Chavez v. PVH Corporation

Plaintiff: Jessie Chavez
Defendant: PVH Corporation
Case Number: 5:2013cv01797
Filed: April 19, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 28, 2015 212 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/28/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2015)
December 18, 2015 209 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy Koh granting 164 Motion for Settlement; granting 163 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 202 Ex Parte Motion to Intervene (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2015)
August 6, 2015 161 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy Koh granting 144 Motion for Settlement (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2015)
July 9, 2015 151 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO FILE PROPOSED CLAIM FORM AND NOTICE PACKET. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/9/2015. (lhklc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2015)
February 13, 2015 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 2/13/2015. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2015)
February 11, 2015 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy Koh denying 128 Motion for Leave to File (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2015)
January 16, 2015 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 1/16/2015. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2015)
November 20, 2014 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 77 Motion to Intervene; granting in part and denying in part 99 Motion for Leave to File (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2014)
November 19, 2014 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION AND VACATING CASE SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 11/19/2014. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2014)
September 12, 2014 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2014)
September 11, 2014 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE A JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2014)
June 20, 2014 62 Opinion or Order of the Court <CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 6/20/2014. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2014)
January 3, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER (MODIFIED BY THE COURT) re 30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Protective Order filed by PVH Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/3/2014. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014)
January 2, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO FILE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 1/2/2014. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
October 31, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ordering parties to file joint case management statement. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 10/31/2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2013)
August 6, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 23 Notice (Other) filed by Jessie Chavez. Counsel to contact Court Call to arrange. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/6/13. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2013)
July 30, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY re 18 Notice (Other) filed by PVH Corporation. Counsel to arrange through CourtCall. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/30/13. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chavez v. PVH Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie Chavez
Represented By: Daniel Hyo-Shik Chang
Represented By: Larry W Lee
Represented By: William Lucas Marder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PVH Corporation
Represented By: Asheley Greshaune Dean
Represented By: Dean Hansell
Represented By: Rachel A Patta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?