July 7, 2015 |
Filing
295
ORDER SUA SPONTE REFERRING ACTION FOR DETERMINATION OF RELATED CASE STATUS PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 3-12(c). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/7/2015. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2015)
|
June 30, 2015 |
Filing
283
ORDER TO PAY ADDITIONAL ATTENDANCE FEE. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 1871(b)(2), petit jurors required to attend more than ten (10) days in hearing one case may be paid, in the discretion of the trial judge, an additional fee, not exceedin g $10.00 more than the $40.00 attendance fee, for each day in excess of ten (10) days on which the juror is required to hear such case. It is hereby ordered that each member of the jury hearing the above case shall receive a total attendance fee of $50 per day for each day of service in excess of ten (10) days. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/29/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2015)
|
June 17, 2015 |
Filing
244
ORDER re: Defendants' Objections 235 236 . Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/17/2015. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2015)
|
June 9, 2015 |
Filing
229
FURTHER ORDER re: Trial Schedule and Related Matters. On or before 4:00 p.m. on June 9, 2015, the parties shall provide an updated joint witness list consistent with this court's previous rulings. Also, on or before 4:00 p.m. on June 9, 201 5, the parties shall provide a brief joint statement, not exceeding two pages, which lists the causes of action that will be tried, taking into consideration this court's previous rulings. The parties shall appear for a further Final Pretrial Conference at 9:00 a.m. on June 10, 2015. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/9/2015. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2015)
|
June 3, 2015 |
Filing
224
FURTHER ORDER RE: TRIAL SCHEDULE. 1. The notice regarding settlement contemplated by the June 2nd order, which was to be filed 4:00 p.m. on 6/8/2015, shall instead be filed by 10:00 p.m. on 6/8/2015. 2. No other modifications will be ordered at this time. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/3/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2015)
|
June 2, 2015 |
Filing
221
ORDER RE: TRIAL SCHEDULE. The jury trial currently scheduled to commence on June 9, 2015, is CONTINUED and shall instead commence at 9:00 a.m. on June 10, 2015, in order to allow the parties to complete the mediation process. The prior order requ iring the parties to notify the court of settlement efforts by June 5, 2015, is MODIFIED such that on or before 4:00 p.m. on June 8, 2015, the parties shall either: (1) file a Notice of Settlement and provide further notice as required by III(F) of t he undersigned's Standing Order for Civil Cases if a settlement is reached; or (2) file a brief joint statement which notifies the court that a full settlement has not been reached, specifies whether the trial commencing on June 10th will be a court trial or a jury trial, and provides any other information the parties believe may assist the court in preparing for trial. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/2/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2015)
|
March 4, 2015 |
Filing
116
ORDER 112 DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Continue Pre-Trial Conference; DEFERRING Ruling on Motion to Continue Trial. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/4/2015. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2015)
|
February 24, 2015 |
Filing
111
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO SECOND MAGISTRATE JUDGE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. The above-entitled case is referred to Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal for a second settlement conference to occur no later than 4/1/2015. The parties are instructed to contact Judge Grewal's Courtroom Deputy to arrange a date and time for the conference. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/24/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2015)
|
February 11, 2015 |
Filing
107
ORDER granting 52 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 54 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. This order replaces 106 Order. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/11/2015. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2015)
|
November 6, 2014 |
Filing
77
ORDER RE: MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 52 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Travelers Property Casualty of America, 54 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Kaufman & Broad Monterey Bay, Inc., KB Home South Bay, Inc., K&B Bakewell Seaside Venture, LLC. The court has reviewed the motions, and finds that both exceed the page limitation provided by this courts Local Rules. Since neither side sought leave to exceed the page limitation in advance of filing, the court notifies the parties that it will not review any material contained in the motions past the 25th page of text. In other words, the court will review the first 25 pages - which may include the notice of motion and prefatory material such as tables of contents and tables of authorities - but nothing more. Any arguments contained in excessive pages will therefore not be considered. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/6/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2014)
|
August 29, 2014 |
Filing
44
ORDER GRANTING 41 Order on Stipulation AND JOINT REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLETE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND EXTEND TIME FOR EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURES AND FILING OF DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS. (Correction of 43 ). Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/29/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2014)
|
July 15, 2014 |
Filing
29
ORDER RE: OPPOSITION DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on July 15, 2014. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2014)
|
May 12, 2014 |
Filing
20
ORDER VACATING STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal for Settlement. The court has determined an appearance is unnecessary at this time. Accordingly, the status conference is VACATED and the parties are ORDER ED to comply with the schedule previously set forth in this court's Case Management Order dated February 10, 2014 (See 18 Case Management Scheduling Order). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to ADR Local Rule 7-2, this case is referred to M agistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal for a settlement conference to occur no later than 120 days from the date this order is filed. The parties are instructed to contact Judge Grewal's Courtroom Deputy to arrange a date for the conference forthwith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that each party is limited to one Motion for Summary Judgment. Please see Order for further specifics. ***5/16/2014 CMC Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/12/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2014)
|