Google Inc. v. Rockstar Consortium US LP et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Google Inc.
Defendant: Rockstar Consortium US LP and MobileStar Technologies LLC
Case Number: 5:2013cv05933
Filed: December 23, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2015 Filing 150 REPORT on the determination of an action regarding patent (cc: form mailed to register). (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2015)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 148 Joint Motion to Dismiss action (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2015)
February 18, 2015 Filing 148 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by Google Inc., Rockstar Consortium US LP, MobileStar Technologies LLC. Responses due by 3/4/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Curran, Patrick) (Filed on 2/18/2015) Modified on 2/19/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2015 Filing 147 CLERK'S NOTICE: Notice is hereby given that the Further Case Management Conference/ Claims Construction Hearing/ Motion Hearing, previously set for Thursday, April 30, 2015, is continued to Thursday, May 7, 2015, at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612. Case Management Statement due by April 30, 2015. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2015)
January 7, 2015 Filing 146 Order granting 145 Motion to Stay entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
December 31, 2014 Filing 145 Second Unopposed MOTION to Stay Case filed by MobileStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. Responses due by 1/14/2015. Replies due by 1/21/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joshua W. Budwin, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Proposed Order)(Budwin, Joshua) (Filed on 12/31/2014) Modified on 12/31/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 25, 2014 Filing 144 Order granting 143 Motion to Stay entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
November 22, 2014 Filing 143 CORRECTED Unopposed MOTION to Stay filed by MobileStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. Responses due by 12/8/2014. Replies due by 12/15/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Proposed Order)(Budwin, Joshua) (Filed on 11/22/2014) Modified on 11/24/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 21, 2014 Filing 142 Unopposed MOTION to Stay filed by MobileStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. Responses due by 12/5/2014. Replies due by 12/12/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Proposed Order)(Budwin, Joshua) (Filed on 11/21/2014) Modified on 11/24/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 4, 2014 Filing 141 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Regarding Mediation by Google Inc.. (Curran, Patrick) (Filed on 11/4/2014)
October 27, 2014 Filing 140 JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 139 filed by Google Inc., Rockstar Consortium US LP, MobileStar Technologies. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Liu, Jason) (Filed on 10/27/2014) Modified on 10/28/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 24, 2014 Filing 139 JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT filed by Google Inc., Rockstar Consortium US LP, MobileStar Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Curran, Patrick) (Filed on 10/24/2014) Modified on 10/27/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Denying 67 Motion to Transfer Case. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2014)
October 14, 2014 Filing 137 NOTICE by Google Inc. Notice of Order by the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Texas Staying and Administratively Closing Proceedings (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Curran, Patrick) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
October 9, 2014 Filing 136 Notice of Order by the Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit Granting-In-Part Petitions for Writ of Mandamus to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Texas by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Curran, Patrick) (Filed on 10/9/2014) Modified on 10/10/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 134 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory to the Superior Court of Justice of Ontario, Canada for Nortel Networks Corporation, Jean-Pierre Fortin, Angela de Wilton, Jaspreet Harit, Yee-Ning Chan, Brian Finlay Beaton, Bruce Dale Stalkie, Mitch A. Brisebois, Laura A. Mahan, Paul Michael Brennan, Brian Cruickshank, and John Eric Lumsden. (Attachments: # 1 Letters Rogatory) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2014)
September 29, 2014 Filing 134 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory to the Superior Court of Justice of Ontario, Canada for Nortel Networks Corporation, Jean-Pierre Fortin, Angela de Wilton, Jaspreet Harit, Yee-Ning Chan, Brian Finlay Beaton, Bruce Dale Stalkie, Mitch A. Brisebois, Laura A. Mahan, Paul Michael Brennan, Brian Cruickshank, and John Eric Lumsden filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Google's Notice of Unopposed Motion and Motion for Issuance of Letter Rogatory, # 2 Declaration of Kristin J. Madigan In Support of Google's Unopposed Motion for Issuance of Letter Rogatory, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 17, # 20 Exhibit 18, # 21 Exhibit 19, # 22 Exhibit 20, # 23 Exhibit 21, # 24 Proposed Order)(Curran, Patrick) (Filed on 9/29/2014) Modified on 9/30/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 26, 2014 Filing 133 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan Ross Jaffe on behalf of Google, Inc. (Jaffe, Jordan) (Filed on 9/26/2014)
