Williamson v. McAfee, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sam Williamson
Defendant: McAfee, Inc.
Other: Amirali Jabrani, Joshua D. Holyoak and Wanda Richardson
Case Number: 5:2014cv00158
Filed: January 10, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Referring Judge: Howard R Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2017 Filing 126 CLERK'S Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2017)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER of USCA Appellants motion to dismiss this appeal is granted.. The parties shall bear their own costs on appeal.A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. as to #119 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Amirali Jabrani (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2017)
March 20, 2017 Filing 124 Transcript of Proceedings held on 01/26/2017, before Judge Davila. Court Reporter Irene L. Rodriguez, telephone number Irene_Rodriguez@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/19/2017. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 3/20/2017)
March 1, 2017 Filing 123 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/26/2017 before Hon. Edward J. Davila by Sam Williamson, for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 3/1/2017)
March 1, 2017 Filing 122 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 1/26/17 before Hon. Edward J. Davila by McAfee, Inc., for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Kurtzer-Ellenbogen, David) (Filed on 3/1/2017)
March 1, 2017 Filing 121 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 1/26/2017 before Hon. Edward J. Davila by Amirali Jabrani, for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Hanigan, Timothy) (Filed on 3/1/2017)
February 21, 2017 Filing 120 USCA Case Number 17-15301 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals for (119 in 5:14-cv-00158-EJD) Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Amirali Jabrani, (117 in 5:14-cv-00158-EJD) Notice of Appeal, filed by Amirali Jabrani. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 02/28/2017. Transcript ordered by 03/17/2017. Transcript due 04/17/2017. Appellant Amirali Jabrani opening brief due 05/26/2017. Appellees Samantha Kirby, McAfee, Inc. and Sam Williamson answering brief due 06/26/2017. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2017)
February 19, 2017 Filing 119 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL by Amirali Jabrani as to #114 Order on Motion for Settlement, Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, #118 Order Final Judgment and Order. Appeal Record due by 3/21/2017. (Hanigan, Timothy) (Filed on 2/19/2017)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/15/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017)
February 15, 2017 Filing 117 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Amirali Jabrani. Appeal of Order on Motion for Settlement, Order on Motion for Attorney Fees #114 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-11158493 paid.) (Hanigan, Timothy) (Filed on 2/15/2017)
February 14, 2017 Filing 116 Joint MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) filed by McAfee, Inc.. Responses due by 2/14/2017. Replies due by 2/14/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kurtzer-Ellenbogen, David) (Filed on 2/14/2017)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE FILES. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/3/2017. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2017)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER GRANTING #98 MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND #99 MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS AND FOR SERVICE AWARDS. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/3/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2017)
January 26, 2017 Filing 113 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Edward J. Davila: Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement #98 , and Motion for Attorney Fees #99 Hearing held on 1/26/2017. The Court heard oral arguments. The Court finds after review of all pleadings and oral arguments that the Class Settlement is appropriate, fair, adequate and reasonable and will approve the settlement. The Court will approve the award of payment to the named plaintiffs in the approved class settlement. The Court shall review the billings as to the Lodestar Multiplier-Method re the Motion for Attorney Fees and takes the motion under submission. The Court to prepare the order. Plaintiff Attorney Roger Heller, Theodore Maya. Defendant Attorney avid Kurtzer-Ellenbogen, Anna St. John(Objector Holyoak). Total Time in Court:10:15-10:50am(35 Mins.) Court Reporter: Irene Rodriguez. This is a text only Minute Entry (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/26/2017)
January 19, 2017 Filing 112 REPLY (re #99 MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion and Motion for Award of Attorneys Fees and Costs and for Service Awards; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #98 MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement; Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) Reply Of Objector Amirali Jabrani To Plaintiffs' Memorandum Responding To Objections filed byAmirali Jabrani. (Hanigan, Timothy) (Filed on 1/19/2017)
