Stevens v. Beard et al

Petitioner: Joseph E. Stevens
Respondent: Jerry Beard and Randy Grounds
Case Number: 5:2013cv03877
Filed: August 22, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 3, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO REOPEN CASE; DISSOLVING STAY; REINSTATING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Respondents shall file with the court and serve on Petitioner, within sixty (60) days of the date this order is filed, an answer conforming in all respects to Rule 5 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases. If Petitioner wishes to respond to the answer, he shall do so by filing a traverse with the court and serving a copy on Respondents within thirty (30) days of his receipt of the answer. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/3/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2015)
November 18, 2015 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 5 Motion to Dismiss; Staying Case. This case is STAYED pending final resolution of all proceedings related to the habeas corpus petition filed on 8/3/2015. The Clerk shall ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this file. Petitioner shall submit a brief report on 2/8/2016 and continuing every three months thereafter. Furthermore, within 10 days of the final resolution of the state proceedings, Petitioner shall file a notice informing the court of such development and request that this matter be reopened and a new briefing schedule entered. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/18/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2015)
June 11, 2015 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. The Clerk shall serve by mail a copy of this Order to Show Cause and the Petition and all attachments (Docket Item No. 1 ) upon Respondent. Respondent shall file with the court and serve on Petitioner, within sixty (60) days of the date this order is filed, an answer conforming in all respects to Rule 5 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases, showing cause why a writ of habeas corpus should not be granted. Respondent shall file w ith the answer and serve on Petitioner a copy of all portions of the underlying state criminal court records that have been transcribed previously and that are relevant to a determination of the issues presented by the Petition. Habeas Answer or Dispositive Motion due by 8/10/2015. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/11/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevens v. Beard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph E. Stevens
Represented By: Theresa A. Gibbons
Represented By: Neil Jacob Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jerry Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Randy Grounds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?