Campbell et al v. Facebook Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiffs Matthew Campbell and Michael Hurley are filing a class-action lawsuit against Facebook for alleged violations of federal and state privacy laws. According to the complaint, Facebook systematically intercepts users' messages in order to mine user data for sharing with third parties – namely, advertisers, marketers, and other data aggregators.

Plaintiff: Matthew Campbell and Michael Hurley
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
Case Number: 5:2013cv05996
Filed: December 30, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 19, 2016 216 RESPONSE (re 208 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents ) Defendant Facebook, Inc.s Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Production of Documents filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Maute Declaration in Support of Facebooks Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Production of Documents)(Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 8/19/2016)
August 19, 2016 215 RESPONSE (re 207 MOTION to Compel Production of Configuration Tables ) Defendant Facebook, Inc.s Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Production of Configuration Tables filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Poole Declaration in Support of Facebooks Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Production of Configuration Tables)(Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 8/19/2016)
August 19, 2016 214 RESPONSE (re 206 MOTION to Compel Production of Source Code ) Defendant Facebook, Inc.s Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Production of Source Code filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Poole Declaration in Support of Facebooks Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Production of Source Code)(Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 8/19/2016)
August 19, 2016 213 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant Facebook, Inc.s Administrative Motion to File Documents in Support of Its Oppositions to Plaintiffs Motions to Compel Under Seal filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nikki Stitt Sokol In Support Of Defendant Facebook, Inc.s Administrative Motion to File Documents in Support of its Oppositions to Plaintiffs Motions to Compel Under Seal, # 2 [Proposed] Order Authorizing the Filing of Documents Under Seal, # 3 Exhibit 1 (Unredacted) Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Production of Source Code, # 4 Exhibit 2 (Redacted) Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Production of Source Code, # 5 Exhibit 3 (Unredacted) Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Production of Configuration Tables, # 6 Exhibit 4 (Redacted) Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Production of Configuration Tables, # 7 Exhibit 5 (Unredacted) Poole Declaration in Support of Facebooks Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Production of Configuration Tables, # 8 Exhibit 6 (Redacted) Poole Declaration in Support of Facebooks Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Production of Configuration Tables, # 9 Exhibit 7 (Unredacted) Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Production of Documents, # 10 Exhibit 8 (Redacted) Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Production of Documents, # 11 Exhibit 9 (Unredacted) Maute Declaration in Support of Facebooks Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Production of Documents, # 12 Exhibit 10 (Redacted) Maute Declaration in Support of Facebooks Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Production of Documents, # 13 Proof of Service)(Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 8/19/2016)
August 9, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 207 MOTION to Compel, 208 MOTION to Compel, 206 MOTION to Compel. Responses due by 8/19/2016. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2016)
August 9, 2016 212 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR FACEBOOK INC TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS TO COMPEL (DKT. NOS. 206-208) by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 210 Stipulation.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2016)
August 8, 2016 211 Declaration of Nikki Stitt Sokol in Support of 205 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Plaintiffs' Motions to Compel Discovery filed byFacebook Inc.. (Related document(s) 205 ) (Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 8/8/2016)
August 3, 2016 210 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 206 MOTION to Compel Production of Source Code, 207 MOTION to Compel Production of Configuration Tables, 208 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Extend Time for Defendant Facebook, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motions to Compel filed by Facebook Inc.. (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 8/3/2016)
August 2, 2016 209 Declaration of David Rudolph in Support of 208 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents, 206 MOTION to Compel Production of Source Code, 207 MOTION to Compel Production of Configuration Tables filed byMatthew Campbell, Michael Hurley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12)(Related document(s) 208 , 206 , 207 ) (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 8/2/2016)
August 2, 2016 208 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley. Responses due by 8/9/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 8/2/2016)
August 2, 2016 207 MOTION to Compel Production of Configuration Tables filed by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley. Responses due by 8/9/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Dr. Jennifer Golbeck)(Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 8/2/2016)
August 2, 2016 206 MOTION to Compel Production of Source Code filed by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley. Responses due by 8/9/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 8/2/2016)
August 2, 2016 205 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Plaintiffs' Motions to Compel Discovery filed by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service, # 3 Declaration of Melissa Gardner, # 4 Exhibit A (Unredacted) Motion to Compel Source Code, # 5 Exhibit B (Redacted) Motion to Compel Source Code, # 6 Exhibit C (Unredacted) Motion to Compel Configuration Tables, # 7 Exhibit D (Redacted) Motion to Compel Configuration Tables, # 8 Exhibit E (Unredacted) Motion to Compel Production of Documents, # 9 Exhibit F (Redacted) Motion to Compel Documents, # 10 Exhibit G (Unredacted) Declaration of Dr. Jennifer Golbeck, # 11 Exhibit H (Redacted) Declaration of Dr. Jennifer Golbeck, # 12 Exhibit I (Unredacted) Rudolph Decl. Ex. 1, # 13 Exhibit J (Redacted) Rudolph Decl. Ex. 1, # 14 Exhibit K (Unredacted) Rudolph Decl. Ex. 11, # 15 Exhibit L (Redacted) Rudolph Decl. Ex. 11, # 16 Exhibit M - Rudolph Decl. Ex. 5 (under seal), # 17 Exhibit N - Rudolph Decl. Ex. 7 (under seal), # 18 Exhibit O - Rudolph Decl. Ex. 8 (under seal), # 19 Exhibit P - Rudolph Decl. Ex. 9 (under seal), # 20 Exhibit Q - Rudolph Decl. Ex. 10 (under seal), # 21 Exhibit R - Rudolph Decl. Ex. 12 (under seal))(Gardner, Melissa) (Filed on 8/2/2016)
July 5, 2016 204 NOTICE OF REFERRAL FOR DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 7/5/2016. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2016)
July 5, 2016 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim for Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2016)
June 30, 2016 203 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton: Further Case Management Conference held on 6/30/2016. Non-Expert Discovery due by 11/30/2016. Disclosure of Experts due by 1/18/2017. Cross Motions for Summary Judgment shall be filed by 1/18/2017.FTR Time 2:33-3:25. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/30/2016)
June 28, 2016 202 ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint by Facebook Inc.. (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 6/28/2016) Modified on 6/29/2016 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
June 23, 2016 201 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT by Plaintiffs and Defendant Facebook, Inc., filed by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 6/23/2016)
June 17, 2016 200 STIPULATION re 196 Amended Complaint To Extend Time For Defendant Facebook, Inc. To Respond To Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Facebook Inc.. (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 6/17/2016)
June 15, 2016 199 NOTICE by Facebook Inc. Joint Notice of Refiling of Documents Accompanying Class Certification Briefs and Evidentiary Objections (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1 - Replacement for Dkt. 178-1, # 2 Ex. 2 - Replacement for Dkt. 183-4, # 3 Ex. 3 - Replacement for Dkt. 179-1, # 4 Ex. 4 - Replacement for Dkt. 184-3, # 5 Ex. 5 - Replacement for Dkt. 179-2, # 6 Ex. 6 - Replacement for Dkt. 179-3, # 7 Ex. 7 - Replacement for Dkt. 179-4, # 8 Ex. 8 - Replacement for Dkt. 179-5, # 9 Ex. 9 - Replacement for Dkt. 179-6, # 10 Ex. 10 - Replacement for Dkt. 179-7, # 11 Ex. 11 - Replacement for Dkt. 179-10, # 12 Ex. 12 - Replacement for Dkt. 179-11, # 13 Ex. 13 - Replacement for Dkt. 179-12, # 14 Ex. 14 - Replacement for Dkt. 179-13, # 15 Ex. 15 - Replacement for Dkt. 179-14, # 16 Ex. 16 - Replacement for Dkt. 179-15, # 17 Ex. 17 - Replacement for Dkt. 179-16, # 18 Ex. 18 - Replacement for Dkt. 179-17, # 19 Ex. 19 - Replacement for Dkt. 179-18, # 20 Ex. 20 - Replacement for Dkt. 179-20, # 21 Ex. 21 - Replacement for Dkt. 180-2, # 22 Ex. 22 - Replacement for Dkt. 180-3, # 23 Ex. 23 - Replacement for Dkt. 184-9, # 24 Ex. 24 - Replacement for Dkt. 180-7, # 25 Ex. 25 - Replacement for Dkt. 180-9, # 26 Ex. 26 - Replacement for Dkt. 180-12, # 27 Ex. 27 - Replacement for Dkt. 180-17, # 28 Ex. 28 - Replacement for Dkt. 180-18, # 29 Ex. 29 - Replacement for Dkt. 180-19, # 30 Ex. 30 - Replacement for Dkt. 180-20, # 31 Ex. 31 - Replacement for Dkt. 180-21, # 32 Ex. 32 - Replacement for Dkt. 180-22, # 33 Ex. 33 - Replacement for Dkt. 180-23, # 34 Ex. 34 - Replacement for Dkt. 178-5)(Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 6/15/2016)
