DiTirro v. Facebook, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Anthony DiTirro
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2014cv00132
Filed: January 9, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2014 Filing 32 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Katy A. Bresler, Anthony DiTirro, Michelle Shumate (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 5/30/2014)
May 21, 2014 Filing 31 NOTICE of Change of Address by Todd Michael Friedman (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 5/21/2014)
May 8, 2014 Filing 30 CLERKS NOTICE MODIFYING STIPULATION CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND OTHER DEADLINES ( 29 ), Set/Reset Deadlines as to ( 20 ) MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities. Motion Hearing set for 8/14/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, 280 South First Street San Jose, CA 95113 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 6/10/2014. Replies due by 6/24/2014. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2014)
May 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Beth Labson Freeman granting 28 Stipulation as modified. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman 5/7/2014. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2014)
May 6, 2014 Filing 28 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Continuing Case Management Conference and Other Pending Deadlines filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/6/2014) Modified on 5/7/2014 (srmS, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2014 Filing 27 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Beth Labson Freeman granting 25 Stipulation to Extend Time. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman 4/29/2014. (blflc3, COURT STAF) (Filed on 4/29/2014)
April 28, 2014 Filing 25 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Deadline to File Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Defendant's Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition filed by Katy A. Bresler, Anthony DiTirro, Michelle Shumate. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 4/28/2014)
April 28, 2014 Filing 24 Certificate of Interested Entities by Facebook, Inc. Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Local Rule 3-16 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/28/2014)
April 28, 2014 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Gutkin Notice of Appearance of Counsel for Defendant Facebook, Inc. (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/28/2014)
April 25, 2014 Filing 22 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - This case has been reassigned to the Honorable Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. In recognition of the pending issues in this case, the Court has scheduled an early Case Management Conference for May 20, 2014, at 3:30 P.M., in order to address case status and reset vacated hearing dates. The Case Management Conference will be held in Courtroom 3 on the 5th Floor of the United States Courthouse, 280 South First Street, San Jose, California, 95113. For this Case Management Conference only, the Court approves telephonic appearances without further application. Parties present at this Case Management Conference must be prepared to agree on dates for further proceedings, to the extent not already addressed in the parties Joint Case Management Statement. The Court requests that the parties engage in good-faith negotiations regarding dates and scheduling before their appearances. ***THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY NOTICE. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS DOCKET ENTRY***( (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2014)
April 18, 2014 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd for all discovery matters. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2014)
April 17, 2014 CASE REASSIGNED to the Honorable Beth Labson Freeman, United States District Judge. All parties must review the reassignment order posted at http://cand.uscourts.gov/orders/blf-order.pdf and comply with its requirements, including submitting a case management statement. This is a text only docket entry. The reassignment order associated with this notice may be viewed at http://cand.uscourts.gov/orders/blf-order.pdf Case Management Statement due by 5/1/2014. Signed the Executive Committee on 4/17/14. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2014)
April 15, 2014 Filing 21 Request for Judicial Notice re 20 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 20 ) (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
April 15, 2014 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/11/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 4/29/2014. Replies due by 5/6/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sandeep N. Solanki, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Sandeep N. Solanki, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Sandeep N. Solanki, # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Sandeep N. Solanki, # 5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Sandeep N. Solanki, # 6 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint)(Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
March 10, 2014 Filing 19 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint (L.R. 6-1(a)) filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/10/2014) Modified on 3/11/2014 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
February 27, 2014 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua B. Swigart (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Swigart, Joshua) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/8/2014. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/15/2014 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/25/14. (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
February 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal no longer assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 2/13/2014. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2014)
February 13, 2014 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge: All matters presently set before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal are hereby vacated. Clerk to reassign case. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2014)
February 12, 2014 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Facebook, Inc... (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 2/12/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 13 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Anthony DiTirro.. (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 5, 2014 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Parties shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge within 14 days of this notice, by 2/19/2014. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2014)
January 21, 2014 Filing 10 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 20, 2014 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason A. Ibey (Ibey, Jason) (Filed on 1/20/2014)
January 20, 2014 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Seyed Abbas Kazerounian (Kazerounian, Seyed) (Filed on 1/20/2014)
January 15, 2014 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byAnthony DiTirro. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Summons)(Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
January 15, 2014 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/29/2014. Case Management Conference set for 5/6/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
January 13, 2014 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anthony DiTirro. Facebook, Inc. served on 1/10/2014, answer due 1/31/2014. (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
January 9, 2014 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Facebook, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2014)
January 9, 2014 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2014)
January 9, 2014 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 1/9/2014)
January 9, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Facebook, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-8283745.). Filed byAnthony DiTirro. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 1/9/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DiTirro v. Facebook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Gutkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony DiTirro
Represented By: Todd Michael Friedman
Represented By: Jason A. Ibey
Represented By: Seyed Abbas Kazerounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?