Calkins v. Google, Inc. et al. Featured Case

Plaintiff: David F. Calkins
Defendant: Google, Inc. and Teletech Services Corporation
Case Number: 5:2013cv00760
Filed: February 20, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 28, 2013 8 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION CONCERNING TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 6 . (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2013)
February 27, 2013 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Teletech Services Corporation re 6 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Lewis, Justin) (Filed on 2/27/2013)
February 27, 2013 6 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Teletech Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation)(Lewis, Justin) (Filed on 2/27/2013)
February 22, 2013 5 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RE COURT DEADLINE FOR PARTIES TO EITHER CONSENT OR DECLINE TO PROCEED BEFORE A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: 5/28/2013 Case Management Conference reset to 3/19/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/12/2013. Each party who has not already done so shall file either a Consent or Declination to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge no later than 3/12/2013. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2013)
February 20, 2013 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (gmS, ) (Filed on 2/20/2013)
February 20, 2013 4 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 5/21/2013. Case Management Conference set for 5/28/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(gmS, ) (Filed on 2/20/2013)
February 20, 2013 3 Disclosure Statement by Teletech Services Corporation. (gmS, ) (Filed on 2/20/2013)
February 20, 2013 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Teletech Services Corporation (gmS, ) (Filed on 2/20/2013)
February 20, 2013 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara. Their case number is 112-CV218874. (Filing fee $350.00 receipt number 54611013234). Filed byTeletech Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Civil Cover Sheet)(gmS, ) (Filed on 2/20/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calkins v. Google, Inc. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David F. Calkins
Represented By: Gregory N. Karasik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: Whitty Somvichian
Represented By: Abigail E Pringle
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teletech Services Corporation
Represented By: Justin Daniel Lewis
Represented By: Miles D. Scully
Represented By: Allison Feldman Borts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.