January 12, 2017 Filing 111 REPLY (re #98 Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement; and MOTION for Attorneys' Fees and costs and for service awards filed by Sam Williamson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Brian Devery (Part 1), #2 Declaration Brian Devery (Part 2))(Heller, Roger) (Filed on 1/12/2017) Modified on 1/13/2017 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2017 Filing 110 REPLY (re #98 MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement; Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) Response to Objections filed byMcAfee, Inc.. (Kurtzer-Ellenbogen, David) (Filed on 1/12/2017)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER Granting #102 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Anna St. John, Counsel for Joshua D. Holyoak. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/5/2016. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2016)
December 2, 2016 Filing 108 OBJECTIONS to re #96 Order on Motion for Settlement, by Samuel B. Haren. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2016)
December 1, 2016 Filing 107 OBJECTIONS to re #96 Order on Motion for Settlement, filed by b. Sharon Simnitt. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2016)
November 28, 2016 Filing 106 OBJECTIONS to Proposed Settlement by Wanda Richardson. (Sherwood, Alan) (Filed on 11/28/2016)
November 28, 2016 Filing 105 OBJECTIONS to Class Action Settlement by Amirali Jabrani. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1)(Hanigan, Timothy) (Filed on 11/28/2016)
November 28, 2016 Filing 104 OBJECTIONS to re #99 MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion and Motion for Award of Attorneys Fees and Costs and for Service Awards; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #98 MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement; Memorandum of Points and Authorities by Joshua D. Holyoak. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dr. Joshua Holyoak)(Lightman, Eric) (Filed on 11/28/2016)
November 28, 2016 Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric M. Lightman (Lightman, Eric) (Filed on 11/28/2016)
November 28, 2016 Filing 102 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10959644.) filed by Joshua D. Holyoak. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(St. John, Anna) (Filed on 11/28/2016)
November 25, 2016 Filing 101 OBJECTIONS to re #96 Order on Motion for Settlement, by James P. Muggleton.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2016)
November 3, 2016 Filing 100 OBJECTIONS to settlement re #96 Order on Motion for Settlement, filed by Michael A. Kuhlman. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2016)
October 29, 2016 Filing 99 MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion and Motion for Award of Attorneys Fees and Costs and for Service Awards; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Sam Williamson. Motion Hearing set for 1/26/2017 10:00 AM before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 11/28/2016. Replies due by 1/12/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Heller, #2 Declaration Hattis, #3 Declaration Wolfson, #4 Declaration Williamson, #5 Declaration Kirby)(Heller, Roger) (Filed on 10/29/2016)
October 29, 2016 Filing 98 MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Sam Williamson. Motion Hearing set for 1/26/2017 10:00 AM before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 11/28/2016. Replies due by 1/12/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Devery)(Heller, Roger) (Filed on 10/29/2016)
September 30, 2016 Filing 97 NOTICE by Sam Williamson - Joint Notice re Settlement Agreement (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting #91 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. Hearing on Motion for Final Approval of Settlement Agreement, Attorneys' Fees, and Incentive Award is scheduled for 1/26/2017 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/30.2016. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2016) Modified on 8/31/2016 (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2016 Filing 95 Amended Class Action Settlement Agreement and Release amendment to #91 -1 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Heller, Roger) (Filed on 8/22/2016) Modified on 8/23/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2016 Filing 94 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Edward J. Davila: Motion Hearing held on 8/18/2016 re #91 in 5:14-cv-00158-EJD, #62 in 5:14-cv-02475-EJD Motion for Settlement For Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement. Parties will submit a corrected Settlement Agreement and a Proposed Order for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement within a week. The Court will Grant the Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement. The Court set a Final Approval Settlement Hearing for 1/26/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Plaintiff Attorney: Daniel Hattis, Roger Heller, Theodore Maya. Defendant Attorney: David Kurtzer-Ellenbogen. Total Time in Court:10:07-10:18am(11Mins.) Court Reporter: Irene Rodriguez. This is a text only Minute Entry (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/18/2016) Modified text on 8/18/2016 (amkS, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2016 Reset Hearing re (94 in 5:14-cv-00158-EJD, 94 in 5:14-cv-00158-EJD) Final Approval for Settlement hearing set for 1/26/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2016)
