Colaco et al v. The Asic Advantage Simplefied Employee Pension Plan et al

Plaintiff: Stephen Colaco, Tom Gammon, Srivalli Chandra, Donald Humbert, Terry Jones, Quy Lau, David Lichtenstein, Sina Ma, Michael Mullen, Trinh Nguyen, Amaaduddin Quraishi, David Robertson, Stephen Thomas, Nhan Tran and Moddy Wong
Defendant: The Asic Advantage Simplefied Employee Pension Plan, Asic Advantage Inc. and Microsemi Corporation
Case Number: 5:2013cv00972
Filed: March 4, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 18, 2016 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/18/2016. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2016)
February 4, 2016 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal denying 90 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
September 24, 2015 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part and denying-in-part 53 ; denying 55 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2015)
August 10, 2015 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL AND DENYING MOTION FOR SANCTIONS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part and denying-in-part 48 ; denying 50 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2015)
January 6, 2015 46 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on January 6, 2015 re 44 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2015)
July 18, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL AND DENYING DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 28 Motion to Compel; denying 29 Motion for Sanctions (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2014)
September 26, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART AND DENYING-IN-PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting in part and denying in part 9 Motion to Dismiss (psglc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colaco et al v. The Asic Advantage Simplefied Employee Pension Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Colaco
Represented By: Kathryn C. Curry
Represented By: Tracy Minna Tierney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Gammon
Represented By: Kathryn C. Curry
Represented By: Tracy Minna Tierney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Srivalli Chandra
Represented By: Kathryn C. Curry
Represented By: Tracy Minna Tierney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Humbert
Represented By: Kathryn C. Curry
Represented By: Tracy Minna Tierney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Jones
Represented By: Kathryn C. Curry
Represented By: Tracy Minna Tierney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quy Lau
Represented By: Kathryn C. Curry
Represented By: Tracy Minna Tierney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lichtenstein
Represented By: Kathryn C. Curry
Represented By: Tracy Minna Tierney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sina Ma
Represented By: Kathryn C. Curry
Represented By: Tracy Minna Tierney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Mullen
Represented By: Kathryn C. Curry
Represented By: Tracy Minna Tierney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trinh Nguyen
Represented By: Kathryn C. Curry
Represented By: Tracy Minna Tierney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amaaduddin Quraishi
Represented By: Kathryn C. Curry
Represented By: Tracy Minna Tierney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Robertson
Represented By: Kathryn C. Curry
Represented By: Tracy Minna Tierney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Thomas
Represented By: Kathryn C. Curry
Represented By: Tracy Minna Tierney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nhan Tran
Represented By: Kathryn C. Curry
Represented By: Tracy Minna Tierney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moddy Wong
Represented By: Kathryn C. Curry
Represented By: Tracy Minna Tierney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Asic Advantage Simplefied Employee Pension Plan
Represented By: Evan Mitchell Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asic Advantage Inc.
Represented By: Evan Mitchell Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsemi Corporation
Represented By: Evan Mitchell Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?