September 26, 2014 Filing 132 Order granting 123 Motion for Pro Hac Vice entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
September 23, 2014 Filing 131 Declaration of Jason Liu in Support of 123 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8937450.) filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 123 ) (Liu, Jason) (Filed on 9/23/2014) Modified on 9/24/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 122 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2014)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 121 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2014)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 120 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2014)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 119 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2014)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 118 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2014)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 117 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2014)
September 22, 2014 Filing 124 NOTICE by Google Inc. Notice of Agreement for Supplemental and/or Amended Claim Constructions (Curran, Patrick) (Filed on 9/22/2014)
September 22, 2014 Filing 123 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8937450.) filed by Google Inc.. (Liu, Jason) (Filed on 9/22/2014)
September 18, 2014 Filing 122 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8930723.) filed by MobileStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Sibley, Mitchell) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
September 18, 2014 Filing 121 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8930543.) filed by MobileStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Moore, Ashley) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
September 18, 2014 Filing 120 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8930490.) filed by MobileStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Lipschitz, Warren) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
September 18, 2014 Filing 119 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8930393.) filed by MobileStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Li, Kathy) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
September 18, 2014 Filing 118 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8930367.) filed by MobileStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Kamprath, Richard) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
September 18, 2014 Filing 117 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8930337.) filed by MobileStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Mathews, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
September 15, 2014 Filing 116 NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria F. Maroulis (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 9/15/2014)
September 11, 2014 Filing 115 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay Cooper (Cooper, Lindsay) (Filed on 9/11/2014)
September 11, 2014 Filing 114 Order granting 111 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 112 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2014)
September 10, 2014 Filing 112 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8910530.) filed by MobileStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Morris, Joshua) (Filed on 9/10/2014)
September 10, 2014 Filing 111 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Mediation Deadline filed by Google Inc., Rockstar Consortium US LP, MobileStar Technologies. (Curran, Patrick) (Filed on 9/10/2014) Modified on 9/11/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2014 Filing 110 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Cannon (Cannon, Matthew) (Filed on 9/9/2014)
September 9, 2014 Filing 109 NOTICE of Appearance by David Eiseman, IV (Eiseman, David) (Filed on 9/9/2014)
August 27, 2014 Filing 108 NOTICE by Google Inc. of Filings in The Court of Appeals for The Federal Circuit Regarding Petitions for Writ of Mandamus to The Eastern District of Texas (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Warren, Matthew) (Filed on 8/27/2014) Modified on 8/28/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2014 Filing 107 NOTICE by Google Inc. Notice of Filing Before The Court of Appeals for The Federal Circuit of Petition for Writ of Mandamus to The Eastern District of Texas (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Warren, Matthew) (Filed on 8/22/2014)
August 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING 66 MOTION FOR INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2014)
August 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DEFERRING RULING ON 67 MOTION TO TRANSFER. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2014)
August 20, 2014 Filing 104 NOTICE by Google Inc. Notice of Filing Before The Court of Appeals for The Federal Circuit of Petitions for Writ of Mandamus to The Eastern District of Texas (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Warren, Matthew) (Filed on 8/20/2014)
August 14, 2014 Filing 103 NOTICE of Filing Before The Court of Appeals for The Federal Circuit of Petition for Writ of Mandamus to The Eastern District of Texas by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Warren, Matthew) (Filed on 8/14/2014) Modified on 8/15/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 100 Stipulation Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information for Patent Litigation. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2014)
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 99 Stipulation Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2014)
