 Filing 28 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing re 11 MOTION to Dismiss and Case Management Conference held on 5/28/2013 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal: Case management scheduling order to be issued. The Court takes matter under submission; written order after hearing to be issued. (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/28/2013)
May 21, 2013 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by HAH on 5/20/13. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2013)
May 17, 2013 Filing 27 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing and Case Management Conference, Reset Hearing as to 11 MOTION to Dismiss CLAIM OF FACEBOOK IRELAND, LIMITED FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION: 5/21/2013 Motion to Dismiss and Case Management Conference continued to 5/28/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
May 14, 2013 Filing 26 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Christopher Claydon, Profile Technology, LTD. (Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 5/14/2013)
May 10, 2013 ADR Remark: The ADR Phone Conference scheduled for 5/10/13 has been rescheduled to Monday, May 20, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. Pacific. The call-in information remains the same. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2013)
May 6, 2013 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Jared Robinson Smith for Defendants (Smith, Jared) (Filed on 5/6/2013)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES AND HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 23 . (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2013)
April 30, 2013 Filing 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 15 Clerks Notice, 11 MOTION to Dismiss CLAIM OF FACEBOOK IRELAND, LIMITED FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION CONTINUING HEARING DATE AND CMC DATE TO 5/21/2013 filed by Christopher Claydon, Profile Technology, LTD. (Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 4/30/2013)
April 30, 2013 Filing 22 ADR Clerk Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 5/10/13 at 11:00 a.m. Pacific. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2013)
April 24, 2013 Filing 21 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
April 1, 2013 Filing 20 REPLY (re 11 MOTION to Dismiss CLAIM OF FACEBOOK IRELAND, LIMITED FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION ) filed byChristopher Claydon, Profile Technology, LTD. (Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 4/1/2013)
March 28, 2013 Filing 19 Statement re 14 Notice (Other) STATEMENT OF PLAINTIFFS FACEBOOK, INC. AND FACEBOOK IRELAND LTD. OPPOSING DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF OTHER ACTION OR PROCEEDING by Facebook Inc., Facebook Ireland Limited. (Bali, Sunita) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
March 25, 2013 Filing 18 RESPONSE (re 11 MOTION to Dismiss CLAIM OF FACEBOOK IRELAND, LIMITED FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION ) OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS CLAIM OF FACEBOOK IRELAND FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION filed byFacebook Inc., Facebook Ireland Limited. (Alger, Timothy) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
March 18, 2013 Filing 17 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Facebook Inc., Facebook Ireland Limited.. (Alger, Timothy) (Filed on 3/18/2013)
March 15, 2013 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Christopher Claydon, Profile Technology, LTD.. (Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 3/15/2013)
March 12, 2013 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING 5/7/2013 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: 5/7/2013 Case Management Conference reset to 5/14/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2013)
March 11, 2013 Filing 14 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding by Christopher Claydon, Profile Technology, LTD (Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 3/11/2013) Modified on 3/12/2013 (tsh, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2013 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Profile Technology, LTD. (Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 3/11/2013) Modified on 3/12/2013 (tsh, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2013 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Parties by Christopher Claydon, Profile Technology, LTD (Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 3/11/2013) Modified on 3/12/2013 (tsh, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2013 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS CLAIM OF FACEBOOK IRELAND, LIMITED FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION BY DEFENDANTS PROFILE TECHNOLOGY, LTD AND CHRISTOPHER CLAYDON filed by Christopher Claydon, Profile Technology, LTD. Motion Hearing set for 5/14/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 3/25/2013. Replies due by 4/1/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit-Request for Judicial Notice, # 2 (Proposed) Order) (Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 3/11/2013) (tsh, COURT STAFF).
March 7, 2013 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING TIME ON 5/7/2013 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: 5/7/2013 2:00 PM Case Management Conference advanced to 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
February 27, 2013 Filing 9 STIPULATION re 1 Complaint, 5 Summons Issued EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND PURSUANT TO LR 6-1(a) filed by Christopher Claydon, Profile Technology, LTD. (Rothken, Ira) (Filed on 2/27/2013)
February 25, 2013 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook Inc., Facebook Ireland Limited re 1 Complaint, 2 Certificate of Interested Entities, 4 Notice (Other), 3 Statement, 5 Summons Issued PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, ETC. ON DEFENDANT PROFILE TECHNOLOGY, LTD. (Bali, Sunita) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
February 25, 2013 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook Inc., Facebook Ireland Limited re 1 Complaint, 2 Certificate of Interested Entities, 4 Notice (Other), 3 Statement, 5 Summons Issued PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, ETC. ON DEFENDANT CHRISTOPHER CLAYTON (Bali, Sunita) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
February 1, 2013 Filing 6 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 4/30/2013. Case Management Conference set for 5/7/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(gmS, ) (Filed on 2/1/2013)
February 1, 2013 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Christopher Claydon, Profile Technology, LTD. (gmS, ) (Filed on 2/1/2013)
February 1, 2013 Filing 4 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding by Facebook Inc., Facebook Ireland Limited (gmS, ) (Filed on 2/1/2013)
February 1, 2013 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by Facebook Inc., Facebook Ireland Limited. (gmS, ) (Filed on 2/1/2013)
February 1, 2013 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Facebook Inc., Facebook Ireland Limited (gmS, ) (Filed on 2/1/2013)
February 1, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; against Christopher Claydon, Profile Technology, LTD ( Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 34611082845.). Filed byFacebook Ireland Limited, Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(gmS, ) (Filed on 2/1/2013)
February 1, 2013 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (gmS, ) (Filed on 2/1/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Facebook Inc. et al v. Profile Technology, LTD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Facebook Inc.
Represented By: Timothy L. Alger
Represented By: Sunita B Bali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Facebook Ireland Limited
Represented By: Timothy L. Alger
Represented By: Sunita B Bali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Profile Technology, LTD
Represented By: Ira P. Rothken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Claydon
Represented By: Ira P. Rothken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?