Ardalan v. McHugh et al
Plaintiff: Ferial Karen Ardalan
Defendant: John McHugh, Sam Farr and Carlton Hadden
Case Number: 5:2013cv01138
Filed: March 14, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER DENYING 108 Letter Request to Dismiss This Action Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/15/2015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2015)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 104 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 1. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2015)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 103 CASE MANAGMENT ORDER re 102 Further Case Management Conference, Fact Discovery Cut-Off 08/28/2015. Designation of Opening Experts and Reports 09/25/2015, Designation of Rebuttal Experts and Reports 11/20/2015, Expert Discovery Cut-Off 12/18/2 015, Last Day to Hear Dispositive Motions set for 01/14/2016 at 9:00 am, Final Pretrial Conference set for 03/03/2016 at 22:30 pm, Trial set for 05/16/2016 at 9:00 am. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 04/09/2015. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2015)
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Order by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman denying 79 Motion to Dismiss and further denying 78 motion for leave to file a motion for reconsideration. The parties are HEREBY ORDERED to appear for a case management conference at 1:30 p.m. on April 9, 2015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2015)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER by Judge Beth Labson Freeman granting 54 Motion to Dismiss; denying 63 Motion for Leave to File; denying 63 Motion for Equitable Estoppel and Equitable Tolling. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2014)
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 6/12/2014 11:00 AM. Motion for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint and Motion for Equitable Estopell and Tolling the Statute of Limitation Hearing set for 7/24/2014 11:00 AM. ( 63 ). All hearings to be held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman Courtroom #3, 5th Floor 280 South First Street San Jose, CA 95113. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 05/09/2014. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Case Management Conference set for 5/6/2014 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 04/21/2014. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Judge Lucy Koh denying 38 Motion for Default Judgment; granting 16 Motion to Dismiss; granting 24 Motion to Dismiss; (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ardalan v. McHugh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ferial Karen Ardalan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McHugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Farr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlton Hadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?