August 4, 2014 Filing 100 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information for Patent Litigation filed by Google Inc., Rockstar Consortium U.S. LP, MobileStar Technologies LLC. (Warren, Matthew) (Filed on 8/4/2014) Modified on 8/5/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 4, 2014 Filing 99 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information filed by Google Inc., Rockstar Consortium U.S. LP, MobileStar Technologies LLC. (Warren, Matthew) (Filed on 8/4/2014) Modified on 8/5/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 4, 2014 Filing 98 Transcript of Proceedings held on June 26, 2014, before Judge Claudia Wilken. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov, diane.transcripts@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 86 Transcript Order, 85 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/3/2014. (Related documents(s) 86 , 85 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 8/4/2014)
July 29, 2014 Filing 97 Order granting 96 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
July 28, 2014 Filing 96 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time for Proposed E-Discovery Order filed by Google Inc., Rockstar Consortium U.S. LP, MobileStar Technologies LLC. (Warren, Matthew) (Filed on 7/28/2014) Modified on 7/29/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 21, 2014 Filing 95 Order granting 94 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
July 18, 2014 Filing 94 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time for Proposed E-Discovery Order filed by Google Inc., Rockstar Consortium US LP, MobileStar Technologies LLC. (Warren, Matthew) (Filed on 7/18/2014) Modified on 7/21/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 18, 2014 Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by Roderick Manley Thompson (Thompson, Roderick) (Filed on 7/18/2014)
July 18, 2014 Filing 92 NOTICE of Appearance by Eugene Y. Mar (Mar, Eugene) (Filed on 7/18/2014)
July 18, 2014 Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by Erik Christopher Olson (Olson, Erik) (Filed on 7/18/2014)
July 7, 2014 CASE REFERRED to Private ADR 88 . (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 90 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byMobileStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 67 ) (Budwin, Joshua) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 89 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byMobileStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 67 ) (Budwin, Joshua) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
June 27, 2014 Filing 86 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Google Inc. for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Warren, Matthew) (Filed on 6/27/2014)
June 27, 2014 Filing 85 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by MobileStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Sochia, David) (Filed on 6/27/2014)
June 26, 2014 Filing 88 Minute Entry and Case Management Order: Initial Case Management Conference held on 6/26/2014 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 6/26/2014)\.Case referred to mediation; Amended Pleadings due by 8/25/2014; Further Case Management Conference/ Claims Construction Hearing/ Motion Hearing set for 4/30/2015 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken; Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/2/2015 02:00 PM; Jury Selection /Jury Trial (10 day) set for 9/14/2015 08:30 AM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/26/2014)
June 26, 2014 Filing 87 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/26/2014 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 6/26/2014). (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/26/2014)
June 26, 2014 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Daniel Curran (Curran, Patrick) (Filed on 6/26/2014)
June 26, 2014 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Kramer Verhoeven (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 6/26/2014)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 82 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d regarding In re Nintendo of America, Inc., et al., No. 2014-132 (Fed. Cir. June 25, 2014) filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Warren, Matthew) (Filed on 6/25/2014)
June 19, 2014 Filing 81 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Google Inc., Rockstar Consortium US LP, MobileStar Technologies LLC. (Warren, Matthew) (Filed on 6/19/2014) Modified on 6/20/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2014 Filing 80 Refiled REDACTED Declaration of Afzal Dean in support of Motion to Dismiss (pursuant to re 70 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal) filed byMobileStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Related document(s) 70 ) (Budwin, Joshua) (Filed on 6/4/2014) Modified on 6/5/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 30, 2014 Filing 79 Google Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Transfer [Revised Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed] re 70 Order filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 70 ) (Warren, Matthew) (Filed on 5/30/2014) Modified on 6/2/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 30, 2014 Filing 78 REPLY (re 67 MOTION to Transfer Case or, in the Alternative to Stay ) filed byMobileStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration (Supplemental) of Joshua Budwin, # 2 Exhibit 36, # 3 Exhibit 37, # 4 Exhibit 38, # 5 Exhibit 39, # 6 Exhibit 40, # 7 Exhibit 41, # 8 Exhibit 42, # 9 Exhibit 43, # 10 Declaration (Supplemental) of Donald Powers, # 11 Declaration (Supplemental) of John Veschi)(Budwin, Joshua) (Filed on 5/30/2014)
