July 6, 2020 |
Filing
105
Order denying 91 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on July 6, 2020.(ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2020)
|
April 1, 2020 |
Filing
95
Order Denying 93 Plaintiffs' Motion To Stay Pending Federal Circuit Appeal. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/1/2020. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2020)
|
January 29, 2020 |
Filing
82
Order granting 78 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on January 29, 2020.The Clerk shall close the file.(ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2020)
|
October 15, 2019 |
Filing
74
ORDER granting 71 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 73 Motion for Leave to File without prejudice. Defendant EMC is instructed to meet and confer with Defendants Facebook and Google/YouTube pursuant to this Court's October 10, 2019 Order. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on October 15, 2019. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2019)
|
September 10, 2019 |
Filing
66
Order granting 65 Motion for Summary Judgment on Count 1 and Count 2 of the Amended Complaint with respect to U.S. Patent No. 5,978,791, U.S. Patent No. 6,415,280, U.S. Patent No. 7,945,544, U.S. Patent No. 7,945,539, U.S. Patent No. 7,949,662, and U.S. Patent No. 8,001,096. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/10/2019. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
|
January 13, 2014 |
Filing
41
ORDER GRANTING 8 Motion to Stay. The clerk shall ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE these files. The clerk shall ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE these files. These actions are STAYED in their entirety pending final exhaustion of the relevant review proceedings, incl uding any appeals. This order does not preclude any party from moving to reopen this action, when appropriate. Each defendant in each case shall file, on or before January 20, 2013, a notice indicating their consent or declination to be bound by the above-described estoppel limitations. The notice shall not exceed one page in length. Defendants are hereby notified that, absent full consent, the court may sua sponte reconsider this Order. The parties in each case shall submit a joint status repor t apprising the court of the status of the relevant review proceedings on July 13, 2014, and every six months thereafter. These reports shall be filed as separate docket entries on ECF/PACER. The parties in each case shall provide notice to the court within one week of final exhaustion of all relevant review proceedings, including appeals. In their notice, the parties shall request that this matter be reopened, and that a case management conference be scheduled. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on January 13, 2014. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2014) Modified on 1/13/2014 (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF). Modified text on 1/13/2014 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
|
October 28, 2013 |
Filing
30
ORDER DENYING 28 Amended MOTION For Administrative Relief Seeking Leave to Supplement The Record On Defendants' Motion To Stay re 8 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review MOTION for Leave to File filed by EMC Corporation, VMware, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/28/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
|
September 26, 2013 |
Filing
25
ORDER CONTINUING/SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The court advises the parties in each case that date of the Case Management Conference will not be modified further. Requests to change or continue the date of the conference will not be cons idered and should not be filed. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/25/2013. Case Management Conference set for 11/1/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/26/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
|
March 29, 2013 |
Filing
2
ORDER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/29/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2013)
|