GSI Technology, Inc. v. United Memories, Inc.
Plaintiff: GSI Technology, Inc.
Defendant: United Memories, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2013cv01081
Filed: March 8, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1121 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 1065 ; denying 1074 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2016)
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1116 ORDER RE: PARTIES' STIPULATION TO VACATE HEARING. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 11, 2016, re 1115 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2016)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1114 NOTICE OF INTENT TO WITHDRAW AND MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR DEFENDANT UNITED MEMORIES, INC.; ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW, signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 10, 2016, re 1113 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2016)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1112 ORDER RE: ORAL ARGUMENT. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 9, 2016, re 1062 , 1065 , 1071 , 1072 , 1073 , 1074 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2016)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1109 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SEAL by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting 1102 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2016)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1078 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART MOTION TO SEAL by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting-in-part and denying-in-part 1064 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2015)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1050 AMENDED FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS NOS. 26.1, 26.2. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on November 25, 2015. (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2015)
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1047 AMENDED FINAL JURY INSTRUCTION NO. 33. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on November 23, 2015. (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2015)
November 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1044 JURY VERDICT FORM. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on November 22, 2015. (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2015)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1023 [PROPOSED] JURY VERDICT FORM. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on November 19, 2015. (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2015)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1018 [PROPOSED] FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on November 18, 2015. (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2015)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 990 ORDER RE: LIMITING INSTRUCTION. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on November 10, 2015. (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 980 ORDER RE: MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 956 ; granting-in-part and denying-in-part 961 ; denying 968 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2015)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 953 ORDER RE: OPENING STATEMENT MATERIALS. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on October 26, 2015, re 946 , 948 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2015)
October 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 945 ORDER RE: MOTION TO SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part and denying-in-part 928 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2015)
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 936 ORDER GRANTING USE OF ELECTRONIC AND RELATED EQUIPMENT IN COURTROOM FOR TRIAL, granting 933 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 10/22/2015. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2015)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 917 PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on October 21, 2015. (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2015)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 914 ORDER AUTHORIZING USE OF ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT IN COURTROOM FOR TRIAL, granting 912 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 10/20/2015. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2015)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 911 ORDER AUTHORIZING USE OF AUDIO/VISUAL EQUIPMENT IN COURTROOM FOR TRIAL COMMENCING ON OCTOBER 26, 2015, granting 910 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 10/19/2015. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 896 OMNIBUS ORDER RE: MOTIONS IN LIMINE AND OTHER PRE-TRIAL ISSUES by Judge Paul S. Grewal, denying 769 ; denying 770 ; denying 771 ; denying 772 ; denying 773 ; denying 778 ; denying 779 ; denying 780 ; denying 781 ; granting 782 ; granting-in-part and denying-in-part 785 ; denying 787 ; granting-in-part and denying-in-part 789 ; granting-in-part and denying-in-part 791 ; granting-in-part and denying-in-part 816 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2015)
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 891 ORDER RE: MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part and denying-in-part 859 ; granting 866 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2015)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 862 OMNIBUS ORDER RE: MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 814 ; denying 835 ; denying 839 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2015)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 849 OMNIBUS ORDER RE: MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal, denying 768 ; granting-in-part and denying-in-part 777 ; granting-in-part and denying-in-part 784 ; granting-in-part and denying-in-part 791 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2015)
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 807 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, GRANTING-IN-PART MOTIONS TO STRIKE, DENYING MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AND GRANTING-IN-PART MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part and denying-in-part 561 ; denying 563 ; denying 564 ; granting-in-part and denying-in-part 566 ; denying 632 ; granting 650 ; denying 723 ; granting-in-part and denying-in-part 726 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2015)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 740 ORDER RE: MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting in part and denying in part 623 ; granting in part and denying in part 626 ; granting in part and denying in part 629 ; granting in part and denying in part 654 ; granting 657 ; gra nting in part and denying in part 658 ; granting in part and denying in part 662 ; denying 665 ; granting in part and denying in part 669 ; granting in part and denying in part 674 ; granting in part and denying in part 697 ; granting in part and denying in part 702 ; granting 710 ; granting in part and denying in part 722 ; granting in part and denying in part 727 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2015)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 717 ORDER DENYING GSI'S MOTION FOR LEAVE AND TO AMEND, UMI'S MOTION FOR LEAVE OR CLARIFICATION AND UMI'S MOTION FOR EMERGENCY RELIEF AND PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 554 ; denying 619 ; denying 705 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2015)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 680 ORDER AUTHORIZING USE OF AUDIO VISUAL EQUIPMENT IN COURTROOM FOR JUNE 30, 2015 HEARING, granting 678 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 6/29/2015. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2015)
