In re Jacqueline C. Melcher
Trustee: John W. Richardson
Case Number: 5:2013cv04930
Filed: October 23, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/30/2017. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2017) The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on October 2, 2017, a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. Modified on 10/2/2017 (afmS, COURT STAFF).
December 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER AFTER HEARING ON MOTION FOR SANCTIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/30/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2016)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 39 APPELLANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE APPEALS by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2016)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION FOR SANCTIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/2/2016. Replies due by 12/8/2016. Motion Hearing set for 12/29/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2016)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 11/21/2016. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/7/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Ronald M Whyte granting 1 Motion to Withdraw, granting sanctions but deferring calculation of amount (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2014)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting 6 Request for Extension of time. Response due 2/14/14, reply due 2/21/14. Signed by Judge Ronald M Whyte on 1/28/14. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER extending time to file a response. Signed by Judge Whyte on 1/3/2014. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014)
November 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER extending time to respond. Signed by Judge Whyte on 11/15/2013. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re Jacqueline C. Melcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: John W. Richardson
Represented By: Charles P. Maher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?