May 30, 2014 Filing 77 Refiled REDACTED Reply Re Motion to Dismiss pursuant to re 70 Order filed byMobileStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Related document(s) 70 ) (Reichman, Courtland) (Filed on 5/30/2014) Modified on 6/2/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 30, 2014 Filing 76 Refiled REDACTED Declaration of Afzal Dean pursuant to 70 Order filed byMobileStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Related document(s) 70 ) (Reichman, Courtland) (Filed on 5/30/2014) Modified on 6/2/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 30, 2014 Filing 75 Refiled REDACTED Motion to Dismiss pursuant to re 70 Order filed byMobileStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Related document(s) 70 ) (Reichman, Courtland) (Filed on 5/30/2014) Modified on 6/2/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 30, 2014 Filing 74 REPLY (re 66 MOTION for Certificate of Interlocutory Appeal ) in Support of Motion for 1292(b) Certification for Interlocutory Review filed byMobileStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Budwin, Joshua) (Filed on 5/30/2014)
May 27, 2014 Filing 73 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM 61 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Answer of Google Inc. to Counterclaims for Patent Infringement of Rockstar Consortium US LP and MobileStar Technologies LLC byGoogle Inc.. (Warren, Matthew) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 23, 2014 Filing 72 RESPONSE (re 67 MOTION to Transfer Case or, in the Alternative to Stay ) Opposition of Google Inc. to Rockstar's Renewed Motion to Transfer or Stay This Action filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kristin J. Madigan, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18)(Warren, Matthew) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
May 23, 2014 Filing 71 RESPONSE (re 66 MOTION for Certificate of Interlocutory Appeal ) Opposition of Google Inc. to Rockstar's Motion for §1292(b) Certification for Interlocutory Review filed byGoogle Inc.. (Warren, Matthew) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken ON ( 19 , 30 , 39 ) MOTIONS TO SEAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byMobileStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 67 ) (Budwin, Joshua) (Filed on 5/15/2014)
May 12, 2014 Filing 68 CLERKS NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the case management conference, previously set for May 14, 2014, is continued to June 26, 2014, at 2:00 p.m., to be heard along with the 67 motion to transfer, in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612. Case Management Statement due by June 19, 2014. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2014)
May 9, 2014 Filing 67 MOTION to Transfer Case or, in the Alternative to Stay filed by MobileStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. Motion Hearing set for 6/26/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 5/23/2014. Replies due by 5/30/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joshua Budwin, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit 29, # 31 Exhibit 30, # 32 Exhibit 31, # 33 Exhibit 32, # 34 Exhibit 33, # 35 Exhibit 34, # 36 Exhibit 35, # 37 Declaration of William Colvin, # 38 Declaration of Brian Egan, # 39 Declaration of Erik Fako, # 40 Declaration of Mark Hearn, # 41 Declaration of Gillian Mccolgan, # 42 Declaration of Matthew Poisson, # 43 Declaration of Donald Powers, # 44 Declaration of Marilyn French-St. George, # 45 Declaration of John Veschi, # 46 Declaration of Bruce Anthony Wootton, # 47 Proposed Order)(Budwin, Joshua) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 9, 2014 Filing 66 MOTION for Certificate of Interlocutory Appeal filed by MobileStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joshua Budwin, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Proposed Order)(Budwin, Joshua) (Filed on 5/9/2014) Modified on 5/12/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2014 Filing 65 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Google Inc., Rockstar Consortium US LP, MobileStar Technologies LLC. (Warren, Matthew) (Filed on 5/7/2014) Modified on 5/8/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2014 Filing 64 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Google Inc. filed by Google Inc., Rockstar Consortium US LP, MobileStar Technologies LLC. (Warren, Matthew) (Filed on 5/7/2014) Modified on 5/8/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2014 Filing 63 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Warren, Matthew) (Filed on 5/7/2014)
May 7, 2014 Filing 62 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options filed by Rockstar Consortium US LLP and MobileStar Technologies LLC (Budwin, Joshua) (Filed on 5/7/2014)
May 5, 2014 Filing 61 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Google Inc. byMobileStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Budwin, Joshua) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
May 1, 2014 Filing 60 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by MobileStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP, Google Inc. (Budwin, Joshua) (Filed on 5/1/2014) Modified on 5/2/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2014 Filing 59 CLERKS NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the Case Management Conference, previously set for May 7, 2014, is continued to May 14, 2014, at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612. Case Management Statement due by May 7, 2014. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2014)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying 20 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2014)
