Perkins et al v. LinkedIn Corporation Featured Case

Plaintiff: Paul Perkins, Pennie Sempell, Ann Brandwein and Erin Eggers
Defendant: LinkedIn Corporation
Case Number: 5:2013cv04303
Filed: September 17, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2016 Filing 162 Letter from Martin James Monroe. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2016)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER of USCA as to 139 Notice of Appeal, filed by Dan Brown. Appellants motion to dismiss this appeal is granted. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys fees on appeal. A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2016)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER of USCA as to 144 Notice of Appeal, filed by Susan House, Hannah Tanner, Appellants motion to dismiss this appeal is granted. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys fees on appeal. A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2016)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER of USCA as to 140 Notice of Appeal, filed by Olen York. Appellants motion to dismiss this appeal is granted. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys fees on appeal. A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2016)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER of USCA as to 135 Notice of Appeal, filed by Mary Means. Appellants motion to dismiss this appeal is granted. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys fees on appeal. A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2016)
July 21, 2016 Filing 157 NOTICE of Suspension by Joseph Darrell Palmer Attorney for Objector Susan House (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2016) Modified text on 7/21/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 31, 2016 Filing 156 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/11/2016 before Hon. Lucy H. Koh by Susan House, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Palmer, Joseph) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
May 31, 2016 Filing 155 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 2/11/2016 before Judge Lucy H. Koh, (Palmer, Joseph) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
April 22, 2016 Filing 154 Transcript of Proceedings held on 2-11-16, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 150 Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/21/2016. (Related documents(s) 150 ) (las, ) (Filed on 4/22/2016)
April 4, 2016 Filing 153 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/11/2016 before Hon. Lucy H. Koh by Dan Brown, Jenny Hill, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Bacharach, N. Albert) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
March 31, 2016 Filing 152 Transcript Designation Form: No Transcripts Ordered by Appellant Olen York (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2016)
March 31, 2016 Filing 151 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505 receipt number 54611016162 re 144 Notice of Appeal, filed by Susan House, Hannah Tanner (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2016)
March 30, 2016 Filing 150 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/11/2016 before Hon. Lucy H. Koh by Ann Brandwein, Clare Connaughton, Nicole Crosby, Erin Eggers, Jake Kushner, Paul Perkins, Natalie Richstone, Pennie Sempell, Leslie Wall, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Gardner, Melissa) (Filed on 3/30/2016)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER of USCA as to 144 Notice of Appeal, filed by Susan House, Hannah Tanner. Docket Fee Due. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2016)
March 15, 2016 Filing 148 USCA Case Number 16-15430 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals for 144 Notice of Appeal, filed by Susan House, Hannah Tanner. The schedule is set as follows: Fee due from Appellants Susan House and Hannah Tanner on 03/14/2016. Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/22/2016. Transcript ordered by 04/13/2016. Transcript due 05/13/2016. Appellants Susan House and Hannah Tanner opening brief due 06/22/2016. Appellees Ann Brandwein, Clare Connaughton, Nicole Crosby, Erin Eggers, Jake Kushner, LinkedIn Corporation, Paul Perkins, Natalie Richstone, Pennie Sempell and Leslie Wall answering brief due 07/22/2016. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2016)
March 15, 2016 Filing 147 Mailed request for payment of docket fee to appellant (cc to USCA) (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2016)
March 15, 2016 Filing 146 Transcript Designation Form Amended Mary Means (Fletcher, Frederic) (Filed on 3/15/2016)
March 15, 2016 Filing 145 Transcript Designation Form Appellant Mary Means (Fletcher, Frederic) (Filed on 3/15/2016)
March 14, 2016 Filing 144 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Susan House, Hannah Tanner. Appeal of Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, Order on Motion for Settlement 134 , Order 136 (Appeal fee FEE NOT PAID.) Joint Notice of Appeal of Susan House and Hannah Tanner (Palmer, Joseph) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
March 14, 2016 Filing 143 USCA Case Number 16-15414 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals for 140 Notice of Appeal, filed by Olen York. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 04/11/2016. Transcript due 05/09/2016. Appellant Olen York opening brief due 06/20/2016. Appellees Ann Brandwein, Clare Connaughton, Nicole Crosby, Erin Eggers, Jake Kushner, LinkedIn Corporation, Paul Perkins, Natalie Richstone, Pennie Sempell and Leslie Wall answering brief due 07/20/2016. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
March 10, 2016 Filing 142 USCA Case Number 16-15398 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals for 139 Notice of Appeal, filed by Dan Brown. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/17/2016. Transcript ordered by 04/04/2016. Transcript due 05/03/2016. Appellants Daniel Brown and Jenny Hill opening brief due 06/13/2016. Appellees Ann Brandwein, Clare Connaughton, Nicole Crosby, Erin Eggers, Jake Kushner, LinkedIn Corporation, Paul Perkins, Natalie Richstone, Pennie Sempell and Leslie Wall answering brief due 07/13/2016. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2016)