August 5, 2016 Filing 93 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Ellen A. Cirangle of Alexis A. Lien of Williams & Connolly LLP hereby withdraws as attorney of record for Defendant McAFEE, INC. in this action. (Cirangle, Ellen) (Filed on 8/5/2016) Modified on 8/23/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2016 Filing 92 NOTICE by McAfee, Inc. of Complaince with 28 U.S.C. 1715 (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Schlam, Eli) (Filed on 7/25/2016)
July 14, 2016 Filing 91 MOTION for Settlement For Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement filed by Sam Williamson. Motion Hearing set for 8/18/2016 10:00 AM before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 7/28/2016. Replies due by 8/4/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Heller and Exhibit A - please see amended #95 Amended Settlement Agreement and [proposed] order, #2 Declaration Hattis, #3 Declaration Wolfson, #4 Declaration Weisbrot, #5*** please see #95 Amended Proposed Order)(Heller, Roger) (Filed on 7/14/2016) Modified on 8/23/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2016 Filing 90 STIPULATION AND SCHEDULING ORDER AS MODIFIED, granting ECF No. 89 in 5:14-cv-00158-EJD and ECF No. 60 in 5:14-cv-02475-EJD: Motion for Preliminary Approval to be filed by 7/14/2016. Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Settlement Approval set for 8/18/2016 at 10:00 AM (SPECIAL SET) before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 6/6/2016. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2016)
June 2, 2016 Filing 89 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER - Stipulation and [Proposed] Scheduling Order filed by Sam Williamson. (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 6/2/2016)
May 26, 2016 Filing 88 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Edward J. Davila: Status Conference held on 5/26/2016. The parties are to submit proposed scheduling order by 6/3/2016. Appearances:Attorney(s) for Plaintiff(s): Roger Heller, Robert Ahdoot, Daniel Hattis Attorneys(s) for Defendant(s): David Kurter-Ellenbogen Court Reporter Name: Summer Fisher Total Time in Court: 3 minutes (10:13 - 10:16 AM) This is a text only Minute Entry. There is no document associated with this entry. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/26/2016)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER DENYING (86 in 5:14-cv-00158-EJD) Status Report and Request to Continue Status Conference filed by Sam Williamson, (1 in 5:14-cv-00158-EJD) Complaint, filed by Sam Williamson, (57 in 5:14-cv-02475-EJD) Status Report filed by Samantha Kirby. The 5/26/2016 Status Conference remains as previously set. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/23/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2016)
May 19, 2016 Filing 86 STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT AND STIPULATED REQUEST TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE by Sam Williamson. (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 5/19/2016)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE FROM 4/21/2016 TO 5/26/2016 re (55 in 5:14-cv-02475-EJD) Status Report filed by Samantha Kirby, (84 in 5:14-cv-00158-EJD) Status Report filed by Sam Williamson. Joint Status Report due by 5/19/2016. Status Conference set for 5/26/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J.Davila on 4/14/2016. (ecgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2016)
April 8, 2016 Filing 84 STATUS REPORT Joint Notice with Respect to Settlement and Request to Continue Status Conference by Sam Williamson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Heller, Roger) (Filed on 4/8/2016)
April 7, 2016 Filing 83 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Ellen A. Cirangle (Cirangle, Ellen) (Filed on 4/7/2016)
March 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FROM 3/31/2016 to 4/21/2016 re (81 in5:14-cv-00158-EJD Williamson v. McAfee, Inc.), (52 in 5:14-cv-02475-EJD Kirby v. McAfee, Inc.). Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/14/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/21/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/25/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2016)
March 24, 2016 Filing 81 STATUS REPORT - Joint Status Report and Stipulated Request To Continue Status Conference by Sam Williamson. (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 3/24/2016)
