Illinois Union Insurance Company v. Intuitive Surgical, Inc.
Plaintiff: Illinois Union Insurance Company
Defendant: Intuitive Surgical, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2013cv04863
Filed: October 21, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 270 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 269 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER DISMISSING OF ILLINOIS UNIONS COMPLAINT AGAINST INTUITIVE SURGICAL, INC. WITH PREJUDICE filed by Intuitive Surgical, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 13, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2017)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 247 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 218 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Brandt Fees Allocation and Award filed by Intuitive Surgical, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 21, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2017)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 217 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 216 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS filed by Intuitive Surgical, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 4, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2017)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 203 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 202 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend Expert Deadlines filed by Illinois Union Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 9, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2017)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 200 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 199 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND EXPERT DEADLINES BY 10 DAYS filed by Illinois Union Insurance Company. Expert Reports Due December 23, 2016. Rebuttal Expert Reports Due January 27, 2017. Close Of Expert Discovery February 10, 2017. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 8, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2016)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 198 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 197 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE: DEADLINE TO PRODUCE EVIDENCE TO SUPPORT BRANDT FEES filed by Intuitive Surgical, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 26, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2016)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 194 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 193 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND MEDIATION DEADLINE FROM OCTOBER 15, 2016, TO NOVEMBER 30, 2016; filed by Intuitive Surgical, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 13, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2016)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR STAY AND FOR PERMISSION TO APPEAL by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 185 Motion for Leave to Appeal. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2016)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 191 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 190 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATED REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF NAVIGATORS CLAIMS AGAINST INTUITIVE SURGICAL, INC. filed by Intuitive Surgical, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 15, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2016)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 186 STIPULATION AND ORDER re (184 in 3:13-cv-04863-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO ENTER SCHEDULING ORDER filed by Intuitive Surgical, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 27, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2016)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER DENYING ILLINOIS UNIONS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 146 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2016)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 164 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 163 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation to Vacate Deadlines for Expert Disclosure and Close of Expert Discovery filed by Intuitive Surgical, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 27, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2016).
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART INTUITIVE'S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting in part and denying in part 144 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2016)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER REGARDING INTUITIVE SURGICAL'S RIGHT TO A JURY TRIAL re (119 in 3:13-cv-04863-JST) Response ( Non Motion ) filed by Intuitive Surgical, Inc., (115 in 3:13-cv-04863-JST) Response ( Non Motion ) filed by Navigators Specialty Insurance Company, (113 in 3:13-cv-04863-JST) Brief filed by Intuitive Surgical, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 14, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2016)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO TERMINATE ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL re 123 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Illinois Union Insurance Company; 124 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Navigators Specialty Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 23, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2016)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 129 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 127 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re: EXTENDING TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION AND REPLY BRIEFS (PLAINTIFF INSURERS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE: RESCISSION); filed by Illinois Union Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 16, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 112 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 111 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEPOSITIONS, EXPERT DISCLOSURE, AND CLOSE OF EXPERT DISCOVERY filed by Intuitive Surgical, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 26, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2016)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 110 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 21, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 88 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 85 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Court Dates filed by Intuitive Surgical, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 15, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2015)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 78 NOTICE OF REFERENCE; ORDER TO MEET AND CONFER AND FILE JOINT LETTER re 76 Letter Brief filed by Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/12/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2015)
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 69 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend Time to Respond to Cross-Complaint filed by Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 10, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2015)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 59 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER AFFIRMING APPLICATION OF PROTECTIVE ORDER TO IRONSHORE SPECIALTY INSURANCE filed by Intuitive Surgical, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 20, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2015)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER AMENDING CASE SCHEDULE. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/10/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. Jury Trial set for 7/5/2016 - 7/20/2016 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 19, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2015)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 52 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO PERMIT FILING OF CROSS-COMPLAINT TO IMPLEAD IRONSHORE SPECIALITY INSURANCE COMPANY filed by Intuitive Surgical, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 3, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2015)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 49 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO MODIFY EXPERT DISCOVERY DEADLINES filed by Navigators Specialty Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 5, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2015)
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 42 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER requesting two-week continuance of November 19, 2014 Status Conference filed by Illinois Union Insurance Company. Case Management Statement due by 11/18/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/3/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 22, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2014)
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION; CASE SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 22, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2014)
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER re (35 in 3:13-cv-04863-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Intuitive Surgical, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 18, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Illinois Union Insurance Company v. Intuitive Surgical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Illinois Union Insurance Company
Represented By: Amanda Macy Lorenz
Represented By: Charles Edward Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intuitive Surgical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?