June 9, 2016 198 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING REMOVAL OF REFERENCES TO PLAINTIFFS' PREVIOUSLY DISMISSED CLAIMS IN THE SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT re 195 Stipulation filed by Michael Hurley, Matthew Campbell. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/9/16. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2016)
June 8, 2016 197 Proposed Order re 195 Stipulation Regarding Removal Of References To Plaintiffs Previously Dismissed Claims In The Second Amended Class Action Complaint by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 6/8/2016)
June 7, 2016 196 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Class Action Complaint against Facebook Inc.. Filed byMatthew Campbell, Michael Hurley. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 6/7/2016)
June 7, 2016 195 STIPULATION Regarding Removal Of References To Plaintiffs Previously Dismissed Claims In The Second Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 6/7/2016)
May 20, 2016 194 Featured Case ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS OBJECTION re 191 Response ( Non Motion ), filed by Facebook Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/20/16. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2016)
May 18, 2016 193 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting in part and denying in part 181 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2016)
May 18, 2016 192 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting in part and denying in part 138 Motion to Certify Class. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2016)
May 18, 2016 191 RESPONSE to re 187 Objection, Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Request to Respond to Plaintiffs' "Objection" to Facebook's Errata Regarding Certain Pre-Class Period Conduct by Facebook Inc.. (Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 5/18/2016)
May 17, 2016 Set/Reset Hearing (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2016)
May 17, 2016 190 Discovery Order re 189 Defendant's Request for Telephonic Discovery Conference, 186 Plaintiffs' Request for Telephonic Conference. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/17/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2016)
May 12, 2016 189 MOTION to Appear by Telephone Defendant's Request for Telephonic Discovery Conference filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jeana Bisnar Maute In Support of Defendant's Request for Telephonic Discovery Conference)(Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 5/12/2016)
May 12, 2016 Set Meeting re 188 Discovery Order. Discovery Meet and Confer set for 5/23/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2016)
May 12, 2016 188 Discovery Order requiring parties to appear for courtroom meet and confer re: 186 MOTION to Appear by Telephone. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/12/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2016)
May 12, 2016 187 OBJECTIONS to re 185 Errata, Plaintiffs' Objections to Facebook's Errata to Evidence Filed in Support of Facebook's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 5/12/2016)
May 12, 2016 186 MOTION to Appear by Telephone Plaintiffs' Request for Telephonic Conference filed by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David T. Rudolph in Support of Plaintiffs' Request for Telephonic Conference)(Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 5/12/2016)
May 11, 2016 185 ERRATA re 183 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,, 184 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, 178 Notice (Other),, 177 Transcript,,, Evidence Filed In Support Of Facebook's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification Regarding Certain Pre-Class Period Conduct by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alex Himel to Correct and Clarify the Record)(Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 5/11/2016)
March 28, 2016 184 EXHIBITS re 181 Administrative Motion to Seal Documents Accompanying Class Certification Briefs and Evidentiary Objections filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 53 (Redacted), # 2 Exhibit 54 (Unredacted), # 3 Exhibit 55 (Redacted), # 4 Exhibit 56 (Unredacted), # 5 Exhibit 57 (Redacted), # 6 Exhibit 58 (Unredacted), # 7 Exhibit 59 (Redacted), # 8 Exhibit 60 (Unredacted), # 9 Exhibit 61 (Redacted), # 10 Exhibit 62 (Unredacted), # 11 Exhibit 63 (Redacted), # 12 Exhibit 64 (Unredacted), # 13 Exhibit 65 (Redacted), # 14 Exhibit 66 (Unredacted), # 15 Exhibit 67 (Redacted), # 16 Exhibit 68 (Unredacted), # 17 Exhibit 69 (Redacted), # 18 Exhibit 70 (Unredacted), # 19 Exhibit 71 (Redacted), # 20 Exhibit 72 (Unredacted), # 21 Exhibit 73 (Redacted), # 22 Proof of Service)(Related document(s) 181 ) (Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 3/28/2016) Modified on 3/29/2016 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2016 183 EXHIBITS re 181 Administrative Motion to Seal Documents Accompanying Class Certification Briefs and Evidentiary Objections filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 29 (Unredacted), # 2 Exhibit 30 (Redacted), # 3 Exhibit 31 (Unredacted), # 4 Exhibit 32 (Redacted), # 5 Exhibit 33 (Unredacted), # 6 Exhibit 34 (Redacted), # 7 Exhibit 35 (Unredacted), # 8 Exhibit 36 (Redacted), # 9 Exhibit 37 (Unredacted), # 10 Exhibit 38 (Redacted), # 11 Exhibit 39 (Unredacted), # 12 Exhibit 40 (Redacted), # 13 Exhibit 41 (Unredacted), # 14 Exhibit 42 (Unredacted), # 15 Exhibit 43 (Unredacted), # 16 Exhibit 44 (Unredacted), # 17 Exhibit 45 (Unredacted), # 18 Exhibit 46 (Unredacted), # 19 Exhibit 47 (Unredacted), # 20 Exhibit 48 (Unredacted), # 21 Exhibit 49 (Unredacted), # 22 Exhibit 50 (Unredacted), # 23 Exhibit 51 (Unredacted), # 24 Exhibit 52 (Unredacted))(Related document(s) 181 ) (Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 3/28/2016) Modified on 3/29/2016 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2016 182 EXHIBITS re 181 Administrative Motion to Seal Documents Accompanying Class Certification Briefs and Evidentiary Objections filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 11 (Unredacted), # 2 Exhibit 12 (Redacted), # 3 Exhibit 13 (Unredacted), # 4 Exhibit 14 (Redacted), # 5 Exhibit 15 (Unredacted), # 6 Exhibit 16 (Redacted), # 7 Exhibit 17 (Unredacted), # 8 Exhibit 18 (Redacted), # 9 Exhibit 19 (Unredacted), # 10 Exhibit 20 (Redacted), # 11 Exhibit 21 (Unredacted), # 12 Exhibit 22 (Redacted), # 13 Exhibit 23 (Unredacted), # 14 Exhibit 24 (Redacted), # 15 Exhibit 25 (Unredacted), # 16 Exhibit 26 (Redacted), # 17 Exhibit 27 (Unredacted), # 18 Exhibit 28 (Redacted))(Related document(s) 181 ) (Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 3/28/2016) Modified on 3/29/2016 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2016 181 Joint Administrative Motion to Seal Documents Accompanying Class Certification Briefs and Evidentiary Objections filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Melissa Gardner Re Joint Administrative Motion to Seal Documents Accompanying Class Certification Briefs and Evidentiary Objections, # 2 Declaration of Nikki Stitt Sokol In Support of the Joint Administrative Motion to Seal Documents Accompanying Class Certification Briefs and Evidentiary Objections, # 3 [Proposed] Order, # 4 Exhibit 1 (Unredacted), # 5 Exhibit 2 (Redacted), # 6 Exhibit 3 (Unredacted), # 7 Exhibit 4 (Redacted), # 8 Exhibit 5 (Unredacted), # 9 Exhibit 6 (Redacted), # 10 Exhibit 7 (Unredacted), # 11 Exhibit 8 (Redacted), # 12 Exhibit 9 (Unredacted), # 13 Exhibit 10 (Redacted))(Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 3/28/2016) Modified on 3/29/2016 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2016 180 EXHIBITS re 179 Notice (Other),,, Exhibits to Joint Notice of Refiling of Documents Accompanying Class Certification Briefs and Evidentiary Objections filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 26 (Unredacted), # 2 Exhibit 27 (Redacted), # 3 Exhibit 28 (Redacted), # 4 Exhibit 29 (Unredacted), # 5 Exhibit 30 (Redacted), # 6 Exhibit 31 (Redacted), # 7 Exhibit 32 (Redacted), # 8 Exhibit 33 (Unredacted), # 9 Exhibit 34 (Redacted), # 10 Exhibit 35 (Unredacted), # 11 Exhibit 36 (Unredacted), # 12 Exhibit 37 (Redacted), # 13 Exhibit 38 (Unredacted), # 14 Exhibit 39 (Unredacted), # 15 Exhibit 40 (Unredacted), # 16 Exhibit 41 (Unredacted), # 17 Exhibit 42 (Redacted), # 18 Exhibit 43 (Redacted), # 19 Exhibit 44 (Redacted), # 20 Exhibit 45 (Redacted), # 21 Exhibit 46 (Redacted), # 22 Exhibit 47 (Redacted), # 23 Exhibit 48 (Redacted), # 24 Exhibit 49 (Unredacted), # 25 Exhibit 50 (Unredacted))(Related document(s) 179 ) (Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 3/28/2016)
March 28, 2016 179 Joint Notice of Refiling of Documents Accompanying Class Certification Briefs and Evidentiary Objections. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Redacted), # 2 Exhibit 2 (Redacted), # 3 Exhibit 3 (Redacted), # 4 Exhibit 4 (Redacted), # 5 Exhibit 5 (Redacted), # 6 Exhibit 6 (Redacted), # 7 Exhibit 7 (Redacted), # 8 Exhibit 8 (Unredacted), # 9 Exhibit 9 (Unredacted), # 10 Exhibit 10 (Redacted), # 11 Exhibit 11 (Redacted), # 12 Exhibit 12 (Redacted), # 13 Exhibit 13 (Redacted), # 14 Exhibit 14 (Redacted), # 15 Exhibit 15 (Redacted), # 16 Exhibit 16 (Redacted), # 17 Exhibit 17 (Redacted), # 18 Exhibit 18 (Redacted), # 19 Exhibit 19 (Unredacted), # 20 Exhibit 20 (Redacted), # 21 Exhibit 21 (Redacted), # 22 Exhibit 22 (Unredacted), # 23 Exhibit 23 (Redacted), # 24 Exhibit 24 (Redacted), # 25 Exhibit 25 (Unredacted))(Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 3/28/2016) Modified on 3/29/2016 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