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 652 OMNIBUS ORDER RE: MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 513 ; granting in part and denying in part 521 ; granting in part and denying in part 523 ; granting in part and denying in part 527 ; granting in part and denying in part [5 46]; granting in part and denying in part 556 ; granting in part and denying in part 560 ; granting in part and denying in part 563 ; granting in part and denying in part 568 ; granting in part and denying in part 570 ; denying 587 ; granting in part and denying in part 594 ; granting in part and denying in part 614 ; granting in part and denying in part 618 ; granting in part and denying in part 636 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2015)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 643 OMNIBUS ORDER RE: MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 464 ; granting in part and denying in part 471 ; denying 476 ; granting in part and denying in part 479 ; granting in part and denying in part 484 ; granting in part and denying in part 486 ; granting in part and denying in part 487 ; granting in part and denying in part 490 ; denying 492 ; granting in part and denying in part 504 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2015)
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 617 ORDER DENYING UMI'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION re 609 Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on June 18, 2015 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2015)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 610 ORDER RE: UMI'S REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on June 16, 2015 re 609 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2015)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 601 OMNIBUS ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTES by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part and denying-in-part 468 ; granting-in-part and denying-in-part 469 ; granting-in-part and denying-in-part 471 ; granting-in-part and denying-in-part 473 ; granting-in-part and denying-in-part 475 ; granting-in-part and denying-in-part 478 ; denying 481 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2015)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 553 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART ISSI'S MOTIONS FOR ADDITIONAL PAGES AND EXTENSION OF TIME by Judge Paul S. Grewal, re 509 and 536 . Amending Order at ECF No. 552 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 5/19/2015. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2015)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 458 ORDER RE: MOTION TO SEAL by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal denying 451 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2015)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 450 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal denying 320 (psglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2015)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 411 ORDER RE: MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting in part and denying in part 375 ; denying 381 ; denying 384 ; denying 389 ; granting in part and denying in part 391 ; denying 403 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDE RE: MOTION TO SEAL by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting-in-part and denying-in-part 352 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2015)
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER: MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting in part and denying in part 337 ; granting 330 ; granting 324 ; granting in part and denying in part 321 ; granting in part and denying in part 318 ; granting 316 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2015).
August 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTES by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 248 Discovery Letter Brief; granting 250 Discovery Letter Brief; granting 251 Discovery Letter Brief; granting 252 Discovery Letter Brief; granting 253 Discovery Letter Brief; granting 254 Discovery Letter Brief; denying 255 Motion to Compel (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2014)
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal denying 269 Stipulation.(psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2014)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 233 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 235 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 237 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2014)
April 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting in part and denying in part 206 Motion to Dismiss and 207 Motion to Dismiss (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2014)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DECLARATION re 185 Declaration in Support,, filed by GSI Technology, Inc. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grwal on October 2, 2013. (psglc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER REGARDING REDACTIONS TO TRANSCRIPT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on July 15, 2013. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2013)
July 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER RE: ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL 95 133 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on July 11, 2013. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2013)
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER GRANTING 91 MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME TO HEAR MOTION TO STRIKE. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on June 25, 2013. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 AMENDED ORDER RE HEARING FOR MOTIONS TO COMPEL re 63 granting 71 . amendment to 74 Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on May 30, 2013. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013) Modified text on 5/30/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART MOTION TO COMPEL THIRD PARTY by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting in part and denying in part 46 Motion to Compel (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO ENTER PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 38 Motion for Protective Order; granting 39 Motion for Protective Order (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2013)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR (1) TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; (2) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; AND (3) EXPEDITED DISCOVERY IN THE ALTERNATIVE by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting in part and denying in part 9 Ex Parte Application (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 27, 2013. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GSI Technology, Inc. v. United Memories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GSI Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher James Beal
Represented By: Rajiv Sajjan Dharnidharka
Represented By: Veronica Lynn Jackson
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Shohet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Memories, Inc.
Represented By: Korula T. Cherian
Represented By: Sarah Minchener Jalali
Represented By: Constance Faye Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?