March 10, 2016 Filing 141 Mailed request for payment of docket fee to appellant (cc to USCA) (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2016)
March 10, 2016 Filing 140 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Olen York. Appeal of Order Granting Motion for Attorney Fees, Order Granting Motion for final Approval of Settlement 134 , Judgment 136 (APPEAL FEE NOT PAID.) (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2016)
March 4, 2016 Filing 139 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Dan Brown. Appeal of Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, Order on Motion for Settlement 134 , Order 136 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-10264699 paid.) (Bacharach, N. Albert) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
February 23, 2016 Filing 138 **CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING COMMUNICATIONS WITH THE COURT** The Court's Case System Administrator received the attached correspondences on February 19, 2016. Unredacted copies of the letters will be sent to counsel of record. (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2016)
February 22, 2016 Filing 137 USCA Case Number 16-15251 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals for 135 Notice of Appeal, filed by Mary Means. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 02/26/2016. Transcript ordered by 03/18/2016. Transcript due 04/18/2016. Appellant Mary Means opening brief due 05/27/2016. Appellees Ann Brandwein, Clare Connaughton, Nicole Crosby, Erin Eggers, Jake Kushner, LinkedIn Corporation, Paul Perkins, Natalie Richstone, Pennie Sempell and Leslie Wall answering brief due 06/27/2016. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2016)
February 19, 2016 Filing 136 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/19/2016. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2016)
February 17, 2016 Filing 135 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Mary Means. Appeal of Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, Order on Motion for Settlement 134 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-10220321 paid.) (Fletcher, Frederic) (Filed on 2/17/2016)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 116 Motion for Attorney's Fees; granting 126 Motion for Final Approval of Settlement. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2016)
February 11, 2016 Filing 133 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Lucy H. Koh: Hearing held on 2/11/2016, re 126 , from 2:23-3:24PM. The Court takes the matter under submission and will issue a written order. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. Courtroom Deputy: Stacy Sakamoto. Representing Plaintiffs: Attorneys Dorian Seawind Berger, Nicholas Diamand, Melissa Ann Gardner, Daniel Paul Hipskind, and Larry C. Russ. Representing Defendant: Attorneys Rosemarie Theresa Ring and Jerome Roth. Other parties present at the hearing: Attorneys Alan J. Sherwood (representing objectors Dan Brown and Jenny Hill) and Frederick Ray Fletcher (representing objector Mary Means). (This is a text only Minute Entry; there is no document associated with this entry) (sms, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/11/2016) Modified on 2/11/2016 (sms, COURT STAFF).
February 10, 2016 Filing 132 Request for Judicial Notice re 118 Opposition/Response to Motion, LinkedIn Financial Status Credibility filed byMary Means. (Related document(s) 118 ) (Fletcher, Frederic) (Filed on 2/10/2016)
February 9, 2016 Filing 131 Declaration of Nicholas R. Diamand / Supplemental Declaration of Nicholas R. Diamand in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Litigation Costs, and Incentive Awards, and Exhibits 1-3 CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [127-1] filed byAnn Brandwein, Clare Connaughton, Nicole Crosby, Erin Eggers, Jake Kushner, Paul Perkins, Natalie Richstone, Pennie Sempell, Leslie Wall. (Diamand, Nicholas) (Filed on 2/9/2016)
February 9, 2016 Filing 130 REPLY (re 116 MOTION for Attorney Fees Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Litigation Costs, and Incentive Awards ) CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 127 filed byAnn Brandwein, Clare Connaughton, Nicole Crosby, Erin Eggers, Jake Kushner, Paul Perkins, Natalie Richstone, Pennie Sempell, Leslie Wall. (Diamand, Nicholas) (Filed on 2/9/2016)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 128 Stipulation for Substitution of Co-Lead Counsel (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2016)
February 9, 2016 Filing 128 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Joint Motion For Substitution Of Co-Lead Class Counsel filed by Ann Brandwein, Clare Connaughton, Nicole Crosby, Erin Eggers, Jake Kushner, Paul Perkins, Natalie Richstone, Pennie Sempell, Leslie Wall. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order re Joint Motion To Substitute Co-Lead Class Counsel)(Berger, Dorian) (Filed on 2/9/2016)
February 4, 2016 Filing 127 REPLY (re 116 MOTION for Attorney Fees Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Litigation Costs, and Incentive Awards ) filed byAnn Brandwein, Clare Connaughton, Nicole Crosby, Erin Eggers, Jake Kushner, Paul Perkins, Natalie Richstone, Pennie Sempell, Leslie Wall. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Larry C. Russ, # 2 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Nicholas R. Diamand and Exhibits 1-3, # 3 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Daniel P. Hipskind and Exhibits 1-4, # 4 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Kenneth Jue and Exhibit 1, # 5 Declaration of Samir Junnarkar, # 6 Proposed Order)(Diamand, Nicholas) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
