Stanford Hospital & Clinics v. Humana Inc.

Defendant: Humana Inc. and Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Plaintiff: Stanford Hospital & Clinics
Case Number: 5:2013cv04924
Filed: October 23, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 23, 2015 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 40 defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2015)
May 7, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/7/2014. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2014)
January 29, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 17 Substitution of Attorneys. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/29/2014. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanford Hospital & Clinics v. Humana Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Humana Inc.
Represented By: Curtis Stanfield Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanford Hospital & Clinics
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Hapak
Represented By: Richard Alan Lovich
Represented By: Barry Sullivan
Represented By: Melanie Joy Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?