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FROM 3/3/2016 TO 3/31/2016 re (50 in 5:14-cv-02475-EJD) Status Report filed by Samantha Kirby, (79 in 5:14-cv-00158-EJD) Status Report filed by Sam Williamson. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/24/2016. Case Management Conference set for 3/31/2016 10:00 AM before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/1/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2016)
February 25, 2016 Filing 79 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) AND STIPULATED REQUEST TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE by Sam Williamson. (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 2/25/2016)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE re (77 in 5:14-cv-00158-EJD) Status Report filed by Sam Williamson, (48 in 5:14-cv-02475-EJD) Status Report filed by Samantha Kirby. Status Conference Statement due by 2/25/2016. Status Conference set for 3/3/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/5/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2016)
February 3, 2016 Filing 77 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report and Stipulated Request to Continue Status Conference by Sam Williamson. (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 2/3/2016)
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The court finds that a scheduling conference at this time is premature. Accordingly, the Case Management Conference scheduled for December 10, 2015, is CONTINUED to 10:00 a.m. on February 11, 2016. The parties shall file an updated Joint Case Management Conference Statement on or before February 4, 2016. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/7/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
December 3, 2015 Filing 75 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report and Stipulated Request to Continue Status Conference by Sam Williamson. (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 12/3/2015)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. the court finds that a scheduling conference at this time is premature. Accordingly, the Case Management Conference scheduled for November 5, 2015, is CONTINUED to 10:00 a.m. on December 10, 2015. The parties shall file an updated Joint Case Management Conference Statement on or before December 3, 2015. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/30/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2015)
October 29, 2015 Filing 73 STATUS REPORT and Stipulated Request to Continue Status Conference by Sam Williamson. (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 10/29/2015)
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER CONTINUING 10/8/2015 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The court finds that a scheduling conference at this time is premature. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/29/2015. Case Management Conference set for 11/5/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/2/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2015) Modified text on 10/2/2015 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2015 Filing 71 STATUS REPORT AND STIPULATED REQUEST TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFRENCE by Sam Williamson. (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 9/30/2015)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER as Modified by the Court Granting (69) Stipulation staying proceedings, and deferring ruling on motion to dismiss, pending filing of settlement agreement in case 5:14-cv-00158-EJD; Granting (41) Stipulation staying proceedings, and deferring ruling on motion to dismiss, pending filing of settlement agreement in case 5:14-cv-02475-EJD. The cases are scheduled for a Status Conference at 10:00 a.m. on 10/8/15, with a joint statement due by 10/1/15. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/9/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2015)
July 9, 2015 Set Deadlines/Hearings re (69 in 5:14-cv-00158-EJD), (41 in 5:14-cv-02475-EJD): Case Management Statement due by 10/1/2015. Case Management Conference set for 10/8/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2015)
July 8, 2015 Filing 69 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS, AND DEFERRING RULING ON MOTION TO DISMISS, PENDING FILING OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT filed by Sam Williamson. (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 7/8/2015)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #67 Discovery of Electronically Stored Information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/19/2015. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2015)
March 17, 2015 Filing 67 Proposed Order RE: DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION by Sam Williamson. (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 3/17/2015)