April 17, 2014 Filing 57 NOTICE of Filings of Responses to Motions to Stary Or, In the Alternative, To Transfer to the Northern District of California by MobileStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Rockstar Response to Samsung Motion to Transfer, # 2 Exhibit B - Rockstar Response to ASUSTek Motion to Transfer, # 3 Exhibit C - Rockstar Response to HTC Motion to Transfer, # 4 Exhibit D - Rockstar Response to LG Motion to Transfer, # 5 Exhibit E - Rockstar Response to ZTE Motion to Transfer)(Budwin, Joshua) (Filed on 4/17/2014) Modified on 4/18/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byMobileStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Order Denying Motion to Consolidate Cases, # 2 Exhibit B - Order Denying Motion to Transfer, # 3 Exhibit C - Order Granting Motion to Stay)(Related document(s) 20 ) (Budwin, Joshua) (Filed on 4/17/2014)
April 8, 2014 Filing 55 NOTICE by Google Inc. Notice of Filing of Motion to Stay or, In the Alternative, to Transfer to the Northern District of California (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Warren, Matthew) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byMobileStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - MICROSOFT CORPORATION v. DATATERN, INC.)(Related document(s) 20 ) (Budwin, Joshua) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
April 4, 2014 Reset Deadline/Hearing (See Docket No. 53 ): Case Management Statement due by 4/23/2014. Case Management Conference set for 5/7/2014 02:00 PM. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2014)
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 52 Stipulation TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2014)
April 2, 2014 Filing 52 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by MobileStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP, Google Inc. (Reichman, Courtland) (Filed on 4/2/2014) Modified on 4/3/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2014 Filing 51 NOTICE by Google Inc. Notice of Filing of Motion to Stay or, Alternatively, to Transfer to the Northern District of California (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B - Part 1, # 3 Exhibit B - Part 2, # 4 Exhibit B - Part 3, # 5 Exhibit B - Part 4, # 6 Exhibit B - Part 5, # 7 Exhibit B - Part 6, # 8 Exhibit B - Part 7, # 9 Exhibit B - Part 8, # 10 Exhibit B - Part 9, # 11 Exhibit B - Part 10, # 12 Exhibit C)(Warren, Matthew) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 28, 2014 Filing 50 NOTICE by Google Inc. Notice of Filing of Motions to Stay or, In the Alternative, to Transfer to the Northern District of California (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B - Part 1, # 3 Exhibit B - Part 2, # 4 Exhibit B - Part 3, # 5 Exhibit B - Part 4, # 6 Exhibit B - Part 5, # 7 Exhibit B - Part 6, # 8 Exhibit C, # 9 Exhibit D)(Warren, Matthew) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 28, 2014 Filing 49 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 25, 2014 Filing 48 NOTICE by Google Inc. Notice of Filing of Motions to Stay or, In the Alternative, to Transfer to the Northern District of California (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B - Part 1, # 3 Exhibit B - Part 2, # 4 Exhibit B - Part 3, # 5 Exhibit B - Part 4, # 6 Exhibit B - Part 5, # 7 Exhibit B - Part 6, # 8 Exhibit B - Part 7, # 9 Exhibit B - Part 8, # 10 Exhibit B - Part 9, # 11 Exhibit C, # 12 Exhibit D, # 13 Exhibit E, # 14 Exhibit F, # 15 Exhibit G, # 16 Exhibit H, # 17 Exhibit I)(Warren, Matthew) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
March 25, 2014 Filing 47 Transcript of Proceedings held on March 13, 2014, before Judge Claudia Wilken. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov, diane.transcripts@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/23/2014. (Related documents(s) 45 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
March 21, 2014 Filing 46 NOTICE by Google Inc. Notice of Filing of Motion to Stay or, In the Alternative, to Transfer to the Northern District of California (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B - Part 1, # 3 Exhibit B - Part 2, # 4 Exhibit B - Part 3, # 5 Exhibit B - Part 4, # 6 Exhibit B - Part 5, # 7 Exhibit B - Part 6, # 8 Exhibit B - Part 7, # 9 Exhibit B - Part 8, # 10 Exhibit C, # 11 Exhibit D, # 12 Exhibit E, # 13 Exhibit F)(Warren, Matthew) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
March 17, 2014 Filing 45 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Google Inc. for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Warren, Matthew) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
March 13, 2014 Filing 44 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/13/2014 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 3/13/2014). (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/13/2014)
February 18, 2014 Filing 43 Order granting 36 Motion for Pro Hac Vice entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
February 18, 2014 Filing 42 Order granting 41 Motion for Pro Hac Vice entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
February 17, 2014 Filing 41 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8381619.) filed by MobileStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Budwin, Joshua) (Filed on 2/17/2014)
February 13, 2014 Filing 40 REPLY (re 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(2) AND 12(b)(3) FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND IMPROPER VENUE AND TO DECLINE EXERCISING JURISDICTION UNDER THE DECLARATORY JUDGMENT ACT ) REDACTED VERSION filed byMobileStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Reichman, Courtland) (Filed on 2/13/2014)
February 13, 2014 Filing 39 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by MobileStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of David Sochia, # 3 REDACTED Reply re Motion to Dismiss, # 4 UNREDACTED Reply re Motion to Dismiss)(Reichman, Courtland) (Filed on 2/13/2014)
