Gametek LLC v. Zynga Inc.
Plaintiff: |
Gametek LLC |
Defendant: |
Zynga Inc |
Case Number: |
5:2013cv02546 |
Filed: |
June 6, 2013 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California |
Office: |
San Francisco Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Richard Seeborg |
Nature of Suit: |
Patent |
Cause of Action: |
35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 2, 2014 |
Filing
116
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR ATTORNEY FEES by Judge Richard Seeborg denying (94) Motion for Attorney Fees; granting (95) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting (107) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting (110) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 3:13-cv-02546-RS; granting (94) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying (95) Motion for Attorney Fees; granting (108) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting (110) Admin istrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 3:13-cv-03089-RS; denying (98) Motion for Attorney Fees; granting (99) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting (108) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting (111) Administrative Mo tion to File Under Seal in case 3:13-cv-03472-RS; granting (77) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying (78) Motion for Attorney Fees; granting (91) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting (93) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 3:13-cv-03493-RS (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2014) Modified on 9/2/2014 (cl, COURT STAFF).
|
July 11, 2014 |
Filing
103
STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING THE DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE (AND DEFENDANT'S REPLY) REGARDING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/11/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
|
July 1, 2014 |
Filing
97
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF GAMETEK LLC'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CHANGE THE TIME OF HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES. Motion Hearing set for 8/28/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/1/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
|
May 8, 2014 |
Filing
88
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR ZYNGA TO FILE BILL OF COSTS AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/8/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2014)
|
April 25, 2014 |
Filing
82
ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/25/14. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2014)
|
March 12, 2014 |
Filing
71
ORDER GRANTING GAMETEK LLC'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CHANGE THE TIME OF HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT. Motion Hearing set for 4/24/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/12/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2014)
|
November 22, 2013 |
Filing
63
Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re 59 Discovery Letter Brief.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
|
November 7, 2013 |
Filing
61
ORDER: Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2013 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re 59 Joint Discovery Letter BriefCompelling Production of Documents filed by Gametek LLC, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 59 Joint Discovery Letter BriefCompelling Production of Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/7/13. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2013)
|
September 20, 2013 |
Filing
57
ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/20/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?