January 14, 2016 Filing 126 MOTION for Settlement Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Ann Brandwein, Clare Connaughton, Nicole Crosby, Erin Eggers, Jake Kushner, Paul Perkins, Natalie Richstone, Pennie Sempell, Leslie Wall. Motion Hearing set for 2/11/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 1/28/2016. Replies due by 2/4/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nicholas R. Diamand & Exs. 1-11, # 2 Declaration of Nathan D. Meyer, # 3 Declaration of Dorian S. Berger, # 4 Declaration of Daniel Burke & Exs. 1-4, # 5 Declaration of Kurt Andersen, # 6 Declaration of Adam Weinstein, # 7 Declaration of Kenneth Jue, # 8 Exhibit Jue Declaration Exs. 1-9, # 9 Exhibit Jue Declaration Exs. 10-18, # 10 Exhibit Jue Declaration Exs. 19-27, # 11 Exhibit Jue Declaration Exs. 28-36, # 12 Exhibit Jue Declaration Exs. 37-45, # 13 Exhibit Jue Declaration Exs. 46-47, # 14 Exhibit Jue Declaration Exs. 48-63, # 15 Exhibit Jue Declaration Exs. 64-72, # 16 Exhibit Jue Declaration Exs. 73-85, # 17 Proposed Order)(Diamand, Nicholas) (Filed on 1/14/2016)
December 30, 2015 Filing 125 **CLERK'S NOTICE OF ADDITIONAL OBJECTIONS / CORRESPONDENCES RECEIVED BY THE CASE SYSTEM ADMINISTRATOR** The attached correspondences were received by the Court's Case System Administrator before or on December 30, 2015. Judge Koh's Courtroom Deputy will email unredacted copies of the correspondences to the legal counsel for the parties. (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2015)
December 14, 2015 Filing 124 **CLERK'S NOTICE OF REMAINING OBJECTION LETTERS RECEIVED BY THE CLERK'S OFFICE BEFORE 12/14/2015** The attached correspondences were received before 12/14/2015 by the Clerk's Office and the Court's Case System Administrator. The Court's Courtroom Deputy will email unredacted copies of the correspondences to the legal counsel for the parties. (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2015)
December 14, 2015 Filing 123 OBJECTION to the Proposed Settlement by Kin Wah Kung. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2015)
December 14, 2015 Filing 122 OBJECTIONS to Proposed Settlement and Notice of Intent to Appear (Redacted) by Susan House. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Palmer, Joseph) (Filed on 12/14/2015)
December 14, 2015 Filing 121 OBJECTIONS to re 106 Order on Motion for Settlement, Set/Reset Hearings by Dan Brown. (Sherwood, Alan) (Filed on 12/14/2015)
December 14, 2015 Filing 120 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Mary Means. Amendment to 118 Opposition/Response to Motion, Amended Proof of Service. (Fletcher, Frederic) (Filed on 12/14/2015)
December 13, 2015 Filing 119 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 116 MOTION for Attorney Fees Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Litigation Costs, and Incentive Awards Declaration with Exhibit filed byMary Means. (Related document(s) 116 ) (Fletcher, Frederic) (Filed on 12/13/2015)
December 13, 2015 Filing 118 RESPONSE (re 116 MOTION for Attorney Fees Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Litigation Costs, and Incentive Awards ) Objection & Notice to Appear filed byMary Means. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration Mary Means, # 2 Affidavit Declaration Fletcher 1, # 3 Affidavit Declaration Fletcher 2)(Fletcher, Frederic) (Filed on 12/13/2015)
December 11, 2015 Filing 117 OBJECTIONS to Final Approval of Class Action Settlement by Hannah Tanner. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of absent class member class member hannah tanner in support of objection and notice to appear, # 2 Exhibit Part 1 of Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Part 2 of Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit Part 2.5 of Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit Part 3 of Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit Part 4 of Exhibit A, # 7 Exhibit Part 5 of Exhibit A)(Helfand, Steven) (Filed on 12/11/2015)
November 30, 2015 Filing 116 MOTION for Attorney Fees Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Litigation Costs, and Incentive Awards filed by Ann Brandwein, Clare Connaughton, Nicole Crosby, Erin Eggers, Jake Kushner, Paul Perkins, Natalie Richstone, Pennie Sempell, Leslie Wall. Motion Hearing set for 2/11/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 12/21/2015. Replies due by 2/4/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nicholas Diamand, # 2 Declaration of Larry C. Russ, # 3 Declaration of Daniel P. Hipskind)(Diamand, Nicholas) (Filed on 11/30/2015)
November 30, 2015 Filing 115 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Daniel Meyer for Plaintiffs Paul Perkins, Pennie Sempell, Clare Connaughton and Natalie Richstone (Meyer, Nathan) (Filed on 11/30/2015)
October 27, 2015 Filing 114 **CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING COMMUNICATIONS RECEIVED BY THE COURT ON OCTOBER 27, 2015** The attached correspondences were received by the Court's Courtroom Deputy and Case Systems Administrator on October 27, 2015. The Court will send unredacted copies of all correspondences to the parties. (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2015)
October 23, 2015 Filing 113 **CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING COMMUNICATIONS RECEIVED BY THE COURT ON OCTOBER 22, 2015** The attached correspondences were received by the Court's Courtroom Deputy and Case Systems Administrator on October 22, 2015. The Court will send unredacted copies of all correspondences to the parties. (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2015)
October 19, 2015 Filing 112 **CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING COMMUNICATIONS RECEIVED BY THE COURT ON OCTOBER 19, 2015** The attached correspondences were received by the Court's Courtroom Deputy and Case Systems Administrator on October 19, 2015. The Court will send unredacted copies of all correspondences to the parties. (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
October 16, 2015 Filing 111 **CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING COMMUNICATIONS RECEIVED BY THE COURT ON OCTOBER 14, 2015** The attached correspondences were received by the Court's Courtroom Deputy and Case Systems Administrator on October 14, 2015. The Court will send unredacted copies of all correspondences to the parties. (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2015) Modified on 10/19/2015 (sms, COURT STAFF).