March 21, 2016 178 Joint Notice of Refiling of Class Certification Briefs and Evidentiary Objections (Dkt. 138, 149, 167, 170, and 172) by Facebook Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Replacement for Dkt. 138 (Redacted), # 2 Exhibit 2 - Replacement for Dkt. 149 (Redacted), # 3 Exhibit 3 - Replacement for Dkt. 167 (Redacted), # 4 Exhibit 4 - Replacement for Dkt. 170, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Replacement for Dkt. 172 (Redacted))(Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 3/21/2016) Modified on 3/22/2016 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
March 17, 2016 177 Transcript of Proceedings held on March 16, 2016, before Judge Hamilton. Court Reporter Victoria L. Valine, CSR, RMR, CRR, victoriavalinecsr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 175 Transcript Order, 176 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 4/7/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/18/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/15/2016. (Related documents(s) 175 , 176 ) (vlv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 16, 2016 176 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley, David Shadpour for Court Reporter Victoria Valine. (Rudolph, David) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
March 16, 2016 175 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Facebook Inc. for Court Reporter Victoria Valine. (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
March 16, 2016 174 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton: Motion Hearing held on 3/16/2016 re 138 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Michael Hurley, Matthew Campbell. Court Reporter: Victoria Valine. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/16/2016)
March 14, 2016 173 Declaration of Nikki Stitt Sokol in Support of 171 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Objection to and Request to Strike New Evidence and Misstatements of Fact filed byFacebook Inc.. (Related document(s) 171 ) (Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
March 9, 2016 172 RESPONSE to re 170 Objection,,, Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Objection to and Request to Strike New Evidence and Misstatements of Fact by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 3/9/2016)
March 9, 2016 171 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Objection to and Request to Strike New Evidence filed by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Melissa Gardner, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit A-Filed Under Seal, # 4 Exhibit B-Redacted, # 5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Gardner, Melissa) (Filed on 3/9/2016)
February 26, 2016 170 OBJECTIONS to re 167 Reply to Opposition/Response, Defendant Facebook, Inc.s Objection to and Request to Strike New Evidence and Misstatements of Fact Contained in in Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Their Motion for Class Certification (Redacted) by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alex Himel In Support of Defendant Facebook, Inc.s Objection to and Request to Strike New Evidence and Misstatements of Fact in Plaintiffs Reply in Support Of Their Motion For Class Certification (Redacted), # 2 Declaration of Dale Harrison In Support of Defendant Facebook, Inc.s Objection to and Request to Strike New Evidence and Misstatements of Fact in Plaintiffs Reply in Support Of Their Motion For Class Certification (Redacted))(Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 2/26/2016)
February 26, 2016 169 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents In Support of Its Objection to and Request to Strike New Evidence and Misstatements of Fact Contained in in Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Their Motion for Class Certification filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nikki Stitt Sokol in Support of Defendant Facebook Inc.s Administrative Motion to File Documents In Support of Its Objection to and Request to Strike New Evidence and Misstatements of Fact Contained in Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Their Motion for Class Certification Under Seal, # 2 [Proposed] Order Authorizing the Filing of Documents Under Seal, # 3 Proof of Service, # 4 Exhibit 1 (Unredacted), # 5 Exhibit 2 (Redacted), # 6 Exhibit 3 (Unredacted), # 7 Exhibit 4 (Redacted), # 8 Exhibit 5 (Unredacted), # 9 Exhibit 6 (Redacted))(Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 2/26/2016)
February 23, 2016 168 Declaration of Nikki Stitt Sokol in Support of 166 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Class Certification filed byFacebook Inc.. (Related document(s) 166 ) (Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 2/23/2016)
February 19, 2016 167 REPLY (re 138 MOTION to Certify Class ) filed byMatthew Campbell, Michael Hurley. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Slade, # 2 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Melissa Gardner)(Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 2/19/2016)
February 19, 2016 166 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Class Certification filed by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service, # 3 Declaration of Melissa Gardner, # 4 Exhibit A (filed under seal), # 5 Exhibit B (redacted), # 6 Exhibit C (filed under seal), # 7 Exhibit D (redacted), # 8 Exhibit E (filed under seal), # 9 Exhibit F (redacted), # 10 Exhibit G (filed under seal), # 11 Exhibit H (redacted), # 12 Exhibit I (filed under seal), # 13 Exhibit J (redacted), # 14 Exhibit K (filed under seal), # 15 Exhibit L (filed under seal), # 16 Exhibit M (filed under seal), # 17 Exhibit N (filed under seal), # 18 Exhibit O (filed under seal), # 19 Exhibit P (filed under seal), # 20 Exhibit Q (filed under seal), # 21 Exhibit R (filed under seal), # 22 Exhibit S (filed under seal), # 23 Exhibit T (filed under seal), # 24 Exhibit U (filed under seal), # 25 Exhibit V (filed under seal), # 26 Exhibit W (filed under seal))(Gardner, Melissa) (Filed on 2/19/2016)
February 8, 2016 165 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Joshua Aaron Jessen (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 2/8/2016)
January 22, 2016 164 Declaration of Melissa Gardner in Support of 147 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Facebook's Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification filed byMatthew Campbell, Michael Hurley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Authorizing the Filing of Documents Under Seal)(Related document(s) 147 ) (Gardner, Melissa) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
January 22, 2016 163 EXHIBITS re 157 Exhibits,,,, Replacement for Dkt. 157-13 (Redacted Appendix of Evidence (Part 13 of 13)) filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Replacement for Dkt. 162-12 (Replacement for Dkt. 157-13 (Redacted Appendix of Evidence (Part 13 of 13))))(Related document(s) 157 ) (Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
January 22, 2016 162 Exhibits in Support of 147 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and Documents in Support of Facebooks Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification (Dkt. 149) filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Replacement for Dkt. 147-1 (Declaration of Nikki Stitt Sokol In Support Of Defendant Facebook, Inc.s Administrative Motion to File Documents in Support of its Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification Under Seal), # 2 Replacement for Dkt. 147-2 ([Proposed] Order Authorizing the Filing of Documents Under Seal), # 3 Replacement for Dkt. 147-5 ((Exhibit 3) Unredacted Chorba Declaration Motion to Seal), # 4 Replacement for Dkt. 147-6 ((Exhibit 4) Redacted Chorba Declaration Motion to Seal), # 5 Replacement for Dkt. 149-1 (Redacted Chorba Declaration Opposition to Class Certification), # 6 Replacement for Dkt. 149-7 (Redacted Expert Report of Dr. Catherine Tucker Opposition to Class Certification), # 7 Replacement for Dkt. 154-11 ((Exhibit 66) Unredacted Tucker Expert Report Motion to Seal), # 8 Replacement for Dkt. 154-12 ((Exhibit 67) Redacted Tucker Expert Report Motion to Seal), # 9 Replacement for Dkt. 155-1 (Unredacted Appendix of Evidence (Part 1 of 19) Motion to Seal), # 10 Replacement for Dkt. 156-9 (Unredacted Appendix of Evidence (Part 19 of 19) Motion to Seal), # 11 Replacement for Dkt. 157-1 (Redacted Appendix of Evidence (Part 1 of 13) Opposition to Class Certification), # 12 Replacement for Dkt. 157-13 (Unredacted Appendix of Evidence (Part 13 of 13)) Motion to Seal))(Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 1/22/2016) Modified on 1/22/2016 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
January 16, 2016 161 EXHIBITS re 149 Opposition/Response to Motion,,,,, filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Himel Decl. - Exhibit MM (Redacted), # 2 Himel Decl. - Exhibit NN (Redacted), # 3 Himel Decl. - Exhibit OO (Redacted), # 4 Fechete Decl. - Exhibit PP (filed under seal), # 5 Fechete Decl. - Exhibit QQ (filed under seal), # 6 Fechete Decl. - Exhibit RR (filed under seal), # 7 Fechete Decl. - Exhibit SS (filed under seal), # 8 Fechete Decl. - Exhibit TT (filed under seal), # 9 Fechete Decl. - Exhibit UU (filed under seal), # 10 Fechete Decl. - Exhibit VV (filed under seal), # 11 Fechete Decl. - Exhibit WW (filed under seal), # 12 Fechete Decl. - Exhibit XX (filed under seal), # 13 Fechete Decl. - Exhibit YY (filed under seal), # 14 Fechete Decl. - Exhibit ZZ (filed under seal), # 15 Fechete Decl. - Exhibit AAA (filed under seal), # 16 Declaration Declaration of Michael Adkins In Support of Defendant Facebook, Inc.s Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification (Redacted))(Related document(s) 149 ) (Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 1/16/2016)
