Reyes et al v. Nationstar Mortgage Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Martin Reyes and Doreen Reyes
Defendant: Aurora Loan Services, LLC, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, Nationstar Mortgage Holdings, Inc. and Aurora Bank, FSB
Case Number: 5:2013cv00854
Filed: February 25, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Order Directing Parties to File Joint Case Management Statement. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/6/2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on October 21, 2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2013)
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER TO FILE STATEMENT REGARDING MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on August 7, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2013)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 12 Stipulation (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2013)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER That Case Be Reassigned to a District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/22/2013. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Referring Case to ADR Unit for Assessment Telephone Conference. Conference to be held no later than 3/29/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/27/2013. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reyes et al v. Nationstar Mortgage Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Loan Services, LLC
Represented By: Alex Sears
Represented By: Mary Kate Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: Mary Kate Sullivan
Represented By: Alex Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Mary Kate Sullivan
Represented By: Alex Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Bank, FSB
Represented By: Mary Kate Sullivan
Represented By: Alex Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Reyes
Represented By: Timothy Andrew Pupach
Represented By: Michael Avramidis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doreen Reyes
Represented By: Timothy Andrew Pupach
Represented By: Michael Avramidis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?