Umamoto et al v. Insphere Insurance Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Greg Umamoto and Shirley Umamoto
Defendant: Insphere Insurance Solutions, Inc., Healthmarkets, Inc., The Blackstone Group LP, Goldman Sachs Capital Partners, Katherine Feeny, Kenneth Fasola, Kent Schooler and DLJ Merchant Banking Partners
Case Number: 5:2013cv00475
Filed: February 4, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 17 Motion to Remand; finding as moot 8 Motion to Dismiss (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2013)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh denying 3 Motion to Relate Case.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2013)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on February 28, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2013)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Umamoto et al v. Insphere Insurance Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Umamoto
Represented By: Bradley J. Mancuso
Represented By: Lawrance A. Bohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Umamoto
Represented By: Bradley J. Mancuso
Represented By: Lawrance A. Bohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insphere Insurance Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Salvatore Picariello
Represented By: Paulo Byron McKeeby
Represented By: Kathryn T McGuigan
Represented By: Barbara Ann Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthmarkets, Inc.
Represented By: Salvatore Picariello
Represented By: Paulo Byron McKeeby
Represented By: Kathryn T McGuigan
Represented By: Barbara Ann Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Blackstone Group LP
Represented By: Salvatore Picariello
Represented By: Paulo Byron McKeeby
Represented By: Kathryn T McGuigan
Represented By: Barbara Ann Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs Capital Partners
Represented By: Salvatore Picariello
Represented By: Paulo Byron McKeeby
Represented By: Kathryn T McGuigan
Represented By: Barbara Ann Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Feeny
Represented By: Barbara Ann Fitzgerald
Represented By: Kathryn T McGuigan
Represented By: Paulo Byron McKeeby
Represented By: Salvatore Picariello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Fasola
Represented By: Barbara Ann Fitzgerald
Represented By: Kathryn T McGuigan
Represented By: Paulo Byron McKeeby
Represented By: Salvatore Picariello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent Schooler
Represented By: Barbara Ann Fitzgerald
Represented By: Kathryn T McGuigan
Represented By: Paulo Byron McKeeby
Represented By: Salvatore Picariello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DLJ Merchant Banking Partners
Represented By: Kathryn T McGuigan
Represented By: Barbara Ann Fitzgerald
Represented By: Paulo Byron McKeeby
Represented By: Salvatore Picariello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?