Medina v. Immigration and Naturalization Director

Plaintiff: Pedro Medina
Defendant: Immigration and Naturalization Director
Case Number: 5:2013cv04436
Filed: September 24, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Deportation
Cause of Action: Application for Naturalization
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/20/2014. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2014)
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Beth Labson Freeman granting 16 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/29/2014. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2014)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 2 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medina v. Immigration and Naturalization Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Immigration and Naturalization Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?