January 16, 2016 160 EXHIBITS re 149 Opposition/Response to Motion,,,,, filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Chorba Decl. - Exhibit Y, # 2 Chorba Decl. - Exhibit Z, # 3 Chorba Decl. - Exhibit AA, # 4 Chorba Decl. - Exhibit BB (Redacted), # 5 Chorba Decl. - Exhibit CC (Redacted), # 6 Chorba Decl. - Exhibit DD (Redacted), # 7 Chorba Decl. - Exhibit EE (Redacted), # 8 Chorba Decl. - Exhibit FF (filed under seal), # 9 Chorba Decl. - Exhibit GG (filed under seal), # 10 Chorba Decl. - Exhibit HH (filed under seal), # 11 Chorba Decl. - Exhibit II (Redacted), # 12 Chorba Decl. - Exhibit JJ (Redacted), # 13 Chorba Decl. - Exhibit KK (filed under seal), # 14 Chorba Decl. - Exhibit LL (filed under seal))(Related document(s) 149 ) (Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 1/16/2016)
January 16, 2016 159 EXHIBITS re 149 Opposition/Response to Motion,,,,, filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Chorba Decl. - Exhibit L (filed under seal), # 2 Chorba Decl. - Exhibit M (filed under seal), # 3 Chorba Decl. - Exhibit N (filed under seal), # 4 Chorba Decl. - Exhibit O (filed under seal), # 5 Chorba Decl. - Exhibit P (filed under seal), # 6 Chorba Decl. - Exhibit Q (filed under seal), # 7 Chorba Decl. - Exhibit R (Redacted), # 8 Chorba Decl. - Exhibit S (filed under seal), # 9 Chorba Decl. - Exhibit T (filed under seal), # 10 Chorba Decl. - Exhibit U (filed under seal), # 11 Chorba Decl. - Exhibit V (filed under seal), # 12 Chorba Decl. - Exhibit W (Redacted), # 13 Chorba Decl. - Exhibit X)(Related document(s) 149 ) (Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 1/16/2016)
January 16, 2016 158 EXHIBITS re 149 Opposition/Response to Motion,,,,, filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Chorba Decl. - Exhibit A (filed under seal), # 2 Chorba Decl. - Exhibit B (filed under seal), # 3 Chorba Decl. - Exhibit C (filed under seal), # 4 Chorba Decl. - Exhibit D (filed under seal), # 5 Chorba Decl. - Exhibit E, # 6 Chorba Decl. - Exhibit F, # 7 Chorba Decl. - Exhibit G, # 8 Chorba Decl. - Exhibit H, # 9 Chorba Decl. - Exhibit I, # 10 Chorba Decl. - Exhibit J, # 11 Chorba Decl. - Exhibit K)(Related document(s) 149 ) (Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 1/16/2016)
January 16, 2016 157 EXHIBITS re 149 Opposition/Response to Motion,,,,, filed byFacebook Inc.. *** ATTACHMENTS 1, 13 LOCKED AT FILER'S REQUEST. SEE DOCUMENT 162 . *** (Attachments: # 1 Appendix of Evidence (Part 1 of 13) (Redacted), # 2 Appendix of Evidence (Part 2 of 13) (Redacted), # 3 Appendix of Evidence (Part 3 of 13) (Redacted), # 4 Appendix of Evidence (Part 4 of 13) (Redacted), # 5 Appendix of Evidence (Part 5 of 13) (Redacted), # 6 Appendix of Evidence (Part 6 of 13) (Redacted), # 7 Appendix of Evidence (Part 7 of 13) (Redacted), # 8 Appendix of Evidence (Part 8 of 13) (Redacted), # 9 Appendix of Evidence (Part 9 of 13) (Redacted), # 10 Appendix of Evidence (Part 10 of 13) (Redacted), # 11 Appendix of Evidence (Part 11 of 13) (Redacted), # 12 Appendix of Evidence (Part 12 of 13) (Redacted), # 13 Appendix of Evidence (Part 13 of 13) (Redacted))(Related document(s) 149 ) (Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 1/16/2016) Modified on 1/22/2016 (ewn, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/22/2016 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
January 16, 2016 156 Exhibits re 147 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Facebook's Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix of Evidence (Part 11 of 19) (Unredacted), # 2 Appendix of Evidence (Part 12 of 19) (Unredacted), # 3 Appendix of Evidence (Part 13 of 19) (Unredacted), # 4 Appendix of Evidence (Part 14 of 19) (Unredacted), # 5 Appendix of Evidence (Part 15 of 19) (Unredacted), # 6 Appendix of Evidence (Part 16 of 19) (Unredacted), # 7 Appendix of Evidence (Part 17 of 19) (Unredacted), # 8 Appendix of Evidence (Part 18 of 19) (Unredacted), # 9 Appendix of Evidence (Part 19 of 19) (Unredacted), # 10 Proof of Service by Electronic Transmission)(Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 1/16/2016) Modified on 1/20/2016 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
January 16, 2016 155 Exhibits re 147 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Facebook's Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix of Evidence (Part 1 of 19) (Unredacted), # 2 Appendix of Evidence (Part 2 of 19) (Unredacted), # 3 Appendix of Evidence (Part 3 of 19) (Unredacted), # 4 Appendix of Evidence (Part 4 of 19) (Unredacted), # 5 Appendix of Evidence (Part 5 of 19) (Unredacted), # 6 Appendix of Evidence (Part 6 of 19) (Unredacted), # 7 Appendix of Evidence (Part 7 of 19) (Unredacted), # 8 Appendix of Evidence (Part 8 of 19) (Unredacted), # 9 Appendix of Evidence (Part 9 of 19) (Unredacted), # 10 Appendix of Evidence (Part 10 of 19) (Unredacted))(Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 1/16/2016) Modified on 1/20/2016 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
January 16, 2016 154 Exhibits re 147 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Facebook's Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 56 (Unredacted), # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 57 (Unredacted), # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 58 (Unredacted), # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 59 (Unredacted), # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 60 (Unredacted), # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 61 (Unredacted), # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 62 (Unredacted), # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 63 (Redacted), # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 64 (Unredacted), # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 65 (Redacted), # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 66 (Unredacted), *** # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 67 (Redacted) DOCUMENT LOCKED AT FILER'S REQUEST. SEE DOCUMENT 162 . *** )(Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 1/16/2016) Modified on 1/20/2016 (vlkS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/22/2016 (ewn, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/22/2016 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
January 16, 2016 153 Exhibits re 147 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Facebook's Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 46 - Part 3 of 3 (Unredacted), # 2 Exhibit 47 (Redacted), # 3 Exhibit 48 (Unredacted), # 4 Exhibit 49 (Redacted), # 5 Exhibit 50 (Unredacted), # 6 Exhibit 51 (Unredacted), # 7 Exhibit 52 (Unredacted), # 8 Exhibit 53 (Unredacted), # 9 Exhibit 54 (Unredacted), # 10 Exhibit 55 (Unredacted))(Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 1/16/2016) Modified on 1/20/2016 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
January 16, 2016 152 Exhibits re 147 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Facebook's Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 38 (Unredacted), # 2 Exhibit 39 (Unredacted), # 3 Exhibit 40 (Unredacted), # 4 Exhibit 41 (Redacted), # 5 Exhibit 42 (Unredacted), # 6 Exhibit 43 (Redacted), # 7 Exhibit 44 (Unredacted), # 8 Exhibit 45 (Redacted), # 9 Exhibit 46 - Part 1 of 3 (Unredacted), # 10 Exhibit 46 - Part 2 of 3 (Unredacted))(Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 1/16/2016) Modified on 1/20/2016 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
January 16, 2016 151 Exhibits re 147 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Facebook's Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 28 (Unredacted), # 2 Exhibit 29 (Unredacted), # 3 Exhibit 30 (Unredacted), # 4 Exhibit 31 (Unredacted), # 5 Exhibit 32 (Unredacted), # 6 Exhibit 33 (Unredacted), # 7 Exhibit 34 (Unredacted), # 8 Exhibit 35 (Unredacted), # 9 Exhibit 36 (Unredacted), # 10 Exhibit 37 (Unredacted))(Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 1/16/2016) Modified on 1/20/2016 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2016 150 Exhibits re 147 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Facebook's Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 18 (Redacted), # 2 Exhibit 19 (Unredacted), # 3 Exhibit 20 (Redacted), # 4 Exhibit 21 (Unredacted), # 5 Exhibit 22 (Unredacted), # 6 Exhibit 23 (Unredacted), # 7 Exhibit 24 (Unredacted), # 8 Exhibit 25 (Unredacted), # 9 Exhibit 26 (Unredacted), # 10 Exhibit 27 (Unredacted))(Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 1/15/2016) Modified on 1/20/2016 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2016 149 RESPONSE (re 138 MOTION to Certify Class ) Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification (Redacted) filed byFacebook Inc.. *** ATTACHMENTS 1, 7 LOCKED AT FILER'S REQUEST. SEE DOCUMENT 162 *** (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Christopher Chorba In Support of Defendant Facebook, Inc.s Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification (Redacted), # 2 Declaration Declaration of Alex Himel In Support of Defendant Facebook, Inc.s Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification (Redacted), # 3 Declaration Declaration of Dan Fechete In Support of Defendant Facebook, Inc.s Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification (Redacted), # 4 Exhibit Expert Report of Dr. Benjamin Goldberg (Redacted), # 5 Exhibit Exhibit BBB to