Enki Corporation v. Freedman et al

Plaintiff: Enki Corporation
Defendant: Keith Freedman, Freeform Technologies, LLC and Zuora, Inc
Case Number: 5:2013cv02201
Filed: May 14, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 70 CASE SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 4, 2015 re 68 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2015)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on January 28, 2015 re 65 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2015)
December 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION AS MODIFIED. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on December 30, 2014 re 62 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2014)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART MOTION TO DISMISS by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting in part and denying in part 32 Motion to Dismiss. (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2014)
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING 13 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on August 9, 2013. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Enki Corporation v. Freedman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enki Corporation
Represented By: David T. Feuerstein
Represented By: Jessica Natbony
Represented By: David Robert Shraga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Freedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freeform Technologies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zuora, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?