October 16, 2015 Filing 110 **CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING COMMUNICATIONS RECEIVED BY THE COURT ON OCTOBER 3, 2015** The attached correspondence was received by the Court's Case Systems Administrator on October 3, 2015. The Court will send an unredacted copy to the parties. (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
October 13, 2015 Filing 109 **CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING COMMUNICATIONS RECEIVED BY THE COURT ON OCTOBER 9, 2015** The attached correspondences were received by the Court's Courtroom Deputy and Case Systems Administrator on October 9, 2015. The Court will send unredacted copies of all correspondences to the parties. (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2015)
October 13, 2015 Filing 108 **CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING COMMUNICATIONS RECEIVED BY THE COURT ON OCTOBER 8, 2015** The attached correspondences were received by the Court's Courtroom Deputy and Case Systems Administrator on October 8, 2015. The Court will send unredacted copies of all correspondences to the parties. (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2015) (sms, COURT STAFF).
October 13, 2015 Filing 107 **CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING COMMUNICATIONS RECEIVED BY THE COURT ON OCTOBER 6, 2015** The attached correspondences were received by the Court's Courtroom Deputy and Case Systems Administrator on October 6, 2015. The Court will send unredacted copies of all correspondences to the parties. (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2015)
September 15, 2015 ECF calendar amended, re 106 : 9/16/2015 hearing vacated. Final approval hearing set for 2/11/2016 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2015)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 95 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit A (Redline), # 5 Exhibit B (Redline), # 6 Exhibit C (Redline)) (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2015)
September 10, 2015 Filing 105 Joint Statement regarding Supplemental Filing in Support of 95 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement by Ann Brandwein, Clare Connaughton, Nicole Crosby, Erin Eggers, Jake Kushner, Paul Perkins, Natalie Richstone, Pennie Sempell, Leslie Wall. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Diamand, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/10/2015) Modified text on 9/11/2015 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
September 2, 2015 Filing 104 Transcript of Proceedings held on 8-27-15, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 102 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/1/2015. (Related documents(s) 102 ) (las, ) (Filed on 9/2/2015)
September 1, 2015 Filing 103 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by LinkedIn Corporation for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Ring, Rosemarie) (Filed on 9/1/2015)
August 28, 2015 Filing 102 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Ann Brandwein, Clare Connaughton, Nicole Crosby, Erin Eggers, Jake Kushner, Paul Perkins, Natalie Richstone, Pennie Sempell, Leslie Wall for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Gardner, Melissa) (Filed on 8/28/2015)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER CONTINUING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL HEARING. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/27/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2015)
August 27, 2015 Filing 100 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Lucy H. Koh: Motion Hearing held on 8/27/2015 from 2:22-3:09pm and 3:48-4:12pm, re 95 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. A further hearing is set for 9/16/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. A forthcoming order will memorialize all relevant information, deadlines, and rulings from the hearing. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. Courtroom Deputy: Stacy Sakamoto. Representing Plaintiffs: Attorney Nicholas Diamand (Perkins, Sempell, and Connaughton plaintiffs) and Attorney David Seawind Berger (Brandwein, Eggers, Crosby, Kushner, Wall, and Richstone plaintiffs). Representing Defendant: Attorneys Rosemarie Theresa Ring and Jerome Cary Roth. (This is a text only Minute Entry; there is no document associated with this entry) (sms, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/27/2015)
June 16, 2015 Case calendar amended, re 99 : CMCs on 6/17/15, 6/24/15, 7/1/15, 7/8/15, and 7/15/15 VACATED. (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2015)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCES, VACATING CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING, AND SETTING HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/16/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2015)
June 11, 2015 Filing 98 Declaration of Dorian S. Berger in Support of 95 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byAnn Brandwein, Clare Connaughton, Nicole Crosby, Erin Eggers, Jake Kushner, Paul Perkins, Natalie Richstone, Pennie Sempell, Leslie Wall. (Related document(s) 95 ) (Diamand, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/11/2015)
June 11, 2015 Filing 97 Declaration of Larry C. Russ in Support of 95 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byAnn Brandwein, Clare Connaughton, Nicole Crosby, Erin Eggers, Jake Kushner, Paul Perkins, Natalie Richstone, Pennie Sempell, Leslie Wall. (Related document(s) 95 ) (Diamand, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/11/2015)
June 11, 2015 Filing 96 Declaration in Support of 95 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byAnn Brandwein, Clare Connaughton, Nicole Crosby, Erin Eggers, Jake Kushner, Paul Perkins, Natalie Richstone, Pennie Sempell, Leslie Wall. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) 95 ) (Diamand, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/11/2015)
June 11, 2015 Filing 95 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Ann Brandwein, Clare Connaughton, Nicole Crosby, Erin Eggers, Jake Kushner, Paul Perkins, Natalie Richstone, Pennie Sempell, Leslie Wall. Motion Hearing set for 8/27/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 6/25/2015. Replies due by 7/2/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Diamand, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/11/2015) Modified text on 6/15/2015 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
