Fiteq Inc v. Venture Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Fiteq Inc
Defendant: Venture Corporation and Cebelian Holding PTE, LTD
Case Number: 5:2013cv01946
Filed: April 29, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2016 453 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 431 PLAINTIFF FITEQ, INC.'S MOTION TO REOPEN DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/17/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
September 26, 2016 443 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 439 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/26/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2016)
August 9, 2016 428 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge Beth L. Freeman denying 352 ; denying 355 . (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2016)
June 17, 2016 422 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 421 NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2016)
June 3, 2016 417 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND JURY INSTRUCTION CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2016)
May 13, 2016 414 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING JURY INSTRUCTION CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/13/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 5, 2016 413 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING TRIAL DATES AND DENYING 409 412 PARTIES' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS FOR ORDER PERMITTING USE OF ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT IN COURTROOM AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/5/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
May 3, 2016 410 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING JURY INSTRUCTION CONFERENCE TO MAY 19, 2016 AT 2:00 P.M. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2016)
April 28, 2016 406 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING 356 358 360 361 362 363 364 365 366 367 394 MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2016)
March 17, 2016 354 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/17/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 14, 2016 351 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 313 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
February 22, 2016 350 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 305 MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY ABOUT FITEQ'S ALLEGED LOST PROFITS AND VALUATION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2016)
October 23, 2015 324 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 315 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2015)
September 17, 2015 304 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 303 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME IN WHICH TO FILE OPPOSITION AND REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY. Motions due by 9/17/2015. Replies due by 11/3/2015. Responses due by 10/20/2015. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 09/17/2015. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2015)
August 27, 2015 293 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 229 ; denying 273 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2015)
July 15, 2015 290 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal denying 272 (psglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2015)
June 30, 2015 289 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Beth Labson Freeman granting 199 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2015)
June 11, 2015 284 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Converting Defendant's motion for leave into an administrative motion. Plaintiff shall have until June 14 to file a response, consistent with Civil Local Rule 7-11. Defendant shall not be permitted a reply. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/11/2015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2015)
April 27, 2015 278 Opinion or Order of the Court REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE PURSUANT TO THE HAGUE CONVENTION OF 18 MARCH 1970 ON THE TAKING OF EVIDENCE ABROAD IN CIVIL OR COMMERCIAL MATTERS, re 210 . (French). Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 4/27/2015. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2015)
March 31, 2015 257 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE AND REFERRING DISCOVERY DISPUTES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/31/2015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2015)
March 12, 2015 233 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/12/2015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
March 4, 2015 226 Opinion or Order of the Court TENTATIVE RULINGS re 214 Status Report. The parties shall appear for a telephonic conference on March 10, 2015 at 5:00 p.m. to discuss the Court's tentative rulings regarding the parties' disputes over the re-opening of fact discovery and to set all remaining dates. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/4/2015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2015)
February 10, 2015 203 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman granting 198 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2015)
January 16, 2015 194 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman denying 165 Motion to Exclude Evidence. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2015)
August 5, 2014 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DISCOVERY by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part 103 and 105 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2014)
October 16, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING FITEQ'S MOTION TO COMPEL AND GRANTING VENTURE'S MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part 45 , denying 46 , and granting 48 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fiteq Inc v. Venture Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fiteq Inc
Represented By: Darrell Rae Atkinson
Represented By: Spencer Hosie
Represented By: Diane Sue Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Venture Corporation
Represented By: Sid M. Leach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cebelian Holding PTE, LTD
Represented By: Sid M. Leach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?