Expert Report of Dr. Benjamin Goldberg, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit CCC to Expert Report of Dr. Benjamin Goldberg, # 7 Exhibit Expert Report of Dr. Catherine Tucker (Redacted), # 8 Exhibit Exhibit DDD to Expert Report of Dr. Catherine Tucker, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit EEE - Expert Report of Dr. Catherine Tucker, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit FFF - Expert Report of Dr. Catherine Tucker, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit GGG - Expert Report of Dr. Catherine Tucker, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit HHH - Expert Report of Dr. Catherine Tucker, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit III - Expert Report of Dr. Catherine Tucker, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit JJJ - Expert Report of Dr. Catherine Tucker)(Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 1/15/2016) Modified on 1/22/2016 (ewn, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/22/2016 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2016 148 Exhibits re 147 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Facebook's Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 9 (Unredacted), # 2 Exhibit 10 (Redacted), # 3 Exhibit 11 (Unredacted), # 4 Exhibit 12 (Redacted), # 5 Exhibit 13 (Unredacted), # 6 Exhibit 14 (Redacted), # 7 Exhibit 15 - Part 1 (Unredacted), # 8 Exhibit 15 - Part 2 (Unredacted), # 9 Exhibit 16 (Redacted), # 10 Exhibit 17 (Unredacted))(Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 1/15/2016) Modified on 1/20/2016 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2016 147 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Facebook's Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification filed by Facebook Inc.. *** ATTACHMENTS 1, 2, 6 LOCKED AT FILER'S REQUEST. SEE DOCUMENT 162 *** (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Nikki Stitt Sokol In Support Of Defendant Facebook, Inc.s Administrative Motion to File Documents in Support of its Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Authorizing the Filing of Documents Under Seal, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (Unredacted), # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (Redacted), # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 3 (Unredacted), # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 4 (Redacted), # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 5 (Unredacted), # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 6 (Redacted), # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 7 (Unredacted), # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 8 (Redacted))(Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 1/15/2016) Modified on 1/22/2016 (ewn, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/22/2016 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2016 146 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting in part and denying in part 143 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2016)
January 7, 2016 145 REPLY (re 143 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Facebook's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification ) filed byFacebook Inc.. (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 1/7/2016)
January 6, 2016 144 RESPONSE (re 143 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Facebook's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification ) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Facebook's Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages filed byMatthew Campbell, Michael Hurley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 1/6/2016)
January 4, 2016 143 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Facebook's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christopher Chorba ISO Facebook's Administrative Motion to Enlarge Page Limit for Its Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 2 Proposed Order)(Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 1/4/2016)
November 17, 2015 142 Declaration of Nikki Stitt Sokol in Support of 137 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byFacebook Inc.. (Related document(s) 137 ) (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 11/17/2015)
November 16, 2015 141 NOTICE by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley re 131 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,, 110 , 111 , 121 , 127 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Letter Brief re Plaintiffs' Third Set of RFPs (Dkt. 112), # 2 Exhibit 2 Letter Brief re Plaintiffs' Interrogatory 8 and RFP 41 (Dkt. 113) and Exhibit E thereto (Dkt. 113-5), # 3 Exhibit 3 Exhibits A-D to Letter Brief re Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition (Dkt. 122-1 122-4), # 4 Exhibit 4 Plaintiffs' Response to Harrison Declaration (Dkt. 128))(Gardner, Melissa) (Filed on 11/16/2015)
November 16, 2015 140 Notice of Filing of Re-Redacted Declaration of Dale Harrison in Response to Order on Administrative Motion to File under Seal filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 126 , 131 ) (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 11/16/2015) Modified on 11/16/2015 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
November 16, 2015 139 NOTICE of Appearance by Priyanka Rajagopalan for Defendant Facebook Inc. (Rajagopalan, Priyanka) (Filed on 11/16/2015)
November 13, 2015 138 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley. Motion Hearing set for 3/16/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 1/15/2016. Replies due by 2/19/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael W. Sobol, # 2 Declaration of Hank Bates, # 3 Declaration of David T. Rudolph, # 4 Declaration of Melissa Gardner, # 5 Proposed Order)(Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 11/13/2015)
November 13, 2015 137 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service, # 3 Declaration of Melissa Gardner, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit I, # 13 Exhibit J, # 14 Exhibit K, # 15 Exhibit L, # 16 Exhibit M, # 17 Exhibit N, # 18 Exhibit O, # 19 Exhibit P, # 20 Exhibit Q, # 21 Exhibit R, # 22 Exhibit S, # 23 Exhibit T, # 24 Exhibit U, # 25 Exhibit V, # 26 Exhibit W, # 27 Exhibit X, # 28 Exhibit Y, # 29 Exhibit Z, # 30 Exhibit AA, # 31 Exhibit BB, # 32 Exhibit CC, # 33 Exhibit DD)(Gardner, Melissa) (Filed on 11/13/2015)
November 3, 2015 136 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 133 Motion ; denying 134 Motion for Extension of Time to File (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2015)
November 2, 2015 135 RESPONSE (re 134 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Renewed Motion to Continue Class Certification and Summary Judgment Deadlines ) filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joshua Jessen, # 2 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Joshua Jessen)(Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
October 29, 2015 134 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Renewed Motion to Continue Class Certification and Summary Judgment Deadlines filed by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael W. Sobol, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Proposed Order)(Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 10/29/2015)
October 28, 2015 133 MOTION for Relief from Nondispositive Order of Magistrate Judge re 130 Discovery Order filed by Facebook Inc.. Responses due by 10/28/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christopher Chorba In Support Of Facebook, Inc.'s Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Order of Magistrate Judge, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Christopher Chorba, # 3 Proposed Order)(Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 10/28/2015)
October 16, 2015 132 TRANSCRIPT OF TELEPHONIC PROCEEDINGS OF THE OFFICIAL ELECTRONIC SOUND RECORDING - FTR 2:20-3:35 held on 09/29/2015, before Judge Maria-Elena James, Magistrate. Transcriber Kelly Polvi, telephone number 503.779.7406; kpolvi@comcast.net. Tape Number: FTR 2:20-3:35. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 120 Transcript Order, 119 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/14/2016. (Related documents(s) 120 , 119 ) (Polvi, Kelly) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
October 15, 2015 131 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting in part and denying in part Administrative Motions to File Under Seal 110 , 111 , 121 , 125 , 127 (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2015)
October 14, 2015 Motions terminated: 122 Joint Discovery Letter Brief on Plaintiffs' 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice filed by Michael Hurley, Matthew Campbell, 112 Joint Discovery Letter Briefre Plaintiffs' Third Set of Requests for Production filed by David Shadpour, Michael Hurley, Matthew Campbell, 113 Joint Discovery Letter Briefon Plaintiffs Request for Production No. 41 and Interrogatory No. 8 filed by David Shadpour, Michael Hurley, Matthew Campbell. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/14/2015. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2015)
October 14, 2015 130 Discovery Order re: Dkt. Nos. 112 , 113 , 122 . Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/14/2015. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2015)
October 13, 2015 129 Declaration of Nikki Stitt Sokol in Support of 127 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Plaintiffs' Response to Declaration of Dale Harrison filed byFacebook Inc.. (Related document(s) 127 ) (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 10/13/2015)
October 8, 2015 128 RESPONSE to re 126 Declaration of Dale Harrison by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 10/8/2015) Modified on 10/9/2015 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