June 10, 2015 Filing 94 SUPPLEMENTAL JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Ann Brandwein, Clare Connaughton, Nicole Crosby, Erin Eggers, Jake Kushner, Paul Perkins, Natalie Richstone, Pennie Sempell, Leslie Wall. (Diamand, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/10/2015) Modified text on 6/11/2015 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 93 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/10/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2015)
June 10, 2015 Filing 92 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Lucy H. Koh: Further Case Management Conference held on 6/10/2015 from 2:16-2:30PM. A forthcoming Case Management Order will memorialize all relevant information, deadlines, and rulings from the Conference. Further Case Management Conferences are set for 6/17/2015, 6/24/2015, 7/1/2015, 7/8/2015, and 7/15/2015, all at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. Courtroom Deputy: Stacy Sakamoto. Representing Plaintiffs: Attorneys Dorian Seawind Berger and Daniel Paul Hipskind (for Brandwein, Eggers, Wall, Kushner, Richstone, and Crosby); Attorneys Michael Sobol, Nicholas Diamand, and Melissa Ann Gardner (Connaughton, Perkins, and Sempell); and, Attorney Larry Craig Russ (Connaughton, Perkins, and Sempell). Representing Defendant: Attorney Rosemarie Theresa Ring. (This is a text only Minute Entry; there is no document associated with this entry) (sms, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/10/2015)
June 9, 2015 Filing 91 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Supplemental Joint Case Management Statement filed by Ann Brandwein, Clare Connaughton, Nicole Crosby, Erin Eggers, Jake Kushner, Paul Perkins, Natalie Richstone, Pennie Sempell, Leslie Wall. (Diamand, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/9/2015)
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/8/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2015)
June 5, 2015 Filing 89 Joint Notice of Status of Settlement Negotiations by Ann Brandwein, Clare Connaughton, Nicole Crosby, Erin Eggers, Jake Kushner, Paul Perkins, Natalie Richstone, Pennie Sempell, Leslie Wall. (Diamand, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/5/2015) Modified text on 6/8/2015 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER RE DEADLINE TO FILE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/1/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2015)
May 27, 2015 Filing 87 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Further Joint Case Management Statement filed by Ann Brandwein, Clare Connaughton, Nicole Crosby, Erin Eggers, Jake Kushner, Paul Perkins, Natalie Richstone, Pennie Sempell, Leslie Wall. (Diamand, Nicholas) (Filed on 5/27/2015)
May 22, 2015 Calendar amended, re 86 Order: Further Case Management Conference set for 6/10/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2015)
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 85 Stipulation (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2015)
May 19, 2015 Filing 85 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING OF PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT AND TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Ann Brandwein, Clare Connaughton, Nicole Crosby, Erin Eggers, Jake Kushner, Branton Lea, Paul Perkins, Natalie Richstone, Pennie Sempell, Leslie Wall. (Diamand, Nicholas) (Filed on 5/19/2015)
May 14, 2015 Filing 84 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Dorian Seawind Berger and Daniel P. Hipskind of Olavi Dunne LLP (Berger, Dorian) (Filed on 5/14/2015)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 81 Motion to Relate Case (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2015)
April 27, 2015 Filing 82 RESPONSE (re 81 MOTION to Relate Case LinkedIn Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 3-12 and 7-11 ) filed byBranton Lea. (Shah, James) (Filed on 4/27/2015)
April 22, 2015 Filing 81 MOTION to Relate Case LinkedIn Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 3-12 and 7-11 filed by LinkedIn Corporation. (Roth, Jerome) (Filed on 4/22/2015)
April 17, 2015 Filing 80 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Dorian Seawind Berger and Daniel P. Hipskind of Olavi Dunne LLP (Berger, Dorian) (Filed on 4/17/2015)
March 27, 2015 Calendar amended, re 79 Order: Case Management Conference continued to 6/3/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Hearing on preliminary approval reserved for 8/27/2015 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2015)
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, VACATING CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING, AND SETTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL HEARING. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/26/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2015)
March 25, 2015 Filing 78 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Paul Perkins. (Berger, Dorian) (Filed on 3/25/2015)
February 26, 2015 Calendar amended, re 77 : Case Management Conference set for 4/1/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2015)
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/26/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2015)
February 25, 2015 Filing 76 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Paul Perkins. (Berger, Dorian) (Filed on 2/25/2015)
February 5, 2015 Calendar amended, re 75 : Further Case Management Conference set for 3/4/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2015)
February 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/5/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2015)
February 4, 2015 Filing 74 FURTHER JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by LinkedIn Corporation. (Roth, Jerome) (Filed on 2/4/2015) Modified text on 2/5/2015 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
January 9, 2015 Filing 73 ANSWER of Defendant LinkedIn Corporation to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Class Action Complaint byLinkedIn Corporation. (Roth, Jerome) (Filed on 1/9/2015) Modified on 1/12/2015 (srmS, COURT STAFF).