February 13, 2014 Filing 38 First Amended Declaration of DAVID SOCHIA in Support of 30 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Google Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Transfer filed byMobileStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Related document(s) 30 ) (Sochia, David) (Filed on 2/13/2014) Modified on 2/14/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2014 Filing 36 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8376372.) filed by MobileStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (McKool, Mike) (Filed on 2/13/2014)
February 13, 2014 Filing 35 Declaration of David Sochia in Support of 30 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Google Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Transfer filed byMobileStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Related document(s) 30 ) (Sochia, David) (Filed on 2/13/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 34 Order granting 33 Motion for Pro Hac Vice entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
February 7, 2014 Filing 37 EXHIBIT 11 and 30 (CD) re 31 Declaration of Kristin J. Madigan filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 31 ) (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2014)
February 7, 2014 Filing 33 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8360222.) filed by MobileStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Cawley, Douglas) (Filed on 2/7/2014)
February 7, 2014 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc. re 31 Declaration in Support,,,, 30 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Google Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Transfer (Warren, Matthew) (Filed on 2/7/2014)
February 7, 2014 Filing 31 Declaration of Kristin J. Madigan in Support of 30 Google Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Transfer filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19 - Part 1 of 3, # 20 Exhibit 19 - Part 2 of 3, # 21 Exhibit 19 - Part 3 of 3, # 22 Exhibit 20, # 23 Exhibit 21 - Part 1 of 2, # 24 Exhibit 21 - Part 2 of 2, # 25 Exhibit 22, # 26 Exhibit 23, # 27 Exhibit 24, # 28 Exhibit 25, # 29 Exhibit 26, # 30 Exhibit 27, # 31 Exhibit 28, # 32 Exhibit 29, # 33 Exhibit 30, # 34 Exhibit 31, # 35 Exhibit 32, # 36 Exhibit 33, # 37 Exhibit 34, # 38 Exhibit 35, # 39 Exhibit 36, # 40 Exhibit 37)(Related document(s) 30 ) (Warren, Matthew) (Filed on 2/7/2014) Modified on 2/10/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2014 Filing 30 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Google Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Transfer filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kristin J. Madigan In Support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Google Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Transfer, # 4 Unredacted Version of Google Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Transfer, # 5 Declaration of Abeer Dubey In Support of Google Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Transfer)(Warren, Matthew) (Filed on 2/6/2014)
January 28, 2014 Filing 29 Certificate of Interested Entities by Google Inc. identifying Other Affiliate LG Electronics Inc., Other Affiliate Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Other Affiliate HTC Corporation, Other Affiliate HTC America, Inc., Other Affiliate Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Other Affiliate Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate ZTE Corporation, Other Affiliate Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Other Affiliate Asus Computer International, Inc., Other Affiliate Huawei Technologies USA, Inc, Other Affiliate Asustek Computer, Inc., Other Affiliate Huawei Device USA, Inc., Other Affiliate LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., Other Affiliate LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Other Affiliate Huawei Device Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Pantech Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Pantech Wireless, Inc., Other Affiliate Huawei Investment & Holding Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Huawei Technologies Coperatief U.A., Other Affiliate ZTE (USA) Inc., Other Affiliate ZTE Solutions for Google Inc.. (Warren, Matthew) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 28, 2014 Filing 28 Order granting 26 Motion for Pro Hac Vice entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
January 27, 2014 Filing 27 Declaration of Kristin J. Madigan in Support of 19 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal certain portions of Defendant's Motion to dismiss and supporting declaration filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 19 ) (Madigan, Kristin) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 27, 2014 Filing 26 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8324215.) filed by MobileStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Stevenson, Theodore) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 24, 2014 Filing 25 Certificate of Interested Entities by MobileStar Technologies LLC identifying Corporate Parent Rockstar Consortium US LP, Other Affiliate Microsoft Corporation, Other Affiliate Blackberry Limited, Other Affiliate ICA IPLA Holdings Inc. (Sony), Other Affiliate Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ), Other Affiliate Apple Inc. for MobileStar Technologies LLC. (Reichman, Courtland) (Filed on 1/24/2014)
January 24, 2014 Filing 24 Certificate of Interested Entities by Rockstar Consortium US LP identifying Other Affiliate Microsoft Corporation, Other Affiliate Blackberry Limited, Other Affiliate ICA IPLA Holdings Inc. (Sony), Other Affiliate Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ), Other Affiliate Apple Inc. for Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Reichman, Courtland) (Filed on 1/24/2014)