October 8, 2015 127 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Plaintiffs' Response to Declaration of Dale Harrison filed by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Melissa Gardner, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Proposed Order, # 7 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Gardner, Melissa) (Filed on 10/8/2015)
October 6, 2015 126 NOTICE of Filing of Proportionality Declaration by Facebook Inc. re 118 Minute Entry. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Dale Harrison on Behalf of Defendant Facebook, Inc.)(Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 10/6/2015) Modified on 10/7/2015 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
October 6, 2015 125 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the Declaration of Dale Harrison filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nikki Sokol In Support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Exhibit A - Unredacted Version of Declaration of Dale Harrison, # 3 Exhibit B - Redacted Version of Declaration of Dale Harrison, # 4 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 5 Certificate/Proof of Service by Email)(Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 10/6/2015)
October 5, 2015 124 Declaration of Nikki Stitt Sokol in Support of 121 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Joint Letter Brief on Plaintiffs' 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice filed byFacebook Inc.. (Related document(s) 121 ) (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 10/5/2015)
October 2, 2015 123 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by David Shadpour (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 10/2/2015)
October 1, 2015 122 Joint Discovery Letter Brief on Plaintiffs' 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice filed by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 10/1/2015)
October 1, 2015 121 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Joint Letter Brief on Plaintiffs' 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice filed by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Melissa Gardner, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Proposed Order, # 9 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Gardner, Melissa) (Filed on 10/1/2015)
October 1, 2015 120 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley, David Shadpour for Court Reporter FTR - Oakland. (Rudolph, David) (Filed on 10/1/2015)
September 30, 2015 119 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Facebook Inc. for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 9/30/2015)
September 29, 2015 118 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James: Discovery Hearing held on 9/29/2015.FTR Time: 2:20-3:35. Plaintiff Attorneys: Joseph H. Bates, Esq., Melissa A. Gardner, Esq., David T. Rudolph, Esq., Michael W. Sobol, Esq. Defendant Attorneys: Christopher Chorba, Esq., Joshua A. Jessen, Esq., Jean Marie Bisnar Maute, Esq. Interpreter :None Needed. Attachment: Minutes of Telephonic Discovery Hearing.(rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/29/2015)
September 28, 2015 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 9/29/2015 before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Parties to all call in by telephone. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2015)
September 24, 2015 117 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting in part and denying in part 109 Motion for Extension of Time to File (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2015)
September 22, 2015 116 Declaration of Nikki Stitt Sokol in Support of 111 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Joint Letter Brief on Plaintiffs' Request for Production No. 41 and Interrogatory No. 8 filed byFacebook Inc.. (Related document(s) 111 ) (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 9/22/2015)
September 22, 2015 115 Declaration of Nikki Stitt Sokol in Support of 110 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Joint Letter Brief on Plaintiffs' Third Set of Requests for Production filed byFacebook Inc.. (Related document(s) 110 ) (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 9/22/2015)
September 21, 2015 114 RESPONSE (re 109 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Class Certification and Summary Judgment Deadlines ) filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Joshua Jessen, # 2 Proposed Order)(Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 9/21/2015)
September 18, 2015 113 Joint Discovery Letter Briefon Plaintiffs Request for Production No. 41 and Interrogatory No. 8 filed by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley, David Shadpour. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 9/18/2015)
September 18, 2015 112 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Plaintiffs' Third Set of Requests for Production filed by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley, David Shadpour. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 9/18/2015) Modified on 9/21/2015 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2015 111 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Joint Letter Brief on Plaintiffs' Request for Production No. 41 and Interrogatory No. 8 filed by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley, David Shadpour. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Melissa Gardner, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Proposed Order, # 7 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Gardner, Melissa) (Filed on 9/18/2015)
September 18, 2015 110 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Joint Letter Brief on Plaintiffs' Third Set of Requests for Production filed by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley, David Shadpour. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Melissa Gardner, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Proposed Order, # 5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Gardner, Melissa) (Filed on 9/18/2015)
September 16, 2015 109 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Class Certification and Summary Judgment Deadlines filed by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of David Rudolph, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 17, # 20 Exhibit 18, # 21 Exhibit 19, # 22 Exhibit 20, # 23 Exhibit 21)(Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 9/16/2015)
September 11, 2015 108 Featured Case ORDER re motion to withdraw class representative and dismiss claims. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 9/11/2015. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2015)
August 21, 2015 107 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER TAKING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW (DKT. 96) OFF CALENDAR WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 106 Stipulation.(napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2015)
August 14, 2015 106 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Taking Plaintiffs' Motion to Withdraw Plaintiff David Shadpour and Dismiss Claims (Dkt. 96) Off Calendar Without Prejudice filed by Facebook Inc.. (Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 8/14/2015)
August 3, 2015 105 REPLY (re 96 MOTION to Dismiss Claims and Withdraw David Shadpour as Putative Class Representative ) filed byMatthew Campbell, Michael Hurley, David Shadpour. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Melissa Gardner)(Gardner, Melissa) (Filed on 8/3/2015)
July 27, 2015 104 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook Inc. re 102 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Facebook's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Withdraw Plaintiff David Shadpour Without Prejudice (Rogers, Ashley) (Filed on 7/27/2015)
July 27, 2015 103 RESPONSE (re 96 MOTION to Dismiss Claims and Withdraw David Shadpour as Putative Class Representative ) Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Withdraw Plaintiff David Shadpour Without Prejudice filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christopher Chorba In Support of Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Withdraw Plaintiff David Shadpour Without Prejudice, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Chorba Decl. ISO Facebook's Opposition, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Chorba Decl. ISO Facebook's Opposition, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Chorba Decl. ISO Facebook's Opposition, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Chorba Decl. ISO Facebook's Opposition, # 6 Exhibit 5 to Chorba Decl. ISO Facebook's Opposition (Filed Under Seal), # 7 Exhibit 6 to Chorba Decl. ISO Facebook's Opposition)(Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 7/27/2015)
July 27, 2015 102 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Facebook's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Withdraw Plaintiff David Shadpour Without Prejudice filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ashley Rogers in Support of Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Exhibit A - Exhibit 5 to Decl. of Christopher Chorba - Unredacted and Filed Under Seal, # 3 Exhibit A - Exhibit 5 to Decl. of Christopher Chorba - Redacted and Filed Under Seal, # 4 Proposed Order Authorizing the Filing of Documents Under Seal)(Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 7/27/2015)
July 21, 2015 101 Discovery Order re: 95 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Plaintiffs' Request for Production No. 30. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/21/2015. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2015) (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF).