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 71 Stipulation (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2014)
December 18, 2014 Filing 71 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation Regarding Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by LinkedIn Corporation. (Roth, Jerome) (Filed on 12/18/2014)
December 15, 2014 Filing 70 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against LinkedIn Corporation. Filed by Leslie Wall, Ann Brandwein, Pennie Sempell, Natalie Richstone, Nicole Crosby, Erin Eggers, Paul Perkins, Jake Kushner, Clare Connaughton. (Berger, Dorian) (Filed on 12/15/2014) Modified text on 12/19/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 60 Motion to Dismiss (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
November 12, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing re 68 Order: Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2014)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER VACATING MOTION HEARING AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/12/2014. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2014)
October 23, 2014 Filing 67 Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice filed by LinkedIn Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of William Edelman ISO Defendant's Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice)(Roth, Jerome) (Filed on 10/23/2014) Modified text on 10/24/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 23, 2014 Filing 66 REPLY in Support of ( 60 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint and to Dismiss Request for Statutory Damages ) filed by LinkedIn Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rosemarie Ring ISO Defendant's Reply)(Roth, Jerome) (Filed on 10/23/2014) Modified text on 10/24/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 13, 2014 Filing 65 OPPOSITION to ( 60 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint and to Dismiss Request for Statutory Damages ) CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 63 filed by Ann Brandwein, Clare Connaughton, Nicole Crosby, Erin Eggers, Jake Kushner, Paul Perkins, Natalie Richstone, Pennie Sempell, Leslie Wall. (Berger, Dorian) (Filed on 10/13/2014) Modified text on 10/14/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 9, 2014 Filing 64 Request for Judicial Notice re 63 Opposition/Response to Motion,, filed byAnn Brandwein, Clare Connaughton, Nicole Crosby, Erin Eggers, Jake Kushner, Paul Perkins, Natalie Richstone, Pennie Sempell, Leslie Wall. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) 63 ) (Berger, Dorian) (Filed on 10/9/2014)
October 9, 2014 Filing 63 OPPOSITION to ( 60 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint and to Dismiss Request for Statutory Damages ) filed by Ann Brandwein, Clare Connaughton, Nicole Crosby, Erin Eggers, Jake Kushner, Paul Perkins, Natalie Richstone, Pennie Sempell, Leslie Wall. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Dorian S. Berger, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Dorian S. Berger, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Dorian S. Berger, # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Dorian S. Berger)(Berger, Dorian) (Filed on 10/9/2014) Modified text on 10/10/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 9, 2014 Filing 62 OBJECTIONS to re 61 Request for Judicial Notice, by Ann Brandwein, Clare Connaughton, Nicole Crosby, Erin Eggers, Jake Kushner, Paul Perkins, Natalie Richstone, Pennie Sempell, Leslie Wall. (Berger, Dorian) (Filed on 10/9/2014)
September 18, 2014 Filing 61 Request for Judicial Notice re 60 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint and to Dismiss Request for Statutory Damages filed by LinkedIn Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jonathan Blavin ISO, # 2 Exhibit A to Blavin Decl.)(Related document(s) 60 ) (Roth, Jerome) (Filed on 9/18/2014) Modified text on 9/19/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2014 Filing 60 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint and to Dismiss Request for Statutory Damages; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by LinkedIn Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 10/9/2014. Replies due by 10/23/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Roth, Jerome) (Filed on 9/18/2014) Modified text on 9/19/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing re 59 Order. Tomorrow's CMC is hereby rescheduled for 11/13/2014 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2014)
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 9/9/2014. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2014)
September 9, 2014 Filing 58 FURTHER JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by LinkedIn Corporation. (Roth, Jerome) (Filed on 9/9/2014) Modified text on 9/10/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER ON PROPOSED SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 9/8/14. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2014)
September 3, 2014 Filing 56 FURTHER JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT for September 10, 2014 Case Management Conference filed by Paul Perkins. (Berger, Dorian) (Filed on 9/3/2014) Modified text on 9/4/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 28, 2014 Filing 55 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against LinkedIn Corporation. Filed by Natalie Richstone, Paul Perkins, Erin Eggers, Nicole Crosby, Jake Kushner, Ann Brandwein, Pennie Sempell. (Berger, Dorian) (Filed on 8/28/2014) Modified text on 8/29/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 12, 2014 Filing 54 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 53 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2014)
August 12, 2014 Filing 53 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Nicholas Diamand ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8840024.) filed by Ann Brandwein, Nicole Crosby, Erin Eggers, Jake Kushner, Paul Perkins, Natalie Richstone, Pennie Sempell. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Diamand, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/12/2014)
August 12, 2014 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Ann Gardner (Gardner, Melissa) (Filed on 8/12/2014)
August 12, 2014 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by Daniel Bowling, ADR Program Staff Attorney, on 8/12/2014. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2014)