January 24, 2014 Filing 23 Order granting 18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
January 24, 2014 Electronic filing error. Names of interested entities or person were not entered. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: 22 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Rockstar Consortium US LP, 21 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by MobileStar Technologies LLC (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2014)
January 23, 2014 Filing 22 Certificate of Interested Entities by Rockstar Consortium US LP (Reichman, Courtland) (Filed on 1/23/2014)
January 23, 2014 Filing 21 Certificate of Interested Entities by MobileStar Technologies LLC (Reichman, Courtland) (Filed on 1/23/2014)
January 23, 2014 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(2) AND 12(b)(3) FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND IMPROPER VENUE AND TO DECLINE EXERCISING JURISDICTION UNDER THE DECLARATORY JUDGMENT ACT filed by MobileStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 2/6/2014. Replies due by 2/13/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Afzal Dean, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H)(Reichman, Courtland) (Filed on 1/23/2014)
January 23, 2014 Filing 19 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal certain portions of Defendant's Motion to dismiss and supporting declaration filed by MobileStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration OF JOSHUA BUDWIN, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 REDACTED Motion to Dimiss, # 4 UNREDACTED Motion to Dismiss, # 5 REDACTED Declaration of Afzal Dean, # 6 UNREDACTED Declaration of Afzal Dean)(Reichman, Courtland) (Filed on 1/23/2014)
January 23, 2014 Filing 18 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8317159.) filed by MobileStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Sochia, David) (Filed on 1/23/2014)
January 14, 2014 Filing 17 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO GOOGLE'S COMPLAINT filed by MobileStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP, Google Inc. (Reichman, Courtland) (Filed on 1/14/2014) Modified on 1/15/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 8, 2014 Filing 16 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding patent (cc: form mailed to register). (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2014)
January 7, 2014 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc. re 14 Case Management Scheduling Order, (Warren, Matthew) (Filed on 1/7/2014)
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE: Case Management Statement due by 4/2/2014. Case Management Conference set for 4/9/2014 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/7/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2014)
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Claudia Wilken for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal no longer assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 1/7/2014. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2014)
January 6, 2014 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge: All matters presently set before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal are hereby vacated. Clerk to reassign case. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
January 6, 2014 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Google Inc... (Warren, Matthew) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
January 6, 2014 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Google Inc.. MobileStar Technologies LLC served on 12/26/2013, answer due 1/16/2014. (Warren, Matthew) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
January 6, 2014 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Google Inc.. Rockstar Consortium US LP served on 12/26/2013, answer due 1/16/2014. (Warren, Matthew) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
December 24, 2013 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/1/2014. Case Management Conference set for 4/8/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2013)
December 23, 2013 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Rockstar Consortium US LP. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2013)
December 23, 2013 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to MobileStar Technologies LLC. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2013)
December 23, 2013 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2013)
December 23, 2013 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Google Inc. (Warren, Matthew) (Filed on 12/23/2013)
December 23, 2013 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Warren, Matthew) (Filed on 12/23/2013)
December 23, 2013 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Warren, Matthew) (Filed on 12/23/2013)
December 23, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment of Non-Infringement against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-8252154.). Filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Warren, Matthew) (Filed on 12/23/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Google Inc. v. Rockstar Consortium US LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Google Inc.
Represented By: Matthew S. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockstar Consortium US LP
Represented By: Courtland Lewis Reichman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MobileStar Technologies LLC
Represented By: Courtland Lewis Reichman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?