July 20, 2015 100 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Catherine A. Yanni as Mediator. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2015)
July 17, 2015 99 ADR Clerk's Notice Vacating Appointment of Mediator Mark Petersen 97 . The ADR Program will appoint another mediator as soon as possible. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2015)
July 17, 2015 ADR Program received OBJECTION to 97 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Mediator Mark Petersen. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2015)
July 16, 2015 98 OBJECTIONS to re 97 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Mediator Mark Petersen by Facebook Inc.. (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 7/16/2015)
July 15, 2015 97 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Mark Petersen as Mediator. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2015)
July 13, 2015 96 MOTION to Dismiss Claims and Withdraw David Shadpour as Putative Class Representative filed by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley, David Shadpour. Motion Hearing set for 9/9/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 7/27/2015. Replies due by 8/3/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 7/13/2015)
July 6, 2015 95 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Plaintiffs Request for Production No. 30 filed by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley, David Shadpour. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A - B)(Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 7/6/2015)
July 2, 2015 94 Discovery Order re: 89 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Plaintiff David Shadpour filed by Facebook Inc. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/2/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2015)
July 1, 2015 93 AMENDED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 91 Stipulation.(napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2015)
June 30, 2015 92 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 90 Stipulation and Proposed Order Continuing The Deposition Of Alex Himel And Removing The Current Source Code Briefing Schedule And Hearing Date (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2015)
June 26, 2015 91 Amended Stipulated [Proposed] Protective Order filed by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley, David Shadpour. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 6/26/2015) Modified on 6/29/2015 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
June 26, 2015 90 Joint Stipulation And [Proposed] Order Continuing The Deposition Of Alex Himel And Removing The Current Source Code Briefing Schedule And Hearing Date filed by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley, David Shadpour. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 6/26/2015) Modified on 6/29/2015 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
June 18, 2015 89 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Plaintiff David Shadpour filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-B)(Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 6/18/2015)
June 12, 2015 88 Discovery Order re: 84 MOTION to Appear by Telephone Plaintiffs' Request for Telephonic Discovery Conference filed by David Shadpour, Michael Hurley, Matthew Campbell. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/12/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2015)
June 9, 2015 87 Declaration of Alex Himel Regarding Availability for Deposition filed by Facebook Inc.. (Related document(s) 85 ) (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 6/9/2015) Modified on 6/10/2015 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
June 8, 2015 86 Discovery Order for Supplemental Response re: 84 Plaintiffs' Request for Telephonic Discovery Conference. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/8/2015. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2015)
June 5, 2015 85 RESPONSE (re 84 MOTION to Appear by Telephone Plaintiffs' Request for Telephonic Discovery Conference ) filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joshua Jessen In Support of Response to Plaintiffs' Request for Telephonic Conference, # 2 Declaration of Christopher Chorba In Support of Response to Plaintiffs' Request for Telephonic Conference)(Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 6/5/2015)
June 5, 2015 84 MOTION to Appear by Telephone Plaintiffs' Request for Telephonic Discovery Conference filed by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley, David Shadpour. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David T. Rudolph in Support of Plaintiffs' Request for Telephonic Conference, # 2 Exhibit A)(Rudolph, David) (Filed on 6/5/2015)
June 3, 2015 83 Discovery Order re: 77 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Plaintiffs' Responses to Facebook's Interrogatories. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/3/2015. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2015)
May 28, 2015 81 Featured Case ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS (MEDIATION) by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton finding as moot 78 Stipulation selecting Mediation; granting 80 Stipulation selecting Mediation. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2015)
May 26, 2015 80 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley, David Shadpour SECOND AMENDED Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Selecting ADR Process filed by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley, David Shadpour. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 5/26/2015)
May 26, 2015 79 Declaration of Michael W. Sobol in Support of 78 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley, David Shadpour AMENDED Stipulation And [Proposed] Order Selecting ADR Process filed byMatthew Campbell, Michael Hurley, David Shadpour. (Related document(s) 78 ) (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 5/26/2015)
May 26, 2015 78 AMENDED Stipulation And [Proposed] Order selecting Mediation by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley, David Shadpour (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 5/26/2015) Modified on 5/27/2015 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2015 77 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Plaintiffs' Responses to Facebook's Interrogatories filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-F)(Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 5/20/2015)
April 17, 2015 76 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 75 Stipulation.(napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2015)
April 16, 2015 75 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated [Proposed] Protective Order filed by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley, David Shadpour. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 4/16/2015)
April 15, 2015 74 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 72 Stipulation.(napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2015)
April 15, 2015 73 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 71 Stipulation (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2015)
April 14, 2015 72 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 70 filed by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley, David Shadpour. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 4/14/2015)
April 14, 2015 71 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 69 filed by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley, David Shadpour. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 4/14/2015)
April 13, 2015 70 Filed in Error. See document 72 .STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Electronic Discovery filed by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley, David Shadpour. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 4/13/2015) Modified on 4/14/2015 (vlkS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/15/2015 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
April 13, 2015 69 Filed in Error. See document 71 .STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley, David Shadpour. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 4/13/2015) Modified on 4/14/2015 (vlkS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/15/2015 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
April 13, 2015 68 Discovery Order re: Source Code Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/13/2015. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2015)
April 10, 2015 67 NOTICE of Change of Address by Joseph Henry Bates, III (Bates, Joseph) (Filed on 4/10/2015)
March 31, 2015 Set/Reset Hearing re 66 Discovery Order Discovery Meet and Confer set for 4/13/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2015)
March 31, 2015 66 Discovery Order re meet and Confer signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/31/2015. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2015) Modified on 4/1/2015 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
March 30, 2015 65 Discovery Order re: 64 MOTION for Hearing Plaintiffs' Request for Discovery Conference. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/30/3015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2015)
March 27, 2015 64 MOTION for Hearing Plaintiffs' Request for Discovery Conference filed by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley, David Shadpour. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 3/27/2015)
March 13, 2015 63 Featured Case ORDER RE REFERRAL FOR DISCOVERY re Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/13/2015. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/13/2015: # 1 Standing Order - Discovery) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF).