August 6, 2014 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Sobol (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 8/6/2014)
July 9, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing re 50 Order on Stipulation Further Case Management Conference set for 9/10/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2014)
July 9, 2014 Filing 50 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 49 Stipulation to Continue Dates. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2014)
July 9, 2014 Filing 49 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Dates and Vacate the Case Management Conference Set for July 16, 2014 filed by LinkedIn Corporation. (Roth, Jerome) (Filed on 7/9/2014)
June 16, 2014 Filing 48 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff: Correspondence from a member of the public. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2014: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (mpbS, COURT STAFF).
June 12, 2014 Filing 47 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 17 Motion to Dismiss with Leave to Amend. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2014)
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 43 Stipulated [Proposed] Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/14/2014. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2014)
May 9, 2014 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by Daniel Bowling, ADR Program Staff Attorney, on 5/8/2014. A further ADR Phone Conference is scheduled on 8/12/2014 at 10:00 AM Pacific time. The call-in information remanins the same. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 9, 2014 Filing 45 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by LinkedIn Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Roth, Jerome) (Filed on 5/9/2014) Modified text on 5/12/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 5, 2014 Filing 44 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4-10-14, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/4/2014. (Related documents(s) 40 ) (las, ) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
April 23, 2014 Filing 43 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated [Proposed] Protective Order filed by Paul Perkins. (Berger, Dorian) (Filed on 4/23/2014)
April 15, 2014 Filing 42 EXHIBITS JOINT FILING RELATING TO LINKEDINS MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND TO STRIKE CLASS ALLEGATIONS filed byPaul Perkins. (Berger, Dorian) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
April 15, 2014 Filing 41 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Ann Brandwein, Nicole Crosby, Erin Eggers, Jake Kushner, Paul Perkins, Natalie Richstone, Pennie Sempell for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Berger, Dorian) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
April 15, 2014 Filing 40 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by LinkedIn Corporation for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Ring, Rosemarie) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
April 10, 2014 Filing 39 Minute Entry and Case Management Order: Initial Case Management Conference held on 4/10/2014 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 4/10/2014), Motion Hearing held on 4/10/2014 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 4/10/2014) re 17 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint and to Strike Class Allegations filed by LinkedIn Corporation. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/16/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/10/2014)
April 10, 2014 Filing 38 Certificate of Interested Entities by LinkedIn Corporation Defendant LinkedIn Corporation's Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Civil Local Rule 3-15 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Ring, Rosemarie) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
April 3, 2014 Filing 37 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Paul Perkins. (Berger, Dorian) (Filed on 4/3/2014) Modified on 4/4/2014 incorrect event selected when posting document (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 24, 2014 Filing 36 STIPULATION filed by LinkedIn Corporation. (Roth, Jerome) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER re 34 Discovery Dispute Joint Report #1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/17/2014. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2014) Modified text on 3/18/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 3, 2014 Filing 34 Joint Discovery Report #1 filed by LinkedIn Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Roth, Jerome) (Filed on 3/3/2014) Modified text on 3/4/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2014 Filing 33 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options By Parties And Counsel (Berger, Dorian) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
February 26, 2014 Filing 32 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options By Parties And Counsel (Berger, Dorian) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
February 26, 2014 Filing 31 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options By Parties And Counsel (Berger, Dorian) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
January 31, 2014 Filing 30 REPLY in Support of ( 17 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint and to Strike Class Allegations ) filed by LinkedIn Corporation. (Roth, Jerome) (Filed on 1/31/2014) Modified text on 2/3/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
January 24, 2014 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by Daniel Bowling, ADR Program Staff Attorney, on 1/23/2014. A further ADR Phone Conference is scheduled on 5/8/2014 at 2:30 PM Pacific time. The call-in information remains the same. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2014)
January 17, 2014 Filing 29 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Pennie Sempell) (Berger, Dorian) (Filed on 1/17/2014)
January 17, 2014 Filing 28 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Natalie Richstone) (Berger, Dorian) (Filed on 1/17/2014)
January 17, 2014 Filing 27 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Jake Kushner) (Berger, Dorian) (Filed on 1/17/2014)
January 17, 2014 Filing 26 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Paul Perkins) (Berger, Dorian) (Filed on 1/17/2014)
