523 Burlingame Ave., LLC v. Tapang

Miscellaneous: USBC Manager-San Jose and Judge Arthur S. Weissbrodt
Appellant: 523 Burlingame Ave., LLC
Appellee: Esterlita Cortes Tapang
Case Number: 5:2013cv01714
Filed: April 16, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BAP)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 21, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 5/7/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 04/21/2014. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
May 9, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Defendant to file Request to Consider Appellee's Brief ( 29 ) with Declaration. Plaintiff withdraws the Motion to Strike ( 30 ). Plaintiff to submit Reply to Appellee's Brief on or before 05/14/2014. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 05/09/2014. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 15, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER ReModification of Briefing Schedule on Appeal re 3 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by 523 Burlingame Ave., LLC. Appellant shall file and serve, by e-mail or hand delivery, its opening brief on or before M ay 24, 2013;Appellee shall file and serve, by e-mail or hand delivery, her response brief 21 days after service of Appellants opening brief; and Appellant shall file and serve, by e-mail or hand delivery, its reply brief 14 days after service of Appellee's response brief. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/15/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
July 11, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 7/11/2014. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 523 Burlingame Ave., LLC v. Tapang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: USBC Manager-San Jose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Judge Arthur S. Weissbrodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: 523 Burlingame Ave., LLC
Represented By: David Marvin Wiseblood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Esterlita Cortes Tapang
Represented By: Francisco Javier Aldana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.