Pittman v. County of San Francisco et al
Plaintiff: Alfred Fred Pittman
Defendant: County of San Francisco and Michael Hennessey
Case Number: 5:2013cv02095
Filed: May 8, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Presiding Judge: PSLC HHL
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding. Case Settled. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 4/12/2017. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2017)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER. Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/11/2015 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 7/28/2015. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2015)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding. Matter not settled. Parties to report back to Judge Vadas within two weeks of settlement conference. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 7/7/15. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2015)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for presence of Plaintiff at settlement conference. Signed by Judge Nandor Vadas on 5/7/2015. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2015)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Vacating Writ. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 3/18/2015. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2015)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for presence of Plaintiff at settlement conference. Signed by Judge Nandor Vadas on 2/23/2015. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2015)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF SERVICE; DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTION OR NOTICE REGARDING SUCH MOTION; INSTRUCTIONS TO CLERK. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, a copy of the complaint , (Docket Nos. 1 & 2), all attachments thereto, and a copy of this order upon Defendants Michael Hennessey, Deputy O'Conner, and Deputy Lee at the San Francisco County Sheriff's Department (Sheriff's Department, City Hall, Room 456), 1 Dr. Carlton B. Goodlett Place, San Francisco, CA 94102). The Clerk shall also mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff. The Clerk shall terminate the County of San Francisco, the San Francisco County Sheriff's Department and John and Jane Does 1 through 10 from this action. County of San Francisco terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/20/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pittman v. County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Fred Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Hennessey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?