January 13, 2014 Filing 25 Request for Judicial Notice re 24 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byPaul Perkins. (Attachments: # 1 In Support Of Request For Judicial Notice, # 2 Exhibits A To F)(Related document(s) 24 ) (Berger, Dorian) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
January 13, 2014 Filing 24 OPPOSITION to ( 17 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint and to Strike Class Allegations ) filed by Paul Perkins. (Berger, Dorian) (Filed on 1/13/2014) Modified text on 1/22/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2014 Filing 23 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO DATE OF MOTION HEARING Case Management Statement due by 4/3/2014. Case Management Conference set for 4/10/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. *****THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY NOTICE. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS DOCKET ENTRY***** (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
January 10, 2014 Filing 22 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Thursday, January 23, 2014 at 2:30 PM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2014)
January 9, 2014 Filing 21 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) re 20 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b)of discussion of ADR options re document 20 ) (Ring, Rosemarie) (Filed on 1/9/2014)
January 9, 2014 Filing 20 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Ring, Rosemarie) (Filed on 1/9/2014)
January 9, 2014 Filing 19 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2014)
December 6, 2013 Filing 18 Request for Judicial Notice re 17 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint and to Strike Class Allegations; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byLinkedIn Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of William J. Edelman, # 2 Exhibit A-F to Edelman Declaration)(Related document(s) 17 ) (Roth, Jerome) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
December 6, 2013 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint and to Strike Class Allegations; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by LinkedIn Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 4/10/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 1/13/2014. Replies due by 1/31/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Roth, Jerome) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Lucy Koh granting 15 Stipulation (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
December 4, 2013 Filing 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Page Limits for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike filed by LinkedIn Corporation. (Ring, Rosemarie) (Filed on 12/4/2013)
October 29, 2013 Filing 14 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT Case Management Statement due by 1/22/2014. Case Management Conference set for 1/29/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. *****THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY NOTICE. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS DOCKET ENTRY***** (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2013)
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd remains as the referral judge to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 10/18/2013. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2013)
October 17, 2013 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2013)
October 17, 2013 Filing 11 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule filed by LinkedIn Corporation. (Roth, Jerome) (Filed on 10/17/2013)
October 17, 2013 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Defendant's Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the First Amended Complaint filed by LinkedIn Corporation. (Roth, Jerome) (Filed on 10/17/2013)
October 17, 2013 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by LinkedIn Corporation.. (Roth, Jerome) (Filed on 10/17/2013)
October 16, 2013 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ann Brandwein, Erin Eggers, Paul Perkins, Pennie Sempell.. (Berger, Dorian) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
October 2, 2013 Filing 7 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (Class Action) against LinkedIn Corporation. Filed byPaul Perkins, Erin Eggers, Ann Brandwein, Pennie Sempell. (Russ, Larry) (Filed on 10/2/2013) Modified text on 10/3/2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
September 24, 2013 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul Perkins, Erin Eggers, Ann Brandwein, Pennie Sempell. LinkedIn Corporation served on 9/20/2013, answer due 10/11/2013. (Berger, Dorian) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
September 19, 2013 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to LinkedIn Corporation. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
September 17, 2013 Filing 4 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 12/17/2013. Case Management Conference set for 12/24/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
September 17, 2013 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
September 17, 2013 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Berger, Dorian) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
September 17, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Class Action) against LinkedIn Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-8008331.). Filed byPaul Perkins, Erin Eggers, Ann Brandwein, Pennie Sempell. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berger, Dorian) (Filed on 9/17/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perkins et al v. LinkedIn Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Perkins
Represented By: Dorian Seawind Berger
Represented By: Daniel Paul Hipskind
Represented By: Larry C. Russ
Represented By: Larry Craig Russ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pennie Sempell
Represented By: Dorian Seawind Berger
Represented By: Daniel Paul Hipskind
Represented By: Larry C. Russ
Represented By: Larry Craig Russ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Brandwein
Represented By: Dorian Seawind Berger
Represented By: Daniel Paul Hipskind
Represented By: Larry C. Russ
Represented By: Larry Craig Russ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Eggers
Represented By: Dorian Seawind Berger
Represented By: Daniel Paul Hipskind
Represented By: Larry C. Russ
Represented By: Larry Craig Russ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LinkedIn Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?