J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Salgadobarajas

Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Salvador Salgadobarajas
Case Number: 5:2013cv05557
Filed: December 2, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:553
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order denying 23 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 10/9/2014.(blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2014)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING 13 MOTION for Default Judgment and 20 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 7/3/2014. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2014)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR APRIL 2, 2014 AND ORDER TO FILE MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 3/26/2014. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Salgadobarajas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salvador Salgadobarajas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?