March 2, 2015 Filing 66 CLERK'S NOTICE TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT. The Motion to Dismiss (Docket Item No. #48 ) before Judge Edward J. Davila previously noticed for 3/5/2015 at 9:00 AM has been taken under submission without oral argument pursuant to Civ. L.R. 7-1(b). The 3/5/2015 hearing is VACATED. The Court to issue further Order on the submitted motion. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2015)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Order Granting #64 Stipulation Extending ADR Deadline. ADR Deadine set for 4/8/2015. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 2/24/2015.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2015)
February 20, 2015 Filing 64 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE RE-SCHEDULED ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION SESSION filed by Sam Williamson. (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 2/20/2015)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING #62 Stipulation for EXTENSION OF TIME FOR ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION SESSION filed by Sam Williamson. The parties shall meet and confer to determine an alternative date for their ADR session, and shall so advise the Court on or before February 21, 2015. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/12/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2015)
February 11, 2015 Filing 62 STIPULATION RE Extension of Time for Alternative Dispute Resolution Session filed by Sam Williamson. (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 2/11/2015)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #58 Establishing Protocol for Expert Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2014)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re #57 (MODIFIED BY THE COURT). Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2014)
November 25, 2014 Filing 59 REPLY (re #48 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion of Defendant McAfee, Inc. to Dismiss First Amended Complaint ) Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion of Defendant McAfee, Inc. to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed byMcAfee, Inc.. (Donner, Michael) (Filed on 11/25/2014)
November 24, 2014 Filing 58 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Establishing Protocol for Expert Discovery filed by Sam Williamson. (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 11/24/2014)
November 24, 2014 Filing 57 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Proposed Protective Order filed by Sam Williamson. (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 11/24/2014)
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Order Granting #55 Stipulation Extending ADR Dispute Resolution Deadline. Deadline 2/10/2015. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 11/10/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2014)
November 6, 2014 Filing 55 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE Extension of Time for Alternative Dispute Resolution Session filed by McAfee, Inc.. (Kurtzer-Ellenbogen, David) (Filed on 11/6/2014)
November 4, 2014 Filing 54 RESPONSE (re #48 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion of Defendant McAfee, Inc. to Dismiss First Amended Complaint ) filed bySam Williamson. (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 11/4/2014)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Order Granting #52 Stipulation re Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 10/17/2014.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 17, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #48 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion of Defendant McAfee, Inc. to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Response due by 11/4/2014. Reply due by 11/25/2014. Motion Hearing set for 3/5/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 16, 2014 Filing 52 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Sam Williamson. (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 10/16/2014)
October 9, 2014 Filing 51 Proposed Order re #49 MOTION for Hearing Notice of Motion and Defendant McAfee, Inc.'s Motion for Judicial Notice by McAfee, Inc.. (Donner, Michael) (Filed on 10/9/2014)
October 9, 2014 Filing 50 Declaration of Alexis Lien in Support of #49 MOTION for Hearing Notice of Motion and Defendant McAfee, Inc.'s Motion for Judicial Notice filed byMcAfee, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, Part 1 of 9, #4 Exhibit 3, Part 2 of 9, #5 Exhibit 3, Part 3 of 9, #6 Exhibit 3, Part 4 of 9, #7 Exhibit 3, Part 5 of 9, #8 Exhibit 3, Part 6 of 9, #9 Exhibit 3, Part 7 of 9, #10 Exhibit 3, Part 8 of 9, #11 Exhibit 3, Part 9 of 9, #12 Exhibit 4, Part 1 of 7, #13 Exhibit 4, Part 2 of 7, #14 Exhibit 4, Part 3 of 7, #15 Exhibit 4, Part 4 of 7, #16 Exhibit 4, Part 5 of 7, #17 Exhibit 4, Part 6 of 7, #18 Exhibit 4, Part 7 of 7)(Related document(s) #49 ) (Donner, Michael) (Filed on 10/9/2014)
October 9, 2014 Filing 49 Notice of Motion and Motion for Judicial Notice filed by McAfee, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charlie Simpson)(Donner, Michael) (Filed on 10/9/2014) Modified on 10/14/2014 (cvS, COURT STAFF).
