Fortinet Inc. v. FireEye Inc.

Plaintiff: Fortinet Inc.
Defendant: FireEye Inc.
Case Number: 5:2013cv02496
Filed: June 5, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 22, 2015 222 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 221 Stipulation for Dismissal of State Law Claims with Prejudice and of Patent Claims without Prejudice. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2015)
September 15, 2015 216 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 212 Motion to Change Case Management Schedule : Discovery due by 12/23/2015. Motions due by 1/22/2016. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 9/15/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2015)
September 1, 2015 195 Opinion or Order of the Court CORRECTED 192 ORDER Granting 185 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR SHORTENED TIME TO HEAR FIREEYE, INC.S 184 MOTION TO AMEND THE CASE SCHEDULE FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF SERVING THIRD PARTY SUBPOENAS TO FORTINET CUSTOMERS. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 9/1/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2015)
August 31, 2015 181 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 100 Notice. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 8/31/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2015)
August 25, 2015 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 171 Motion to Take Deposition from MR. SHAOHONG WEI After the Close of Fact Discovery. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2015)
August 24, 2015 167 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 166 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2015)
August 20, 2015 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 161 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2015)
August 13, 2015 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 151 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2015)
August 4, 2015 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING FIREEYE, INC.S UNOPPOSED 140 MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME TO HEAR FIREEYES 139 MOTION TO AMEND THE CASE SCHEDULE. Responses due by 8/10/2015; Motion Hearing set for 8/11/2015 02:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 8/4/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2015)
July 9, 2015 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Giiliam, Jr. Granting 120 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2015)
February 10, 2015 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 83 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING PROPOSED AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS filed by FireEye Inc. The amended answer shall be filed as a separate docket item forthwith. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/10/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2015)
October 30, 2014 73 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING 72 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending the Deadline to Respond to Second Amended Complaint filed by FireEye Inc. Response due 11/21/2014. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/30/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2014)
September 30, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 45 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff has leave to amend and can file its second amended complaint no later than 15 days from the date of this order. A case management conference is scheduled for 10:00 a.m. on 12/05/2014. Parties shall file a joint case management conference statement on or before 11/26/2014. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 09/30/2014. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
September 24, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Court shall set a Case Management Conference, if necessary, in its forthcoming order on Defendant's Motion to dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. ***9/27/2013 CMC Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/24/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fortinet Inc. v. FireEye Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fortinet Inc.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: William Owen Cooper
Represented By: Michael J. Flynn
Represented By: John M. Neukom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FireEye Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Bettinger
Represented By: David Shane Brun
Represented By: Francis DiGiovanni
Represented By: Meghana Chandrakant RaoRane
Represented By: Eric C. Rusnak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?