March 13, 2015 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James for Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2015)
March 12, 2015 62 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton: Case Management Conference held on 3/12/2015. Motions due by 10/14/2015.Court Reporter: Not Reported. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/12/2015)
March 12, 2015 61 NOTICE of Appearance by David Taylor Rudolph (Rudolph, David) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
March 5, 2015 60 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC., filed by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley, David Shadpour, Facebook Inc.. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 3/5/2015) Modified on 3/6/2015 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
February 23, 2015 CASE REFERRED to Private ADR. (nap, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2015)
February 23, 2015 59 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS (Private Mediation) by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 55 Stipulation selecting Mediation.(nap, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2015)
February 19, 2015 58 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options David Shadpour (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 2/19/2015)
February 19, 2015 57 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Michael Hurley (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 2/19/2015)
February 19, 2015 56 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Matthew Campbell (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 2/19/2015)
February 19, 2015 55 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley, David Shadpour filed by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley, David Shadpour. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 2/19/2015)
February 19, 2015 54 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 2/19/2015)
February 6, 2015 53 ANSWER to Amended Complaint; Jury Demand byFacebook Inc.. (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 2/6/2015) Modified on 2/9/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 2, 2015 52 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. You are hereby notified that the February 26, 2015 case management conference is continued to March 12, 2015. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/5/2015. Case Management Conference set for 3/12/2015 02:00 PM. (THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY, THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE) (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2015)
January 21, 2015 51 Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 49 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for David Slade.(napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2015)
January 20, 2015 50 EXHIBITS re 49 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice David F. Slade ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9219496.) filed byMatthew Campbell, Michael Hurley, David Shadpour. (Related document(s) 49 ) (Slade, David) (Filed on 1/20/2015)
January 20, 2015 49 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice David F. Slade ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9219496.) filed by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley, David Shadpour. (Slade, David) (Filed on 1/20/2015)
December 30, 2014 48 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER PLAINTIFFS CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT re 25 Amended Complaint filed by Facebook Inc. (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 12/30/2014) Modified on 12/31/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
December 30, 2014 47 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF CERTAIN COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC. by Joshua Aaron Jessen. (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 12/30/2014) Modified on 12/31/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
December 30, 2014 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Marie Rogers (Rogers, Ashley) (Filed on 12/30/2014)
December 26, 2014 45 Transcript of Proceedings from 10/1/2014 before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Court Reporter Raynee H. Mercado, CSR, Telephone number 510-502-6175, cacsr8258@gmail.com, raynee_mercado@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 40 Transcript Order, 41 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/26/2015. (Related document(s) 40 , 41 ) (rhm) (Filed on 12/26/2014) Modified on 12/29/2014 (oh, COURT STAFF).
December 24, 2014 44 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. You are hereby notified that a case management conference will be held on February 26, 2015. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/19/2015. Case Management Conference set for 2/26/2015 02:00 PM. (THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY, THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE)(nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2014)
December 23, 2014 43 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion to Dismiss (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2014)
October 9, 2014 42 STIPULATION Regarding Judicially Noticeable Documents filed by Facebook Inc. (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 10/9/2014) Modified on 10/10/2014 (vlkS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/10/2014 (kk, COURT STAFF).
October 1, 2014 41 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley, David Shadpour for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Gardner, Melissa) (Filed on 10/1/2014)
October 1, 2014 40 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Facebook Inc. for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 10/1/2014)
October 1, 2014 39 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/1/2014 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 10/1/2014) re 29 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Facebook Inc.. (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/1/2014)
September 22, 2014 38 Featured Case STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byFacebook Inc.. (Related document(s) 35 ) (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 9/22/2014)
September 4, 2014 37 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. You are hereby notified that the September 17, 2014 hearing is continued to October 1, 2014, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 29 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 10/1/2014 09:00 AM before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. (THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY, THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE)(nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
August 28, 2014 36 Reply in Support of re 33 Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Complaint by Facebook Inc.. (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 8/28/2014) Modified on 8/29/2014 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
August 28, 2014 35 REPLY (re 29 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint ) filed byFacebook Inc.. (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 8/28/2014)
August 19, 2014 34 NOTICE of Recent Decision by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley, David Shadpour. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gardner, Melissa) (Filed on 8/19/2014) Modified on 8/20/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2014 33 RESPONSE (re 30 Request For Judicial Notice ) filed by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley, David Shadpour. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 7/30/2014) Modified on 7/31/2014 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2014 32 Request for Judicial Notice re 31 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byMatthew Campbell, Michael Hurley, David Shadpour. (Related document(s) 31 ) (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 7/30/2014)
July 30, 2014 31 RESPONSE (re 29 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint ) filed byMatthew Campbell, Michael Hurley, David Shadpour. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael W. Sobol, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 7/30/2014)
June 17, 2014 30 Request for Judicial Notice re 29 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint filed byFacebook Inc.. (Related document(s) 29 ) (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
June 17, 2014 29 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Facebook Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 7/30/2014. Replies due by 8/28/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jeremy Jordan and Exhibits, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
June 11, 2014 28 Certificate of Interested Entities by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley, David Shadpour (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 6/11/2014)
June 9, 2014 27 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE FOR DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 26 Stipulation.(nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2014)
June 6, 2014 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE FOR DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Facebook Inc.. (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 6/6/2014) Modified on 6/9/2014 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
April 25, 2014 25 CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, against Facebook Inc.. Filed by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley, David Shadpour. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 4/25/2014) Modified on 4/28/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2014 24 Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 18 Motion to Consolidate Cases.(nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
April 11, 2014 23 REPLY (re 18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 13-CV-05996 and 14-CV-00307 ) Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Motion to Consolidate Related Actions and Appoint Interim Class Counsel filed byMatthew Campbell, Michael Hurley. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 4/11/2014)
April 4, 2014 22 RESPONSE (re 18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 13-CV-05996 and 14-CV-00307 ) Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate Related Actions and Appoint Interim Counsel filed byFacebook Inc.. (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 4/4/2014)
March 26, 2014 21 Letter from Nicholas Diamand re Dckt Nos.19 & 20. (Diamand, Nicholas) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 26, 2014 20 Renotice motion hearing re 18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 13-CV-05996 and 14-CV-00307 13-5996 PJH 19 > 20 Correction of filing error of Docket No. 19 filed byMatthew Campbell, Michael Hurley. Motion Hearing set for 5/7/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 4/7/2014. Replies due by 4/14/2014. (Related document(s) 18 ) (Diamand, Nicholas) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 24, 2014 19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Appoint Interim Counsel filed by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley. Motion Hearing set for 5/7/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 4/7/2014. Replies due by 4/14/2014. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 21, 2014 18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 13-CV-05996 and 14-CV-00307 filed by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley. Responses due by 4/4/2014. Replies due by 4/11/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Michael W. Sobol, # 2 Exhibit A to Sobol Declaration, # 3 Declaration Hank Bates, # 4 Exhibit A to Bates Declaration, # 5 Declaration Jeremy Lieberman, # 6 Exhibit A to Lieberman Declaration, # 7 Proposed Order)(Gardner, Melissa) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
March 11, 2014 17 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' FILING OF CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT AND RELATED CASE DEADLINES AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting (16) Stipulation in case 4:13-cv-05996-PJH; granting (12) Stipulation in case 4:14-cv-00307-PJH (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2014)
March 6, 2014 16 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Plaintiffs' Filing Of Consolidated Amended Complaint And Related Case Deadlines, filed by Facebook Inc., Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley. (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 3/6/2014) Modified on 3/7/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
February 3, 2014 15 Featured Case ORDER RELATING CASE by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 14 Motion to Relate Case. C 13-5996 PJH AND C 14-307 PSG ARE RELATED. (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
January 29, 2014 14 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
January 15, 2014 13 STIPULATION To Extend Time For Defendant Facebook, Inc. To Answer Or Otherwise Respond To Class Action Complaint filed by Facebook Inc.. (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
January 15, 2014 12 Certificate of Interested Entities by Facebook Inc. (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
January 15, 2014 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Aaron Jessen Notice Of Appearance Of Counsel For Defendant Facebook, Inc. (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
January 10, 2014 10 Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Rachel Geman.(nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2014)
January 10, 2014 9 Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Nicholas Diamand.(nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2014)
January 7, 2014 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8276841.) filed by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Geman, Rachel) (Filed on 1/7/2014)
January 7, 2014 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8276892.) filed by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Diamand, Nicholas) (Filed on 1/7/2014)
January 7, 2014 6 Summons Issued as to Facebook Inc.. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2014)
January 6, 2014 5 Proposed Summons. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
December 30, 2013 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/27/2014. Case Management Conference set for 4/3/2014 02:00 PM. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
December 30, 2013 3 Featured Case ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Hon. Jeremy Fogel no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/30/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
December 30, 2013 2 Case assigned to Hon. Jeremy Fogel. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
December 30, 2013 1 COMPLAINT against Facebook Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-8262200.). Filed byMatthew Campbell, Michael Hurley. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 12/30/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell et al v. Facebook Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Campbell
Represented By: Hank Bates(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Allen Carney(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Nicholas Diamand(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Melissa Ann Gardner(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Rachel Geman(Designation Retained)
Represented By: David F. Slade(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Michael W. Sobol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hurley
Represented By: Hank Bates(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Allen Carney(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Nicholas Diamand(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Melissa Ann Gardner(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Rachel Geman(Designation Retained)
Represented By: David F. Slade(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Michael W. Sobol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Chorba(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Joshua Aaron Jessen
Represented By: Jeana Marie Bisnar Maute(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jessica S. Ou(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?