October 9, 2014 Filing 48 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion of Defendant McAfee, Inc. to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by McAfee, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/5/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 10/23/2014. Replies due by 10/30/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Donner, Michael) (Filed on 10/9/2014)
September 29, 2014 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirill M. Devyatov AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF SAM WILLIAMSON (Devyatov, Kirill) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
September 26, 2014 Filing 46 NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael F. Donner Notice of Change of Name of Law Firm for Defendant McAfee, Inc. (Donner, Michael) (Filed on 9/26/2014)
September 23, 2014 Filing 45 NOTICE of Change of Address by Daniel Morley Kekoa Hattis of Hattis Law (Hattis, Daniel) (Filed on 9/23/2014)
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Order Granting #43 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant McAfee Inc. to respond to First Amended Complaint. Pursuant to Local Rule 6-1(a), the enlargement of time will not alter the date of any event or deadline fixed by Court Order. McAfee's deadline for responding to the First Amended Complaint is extended to October 9, 2014. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 9/12/2014.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2014)
September 11, 2014 Filing 43 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Extension of Time for Defendant McAfee, Inc. to Respond to First Amended Complaint filed by McAfee, Inc.. (Kurtzer-Ellenbogen, David) (Filed on 9/11/2014)
September 8, 2014 Filing 42 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Class Action Complaint against McAfee, Inc.. Filed bySam Williamson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Consumer Agreement)(Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 9/8/2014)
September 8, 2014 Filing 41 NOTICE by Sam Williamson of Plaintiff's Notice of Filing First Amended Complaint (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 9/8/2014)
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #21 Motion to Dismiss. Any amended complaint must be filed within 15 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/22/2014. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2014) Modified on 8/24/2014 (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF).
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The court finds that a conference is premature at this time and hereby VACATES the conference. The court shall set a Case Management Conference, if necessary, in its order on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/28/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2014)
July 28, 2014 Filing 38 CLERKS NOTICE TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT. The Motion to Dismiss (re #21 ) before Judge Edward J. Davila previously noticed for 8/1/2014 at 9:00 AM has been taken under submission without oral argument pursuant to Civ. L.R. 7-1(b). The 8/1/2014 hearing is VACATED. The Court to issue further Order on the submitted motion. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2014)
July 25, 2014 Filing 37 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Management Conference Statement filed by Sam Williamson. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 7/25/2014)
July 18, 2014 Filing 36 Certificate of Interested Entities by Sam Williamson (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 7/18/2014)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR as Modified. The parties shall hold the ADR session by December 5, 2014. Motions terminated: #34 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Sam Williamson filed by Sam Williamson. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/11/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
July 10, 2014 Filing 34 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Sam Williamson filed by Sam Williamson. (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 7/10/2014)
July 10, 2014 Filing 33 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 7/10/2014)
July 10, 2014 Filing 32 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Cirangle, Ellen) (Filed on 7/10/2014)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 RELATED CASE ORDER. 5:14-cv-00158-EJD Williamson v. McAfee, Inc. and 5:14-cv-02475-HRL Kirby v. McAfee, Inc. ARE RELATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/1/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
June 26, 2014 Filing 30 MOTION to Relate Case C14-158 EJD and C14-2475 HRL filed by McAfee, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Donner, Michael) (Filed on 6/26/2014) Modified on 6/26/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2014 Filing 29 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Michael F. Donner (Donner, Michael) (Filed on 6/25/2014)
May 22, 2014 Filing 28 Certificate of Interested Entities by McAfee, Inc. (Slaughter, Daniel) (Filed on 5/22/2014)
May 2, 2014 Filing 27 REPLY (re #21 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint ) Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed byMcAfee, Inc.. (Donner, Michael) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying #24 Motion to Advance Hearing Date. The Case Management Conference scheduled for 5/16/2014 is CONTINUED to 10:00 a.m. on 8/1/2014 to coincide with the date of the motion hearing. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/15/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
April 15, 2014 Set Deadlines/Hearings re #26 Order: Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/25/2014. Case Management Conference set for 8/1/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
April 11, 2014 Filing 25 RESPONSE (re #21 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint ) Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed bySam Williamson. (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 4/11/2014)
April 8, 2014 Filing 24 Joint MOTION to Shorten Time Joint Administrative Motion to Modify Hearing Date for Motion to Dismiss filed by Sam Williamson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Heller, Roger) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order Granting #22 Stipulation to Extending Briefing Schedule re Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 3/17/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
March 17, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines re #23 Order on Stipulation as to #21 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint: Opposition due by 4/11/2014. Reply due by 5/2/2014. Motion Hearing set for 8/1/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
March 14, 2014 Filing 22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss filed by Sam Williamson. (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 3/14/2014)
March 7, 2014 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by McAfee, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/1/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 3/21/2014. Replies due by 3/28/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charlie Simpson, #2 Proposed Order)(Slaughter, Daniel) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order Granting #19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David S. Kurtzer-Ellenbogen for McAfee, Inc. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 2/28/2014(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 19 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice David S. Kurtzer-Ellenbogen ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8410498.) Filing fee previously paid on 2/27/2014 filed by McAfee, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Kurtzer-Ellenbogen, David) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order Granting #17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Daniel F. Katz for Defendant. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 2/18/2014.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 17 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Daniel F. Katz ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8352095.) Filing fee previously paid on 2/5/2014 filed by McAfee, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Katz, Daniel) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order Granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Eli S. Schlam for Defendant McAfee, Inc. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 2/7/2014.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2014)
February 6, 2014 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Eli S. Schlam ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8355373.) filed by McAfee, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Schlam, Eli) (Filed on 2/6/2014)
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Granting #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Alexis Lien for McAfee, Inc. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 2/6/2014.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2014)
February 5, 2014 Filing 13 *** POSTED IN ERROR *** MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Daniel F. Katz ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8352095.) filed by McAfee, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Lien, Alexis) (Filed on 2/5/2014) Modified on 2/5/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 5, 2014 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Alexis Lien ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8351968.) filed by McAfee, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Lien, Alexis) (Filed on 2/5/2014)
February 4, 2014 Filing 11 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT FROM MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/9/2014. Case Management Conference set for 5/16/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. All other deadlines associated with the initial case management conference are adjusted accordingly by the parties. The Court does not issue a revised Initial ADR Scheduling Order. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Edward J. Davila and for all further proceedings., Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd remains as the referral judge to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/3/2014. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
February 3, 2014 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
January 31, 2014 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by McAfee, Inc... (Slaughter, Daniel) (Filed on 1/31/2014)
January 29, 2014 Filing 7 STIPULATION re Extension of Time for Defendant McAfee, Inc. to Respond to Complaint filed by McAfee, Inc.. (Slaughter, Daniel) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
January 23, 2014 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sam Williamson. McAfee, Inc. served on 1/15/2014, answer due 2/5/2014. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 1/23/2014)
January 13, 2014 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to McAfee, Inc.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
January 13, 2014 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/6/2014. Case Management Conference set for 5/13/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
January 13, 2014 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
January 10, 2014 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 1/10/2014)
January 10, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against McAfee, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-8288561.). Filed bySam Williamson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 1/10/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williamson v. McAfee, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Amirali Jabrani
Represented By: Timothy Ricardo Hanigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Joshua D. Holyoak
Represented By: Eric M. Lightman
Represented By: Anna St. John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Wanda Richardson
Represented By: Alan J Sherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Williamson
Represented By: Tina Wolfson
Represented By: Theodore Walter Maya
Represented By: Kirill M. Devyatov
Represented By: Daniel Morley Hattis
Represented By: Robert Ahdoot
Represented By: Nicole Diane Sugnet
Represented By: Michael W. Sobol
Represented By: Roger Norton Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McAfee, Inc.
Represented By: David S. Kurtzer-Ellenbogen
Represented By: Michael F. Donner
Represented By: Daniel F. Katz
Represented By: Ellen A. Cirangle
Represented By: Eli Samuel Schlam
Represented By: Alexis Anne Lien
Represented By: Daniel Kirk Slaughter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?